AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW et al
Plaintiff: AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION
Defendant: EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, JUAN P. OSUNA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and ERIC HOLDER
Case Number: 1:2013cv00840
Filed: June 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Beryl A. Howell
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 62 Order granting in part and denying in part Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Second Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/17/2017. (lccrc2)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's 35 Motion to Enforce or, in the Alternative, to Clarify. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/23/2015. (lccrc2, )
December 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 16 and Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 20 . Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/24/2014. (lccrc2, ) (Main Document 30 replaced on 12/24/2014) (zmac, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Michael T. Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Julie A. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUAN P. OSUNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC HOLDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?