WADELTON et al v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE

Plaintiff: JOAN WADELTON and TRUTHOUT
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Case Number: 1:2013cv00412
Filed: April 1, 2013
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Ellen S. Huvelle
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: Re Defendant's 58 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 09/22/2016. (lctsc3)
May 26, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/26/15. (lctsc3)
April 25, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 4/25/13. (lcesh1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WADELTON et al v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAN WADELTON
Represented By: Kelly Brian McClanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUTHOUT
Represented By: Kelly Brian McClanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: Fred Elmore Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?