XEREAS v. HEISS et al
Plaintiff: JOHN N. XEREAS
Defendant: MARJORIE A. HEISS, GEOFFREY O.S. DAWSON, RIOT ACT DC, LLC and SQUIID, INC.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00456
Filed: March 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Richard W. Roberts
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 234 Motion to Amend/Correct and denying 235 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. See Memorandum Opinion and Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 8/5/2019. (lcdar3)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 142 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and 151 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 10/5/2018. (lcdar3)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 8/18/2017. (lcdar2)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part the defendants' motions 15 , 16 to dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/27/13. (lcrwr1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: XEREAS v. HEISS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN N. XEREAS
Represented By: Stephanie H. Bald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARJORIE A. HEISS
Represented By: Joshua Allen Fowkes
Represented By: Alec P. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEOFFREY O.S. DAWSON
Represented By: Joshua Allen Fowkes
Represented By: Alec P. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIOT ACT DC, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Allen Fowkes
Represented By: Alec P. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SQUIID, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?