BLOOMGARDEN v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Plaintiff: HOWARD BLOOMGARDEN
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Case Number: 1:2012cv00843
Filed: May 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Ellen S. Huvelle
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM OPINION (REDACTED). Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 7/19/16. (gdf)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 REDACTED MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on February 05, 2016. (jf)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: parties' cross-motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on February 5, 2016. (lcesh1)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 22, 2014.(lcesh2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLOOMGARDEN v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOWARD BLOOMGARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?