HENOK v. CHASE HOME FINANCE, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
ARAYA HENOK |
Defendant: |
CHASE HOME FINANCE, LLC, SHAPIRO & BURSON, LLP and FANNIE MAE |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv00292 |
Filed: |
February 22, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Columbia |
Office: |
Washington, DC Office |
County: |
11001 |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard W. Roberts |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1444 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 6, 2015 |
Filing
136
OPINION AND ORDER remanding these two cases to the Superior Court of the District of Columbia because this Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk of Court shall transfer all papers in these proceedings to the Superior Court of the District of Columbia, and remove these cases from this Court's docket. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 6, 2015. (MA)
|
January 28, 2015 |
Filing
130
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: If Marco Acevedo or any of the parties named in Dr. Araya's proposed amended complaints, specifically, Shapiro Brown & Alt; Gregory Britto; John Burson; or Fannie Mae, wishes to submit views on the question of this Court's jurisdiction to these matters, it shall do so in writing on or before February 11, 2015; plaintiff shall file a response regarding the question of this Court's jurisdiction in these matters on or before February 26, 2015. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 28, 2015. (MA)
|
August 5, 2014 |
Filing
111
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Fannie Mae's motions to terminate proceedings or, in the alternative, to dismiss [Dkt. No. 75 in Civil Action No. 12-0292; Dkt. 72 in Civil Action No. 12-0336] are GRANTED; Fannie Mae is dismissed as a party to the above-captioned civil actions. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 5, 2014. (lcplf2)
|
July 31, 2014 |
Filing
108
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Fannie Mae's motions to terminate proceedings or, in the alternative, to dismiss [Dkt. No. 75 in Civil Action No. 12-0292; Dkt. 72 in Civil Action No. 12-0336] are GRANTED; Fannie Mae is dismissed as as party to the above-captioned civil actions. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 31, 2014. (MA)
|
July 29, 2013 |
Filing
65
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying Henok's motion 61 for reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/29/13. (lcrwr1)
|
June 17, 2013 |
Filing
60
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying the plaintiff's motion 50 for partial summary judgment and granting Chase's cross-motion 56 for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 6/17/13. (lcrwr1)
|
February 26, 2013 |
Filing
45
AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/26/13. (lcrwr1)
|
February 25, 2013 |
Filing
44
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying the plaintiff's motions 11 , 26 for partial summary judgment and entering judgment for Chase concerning the notice of default claim, and denying the plaintiff's motion 17 to strike Shapiro's opposition and denying the plaintiff's motions 32 , 33 for sanctions. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/25/13. (lcrwr1)
|
January 15, 2013 |
Filing
39
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's motion 30 for leave to amend the complaint and denying defendants' motions 20 , 23 as moot. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 1/15/13. (lcrwr1)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?