AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS et al v. PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. Featured Case

Plaintiff: AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS, NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. and AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC.
Defendant: PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01215
Filed: August 6, 2013
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Emmet G. Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' pending appeal before the Circuit Court, the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to Administratively Close this case. Upon resolution of the appeal (#17-7035) the parties may file a motion to return this case to the court's active docket. Any such motion shall contain a proposed order for moving forward with this case. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/6/17. (DJS)
April 7, 2017 184 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 183 Amended Notice of Appeal ;USCA Case Number 17-7035. (jf)
April 6, 2017 183 Amended NOTICE OF APPEAL re appeal 177 by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (Bridges, Andrew)
April 3, 2017 182 Featured Case ORDER amending 176 Order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/3/2017. (lctsc2)
March 1, 2017 181 NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT ORDER BY DEFENDANT-COUNTERCLAIMANT PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (Bridges, Andrew)
March 1, 2017 180 NOTICE RE PRELIMINARY AND NON-BINDING STATEMENT OF ISSUES BY APPELLANT/DEFENDANT-COUNTERCLAIMANT PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (Bridges, Andrew)
February 28, 2017 USCA Case Number 17-7035 for 177 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (td)
February 17, 2017 179 Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS. (Rubel, Jordana)
February 16, 2017 178 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date 2/15/17 re 177 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,. (td)
February 15, 2017 177 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 175 Memorandum & Opinion, 176 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction, by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-4843999. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Bridges, Andrew)
February 3, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/17/2017. (tb)
February 2, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Parties are ORDERED to submit a JOINT status report by 2/17/2017 (1) updating the court as to Defendant's compliance with 176 the court's order to remove the nine standards from its website and to cease all unauthorized use of Plaintiffs' trademarks, and (2) providing a jointly proposed schedule for this case going forward to resolve Plaintiffs' claims as to the remaining standards. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/2/2017. (lctsc2)
February 2, 2017 176 Featured Case ORDER granting 118 Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment and denying 121 Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment. See Order for more details. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/2/2017. (lctsc2)
February 2, 2017 175 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 118 Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment and 121 Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/2/2017. (lctsc2)
October 14, 2016 174 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. Attorney Kathleen Lu terminated. (Lu, Kathleen)
October 13, 2016 173 TRANSCRIPT OF 9/12/16 MOTIONS HEARING, before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan, held on September 12, 2016. Page Numbers: 1-142. Date of Issuance: 10/13/16. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, t he transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2017.(Wayne, Bryan)
September 21, 2016 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 169 Plaintiffs' Motion to Take Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/21/2016. (lctsc2)
September 21, 2016 172 Featured Case ORDER denying 124 Motion to Strike Expert Report. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/21/2016. (lctsc2)
September 12, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2016 re 118 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC., AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC., 121 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. Motions taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne.) (zsm)
September 9, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsm)
September 9, 2016 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The motions hearing previously scheduled for 9:30 a.m. on 9/12/2016 has been rescheduled to begin at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/9/2016. (lctsc2)
June 30, 2016 171 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel of Nathan M. Rehn by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (Rehn, Nathan)
June 3, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsm)
June 3, 2016 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. Motion Hearing on all pending motions set for 9/12/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/3/16. (lctsc2)
March 14, 2016 170 SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibits) filed by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS. re Sealed Order. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd)
March 14, 2016 Featured Case SEALED MINUTE ORDER granting 97 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/14/16.(zsm)
February 8, 2016 169 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs' Request For Judicial Notice)(Ehler, Rose)
February 8, 2016 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 152 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Sebastian E. Kaplan is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendant. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/8/16. (DJS)
February 5, 2016 168 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. re 124 MOTION to Strike 118 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction (ztd)
February 5, 2016 167 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. re Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd)
February 5, 2016 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 163 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting 165 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/5/16. (zsm)
February 5, 2016 166 REPLY in support to motion re 165 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.), 123 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (Bridges, Andrew) Modified text on 2/5/2016 (ztd).
February 5, 2016 165 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 [Sealed] Reply In Support of Motion to Strike the Expert Report of John Jarosz, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Bridges, Andrew)
February 5, 2016 164 REPLY in support of motion re 163 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.), 120 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 [Redacted] Declaration of Matthew Becker, # 2 [Redacted] Consolidated List of Exhibits, # 3 [Redacted] Response to Supplemental Statement of Facts, # 4 [Redacted] Response to Statement of Disputed Facts, # 5 Supplemental Objections to Evidence, # 6 Response to Evidentiary Objections, # 7 Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice, # 8 Supplemental Declaration of Carl Malamud, # 9 Exhibit 1, # 10 Exhibit 2, # 11 Exhibit 3, # 12 Exhibit 4, # 13 Exhibit 5, # 14 Exhibit 6, # 15 Exhibit [Redacted] 7, # 16 Exhibit 8, # 17 Exhibit 9, # 18 Exhibit [Redacted] 10, # 19 Exhibit [Redacted] 11, # 20 Exhibit 12, # 21 Exhibit 13, # 22 Exhibit 14, # 23 Exhibit 15, # 24 Exhibit 16, # 25 Exhibit 17)(Bridges, Andrew) Modified text on 2/5/2016 (ztd).
February 4, 2016 163 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 [Sealed] Matthew Becker Declaration, # 2 [Sealed] Supplemental Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # 3 [Sealed] Supplemental Statement of Disputed Material Facts, # 4 [Sealed] Consolidated List of Exhibits, # 5 [Sealed] Exhibit 7, # 6 [Sealed] Exhibit 10, # 7 [Sealed] Exhibit 11, # 8 Text of Proposed Order, # 9 Certificate of Service)(Bridges, Andrew)
February 4, 2016 162 SEALED DOCUMENT (Part 1 of 27) filed by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC.. re Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,,,,. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of 27, # 2 Part 3 of 27, # 3 Part 4 of 27, # 4 Part 5 of 27, # 5 Part 6 of 27, # 6 Part 7 of 27, # 7 Part 8 of 27, # 8 Part 9 of 27, # 9 Part 10 of 27, # 10 Part 11 of 27, # 11 Part 12 of 27, # 12 Part 13 of 27, # 13 Part 14 of 27, # 14 Part 15 of 27, # 15 Part 16 of 27, # 16 Part 17 of 27, # 17 Part 18 of 27, # 18 Part 19 of 27, # 19 Part 20 of 27, # 20 Part 21 of 27, # 21 Part 22 of 27, # 22 Part 23 of 27, # 23 Part 24 of 27, # 24 Part 25 of 27, # 25 Part 26 of 27, # 26 Part 27 of 27)(ztd)
February 4, 2016 161 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. re 160 Sealed Document, filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd)
February 4, 2016 160 SEALED DOCUMENT (Main document Part 1 of 4) filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. re Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,,,,. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of 4, # 2 Part 3 of 4, # 3 Part 4 of 4)(ztd)
February 4, 2016 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 120 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting 123 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting 154 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/4/16. (zsm)
February 3, 2016 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The Court's 1/21/16 Order 153 is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/3/16. (DJS)
January 29, 2016 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 158 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Simeon Meir Schopf terminated. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/29/16. (zsm)
January 28, 2016 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 159 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Rose Leda Ehler is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff National Fire Protection Association, Inc. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/28/16. (DJS)
January 27, 2016 159 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rose Leda Ehler, :Firm- MUNGER, TOLLES & OLSON LLP, :Address- 560 Mission St., 27th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94105-2907. Phone No. - (415) 512-4000. Fax No. - (415) 644-6971 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4391071. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rose Leda Ehler in support of Motionto Admit Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order of Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Choudhury, Anjan)
January 25, 2016 158 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Simeon M Schopf by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Jason)
January 22, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Supplemental Filing due by 2/5/2016. (tth)
January 21, 2016 157 Memorandum in opposition to re 121 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC., NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC..(See docket entry no. {155} (td)
January 21, 2016 156 Memorandum in opposition to re 124 MOTION to Strike 118 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC., NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Fee, J.)
January 21, 2016 155 REPLY to opposition to motion re 118 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC., NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 2 Disputes with Defendant's Statement of Facts, Evidentiary Objections and Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice, # 3 Response to Defendant's Statement of Facts, # 4 Response to Defendant's Evidentiary Objections, # 5 Declaration of Steven Comstock, # 6 Declaration of Christian Dubay, # 7 Supplemental Declaration of Thomas O'Brien, # 8 Supplemental Declaration of Jordana Rubel, # 9 Supplemental Declaration of James Thomas)(Fee, J.) Modified on 1/22/2016 to correct linkage (td).
January 21, 2016 154 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Christian Dubay, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Steve Comstock)(Klaus, Kelly)
January 21, 2016 153 Featured Case ORDER: Holding in abeyance Defendant's motion to file documents under seal 120 . Defendant's filing due 2/5/16. (See order for details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/21/16. (DJS)
January 13, 2016 152 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sebastian E. Kaplan, :Firm- Fenwick & West LLP, :Address- 555 California Street, 12th Fl., San Francisco, CA 94104. Phone No. - (415) 875-2300. Fax No. - (415) 281-1350 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4377635. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sebastian Kaplan, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stoltz, Mitchell)
January 12, 2016 151 AMICUS BRIEF by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS. (td)
January 12, 2016 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 150 Corporate Disclosure Statement was entered in error and is a duplicate of docket entry no. 148 . (td)
January 12, 2016 Featured Case ORDER granting 144 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/12/16. (lctsc2)
January 11, 2016 150 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN LIBRARY ASSOCIATION, KNOWLEGE ECOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE. (td) Modified on 1/12/2016 (td).
January 11, 2016 149 AMICUS BRIEF by LAW SCHOLARS. (znmw)
January 11, 2016 148 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN LIBRARY ASSOCIATION, KNOWLEGE ECOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE. (znmw)
January 11, 2016 147 AMICUS BRIEF by AMERICAN LIBRARY ASSOCIATION, KNOWLEGE ECOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE. (znmw)
January 11, 2016 146 Amicus Brief by SINA BAHRAM. (Pearlman, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/12/2016 (DJS).
January 11, 2016 145 Amicus Brief by INTERNATIONAL CODE COUNCIL, INC. (Onorato, Anthony) Modified on 1/12/2016 (DJS).
January 11, 2016 144 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Bruce)
January 11, 2016 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce D. Brown on behalf of The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press (Brown, Bruce) (Main Document 143 replaced on 1/12/2016) (ztd).
January 11, 2016 142 Amicus Brief by AMERICAN NATIONAL STANDARDS INSTITUTE, INC. (Hochman Rothell, Bonnie) Modified on 1/12/2016 (DJS).
January 11, 2016 Featured Case ORDER granting 141 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curae. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/11/16. (lctsc2)
January 11, 2016 Featured Case ORDER granting 140 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curae. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/11/16. (lctsc2)
January 11, 2016 141 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Law Scholars (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Gellis, Catherine)
January 11, 2016 140 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by AMERICAN LIBRARY ASSOCIATION, KNOWLEGE ECOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Curiae Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Duan, Charles)
January 11, 2016 139 Amicus brief by AMERICAN INSURANCE ASSOCIATION in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Hollywood, Meegan) Modified on 1/12/2016 (DJS).
January 11, 2016 138 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Duan on behalf of PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE, KNOWLEGE ECOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, AMERICAN LIBRARY ASSOCIATION (Duan, Charles)
January 10, 2016 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 136 Motion of International Code Council, Inc. to file an amicus brief on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/10/16. (DJS)
January 10, 2016 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 133 Motion for Sina Bahram to file an amicus brief on behalf of Defendant. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/10/16. (DJS)
January 10, 2016 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 130 Motion for American Insurance Association (AIA) to file an amicus brief on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/10/16. (DJS)
January 9, 2016 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 127 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Gerald W. Griffin is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of amici The American National Standards Institute, Inc. ("ANSI"), American Society of Safety Engineers ("ASSE"), The Institute of Electrical and Electronics Engineers, Incorporated ("IEEE"), International Association of Plumbing & Mechanical Officials ("IAPMO"), National Electrical Manufacturers Association ("NEMA"), North American Energy Standards Board ("NAESB"), and Underwriters Laboratories Inc. ("UL").Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/9/16. (DJS)
January 9, 2016 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 135 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Alan S. Wernick is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of amicus International Code Council, Inc. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/9/16. (DJS) Modified on 1/9/2016 (DJS).
January 8, 2016 137 AFFIDAVIT re 135 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alan S. Wernick, :Firm- FisherBroyles LLP, :Address- 203 North LaSalle Street, Suite 2100, Chicago, IL 60601. Phone No. - (847) 786-1005. Fax No. - (847) 412-9965 Filing Declaration of Alan S. Wernick in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order by International Code Council, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Onorato, Anthony)
January 8, 2016 136 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by International Code Council, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Onorato, Anthony)
January 8, 2016 135 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alan S. Wernick, :Firm- FisherBroyles LLP, :Address- 203 North LaSalle Street, Suite 2100, Chicago, IL 60601. Phone No. - (847) 786-1005. Fax No. - (847) 412-9965 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4372570. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by International Code Council, Inc. (Onorato, Anthony)
January 8, 2016 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony A. Onorato on behalf of International Code Council, Inc. (Onorato, Anthony)
January 8, 2016 133 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT by Sina Bahram (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION OF SINA BAHRAM FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT)(Pearlman, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2016 132 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT by Sina Bahram (Pearlman, Jeffrey).
January 8, 2016 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Pearlman on behalf of Sina Bahram (Pearlman, Jeffrey)
December 31, 2015 130 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by AMERICAN INSURANCE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hollywood, Meegan) Modified on 1/7/2016 (zrdj).
December 29, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 1/21/2016 Replies due by 2/4/2016. (zsm)
December 29, 2015 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 128 Motion for the following entities to file a combined amicus brief on behalf of Plaintiffs: The American National Standards Institute, Inc. ("ANSI"), American Society of Safety Engineers ("ASSE"), The Institute of Electrical and Electronics Engineers, Incorporated ("IEEE"), International Association of Plumbing & Mechanical Officials ("IAPMO"), National Electrical Manufacturers Association ("NEMA"), North American Energy Standards Board ("NAESB"), and Underwriters Laboratories Inc. ("UL"). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/29/15. (DJS)
December 29, 2015 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the Stipulation filed by the parties 129 , it is hereby ordered that Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendant's motion strike 124 by January 21, 2016. Defendant's reply brief is due by February 4, 2016. Going forward, the parties must file a motion seeking court approval to extend deadlines. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/29/15. (DJS)
December 28, 2015 129 STIPULATION Regarding Time To Respond To Motion To Strike by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order)(Cunningham, Jason)
December 28, 2015 128 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by American National Standards Institute, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hochman Rothell, Bonnie)
December 28, 2015 127 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Gerald W. Griffin, :Firm- Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP, :Address- 2 Wall Street, New York, NY 10005. Phone No. - (212) 732-3200. Fax No. - (212) 732-3232 Fee Status: Paid, $100.00, Receipt No. 0090-4361814. by American National Standards Institute, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gerald W. Griffin, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hochman Rothell, Bonnie) Modified on 12/28/2015 to add payment information. (ztnr)
December 22, 2015 126 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. re 123 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Motion to Strike Jarosz Report. (Lu, Kathleen)
December 22, 2015 125 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. re 120 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) . (Bridges, Andrew)
December 22, 2015 124 MOTION to Strike 118 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support [Redacted], # 2 Declaration of Kathleen Lu, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Lu Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Lu Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Lu Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 4 [Redacted] to Lu Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 5 to Lu Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 6 [Redacted] to Lu Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 7 to Lu Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 8 [Redacted] to Lu Declaration, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Bridges, Andrew)
December 22, 2015 123 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Jarosz Report, # 2 Exhibit 4 in Support of Kathleen Lu's Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 6 in support of Kathleen Lu's Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 8 in support of Kathleen Lu's Declaration, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Lu, Kathleen)
December 22, 2015 122 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. 121 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10 Public, # 2 Exhibit 11-20 Public, # 3 Exhibit 21-40 Public, # 4 Exhibit 41-60 Public, # 5 Exhibit 61-80 Public, # 6 Exhibit 81-100 Public, # 7 Exhibit 101-120 Public, # 8 Exhibit 121-140 Public, # 9 Exhibit 141-157 Public)(Bridges, Andrew)
December 21, 2015 121 MOTION for Summary Judgment by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Statement of Disputed Facts, # 4 Objections, # 5 Declaration of Carl Malamud, # 6 Declaration of Matthew Becker, # 7 Request for Judicial Notice, # 8 Index of Consolidated Exhibits, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Bridges, Andrew)
December 21, 2015 120 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit [Proposed] Sealed Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition, # 3 Exhibit [Proposed] Sealed Statement of Material Facts, # 4 Exhibit [Proposed] Sealed Declaration of Matthew Becker In Support, # 5 Exhibit [Proposed] Sealed Index of Consolidated Exhbits, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 11, # 8 Exhibit 21, # 9 Exhibit 22, # 10 Exhibit 53, # 11 Exhibit 74, # 12 Exhibit 75, # 13 Exhibit 76, # 14 Exhibit 80, # 15 Exhibit 82, # 16 Exhibit 83, # 17 Exhibit 84, # 18 Exhibit 85, # 19 Exhibit 86, # 20 Exhibit 87, # 21 Exhibit 88, # 22 Exhibit 89, # 23 Exhibit 90, # 24 Exhibit 91, # 25 Exhibit 92, # 26 Exhibit 93, # 27 Exhibit 94, # 28 Exhibit 114, # 29 Exhibit 129, # 30 Exhibit 140, # 31 Exhibit 141, # 32 Exhibit 142, # 33 Exhibit 146, # 34 Exhibit 150, # 35 Exhibit 153)(Bridges, Andrew)
November 20, 2015 119 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC., NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC.. re Order on Motion for Leave to File,. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd)
November 20, 2015 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 117 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Plaintiffs may file the following documents under seal: 1) Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Jordana S. Rubel (which contains the Expert Report of John C. Jarosz); and (2) Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Jordana S. Rubel, which includes excerpts from the February 27, 2015 deposition of Carl Malamud. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/20/15. (DJS)
November 19, 2015 118 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC., NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration of Dennis Berry and Exhibits, # 4 Declaration of Steven Cramer and Exhibits, # 5 Declaration of James Golinveaux, # 6 Declaration of Randy Jennings and Exhibit, # 7 Declaration of Thomas O'Brien, Jr. and Exhibits, # 8 Declaration of James Pauley and Exhibits, # 9 Declaration of Kevin Reinertson, # 10 Declaration of Stephanie Reiniche and Exhibits, # 11 Declaration of James Thomas, # 12 Declaration of Jordana Rubel and Exhibits - Part 1, # 13 Declaration of Jordana Rubel and Exhibits - Part 2, # 14 Declaration of Jordana Rubel and Exhibits - Part 3, # 15 Declaration of Jordana Rubel and Exhibits - Part 4, # 16 Declaration of Jordana Rubel and Exhibits - Part 5, # 17 Text of Proposed Order and Injunction)(Fee, J.). Added MOTION for Permanent Injunction on 11/20/2015 (znmw).
November 19, 2015 117 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC., NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Sealed Exhibit 1 to Rubel Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Proposed Sealed Exhibit 3 to Rubel Declaration)(Fee, J.)
November 14, 2015 116 TRANSCRIPT OF 11/04/15 STATUS HEARING before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan, held on November 4, 2015. Page Numbers: 1-21. Date of Issuance: 11/14/15. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne; telephone number: 202-354-3186, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2016.(Wayne, Bryan)
November 5, 2015 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Due to an unexpected scheduling conflict, the motion hearing previously set for 3/22/2016 is hereby VACATED. A new date will be set at a later time. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/5/15. (DJS)
November 5, 2015 115 Featured Case ENTERED IN ERROR.....MINUTE ORDER: Due to an unexpected scheduling conflict, the motion hearing previously set for 3/22/2016 is hereby VACATED. A new date will be set at a later time. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/5/15. (DJS) Modified on 11/5/2015 (zsm).
November 4, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 11/19/2015. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/21/2015. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/21/2016.Replies due by 2/4/2016. Brief due by 1/11/2016. (zsm)
November 4, 2015 Featured Case ENTERED IN ERROR.....MINUTE ORDER setting briefing schedule: Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment due by December 21, 2015; Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and COMBINED Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by January 21, 2016; Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment and COMBINED Opposition to Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by February 18, 2016; Defendant's Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by March 3, 2016; Amicus briefs due by February 11, 2016. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/4/15. (lctsc2) Modified on 11/4/2015 (zsm).
November 4, 2015 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER setting briefing schedule: Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment due by November 19, 2015; Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and COMBINED Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by December 21, 2015; Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment and COMBINED Opposition to Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by January 21, 2016; Defendant's Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by February 4, 2016; Amicus briefs due by January 11, 2016. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/4/15. (lctsc2)
November 4, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: Status Conference held on 11/4/2015. Order to issue. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne.) (zsm)
October 30, 2015 114 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Order,, and Joint Report of the Parties, submitted by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Proposed Order)(Becker, Matthew)
October 28, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/30/2015. Status Conference set for 11/4/2015 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsm)
October 27, 2015 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. A status conference will be held in both this case and American Educational Research Association, Inc. v. Public.Resource.Org, Inc., Civil Action No. 1:14-cv-00857-TSC on Wednesday, November 4, 2015 at 10:15am. The court intends to set schedules for briefing summary judgment motions in both cases at the status conference. The parties to this case are hereby directed to jointly file their proposed schedules for summary judgment briefing, accompanied by proposed orders, by Friday, October 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/27/15. (lctsc2)
October 27, 2015 113 NOTICE of Request for Hearing by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC., NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (Rubel, Jordana)
October 20, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Post-Discovery Status Conference conducted on 10/20/2015. All Counsel confirm that discovery - both fact and expert - has been completed. Court Reporter FTR Gold - Ctrm. 4. (FTR Time Frame: 4:02:59-4:10:33). Plaintiffs' Counsel: Jordana Rubel, Kevin Fee, Nathan Rehn, Kelly Klaus, and Blake Cunningham; Defendant's Counsel: Matthew Becker. (mr)
October 15, 2015 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Consent motion for a telephonic status conference, Document No. 112 , is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 10/15/2015. (lcdar1, )
October 14, 2015 112 Consent MOTION for Order Request for Telephonic Status Conference by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (Becker, Matthew)
September 29, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: Post-Discovery Status Conference is hereby set for 10/20/2015 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (lcdar1, )
August 12, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant/Counterclaimant motion in limine due by 8/19/2015. Defendant/Counterclaimant rebuttal expert report due by 9/11/2015. Plaintiff/Counterdefendants replies due by 10/2/2015. (mr)
August 12, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact discovery has closed. Expert discovery shall close on 10/16/2015. (lcdar1, )
August 12, 2015 111 Featured Case ORDER on Status Hearing conducted on August 12, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 8/12/2015. (lcdar1, ) Modified on 8/12/2015 (lcdar1, ).
August 12, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson : Status Hearing conducted on 8/12/2015. Court Reporter FTR Gold - Ctrm. 4. FTR Time Frame: [2:20:37-3:15:13]. (mr)
August 5, 2015 110 NOTICE AND VERIFICATION OF MATTHEW BECKER REGARDING EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR COUNSEL OF RECORD PURSUANT TO COURT'S MINUTE ORDER OF JULY 29, 2015 by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. re Set/Reset Deadlines, Order,, (Becker, Matthew)
August 5, 2015 109 NOTICE Verification of Email Addresses for Counsel of Record Pursuant to July 29, 2015 Minute Order by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC. (Cunningham, Jason)
August 5, 2015 108 NOTICE Verification of Email Addresses for Counsel of Record Pursuant to July 29, 2015 Minute Order by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (Rehn, Nathan)
July 29, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice due by 8/5/2015. (zsm)
July 29, 2015 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that not later than August 5, 2015 all counsel of record shall verify that the docket in this action contains the attorney's email address. In the absence of an email address, the attorney(s) shall obtain an ECF password or file a notice informing the court that that they do not wish to obtain a password. Should counsel decline to obtain an ECF password, they shall forfeit their right to: (1) file electronically in this action; and (2) receive copies of court orders via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/29/15. (DJS)
July 23, 2015 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 107 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Katherine E. Merk is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC.Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/22/15. (DJS)
July 21, 2015 107 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Katherine E. Merk, :Firm- King & Spalding LLP, :Address- 101 Second Street, Ste. 2300, San Francisco, CA 94105. Phone No. - 415-318-1200. Fax No. - 415-318-1300 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4182854. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bucholtz, Jeffrey)
July 9, 2015 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The status conference previously set for 7/28/15 before Judge CHUTKAN is hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/9/15. (DJS)
July 9, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference is hereby set for 8/12/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (lcdar1, )
July 9, 2015 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Scheduling of Certain Depositions (Document No. 106 ) it is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for the deposition of ASTM's 30(b)(6) corporate representative is extended to July 24, 2015. It is further ORDERED that the deposition of Public Resource's expert witness shall take place on or by July 31, 2015. It is further ORDERED that a status hearing is scheduled for 2:00 p.m. on Wednesday 8/12/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 7/9/2015. (lcdar1, )
July 1, 2015 106 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Scheduling of Certain Depositions by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (Becker, Matthew)
June 29, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines : Rule 30(b)(6) depositions to be completed by 7/7/15. (kk)
June 25, 2015 NOTICE OF ERROR re 104 Notice of Proposed Order; emailed to thane.rehn@mto.com, cc'd 35 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. FYI: On future filings, if you are filing the document your name must be on the signature line(s). (td, )
June 24, 2015 105 NOTICE of Proposed Order Regarding the Schedule for Completion of Discovery by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. re Set/Reset Deadlines (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Regarding the Schedule for Completion of Discovery)(Bridges, Andrew)
June 24, 2015 104 NOTICE of Proposed Order to Set Schedule for Expert Discovery by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Setting Schedule for Expert Discovery, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Filing, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Filing)(Rehn, Nathan)
June 22, 2015 103 Featured Case ORDER denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order and Request for Expedited Briefing Schedule (Document No. 86 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 6/22/2015. (lcdar1, )
June 16, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines : The parties' Notice of Filing with attached proposed orders regarding the schedule for completion of discovery to be filed by 6/24/15. (kk)
June 10, 2015 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Expert Schedule (Document No. 100 ) is pending for determination by this court. Entirely absent from the motion, and from the opposition to the motion and the reply to the opposition, is any indication that the parties discharged their duty to confer in an effort to agree upon a schedule, and if not, at least to narrow the areas of disagreement. See LCvR 7(m). This court has previously cautioned counsel that every disagreement regarding the conduct of discovery ought not spawn a new wave of litigation; this concern is particularly true where, as here, the disagreement concerns the schedule for completion of discovery. It is, therefore, ORDERED that the motion is STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for the parties shall meet and confer regarding the schedule for completion of discovery, and, by no later than June 24, 2015, file as attachments to a notice of filing their proposed orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 6/10/2015. (lcdar1, )
May 21, 2015 102 REPLY to opposition to motion re 100 MOTION for Order to Set Expert Schedule filed by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rehn, Nathan)
May 11, 2015 101 Memorandum in opposition to re 100 MOTION for Order to Set Expert Schedule filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (Bridges, Andrew)
April 23, 2015 100 MOTION for Order to Set Expert Schedule by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Expert Schedule)(Fee, J.)
April 21, 2015 99 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS. re Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, )
April 21, 2015 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 97 is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 4/21/2015.(lcdar1, )
April 2, 2015 98 REPLY to Opposition re 86 MOTION for Protective Order filed by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jordana S. Rubel, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 [UNDER SEAL], # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6 [UNDER SEAL])(Fee, J.) Modified event title on 4/3/2015 (znmw, ).
April 2, 2015 97 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit 2 to Rubel Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit 6 to Rubel Declaration)(Fee, J.)
April 1, 2015 96 SUPPLEMENT (Exhibit B) to re 1 Complaint,, filed by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC.. (td, )
April 1, 2015 95 Featured Case ORDER granting NFPA's 74 Motion to Amend the Complaint. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/1/2015. (lctsc2)
March 26, 2015 94 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson held on March 19, 2015; Page Numbers: 1-60. Date of Issuance:March 26, 2015. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa A. Moreira, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 202-354-3187, Court Reporter Email Address : Lisa_Moreira@dcd.uscourts.gov.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/16/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2015.(Moreira, Lisa)
March 24, 2015 93 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. re 91 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, )
March 24, 2015 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, Document No. 90 , is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 03/24/2015. (lcdar1, )
March 24, 2015 92 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. re 90 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) . (Bridges, Andrew)
March 23, 2015 91 Memorandum in opposition to re 86 Emergency MOTION for Order and Request for Expedited Briefing Schedule filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 [Public] Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges In Support of Public.Resource.Org, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Protective Order and Request for Expedited Briefing Schedule, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Bridges Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Bridges Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Bridges Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Bridges Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Bridges Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Bridges Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Bridges Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Bridges Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Bridges Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 10 to Bridges Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 11 to Bridges Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 12 to Bridges Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 13 to Bridges Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 14 to Bridges Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 15 to Bridges Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 16 to Bridges Declaration, # 18 Text of Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Protective Order and Request for Expedited Briefing Schedule)(Bridges, Andrew)
March 23, 2015 90 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Sealed Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges In Support of Public.Resource.Org, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Protective Order and Request for Expedited Briefing Schedule, # 3 Sealed Exhibit 11 to Bridges Declaration, # 4 Sealed Exhibit 12 to Bridges Declaration, # 5 Sealed Exhibit 13 to Bridges Declaration, # 6 Sealed Exhibit 14 to Bridges Declaration, # 7 Sealed Exhibit 15 to Bridges Declaration, # 8 Sealed Exhibit 16 to Bridges Declaration)(Bridges, Andrew)
March 23, 2015 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 89 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 03/23/2015. (lcdar1, )
March 23, 2015 MINUTE ORDER: Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Status hearing and hearing with respect to Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Document No. 71 , conducted on March 19, 2015. Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery DENIED for the reasons set forth in the record, except that Defendant may complete Rule 30(b)(6) depositions in accordance with the agreement of the parties by no later than April 2, 2015. Parties waive oral argument with respect to Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Protective Order Document No. 86, which will be decided by the Court after said motion has been fully briefed. (lcdar1)
March 19, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Status Conference held on 3/19/2015. (Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira) (zcmm, )
March 18, 2015 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 88 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jason Blake Cunningham is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of defendant AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC.Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/18/15. (DJS) Modified on 3/18/2015 (sm).
March 17, 2015 89 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Antonio E. Lewis, :Firm- King & Spalding LLP, :Address- 100 N Tryon Street, Suite 3900, Charlotte, NC 28202. Phone No. - (704) 503-2600. Fax No. - (704) 503-2622 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4024904. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bucholtz, Jeffrey)
March 17, 2015 88 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jason Blake Cunningham, :Firm- King & Spalding LLP, :Address- 101 Second Street, Suite 2300, San Francisco, CA 94105. Phone No. - (415) 318-1200. Fax No. - (415) 318-1300 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4024895. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bucholtz, Jeffrey)
March 9, 2015 87 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. re 71 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Defendant-Counterclaimant Public.Resource.Org, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Discovery Period, Corresponding Modification of Scheduling Order, and Leave to Take More Than 10 Depositions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F)(ztd, )
March 9, 2015 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that 81 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on March 9, 2015. (lcdar2)
March 9, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference, including consideration of 71 scheduled for 3/19/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. All counsel shall meet and confer in advance of said hearing in an effort to reach a consensus regarding the expeditious completion of discovery. (lcdar2)
March 6, 2015 86 Emergency MOTION for Order and Request for Expedited Briefing Schedule by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Fee, J.)
March 3, 2015 DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. . . .NOTICE OF ERROR re 85 Status Report; emailed to abridges@fenwick.com, cc'd 31 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. FYI: On future filings, the document must be signed by counsel who is electronically filing the doc. (td, ) Modified on 3/3/2015 (td, ).
March 2, 2015 85 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report In Response to Scheduling Order (Dkt. 58) by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (Bridges, Andrew)
March 2, 2015 84 REPLY to opposition to motion re 74 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint,, Exhibit B filed by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Rehn, Nathan)
February 28, 2015 83 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. re 81 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) . (Bridges, Andrew)
February 27, 2015 82 REPLY to opposition to motion re 71 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Defendant-Counterclaimant Public.Resource.Org, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Discovery Period, Corresponding Modification of Scheduling Order, and Leave to Take More Than 10 Depositions [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION of Reply Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges In Support of Defendant-Counterclaimant Public.Resource.Org, Inc.s Reply In Support of Motion for Extension of Discovery Period, Corresponding Modification of Scheduling Order, and Leave to Take More Than 10 Depositions, # 2 Exhibit A to Bridges Reply Declaration In Support, # 3 Exhibit B to Bridges Reply Declaration In Support, # 4 Exhibit C to Bridges Reply Declaration In Support, # 5 Exhibit D to Bridges Reply Declaration In Support, # 6 Exhibit E to Bridges Reply Declaration In Support, # 7 Exhibit F to Bridges Reply Declaration In Support)(Bridges, Andrew)
February 27, 2015 81 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 CONFIDENTIAL Version of Public.Resource.Org, Inc.s Reply In Support Of Motion For Extension Of Discovery Period, Corresponding Modification Of Scheduling Order, And Leave To Take More Than Ten Depositions, # 3 CONFIDENTIAL Version of Reply Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges In Support of Defendant-Counterclaimant Public.Resource.Org, Inc.s Reply In Support Of Motion For Extension Of Discovery Period, Corresponding Modification Of Scheduling Order, And Leave To Take More Than Ten Depositions, # 4 Confidential Exhibit D to the Bridges Reply Declaration In Support, # 5 Confidential Exhibit E to the Bridges Reply Declaration In Support, # 6 Confidential Exhibit F to the Bridges Reply Declaration In Support)(Bridges, Andrew)
February 26, 2015 80 WITHDRAWAL of Motion by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. re 78 MOTION for Protective Order filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. . (Bridges, Andrew)
February 20, 2015 79 Memorandum in opposition to re 74 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint,, Exhibit B filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges In Support of Public.Resource.Org, Inc.'s Opposition to National Fire Protection Association, Inc.'s Motion to Amend Complaint, # 2 Exhibit A to Bridges Declaration In Support of Opposition to Motion to Amend Complaint, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Denying National Fire Protection Association, Inc.'s Motion to Amend Complaint (Dkt. No. 74))(Bridges, Andrew)
February 20, 2015 78 WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION PURSUANT TO 80 . . . . . MOTION for Protective Order by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges In Support of Public.Resource.Org, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Second Requests for Production of Documents, Things and Electronically Stored Information, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Protective Order [Dkt. 78])(Bridges, Andrew) Modified on 3/2/2015 (td, ).
February 20, 2015 77 STIPULATION re 44 Stipulation and Order JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND PROTECTIVE ORDER by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (Bridges, Andrew)
February 17, 2015 76 Memorandum in opposition to re 71 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Defendant-Counterclaimant Public.Resource.Org, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Discovery Period, Corresponding Modification of Scheduling Order, and Leave to Take More Than 10 Depositions filed by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Rehn, Nathan)
February 4, 2015 MINUTE ORDER. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Further Status Conference held on 2/4/2015. With respect to 64 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery, the defendant may redact identifying information from the documents (see page 3 in document number 69 ); and, that such redactions are without prejudice to raising the issue at a time there is a more specific factual showing of need. In all other respects, the Motion is DENIED AS MOOT. Status Conference set for 3/25/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (Court Reporter Bowles Reporting Services)(FTR Time Frame: 10:09:09 - 10:42:39, Crtrm 4) (zcmm, )
February 4, 2015 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Simeon Meir Schopf on behalf of AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC. (Schopf, Simeon)
February 3, 2015 74 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint,, Exhibit B by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Exhibit B to Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Amend)(Rehn, Nathan)
February 2, 2015 73 Featured Case ORDER granting 34 Motion to Strike. The jury demand in Defendant's 21 counterclaim and Answer is stricken. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/2/2015. (lctsc2)
February 2, 2015 72 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/2/2015. (lctsc2)
January 29, 2015 71 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Defendant-Counterclaimant Public.Resource.Org, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Discovery Period, Corresponding Modification of Scheduling Order, and Leave to Take More Than 10 Depositions by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Kathleen Lu in Support of Defendant-Counterclaimant Public.Resource.Org, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Discovery Period, Corresponding Modification of Scheduling Order, and Leave to Take More Than 10 Depositions, # 2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Discovery Period, Corresponding Modification of Scheduling Order, and Leave to Take More Than 10 Depositions)(Bridges, Andrew)
January 22, 2015 70 REPLY to opposition to motion re 64 First MOTION to Compel Public Resource.Org, Inc. filed by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Rehn, Nathan)
January 20, 2015 69 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and [Proposed] Order On Defendant and Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel Discovery by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Rehn, Nathan)
January 14, 2015 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: At a hearing conducted by this court on December 1, 2014, this court, inter alia, directed the parties to the discovery disputes which were pending at that time to continue to meet and confer in an effort to finalize the resolution of those disputes; to file a status report by no later than January 12, 2015; and to appear for a status hearing on January 15, 2015. See Order (Document No. 60). This court, in an effort to prepare for the January 15 hearing has determined that (1) in the interim, Plaintiffs filed a Motion to Compel Discovery (Document No. 64), and that the motion is not yet ripe, and (2) the parties have not yet completed their efforts to resolve the discovery disputes which were pending as of December 1, 2014 (see Document No. 68). For these reasons, it is ORDERED that the hearing now scheduled for January 15 is continued to 10:00 a.m. on Wednesday, February 4, 2015. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall continue to meet and confer regarding the discovery disputes which are the subject of both the pending motion and the status report, and shall jointly file a status report by no later than January 20, 2015. Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Counsel for the parties to the discovery disputes shall jointly file a status report by no later than January 20, 2015. A Status Conference is scheduled for 10:00 a.m. on February 4, 2015 in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on January 14, 2015. (SRH)
January 12, 2015 68 STATUS REPORT ON OUTSTANDING ISSUES RAISED IN PUBLIC RESOURCE'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (Related Dkt. # 60 ) by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (Bridges, Andrew)
January 12, 2015 67 Memorandum in opposition to re 64 First MOTION to Compel Public Resource.Org, Inc. Discovery filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kathleen Lu In Support of Defendant-Counterclaimant Public.Resource.Org, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff-Counterdefendant American Society for Testing and Materials d/b/a ASTM International Motion to Compel Discovery, # 2 Declaration of John Doe In Support of Defendant-Counterclaimant Public.Resource.Org, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery, # 3 Declaration of Carl Malamud In Support of Defendant-Counterclaimant Public.Resource.Org, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery)(Bridges, Andrew)
December 24, 2014 66 Declaration re 64 First MOTION to Compel Public.Resource.Org. / by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (Rehn, Nathan) Modified on 12/28/2014 (jf, ).
December 24, 2014 65 Proposed Order re 64 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (Rehn, Nathan) Modified on 12/28/2014 (jf, ).
December 24, 2014 64 First MOTION to Compel Public Resource.Org, Inc. by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (Rehn, Nathan)
December 24, 2014 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 63 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel was entered in error at the request of counsels. (rdj)
December 24, 2014 63 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bridges, Andrew) Modified on 12/24/2014 (rdj).
December 19, 2014 62 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC.. Attorney Michael Andrew Zee terminated. (Zee, Michael)
December 18, 2014 61 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan held on 12-4-14; Page Numbers: 45. Date of Issuance: December 18, 2014. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jan Dickman, Telephone number (202)354-3267, Court Reporter Email Address : JaniceDickmanDCD@gmail.com.<P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 1/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2015.(Dickman, Janice)
December 4, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: Motion Hearing held on 12/4/2014 re 34 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Jury Demand filed by AMERICAN EDUCATIONAL RESEARCH ASSOCIATION, INC., AMERICAN PSYCHOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, INC. and NATIONAL COUNCIL ON MEASUREMENT IN EDUCATION, INC. Oral argument heard, and motion taken under advisement.(Court Reporter: Janice Dickman.) (tj)
December 1, 2014 60 Featured Case ORDER denying remaining issues with respect to Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery (Document No. 41). See Order for details. Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Counsel for the parties to the dispute shall file a status report by no later than 1/12/2015; Hearing with respect to the remaining discovery disputes is scheduled for 1/15/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on December 1, 2014. (SRH) Modified on 12/31/2014 (zcmm, ).
December 1, 2014 59 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson held on 10/28/2014; Page Numbers: 1-22. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bowles Reporting Service, Telephone number (860) 464-1083, Court Reporter Email Address : brs-ct@sbcglobal.net.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/22/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/1/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2015.(znmw, )
December 1, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Status Conference held on 12/1/2014. Further Status Conference set for 1/15/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. Status Report due by 1/12/2015. (Court Reporter Bowles Reporting Services)(FTR Time Frame: 11:13:50 - 1:03:35, Crtrm 4). (zcmm, )
November 25, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Close of Fact Discovery due by 1/30/2015. Joint Status Report due by 3/2/2015. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 3/2/2015. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 4/13/2015. Rebuttal disclosures due by 6/1/2015. Reply Disclosures due by 6/15/2015. Close of Expert Discovery due by 7/14/2015. Joint Status Report due by 7/21/2015. Status Conference set for 7/28/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (sm)
November 25, 2014 58 Featured Case ORDER granting 56 Consent Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Fact discovery to close by 1/30/2015; Joint status report by 3/2/2015; Close of expert discovery by7/14/2015; Joint status report by 7/21/2015; Status conference 7/28/2015 (See order for additional deadlines) Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/25/14. (DJS, )
November 24, 2014 57 Featured Case ORDER regarding 41 Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on November 24, 2014. (SRH)
November 24, 2014 56 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Time for Discovery and Case Schedule by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSherry, Corynne)
November 21, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Setting Hearing on 34 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Jury Demand. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2014 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/21/2014. (lctsc2)
November 17, 2014 55 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan held on September 16, 2014; Page Numbers: 1-24; Date of Issuance: November 17, 2014. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number 202-354-3249; Court Reporter Email Address: William_Zaremba@dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 12/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2015.(Zaremba, William)
November 4, 2014 54 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and [Proposed] Order On Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (Bridges, Andrew)
October 28, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Status Conference held on 10/28/2014. Case called for Motion Hearing but not held. By no later than 11/04/2014, counsel shall file a proposed order indicating with reference to 41 Motion to Compel the matters that have been resolved. Counsel shall include a provision that with respect to those issues the motion maybe denied as moot. Parties are directed to continue to confer. A Further Status Conference is set for 12/1/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (Court Reporter Bowles Reporting Services.)(FTR Time Frame: 3:30:53 - 3:58:59, Crtrm 4) (zcmm, )
October 27, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiffs-Counterdefendants American Society of Heating, Refrigerating, and Air-Conditioning Engineers, Inc. and the National Fire Protection Association, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Allow Telephonic Appearance at the October 28, 2014 (Document No. 53) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on October 27, 2014. (SRH)
October 24, 2014 53 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonicaly at October 28, 2014 Hearing by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC., NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Steinthal, Kenneth)
October 15, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Motion Hearing held on 10/15/2014 re 41 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. The court heard preliminary arguments of counsel regarding the status of the Motion. The court directed counsel and the parties to continue to meet and confer in an effort to resolve disputes. The court scheduled a Further Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (Court Reporter Bowles Reporting Services)(FTR Time Frame: 3:17:30 - 3:47:06, Crtrm 4). (zcmm, )
October 14, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The hearing on Defendant Public.Resource.Org, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery (Document No. 41), which was scheduled for 3:00 p.m. on this date, is, after consultation with counsel for the parties, continued to 3:00 p.m. on Wednesday, October 15, 2014. The court apologizes to counsel and the parties for the inconvenience this continuance has caused. Counsel are encouraged to use the intervening period to meet and confer in an effort to narrow the discovery disputes which are the subject of the motion. Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on October 14, 2014. (SRH)
October 14, 2014 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordana Sara Rubel on behalf of AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS, (ztnr, )
October 13, 2014 51 REPLY to opposition to motion re 41 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges in Support of Defendant's Reply re Motion to Compel Discovery, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Andrew Bridges, # 3 Errata 2 to Declaration of Andrew Bridges)(Bridges, Andrew)
October 11, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 50 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Matthew B. Becker is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of defendant Public.Resource.Org, Inc. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/11/14. (DJS )
October 10, 2014 50 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew B. Becker, :Firm- Fenwick & West LLP, :Address- 801 California Street, Mountain View, California 94041. Phone No. - (650) 335-7930. Fax No. - (650) 938-5200 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-3869285. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stoltz, Mitchell)
October 10, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 49 Plaintiff-Counterdefendant American Society of Heating, Refrigerating, and Air-Conditioning Engineers, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on October 10, 2014. (SRH)
October 9, 2014 49 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear TELEPHONICALLY AT OCTOBER 14, 2014 HEARING by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Steinthal, Kenneth)
October 2, 2014 48 Memorandum in opposition to re 41 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Andrew Zee, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Declaration of Claire Ramspeck)(Steinthal, Kenneth)
October 2, 2014 47 Memorandum in opposition to re 41 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A Declaration of Jordana Rubel in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B Declaration of Norma Jane Hair in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery)(Fee, J.)
October 2, 2014 46 Memorandum in opposition to re 41 MOTION to Compel Discovery Plaintiff National Fire Protection Association, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion to Compel Discovery filed by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christian Dubay In Support of, # 2 Declaration Dennis Berry In Support of)(Klaus, Kelly)
September 29, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion hearing is rescheduled for 3:00 PM on Tuesday 10/14/2014. The hearing was mistakenly scheduled on a holiday. Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on September 29, 2014. (SRH)
September 26, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing on 41 Defendant's Motion to Compel set for 10/13/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (lcdar2)
September 23, 2014 45 CASE Randomly REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for all discovery. (kb)
September 23, 2014 Featured Case ORDER OF REFERRAL: The Court has determined that this action should be referred to a magistrate judge for all issues related to discovery, including the Defendant's pending Motion to Compel (ECF No. 41). The parties are reminded, pursuant to LCvR 73.1, that this action may be referred for all purposes, including trial, upon the filing of an executed notice of consent by all parties. Consent of the District Court Judge is not necessary. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is referred to a magistrate judge for discovery only, beginning immediately; the magistrate judge will be randomly assigned by the Clerk's Office; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that any future filings related to discovery in this action shall have the initials of Judge Tanya Chutkan and the magistrate judge following the case number in the caption. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 09/23/2014. (lctsc2)
September 23, 2014 44 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Entering the stipulated 43 Protective Order submitted by the parties. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 09/23/2014. (lctsc2)
September 22, 2014 43 STIPULATION re Order on Motion for Order, Proposed Protective Order by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC., NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Fee, J.)
September 18, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Michael Andrew Zee is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of plaintiff American Society of Heating, Refrigerating, and Air-Conditioning Engineers, Inc. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/18/14. (DJS)
September 17, 2014 42 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael Andrew Zee, :Firm- King & Spalding LLP, :Address- 101 Second Street, Suite 2300, San Francisco, CA 94105. Phone No. - (415) 318-1222. Fax No. - (415) 318-1300 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-3842463. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bucholtz, Jeffrey)
September 17, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 40 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney NATHAN M. REHN is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of plaintiff National Fire Protection Association, Inc. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/17/14. (DJS)
September 17, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part 31 Plaintiffs' Motion for Order of Protection for the reasons stated on the record at the hearing held September 16, 2014. The parties shall file a revised protective order consistent with the Court's rulings by September 22, 2014. The parties are also instructed to e-mail Chambers the proposed protective order in Word format.. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 09/17/2014. (lctsc2)
September 17, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 37 Consent Motion to Extend Discovery and Case Schedule. Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Fact Discovery due by 12/5/2014. Status Report due by 1/5/2015. Expert Disclosures due by 2/2/2015. Opposition Expert Disclosures due by 3/16/2015. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 5/4/2015. Reply Expert Disclosures due by 5/18/2015. Expert Discovery due by 6/16/2015. Status Report and Joint Recommendation due by 6/23/2015. Status Conference set for 6/30/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 09/17/2014. (lctsc2)
September 16, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: Motion Hearing held on 9/16/2014 re 31 MOTION for Order of Protection filed by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC., AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC. Protective order conditions revised for reasons stated on the record. Revised protective order to be submitted to the court for approval. Case to be referred to a Magistrate Judge for discovery disputes. Order to follow. (Court Reporter:William Zaremba.) (tj )
September 15, 2014 41 MOTION to Compel Discovery by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery (Exhibit A), # 2 Declaration of Kathleen Lu in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel (Exhibit B), # 3 Exhibit 1 to Decl of Kathleen Lu, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Decl of Kathleen Lu, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Decl of Kathleen Lu, # 6 Exhibit 4 to Decl of Kathleen Lu, # 7 Exhibit 5 to Decl of Kathleen Lu, # 8 Exhibit 6 to Decl of Kathleen Lu, # 9 Exhibit 7 to Decl of Kathleen Lu, # 10 Exhibit 8 to Decl of Kathleen Lu, # 11 Exhibit 9 to Decl of Kathleen Lu, # 12 Exhibit 10 to Decl of Kathleen Lu, # 13 Exhibit 11 to Decl of Kathleen Lu, # 14 Exhibit 12 to Decl of Kathleen Lu, # 15 Exhibit 13 to Decl of Kathleen Lu, # 16 Exhibit 14 to Decl of Kathleen Lu, # 17 Exhibit 15 to Decl of Kathleen Lu)(Bridges, Andrew)
September 10, 2014 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nahtan M. Rehn, :Firm- Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP, :Address- 560 Mission Street, 27th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94105. Phone No. - (415) 512-4000. Fax No. - (415) 512-4077 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-3835256. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nathan Rehn ISO, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Choudhury, Anjan)
September 5, 2014 39 REPLY to opposition to motion re 34 MOTION to Strike 21 Answer to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM,, Jury Demand Only and Request for Oral Argument filed by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC., NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Clayton, Michael)
August 25, 2014 38 Memorandum in opposition to re 34 MOTION to Strike 21 Answer to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM,, Jury Demand Only and Request for Oral Argument filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stoltz, Mitchell)
August 20, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: A Hearing is hereby set for 9/16/14, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2 on Plaintiff's 31 Motion for a Protective Order and the parties' 37 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Case Schedule. If the parties or their counsel are unable to attend in person, they may attend by phone. Any persons attending via telephone shall JOINTLY telephone chambers at 202-354-3390 shortly before the hearing begins. All persons on the joint telephone call must call from a landline, rather than a cell phone. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/20/14. (DJS) Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Pre-motion Conference set for 9/16/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan.. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/20/14. (DJS, )
August 15, 2014 37 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Case Schedule by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Consent Motion to Extend Discovery and Case Schedule)(Bridges, Andrew)
August 15, 2014 36 REPLY to opposition to motion re 31 MOTION for Order of Protection filed by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC., NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Fee, J.)
August 14, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting Plaintiffs' 35 Consent Motion to File Reply Brief out of time. Plaintiffs shall refile the brief as a separate document. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/14/14. (djs)
August 13, 2014 35 Consent MOTION to File Reply Brief out of Time re 33 Response to motion, by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC., NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fee, J.)
August 8, 2014 34 MOTION to Strike 21 Answer to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM,, Jury Demand Only and Request for Oral Argument by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC., NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (Fee, J.). Added MOTION for Oral Argument on 8/11/2014 (td, ).
July 24, 2014 33 RESPONSE re 31 MOTION for Order of Protection filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (Exhibit A), # 2 Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges (Exhibit B), # 3 Exhibit B-1, # 4 Exhibit B-2, # 5 Exhibit B-3, # 6 Declaration of Carl Malamud (Exhibit C))(Bridges, Andrew)
July 18, 2014 32 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC.. Attorney Michael J. Mongan terminated. (Choudhury, Anjan)
July 7, 2014 31 MOTION for Order of Protection by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC., NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jordana Rubel, # 3 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 1, # 4 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 2, # 5 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 3, # 6 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 4, # 7 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 5, # 8 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 6, # 9 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 7, # 10 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 8, # 11 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 9, # 12 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 10, # 13 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 11, # 14 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 12, # 15 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 13, # 16 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 14, # 17 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 15, # 18 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 16, # 19 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 17, # 20 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 18, # 21 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 19, # 22 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 20, # 23 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 21, # 24 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 22, # 25 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 23, # 26 Exhibit B - Declaration Exh. 24, # 27 Exhibit C)(Fee, J.)
June 11, 2014 Case reassigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr, )
January 6, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Disclosure due by 1/17/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 3/14/2014. Fact Discovery due by 10/3/2014. Expert Disclosures ( Rule 26a2) due by 12/2/2014. Opening Expert Disclosures ( Rule 26a2) due by 1/16/2015. Replies to Rebuttal Disclosures due by 3/2/2015. Reply Expert Disclosures due by 3/16/2015. Expert Discovery due by 4/16/2015. Status Report due by 11/3/2014. Status Conference set for 4/30/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Joint Recommendation due by 4/23/2015. (mac)
December 31, 2013 30 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties are directed to read this Order in its entirety upon receipt. The Court will hold a status hearing in this case on April 30, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 24A. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 31, 2013. (lcegs2)
December 30, 2013 29 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Fee, J.)
November 22, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER FOR MEET AND CONFER REPORT. Attorney Meet and Confer Conference due by 12/16/2013. Meet & Confer Statement due by 12/30/2013. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/22/2013. (mac)
November 20, 2013 27 ANSWER to 21 Answer to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM,, by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC.. Related document: 21 Answer to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM,, filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC..(Choudhury, Anjan)
November 20, 2013 26 Counter Defendant The American Society of Heating, Refrigerating, and Air-Conditioning Engineers, Inc.'s ANSWER to 21 Answer to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM,, of Public.Resource.Org, Inc. for Declaratory Judgment by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC.. Related document: 21 Answer to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM,, filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC..(Steinthal, Kenneth)
November 20, 2013 25 ANSWER to 21 Answer to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM,, by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC., NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC.. Related document: 21 Answer to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM,, filed by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC..(Clayton, Michael)
October 18, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Counterclaim due by 11/20/2013. Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion due by 12/18/2013. Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion due by 1/15/2014. (mac)
October 17, 2013 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The Court has received 23 the parties' Stipulation, which requests that the Court extend the deadline for plaintiffs to respond to defendant's counterclaim and set a briefing schedule for any oppositions and replies to any motions that may be filed in response to defendant's counterclaim. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs' responses to defendant's counterclaim shall be filed by no later than November 20, 2013. If any plaintiff files a motion in response to defendant's counterclaim, defendant's opposition to that motion shall be filed by no later than December 18, 2013, and plaintiffs shall file any reply in further support of the motion by no later than January 15, 2014. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 17, 2013. (lcegs2)
October 16, 2013 24 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Kevin Fee on behalf of AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS (Fee, J.)
October 15, 2013 23 STIPULATION re 21 Answer to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM,, and [Proposed] Order by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS. (Fee, J.)
September 30, 2013 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 19 motion to admit Kathleen Lu pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on September 30, 2013. (lcegs4)
September 27, 2013 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (Bridges, Andrew)
September 27, 2013 21 Public.Resource.Org, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand for Injunctive Relief, COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Relief against All Plaintiffs by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Bridges, Andrew)
September 24, 2013 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Phillip Bridges on behalf of PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (Bridges, Andrew)
September 24, 2013 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kathleen Lu, :Firm- Fenwick & West LLP, :Address- 555 California St., 12th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94104. Phone No. - 415.875.2300. Fax No. - 415.281.1350 by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kathleen Lu, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stoltz, Mitchell)
September 23, 2013 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Corynne McSherry's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on September 23, 2013. (lcegs4)
September 16, 2013 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Corynne McSherry, :Firm- Electronic Frontier Foundation, :Address- 815 Eddy Street, San Francisco, CA 94109. Phone No. - 415-436-9333. Fax No. - 415-436-9993 by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Corynne McSherry, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stoltz, Mitchell)
August 29, 2013 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 17 motion to appear pro hac vice. Kelly M. Klause is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 29, 2013. (lcegs1)
August 29, 2013 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 16 motion to appear pro hac vice. Jonathan H. Blavin is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 29, 2013. (lcegs1)
August 29, 2013 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 15 motion to appear pro hac vice. Michael J. Mongan is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 29, 2013. (lcegs1)
August 28, 2013 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kelly M. Klaus, :Firm- Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP, :Address- 560 Mission Street, 27th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94105. Phone No. - 415-512-4017. Fax No. - 415-512-4077 by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kelly M, Klaus, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Choudhury, Anjan)
August 28, 2013 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan H. Blavin, :Firm- Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP, :Address- 560 Mission Street, 27th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94105. Phone No. - 415-512-4011. Fax No. - 415-512-4077 by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan H. Blavin, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Choudhury, Anjan)
August 28, 2013 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael J. Mongan, :Firm- Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP, :Address- 560 Mission Street, 27th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94105. Phone No. - (415) 512- 4051. Fax No. - (415) 512-4077 by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Mongan, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Choudhury, Anjan)
August 21, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall respond to the complaint due by 9/27/2013 (tcb)
August 21, 2013 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The Court will construe 13 Stipulation and Proposed Order on Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint as a motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint and will GRANT the motion. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by no later than September 27, 2013. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 21, 2013. (lcegs2)
August 21, 2013 14 NOTICE of Appearance by David Elliot Halperin on behalf of PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (Halperin, David) (Main Document 14 replaced on 8/22/2013) (jf, ).
August 20, 2013 13 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order on Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint by PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (Stoltz, Mitchell)
August 20, 2013 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell L. Stoltz on behalf of PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (Stoltz, Mitchell) (Main Document 12 replaced on 8/21/2013) (jf, ).
August 13, 2013 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 10 and 11 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Joseph R. Wetzel and Kenneth L. Steinthal are hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 13, 2013. (lcegs4)
August 12, 2013 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kenneth L. Steinthal, :Firm- King & Spalding LLP, :Address- 101 Second Street, Suite 2300, San Francisco, CA 94105. Phone No. - (415) 318-1200. Fax No. - (415) 318-1300 by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bucholtz, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2013 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joseph R. Wetzel, :Firm- King & Spalding LLP, :Address- 101 Second Street, Suite 2300, San Francisco, CA 94105. Phone No. - ( 415) 318-1200. Fax No. - (415) 318-1300 by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bucholtz, Jeffrey)
August 8, 2013 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. served on 8/7/2013, answer due 8/28/2013 (Clayton, Michael)
August 7, 2013 8 Electronic Summons (1) Issued as to PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(sth, )
August 7, 2013 7 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC., NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. filed by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC., NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC..(Clayton, Michael)
August 7, 2013 SUMMONS Not Issued as to PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. (sth, )
August 6, 2013 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (sth, )
August 6, 2013 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anjan Choudhury on behalf of NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (Choudhury, Anjan)
August 6, 2013 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC.. (Bucholtz, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2013 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Bucholtz on behalf of AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC. (Bucholtz, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2013 3 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC. (Choudhury, Anjan)
August 6, 2013 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS. (Clayton, Michael)
August 6, 2013 1 COMPLAINT against PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3425373) filed by AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC., NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 A0121 Form, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 12 Summons Summons)(Clayton, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS et al v. PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR TESTING AND MATERIALS
Represented By: Michael Franck Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL FIRE PROTECTION ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan H. Blavin
Represented By: Anjan Choudhury
Represented By: Michael Franck Clayton
Represented By: Kelly Klaus
Represented By: Michael J. Mongan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEATING, REFRIGERATING, AND AIR-CONDITIONING ENGINEERS, INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Bucholtz
Represented By: Michael Franck Clayton
Represented By: Kenneth L. Steinthal(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Joseph R. Wetzel(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG, INC.
Represented By: David Elliot Halperin
Represented By: Mitchell L. Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?