KOCH v. SCHAPIRO
Plaintiff: RANDOLPH S. KOCH
Defendant: MARY L. SCHAPIRO
Case Number: 1:2012cv01934
Filed: November 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Paul L. Friedman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying Plaintiff's 107 108 Motion for Reconsideration. See the attached Memorandum Opinion & Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/01/2017. (lcapm1)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 87 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Please see the attached Memorandum Opinion for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/02/2017. (lcapm1)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Defendant White's Motion to Strike the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/29/2015. (lcapm2)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that plaintiff's complaint [#1] is stricken from the record; defendant's motion to dismiss or for summary judgment [#7] is denied as moot; and plaintiff shall file his amended complaint on or before May 30, 2014. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 31, 2014. (MA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KOCH v. SCHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDOLPH S. KOCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY L. SCHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?