G & E REAL ESTATE, INC. vs. AVISON YOUNG - WASHINGTON, D.C., LLC et al
Plaintiff: G & E REAL ESTATE, INC.
Defendant: AVISON YOUNG - WASHINGTON, D.C., LLC, ANALYTIC SERVICES, INC., BRUCE B. MCNAIR, JOSEPH F. PEYTON and DAVID ROEHRENBECK
Case Number: 1:2014cv00418
Filed: March 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 27, 2020. (lccck1)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court shall GRANT-IN-PART and DENY-IN-PART Plaintiff's 217 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. By OCTOBER 5, 2018, Plaintiff may file a version of its Second Amended Complaint that comp lies with the requirements set forth in this Memorandum Opinion and Order. By OCTOBER 12, 2018, Defendant shall file a Notice that complies with the requirements set forth in this Memorandum Opinion and Order. See Memorandum Opinion and Order for further details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 28, 2018. (lcckk1)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court DENIES the Motion for Sanctions, ECF No. 168, and DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE any pending motions related to the pretrial phase of this case. By NOVEMBER 24, 2017, the parties shall file a Joint Discovery Plan setting forth their positions on what additional discovery is required, proposing a discovery schedule, and indicating whether additional dispositive motion practice is appropriate. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/18/2017. (lcckk1)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER denying Plaintiff's 144 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/18/2016. (lcckk2)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part Offit Kurman, P.A.'s 130 Second Motion for Payment of Legal Fees and Electronic Discovery Vendor Fees in Compliance with Order Granting Motion for Subpoena Issued to Vornado/Charles E. Smith, L.P. Dated April 2, 2014. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/30/2016. (lcckk2)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 137 Order on Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/26/2016. (lcckk2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G & E REAL ESTATE, INC. vs. AVISON YOUNG - WASHINGTON, D.C., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G & E REAL ESTATE, INC.
Represented By: Robert C. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVISON YOUNG - WASHINGTON, D.C., LLC
Represented By: Cynthia Fleming Crawford
Represented By: Stephen M. Faraci, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANALYTIC SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Michael C. Gartner
Represented By: Thomas C. Mugavero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE B. MCNAIR
Represented By: Cynthia Fleming Crawford
Represented By: Stephen M. Faraci, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH F. PEYTON
Represented By: Cynthia Fleming Crawford
Represented By: Stephen M. Faraci, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID ROEHRENBECK
Represented By: Cynthia Fleming Crawford
Represented By: Stephen M. Faraci, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?