October 3, 2019 |
Filing 94
BILL OF COSTS AS TAXED by the Clerk in favor of Plaintiff CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. in the amount of $329.10 *Pursuant to Minute Order of 10/3/19 against Defendants GREGORY J. GOULD, ET AL (ztd)
|
October 3, 2019 |
Filing 93
AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: amending the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order, Dkt. 77, for the reasons set forth in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order, Dkt. 92. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/03/2019. (lcrdm2, )
|
October 3, 2019 |
Filing 92
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Defendants' Motion for Correction of Judgment, Dkt. 81, and granting Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order, Dkt. 84. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/03/2019. (lcrdm2, ) Modified on 10/7/2019 to change document type to "Opinion" (kt).
|
October 3, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER: On June 7, 2019, Plaintiff filed a Bill of Costs seeking $335.55 in fees related to expedited transcripts they obtained for use in the case. See Dkt. 80. Defendants, in turn, filed an objection to Plaintiff's Bill of Costs, asserting that the fees relating to the transcripts were not necessary and should not be awarded. See Dkt. 85. Upon reviewing Plaintiff's Bill of Costs, Defendant's Objection, Plaintiff's Reply, and the existing record, the Court concludes that the expedited transcripts for the October 25, 2017 and December 20, 2017 motions hearings were "necessarily obtained... for use in the case" and thus will award those costs as requested. McGovern v. George Washington Univ., 326 F.R.D. 354, 356 (D.D.C. 2018) (internal citation and quotation omitted). As to the transcript for the March 22, 2019, telephone conference, the Court finds that although the transcript was necessary for use in the case, there was no need to request the transcript on an expedited basis; that requesting the transcript on such a basis was purely for the convenience of counsel; and thus will reduce the cost award to reflect the $6.45 difference between the standard rate and the expedited rate. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Bill of Costs, Dkt. #80 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Clerk of the Court shall tax Plaintiff's Bill of Costs in the amount of $329.10. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/03/2019. (lcrdm2, )
|
October 1, 2019 |
Filing 91
RESPONSE re #89 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (ztd); (See docket entry no. #90 to view.)
|
October 1, 2019 |
Filing 90
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 194 IBLA 350, #2 Exhibit B - 9/17/19 Order)(Leggette, L.)
|
September 12, 2019 |
Filing 89
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by GEOFFRY GIBSON, GREGORY J. GOULD, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit suppl. authority)(Kim, Joseph)
|
July 1, 2019 |
Filing 88
REPLY re #80 Bill of Costs filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Leggette, L.)
|
June 28, 2019 |
Filing 87
REPLY to opposition to motion re #84 MOTION to Amend/Correct Opinion and Order to Conform to Judgment filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 6-18-19 Response)(Leggette, L.)
|
June 27, 2019 |
Filing 86
RESPONSE re #84 MOTION to Amend/Correct Opinion and Order to Conform to Judgment filed by GEOFFRY GIBSON, GREGORY J. GOULD, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pl IBLA filing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Joseph)
|
June 24, 2019 |
Filing 85
RESPONSE re #80 Bill of Costs (objection) filed by GEOFFRY GIBSON, GREGORY J. GOULD, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE. (Kim, Joseph)
|
June 21, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's motion to amend/correct on or before June 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/21/2019. (lcrdm2, )
|
June 21, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's motion to amend/correct on or before 6/27/2019. (kt)
|
June 19, 2019 |
Filing 84
MOTION to Amend/Correct Opinion and Order to Conform to Judgment by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leggette, L.)
|
June 18, 2019 |
Filing 83
REPLY to opposition to motion re #81 MOTION to Amend/Correct #79 Clerk's Judgment filed by GEOFFRY GIBSON, GREGORY J. GOULD, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Kim, Joseph)
|
June 11, 2019 |
Filing 82
RESPONSE re #81 MOTION to Amend/Correct #79 Clerk's Judgment filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leggette, L.)
|
June 10, 2019 |
Filing 81
MOTION to Amend/Correct #79 Clerk's Judgment by GEOFFRY GIBSON, GREGORY J. GOULD, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed corrected judgment)(Kim, Joseph) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/11/2019) (ztd).
|
June 7, 2019 |
Filing 80
BILL OF COSTS by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. Objection to Bill of Costs due by 6/24/2019. (Leggette, L.)
|
May 28, 2019 |
Filing 79
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/28/2019. (kt)
|
May 28, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the unopposed motion for entry of final judgment, Dkt. 78, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter the proposed Judgment, Dkt. 78-1. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/28/2019. (lcrdm2, )
|
May 24, 2019 |
Filing 78
Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judgment)(Leggette, L.)
|
March 30, 2019 |
Filing 77
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant's motion for summary judgment, Dkt. 61, and motion for leave to file supplemental briefing, Dkt. 72, are hereby DENIED, and Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, Dkt. 56, is hereby GRANTED. It is, accordingly, ORDERED that the matter be remanded to ONRR for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/30/2019. (lcrdm2, )
|
March 27, 2019 |
Filing 76
TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE before Judge Randolph D. Moss held on March 22, 2019. Page Numbers: 1 - 44. Date of Issuance: March 27, 2019. Court Reporter: Jeff Hook. Telephone number: 202-354-3373. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter ref erenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/17/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/27/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/25/2019.(Hook, Jeff)
|
March 27, 2019 |
Filing 75
REPLY to opposition to motion re #72 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing filed by GEOFFRY GIBSON, GREGORY J. GOULD, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE. (Kim, Joseph)
|
March 27, 2019 |
Filing 74
RESPONSE re #72 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leggette, L.)
|
March 27, 2019 |
Filing 73
NOTICE of Proposed Order by GEOFFRY GIBSON, GREGORY J. GOULD, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE re #72 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing (Kim, Joseph)
|
March 27, 2019 |
Filing 72
MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing by GEOFFRY GIBSON, GREGORY J. GOULD, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE (Kim, Joseph)
|
March 22, 2019 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Telephone Conference held on 3/22/2019. Issues addressed. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt)
|
March 21, 2019 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 3/22/2019, at 3:00 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
|
March 20, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER: The Court has several questions for the parties regarding the pending cross-motions for summary judgment, Dkt. 56, Dkt. 59. It is, accordingly, ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a telephone conference on Friday, March 22, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. The parties shall contact the Courtroom Deputy regarding the relevant teleconference information. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/20/2019. (lcrdm2, )
|
July 27, 2018 |
Filing 71
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Joseph H. Kim on behalf of GEOFFRY GIBSON, GREGORY J. GOULD, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE Substituting for attorney Jason Hill (Kim, Joseph)
|
July 16, 2018 |
Filing 70
JOINT APPENDIX (NON-CONFIDENTIAL) by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AR 1-6, #2 Exhibit AR 10, 11, 86, #3 Exhibit AR 171, 189, #4 Exhibit AR 238, 515, #5 Exhibit AR 598-609, #6 Exhibit AR 610-612, #7 Exhibit AR 613-619, #8 Exhibit AR 620, 623, 652, etc., #9 Exhibit AR 740-890, #10 Exhibit AR 891-892, #11 Exhibit AR 947, #12 Exhibit AR 950-1354, #13 Exhibit AR 1355, 1356, etc., #14 Exhibit AR 1513, #15 Exhibit AR 1514-1635, #16 Exhibit AR 1650-1700, #17 Exhibit AR 1701-1719, #18 Exhibit AR 1720, 1736, etc., #19 Exhibit AR 2071, 2072, 2105, 2109, #20 Exhibit AR 2142, 2143, 2153, 2154, #21 Exhibit AR 3520-3521, #22 Exhibit AR 3533-3571, #23 Exhibit AR 3572, #24 Exhibit AR 3578-3593, #25 Exhibit AR 3640-3700, #26 Exhibit AR 3742, #27 Exhibit AR 3816-3856, #28 Exhibit AR 3858, #29 Exhibit AR 3892, #30 Exhibit AR 3965, #31 Exhibit AR 4046,4050, #32 Exhibit AR 4885-4909, #33 Exhibit AR 4920-4941, #34 Exhibit AR 4944-4979, #35 Exhibit AR 5007-5023, #36 Exhibit AR 5070-5134, #37 Exhibit AR 5137-5201, #38 Exhibit AR 5202-5232, #39 Exhibit AR 5252-5257, #40 Exhibit AR 5260, 5262, etc., #41 Exhibit AR 5398-5403, #42 Exhibit FOIA005409-5424)(Leggette, L.)
|
July 13, 2018 |
Filing 69
SEALED DOCUMENT ( Joint Appendix of Administrative Record) filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.); (See docket entry no. #66 for sealed documents)(ztd)
|
July 13, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint response to Plaintiff's motion for leave to file documents under seal #66 , the motion is hereby GRANTED pursuant to the compromise reached by the parties. In particular, Plaintiff may file the documents comprising Volume 2 of the Revised Administrative Record (AR4101-4554 and AR4816-30) under seal as well as the following additional documents: AR3594-3639, AR3701-28, AR3860-87, AR4980-5006, and AR5024-69. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/13/2018. (lcrdm2, )
|
June 29, 2018 |
Filing 68
RESPONSE re #66 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) JOINT RESPONSE filed by GEOFFRY GIBSON, GREGORY J. GOULD, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE. (Hill, Jason)
|
June 5, 2018 |
Filing 67
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #66 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) by GEOFFRY GIBSON, GREGORY J. GOULD, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jason)
|
June 5, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' motion for extension #67 is hereby GRANTED. Before responding to Plaintiff's motion #66 , Defendants are directed to meet and confer with Plaintiff on whether any of the documents that Plaintiff seeks to file under seal can be filed on the public docket instead. If the parties are unable to resolve this issue, Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's motion on or before June 29, 2018, and Plaintiff shall file a reply on or before July 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/5/2018. (lcrdm2, )
|
June 5, 2018 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's motion on or before 6/29/2018; Plaintiff shall file a reply on or before 7/6/2018. (kt)
|
June 1, 2018 |
Filing 66
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Appendix (Joint Appendix of Administrative Record), #3 Exhibit AR 1-6, #4 Exhibit AR 10, 11, 86, #5 Exhibit AR 171, 189, #6 Exhibit AR 283, 515, #7 Exhibit AR 598-609, #8 Exhibit AR 610-612, #9 Exhibit AR 613-619, #10 Exhibit AR 620, 623, etc., #11 Exhibit AR 740-890, #12 Exhibit AR 891-892, #13 Exhibit AR 947, #14 Exhibit AR 950-1354, #15 Exhibit AR 1355, 1356, etc., #16 Exhibit AR 1513, #17 Exhibit AR 1514-1635, #18 Exhibit AR 1636-1649, #19 Exhibit AR 1650-1700, #20 Exhibit AR 1701-1719, #21 Exhibit AR 1720, 1736, etc., #22 Exhibit AR 2071, 2072, etc., #23 Exhibit AR 2142, 2143, etc., #24 Exhibit AR 3520-3521, #25 Exhibit AR 3533-3571, #26 Exhibit AR 3572, #27 Exhibit AR 3578-3700, #28 Exhibit AR 3701-3728, #29 Exhibit AR 3742, #30 Exhibit AR 3816-3856, #31 Exhibit AR 3858, #32 Exhibit AR 3860-3887, #33 Exhibit AR 3892, #34 Exhibit AR 3965, #35 Exhibit AR 4046, 4050, #36 Exhibit AR 4101-4554, #37 Exhibit AR 4816-4830, #38 Exhibit AR 4885-4909, #39 Exhibit AR 4920-4941, #40 Exhibit AR 4944-5134, #41 Exhibit AR 5137-5201, #42 Exhibit AR 5202-5232, #43 Exhibit AR 5252-5257, #44 Exhibit AR 5260, 5262, etc., #45 Exhibit AR 5398-5403, #46 Exhibit FOIA5409-FOIA5424)(Leggette, L.)
|
May 21, 2018 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Appendix due by 6/1/2018. (kt)
|
May 18, 2018 |
Filing 65
NOTICE of Initial Designation of Appendix by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. (See Docket Entry #64 to view document). (znmw)
|
May 18, 2018 |
Filing 64
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appendix (and Notice of Initial Designation of Appendix) by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leggette, L.)
|
May 18, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension #64 is hereby GRANTED. The parties shall file an appendix to the Administrative Record on or before June 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/18/2018. (lcrdm2, )
|
May 4, 2018 |
Filing 63
REPLY to opposition to motion re #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GEOFFRY GIBSON, GREGORY J. GOULD, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE. (Hill, Jason)
|
April 26, 2018 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall file a Reply on or before 5/4/2018. (dot)
|
April 26, 2018 |
Filing 62
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by GEOFFRY GIBSON, GREGORY J. GOULD, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jason)
|
April 26, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' unopposed motion for extension #62 is hereby GRANTED. Defendants shall file a reply on or before May 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/26/2018. (lcrdm2, )
|
April 13, 2018 |
Filing 61
REPLY to opposition to motion re #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Cross-Motion filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Leggette, L.)
|
April 3, 2018 |
Filing 60
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Combined Opposition and Reply and Defendants' Reply by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Reset Remaining Deadlines)(Leggette, L.)
|
April 3, 2018 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file a combined reply and opposition on or before 4/13/2018; Defendants shall file a reply on or before 4/27/2018. (kt)
|
April 3, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's consent motion for extension #60 is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a combined reply and opposition on or before April 13, 2018; and Defendants shall file a reply on or before April 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/3/2018. (lcrdm2, )
|
March 9, 2018 |
Filing 59
Memorandum in opposition to re #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment & Federal Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by GEOFFRY GIBSON, GREGORY J. GOULD, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE. (Hill, Jason)
|
March 6, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER: The parties' joint motion for extension #58 is hereby GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before March 9, 2018; Plaintiff shall file a combined reply and opposition on or before April 6, 2018; and Defendants shall file a reply on or before April 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/6/2018. (lcrdm2, )
|
March 6, 2018 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall file a combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 3/9/2018; Plaintiff shall file a combined reply and opposition on or before 4/6/2018; Defendants shall file a reply on or before 4/20/2018. (kt)
|
March 5, 2018 |
Filing 58
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by GEOFFRY GIBSON, GREGORY J. GOULD, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE (Hill, Jason)
|
February 16, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' motion for extension #57 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before March 6, 2018; Plaintiff shall file a combined reply and opposition on or before March 21, 2018; and Defendants shall file a reply on or before April 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/16/2018. (lcrdm2, )
|
February 16, 2018 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall file a combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 3/6/2018; Plaintiff shall file a combined reply and opposition on or before 3/21/2018; Defendants shall file a reply on or before 4/5/2018. (kt)
|
February 14, 2018 |
Filing 57
MOTION for Briefing Schedule to Extend All Briefing Deadlines by 14 Days by GEOFFRY GIBSON, GREGORY J. GOULD, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jason)
|
January 19, 2018 |
Filing 56
MOTION for Summary Judgment by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Points and Authorities ISO Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment)(Leggette, L.)
|
December 22, 2017 |
Filing 55
NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFIED LISTS OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD CONTENTS by GEOFFRY GIBSON, GREGORY J. GOULD, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certififying Lists of the Administrative Record Contents, #2 Exhibit Index for Revised Administrative Record (Version 2) for Volume 1, #3 Exhibit Original Index for Administrative Record for Volume 2, #4 Exhibit Resolution of Mistakes Plaintiff Alleged With Administrate Record Indices in Exhibit B (ECF No. 52-2), #5 Exhibit Extra-Record FOIA Documents from Plaintiff (Bates numbered FOIA005409-24))(Hill, Jason)
|
December 21, 2017 |
Filing 54
TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before Judge Randolph D. Moss held on 12-20-2017; Page Numbers: 1-12. Date of Issuance: 12-21-2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Timothy R. Miller, Telephone number 202-354-3111, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the < < <<
< < Redaction Request due 1/11/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2018.(Miller, Timothy)
|
December 20, 2017 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Motion Hearing held on 12/20/2017 re: #52 MOTION to Complete the Administrative Record filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. The Defendant shall file their Amended Index of the Administrative Record this week, and turn over Exhibit K to the Plaintiff today. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/19/2018; Defendant's Opposition and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/20/2018; Plaintiff's Reply and Opposition to the Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/7/2018; Defendant's final reply due by 3/22/2018. (Court Reporter: Timothy Miller.) (kt)
|
December 18, 2017 |
Filing 53
NOTICE of OPPOSITION by GEOFFRY GIBSON, GREGORY J. GOULD, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE re #51 Unopposed MOTION to Stay ORUnopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Briefing Schedule (Hill, Jason)
|
December 18, 2017 |
Filing 52
MOTION to Complete the Administrative Record re #50 Notice (Other), #44 Notice (Other), by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Correspondence between counsel, #2 Exhibit B - Table of AR Index Mistakes, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts from 10/25/17 Hearing Transcript, #4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Complete the Administrative Record)(Leggette, L.)
|
December 18, 2017 |
Filing 51
Unopposed MOTION to Stay OR, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Briefing Schedule by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay or Extend Briefing Schedule)(Leggette, L.)
|
December 18, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a hearing on Plaintiff's motion to complete the administrative record #52 on December 20, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/18/2017. (lcrdm2, )
|
December 18, 2017 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
|
November 8, 2017 |
Filing 50
NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFIED LIST OF REVISED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD CONTENTS by GEOFFRY GIBSON, GREGORY J. GOULD, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE re #44 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Declaration RAR Certification, #2 Exhibit RAR Index)(Hill, Jason)
|
October 30, 2017 |
Filing 49
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Randolph D. Moss held on October 25, 2017. Page Numbers: 1 - 38. Date of Issuance: October 30, 2017. Court Reporter: Jeff Hook. Contact Information: 202-354-3373 / jeff_hook@dcd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchas ed from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2018.(Hook, Jeff)
|
October 25, 2017 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Motion Hearing held on 10/25/2017 re: #45 MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record re: #44 Notice (Other), filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. The #45 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record is MOOT, as to the issues agreed upon by the parties; and it is further DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, as to the issue of whether Plaintiff's FOIA request should be included in the administrative record. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/22/2017; Defendant's Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/22/2018; Plaintiff's Reply to the Opposition for Summary Judgment and Opposition to the Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/6/2018; Defendant's Cross Motion Reply due by 2/21/2018. The Government shall complete their submission of the record two weeks from today. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt)
|
October 16, 2017 |
Filing 48
REPLY to opposition to motion re #45 MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record re #44 Notice (Other), filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request)(Leggette, L.)
|
October 6, 2017 |
Filing 47
RESPONSE re #45 MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record re #44 Notice (Other), filed by GEOFFRY GIBSON, GREGORY J. GOULD, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE. (Hill, Jason)
|
September 26, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report #46 , it is hereby ORDERED that the summary judgment briefing schedule, see Minute Order (May 25, 2017), is hereby VACATED. The Court will issue a scheduling order following its ruling on Plaintiff's motion to supplement the Administrative Record #45 . Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/26/2017. (lcrdm2, )
|
September 25, 2017 |
Filing 46
Joint STATUS REPORT Proposing Modifications to Existing Schedule for Summary Judgment Briefing by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order regarding Modifications to Existing Schedule for Summary Judgment Briefing)(Leggette, L.)
|
September 20, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's Motion To Supplement the Administrative Record #45 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a hearing on the motion on October 25, 2017, at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall file a response to the motion on or before October 6, 2017, and Plaintiff shall file any reply on or before October 16, 2017. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint report proposing any modifications to the existing schedule for summary judgment briefing on or before September 25, 2017. See Minute Order (May 25, 2017). Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/20/2017. (lcrdm2, )
|
September 20, 2017 |
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants response to the #45 motion due by 10/6/2017; Plaintiff's reply due by 10/16/2017. A Motion Hearing is set for 10/25/2017, at 11:30 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
|
September 15, 2017 |
Filing 45
MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record re #44 Notice (Other), by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rosario C. Doriott Dominguez, #2 Exhibit A - 9/12/17 Hill Email, #3 Exhibit B - 9/13/17 Lundeen Email, #4 Exhibit C - 9/13/17 Doriott Dominguez Email, #5 Exhibit D - 9/15/17 Hill Email, #6 Exhibit E - 8/23/17 Hill Email, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Leggette, L.)
|
August 14, 2017 |
Filing 44
NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFIED LIST OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD CONTENTS by GEOFFRY GIBSON, GREGORY J. GOULD, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(Hill, Jason)
|
July 14, 2017 |
Filing 43
ANSWER to #42 Amended Complaint by GREGORY J. GOULD, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, RYAN ZINKE, Geoffrey Gibson. Related document: #42 Amended Complaint filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC..(Hill, Jason)
|
July 7, 2017 |
Filing 42
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against GREGORY J. GOULD, S. M. R. JEWELL, JAMES P. MORRIS, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC..(td)
|
July 7, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to amend the first amended complaint #41 is hereby GRANTED, and the Second Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's motion is hereby deemed filed. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/7/2017. (lcrdm2, )
|
June 30, 2017 |
Filing 41
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct File Second Amended Complaint by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Leggette, L.)
|
May 30, 2017 |
Filing 40
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. Attorney Kenneth M. Simon terminated. (Simon, Kenneth)
|
May 30, 2017 |
Filing 39
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. Attorney Drew C Ensign terminated. (Ensign, Drew)
|
May 30, 2017 |
Filing 38
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. Attorney Sara Keyna Orr terminated. (Orr, Sara)
|
May 25, 2017 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the first amended complaint or add parties due on or before 6/30/2017; Defendant's answer to the operative complaint due on or before 7/14/2017; Defendant's to serve plaintiff with the administrative record on or before 8/14/2017; Plaintiff to file any motion to complete or supplement the administrative record on or before 9/15/2017; Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment due on or before 9/28/2017; Defendant's opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment due on or before 10/30/2017; Plaintiff's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment due on or before 11/13/2017. (kt)
|
May 25, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the joint status report #37 , it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings in this case: Plaintiff may file a motion for leave to amend the first amended complaint or add parties on or before June 30, 2017; defendants shall answer the operative complaint on or before July 14, 2017; defendants shall serve plaintiff with the administrative record on or before August 14, 2017; plaintiff shall file any motion to complete or supplement the administrative record on or before September 15, 2017; plaintiff may file a motion for summary judgment on or before September 28, 2017; defendants may file an opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on or before October 30, 2017; and plaintiff may file a reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before November 13, 2017. If defendants oppose plaintiff's motion to amend the first amended complaint, or if plaintiff moves to supplement or complete the administrative record, the parties shall meet and confer regarding appropriate modifications to the scheduling order and shall file a joint report with the Court. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/25/2017. (lcrdm2, )
|
May 24, 2017 |
Filing 37
Joint STATUS REPORT and Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leggette, L.)
|
April 26, 2017 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 4/26/2017. (Order forthcoming.) (Court Reporter Jeff Hook.) (tg)
|
April 26, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to submit a joint status report, including a proposed schedule for further proceedings, on or before May 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/26/2017. (lcrdm2, )
|
April 26, 2017 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/24/2017. (dot)
|
March 27, 2017 |
Filing 36
MANDATE of USCA as to #33 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. USCA Case Number 15-5333. (Attachments: #1 judgment filed January 31, 2017)(zrdj)
|
March 27, 2017 |
Set/Reset Hearings: A Status Conference is set for 4/26/2017, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
|
March 27, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on April 26, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. The parties should be prepared to discuss future proceedings in light of the D.C. Circuit's decision reversing and remanding the Court's memorandum opinion #27 and order #28 dismissing Counts 1-3 of the Amended Complaint. See 846 F.3d 1232 (2017). Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/27/2017. (lcrdm1, )
|
December 11, 2015 |
Filing 35
NOTICE of No Transcript Order by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. re #33 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, (Leggette, L.)
|
December 3, 2015 |
USCA Case Number 15-5333 for #33 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (md)
|
November 30, 2015 |
Filing 34
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #33 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (zrdj)
|
November 25, 2015 |
Filing 33
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #32 Clerk's Judgment, #27 Memorandum & Opinion, #28 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-4328699. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Leggette, L.)
|
November 17, 2015 |
Filing 32
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/17/2015. (kt)
|
November 16, 2015 |
Filing 31
ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Stipulation to Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and of the Court's earlier Order dismissing the First, Second, and Third Counts in the Amended Complaint #28 , it is hereby ORDERED that the Fourth Count in the Amended Complaint #19 is now dismissed without prejudice and that final judgment shall be entered in favor of Defendants. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk is directed to enter a final judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/16/2015. (lcrdm2, )
|
November 12, 2015 |
Filing 30
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice)(Leggette, L.)
|
November 12, 2015 |
Set/Reset Deadline: The parties shall submit either a proposed order or a joint status report on or before 11/18/2015. (kt)
|
November 11, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER: During the October 23, 2015 status conference, the parties indicated that they intended to stipulate to a judgment for the purposes of appeal, and stated that they would submit a proposed order to the Court. The Court hereby ORDERS that the parties shall submit either a proposed order or a joint status report on or before November 18, 2015. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/11/2015. (lcrdm2, )
|
October 23, 2015 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 10/23/2015. Plaintiff to draft proposed order that parties will then submit to the Court. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook). (kt)
|
October 16, 2015 |
Filing 29
NOTICE of Appearance by L. Poe Leggette on behalf of CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. (Leggette, L.)
|
October 9, 2015 |
Set/Reset Hearing: A Status Conference is set for 10/23/2015, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
|
October 9, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties appear for a status conference on October 23, 2015, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/9/2015. (lcrdm2, )
|
September 29, 2015 |
Filing 28
ORDER: Granting #20 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/29/15. (gdf)
|
September 29, 2015 |
Filing 27
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/29/15. (gdf)
|
September 23, 2015 |
Filing 26
NOTICE of Appearance by Rosario C. Doriott Dominguez on behalf of CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. (Doriott Dominguez, Rosario)
|
August 20, 2015 |
Filing 25
NOTICE of Appearance by L. Poe Leggette on behalf of CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. (Leggette, L.)
|
August 13, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER REFERRING MOTION: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #20 is REFERRED from Judge Moss to Judge Lamberth. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on August 13, 2015. (lcrdm1, )
|
January 8, 2015 |
Case randomly reassigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. Judge Richard J. Leon no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr, )
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing 24
REPLY to opposition to motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by GREGORY J. GOULD, SALLY JEWELL, JAMES P. MORRIS, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Hill, Jason)
|
June 4, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #23 Federal Defendants' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Their Reply Brief. It is hereby ORDERED that the Federal Defendants' motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the Federal Defendants' reply brief is due on 6/6/2014. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/4/2014. (lcrjl3)
|
June 2, 2014 |
Filing 23
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to Friday, June 6, 2014 by GREGORY J. GOULD, SALLY JEWELL, JAMES P. MORRIS, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jason)
|
May 30, 2014 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 6/4/2014. (tb, )
|
May 29, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #22 Federal Defendants' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Their Reply Brief. It is hereby ORDERED that the federal defendants' motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the federal defendants' reply brief is due on June 4, 2014. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/29/2014. (lcrjl3)
|
May 27, 2014 |
Filing 22
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to June 4, 2014 by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, GREGORY J. GOULD, SALLY JEWELL, JAMES P. MORRIS, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jason)
|
May 19, 2014 |
Filing 21
Memorandum in opposition to re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration)(Simon, Kenneth)
|
May 2, 2014 |
Filing 20
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, GREGORY J. GOULD, SALLY JEWELL, JAMES P. MORRIS, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CRI's Response to the IBLA's Order to Show Cause, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jason)
|
March 18, 2014 |
Filing 19
AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, GREGORY J. GOULD, SALLY JEWELL, JAMES P. MORRIS, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Simon, Kenneth)
|
March 18, 2014 |
Filing 18
STIPULATION Regarding Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (Joint) by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Simon, Kenneth)
|
March 18, 2014 |
Filing 17
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Alan Hill on behalf of All Defendants (Hill, Jason)
|
February 26, 2014 |
Filing 16
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/28/2014. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/29/2014. (Simon, Kenneth)
|
February 26, 2014 |
Filing 15
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/03/2014. (Simon, Kenneth)
|
February 26, 2014 |
Filing 14
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JAMES P. MORRIS served on 1/31/2014 (Simon, Kenneth)
|
February 26, 2014 |
Filing 13
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GREGORY J. GOULD served on 1/29/2014 (Simon, Kenneth)
|
February 26, 2014 |
Filing 12
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE served on 1/31/2014 (Simon, Kenneth)
|
February 26, 2014 |
Filing 11
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 1/29/2014 (Simon, Kenneth)
|
February 26, 2014 |
Filing 10
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SALLY JEWELL served on 1/29/2014 (Simon, Kenneth)
|
January 24, 2014 |
Filing 9
ELECTRONIC (2) SUMMONS Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
|
January 23, 2014 |
Filing 8
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE US Attorney for the District of Columbia by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC..(Simon, Kenneth)
|
January 23, 2014 |
Filing 7
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to US Attorney General by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC..(Simon, Kenneth)
|
January 23, 2014 |
Filing 6
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/23/2014. (lcrjl3)
|
January 17, 2014 |
Filing 5
Electronic Summons (5) Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, GREGORY J. GOULD, SALLY JEWELL, JAMES P. MORRIS, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Notice of Consent)(kb)
|
January 17, 2014 |
Filing 4
NOTICE of Appearance by Drew C Ensign on behalf of CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. (Ensign, Drew)
|
January 17, 2014 |
Filing 3
NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Keyna Orr on behalf of CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. (Orr, Sara)
|
January 16, 2014 |
Filing 2
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Simon, Kenneth)
|
January 16, 2014 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, GREGORY J. GOULD, SALLY JEWELL, JAMES P. MORRIS, OFFICE OF NATURAL RESOURCES REVENUE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3594347) filed by CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Summons to Sally Jewell, #7 Summons to Gregory J. Gould, #8 Summons to James P. Morris, #9 Summons to Office of Natural Resources Revenue, #10 Summons to Department of Interior)(Simon, Kenneth)
|
January 16, 2014 |
Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (kb)
|