GLYCOBIOSCIENCES, INC. v. INNOCUTIS HOLDINGS, LLC et al

Plaintiff: GLYCOBIOSCIENCES, INC.
Defendant: INNOCUTIS HOLDINGS, LLC. and DARA BIOSCIENCES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01901
Filed: November 25, 2012
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M. Collyer
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2016 139 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: It is hereby ORDERED that Fidias motion to dismiss 85 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Counts IV, V, and VII, as well as the portion of Count VI specified above, are DISMISSED. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/24/2016. (lcrdm1, )
November 25, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION: See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/15/2015. (lcrdm1, )
June 10, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 55 . Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on June 10, 2015. (lcrdm1, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLYCOBIOSCIENCES, INC. v. INNOCUTIS HOLDINGS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLYCOBIOSCIENCES, INC.
Represented By: Joseph Jude Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INNOCUTIS HOLDINGS, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARA BIOSCIENCES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?