KUBICKI et al v. MEDTRONIC, INC. et al

Plaintiff: JOHN KUBICKI and KAREN KUBICKI
Defendant: MEDTRONIC, INC., MEDTRONIC DIABETES and MEDTRONIC MINIMED, INC.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00734
Filed: May 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MEMORANDUM OPINION GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 133 Medtronic's Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING 134 Unomedical's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/5/2018. (lckbj1)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 86 and 89 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 12/23/14. (SP, )
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 21, 2013. (lcckk1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KUBICKI et al v. MEDTRONIC, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN KUBICKI
Represented By: Adam R. Leighton
Represented By: Michelle A. Parfitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN KUBICKI
Represented By: Adam R. Leighton
Represented By: Michelle A. Parfitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDTRONIC, INC.
Represented By: Jesse J. Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDTRONIC DIABETES
Represented By: Jesse J. Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDTRONIC MINIMED, INC.
Represented By: Jesse J. Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?