COLBERT et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Plaintiff: KATINA COLBERT, JACQUELINE COLBERT and ESTATE OF T.C.
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA and TOTAL CARE SERVICES INC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00531
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M. Collyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION on 57 motion for partial reconsideration. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/25/2015. (KD)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/12/2015. (KD)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION regarding motion to intervene 16 . Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/29/2014. (KD)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION regarding 9 the District of Columbia's motion to dismiss or for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/13/13. (KD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLBERT et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Joseph Alphonso Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOTAL CARE SERVICES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATINA COLBERT
Represented By: Catherine D. Bertram
Represented By: Harvey S. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUELINE COLBERT
Represented By: Catherine D. Bertram
Represented By: Harvey S. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF T.C.
Represented By: Catherine D. Bertram
Represented By: Harvey S. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?