CAMPBELL v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Plaintiff: JENNIFER B. CAMPBELL
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA and WAYNE M. TURNAGE
Case Number: 1:2012cv01769
Filed: October 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 84 Plaintiff's Motion for Fees and Costs. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/29/2016. (lcrc1)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 83 Defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/25/2016. (lcrc1)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 69 Plaintiff's request for equitable relief and entering judgment for Plaintiff. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/20/2016. (lcrc1)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 24 Defendant's motion for summary judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/4/2015. (lcrc1)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/23/2013. (lcrc3)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAMPBELL v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER B. CAMPBELL
Represented By: Alan Lescht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE M. TURNAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?