LUCAS v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Plaintiff: ALLAN EARL LUCAS, JR
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA POLICE AND FIREFIGHTER RETIREMENT RELIEF BOARD and DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN RESOURCES
Case Number: 1:2013cv00143
Filed: February 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: John D. Bates
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 38:4301 Uniformed Services Employment & Re-Employment Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on October 2, 2019. (lctfh4).
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on February 20, 2018 (lctfh4).
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on October 5, 2016. (lctfh1)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting Defendant District of Columbia's Renewed Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment 36 . Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on September 30, 2015. (lctfh2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LUCAS v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA POLICE AND FIREFIGHTER RETIREMENT RELIEF BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN RESOURCES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLAN EARL LUCAS, JR
Represented By: David Drake Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?