SHANDS JACKSONVILLE MEDICAL CENTER, INC. et al v. SEBELIUS
Plaintiff: SHANDS JACKSONVILLE MEDICAL CENTER, INC. and SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS, INC.
Defendant: KATHLEEN SEBELIUS
Case Number: 1:2014cv00263
Filed: February 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Emmet G. Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached memorandum opinion and order, Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration and motion for remand to the PRRB are DENIED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 02/08/2021. (lcrdm1)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Plaintiffs' motions for an order awarding interest, Dkt. 69 , Dkt. 70 , and Dkt. 71 . See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/15/2019. (lcrdm1, )
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM OPINION: The Court will DENY both the Bakersfield Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment, Dkt. 82 , and the Athens Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment, Dkt. 84 , and will GRANT Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment, Dkt. 89 . A separate Order will issue. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/28/2018. (lcrdm2, )
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION denying Defendant's motion 23 , granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' motions 15 , 16 , 17 , 18 , 19 . The parties shall confer and propose to the Court no later than October 1, 2015, a timetable for administrative proceedings on remand. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on September 21, 2015. (lcrdm1, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHANDS JACKSONVILLE MEDICAL CENTER, INC. et al v. SEBELIUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANDS JACKSONVILLE MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN SEBELIUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?