SOFTVIEW LLC V. APPLE INC., ET AL. Featured Case
Petitioner: SOFTVIEW LLC
Respondent: APPLE INC. and AT&T MOBILITY LLC
Case Number: 1:2012mc00667
Filed: December 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Richard W. Roberts
Presiding Judge: Deborah A. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by SOFTVIEW LLC re 8 Reply to opposition to Motion, 1 MOTION to Quash (Greene, Andra)
February 4, 2013 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. Status Conference held on 1/28/2013; Page Numbers: 1-43. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bowles Reporting Service, Telephone number (860) 464-1083, For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/25/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2013.(znmw, )
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 1/28/2013: For the reasons set forth on the record, further consideration of Softview LLC's Motion to Partially Quash Subpoena 1 is STAYED through February 20, 2013. It is hereby ORDERED that by no later than February 20, 2013, the parties shall file a joint status report. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if the pending motion is not withdrawn, the parties may attach excerpts of the transcript from Dr. Bederson's deposition that may prove probative of the issues in this matter. (lcdar1)
January 28, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Status Conference conducted on 1/28/2013. (Court Reporter Bowles Reporting)(lcdar1)
January 25, 2013 Filing 8 REPLY to opposition to motion re 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by SOFTVIEW LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig Johnson ISO Reply ISO Motion to Quash)(Greene, Andra)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 1/24/2013 granting 7 Apple and AT&T Mobility's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (lcdar1)
January 24, 2013 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stuart M. Rosenberg, :Firm- Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, :Address- 1881 Page Mill Road, Palo Alto, CA 94304. Phone No. - (650) 849-5389. Fax No. - (650) 849-5333 by APPLE INC., AT&T MOBILITY LLC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stuart Rosenberg in Support of Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Buroker, Brian)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 1/22/2013 granting 6 Softview LLC's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (lcdar1)
January 21, 2013 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher Davide Vieira, :Firm- Irell & Manella LLP, :Address- 840 Newport Center Drive, Suite 400, Newport Beach, CA 92660. Phone No. - 949-760-5208. Fax No. - 949-760-5200 by SOFTVIEW LLC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Vieira, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Greene, Andra)
January 18, 2013 Filing 5 Memorandum in opposition to re 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by APPLE INC., AT&T MOBILITY LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stuart Rosenberg in Support of Opposition, # 2 Exhibit A to Rosenberg Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Rosenberg Declaration)(Buroker, Brian)
January 7, 2013 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/28/2013 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (lcdar1)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 1/7/2013 granting 4 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Apple Inc.'s and AT&T Mobility LLC's Response to Petitioner Softview's Motion to Partially Quash Subpoena. Responses due by 1/18/2013. (lcdar1)
January 7, 2013 Filing 4 STIPULATION and Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Response by APPLE INC., AT&T MOBILITY LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buroker, Brian)
December 21, 2012 Filing 3 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (kb)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the case be, and hereby is, REFERRED under LCvR 72.2 to a magistrate judge. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 12/21/2012. (DCL)
December 20, 2012 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by SOFTVIEW LLC. Case related to Case No. 1:12-mc-666-RWR (USDC for the District of Columbia) and 10-cv-389-LPS (USDC for the District of Delaware). (kb)
December 20, 2012 Filing 1 MOTION to Partially Quash Subpoena by SOFTVIEW LLC. (kb)(Fee Paid $46.00, Receipt No. 4616053371) Modified on 12/21/2012 (kb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOFTVIEW LLC V. APPLE INC., ET AL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SOFTVIEW LLC
Represented By: Andra B. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: APPLE INC.
Represented By: Brian Mark Buroker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: AT&T MOBILITY LLC
Represented By: Brian Mark Buroker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?