WASHINGTON ALLIANCE OF TECHNOLOGY WORKERS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Plaintiff: WASHINGTON ALLIANCE OF TECHNOLOGY WORKERS
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2014cv00529
Filed: March 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Ellen S. Huvelle
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 56 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 8, 2016. (lcesh1)
January 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 47 defendant's Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 23, 2016. (lcesh1)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OPINION re plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 25 and defendant's motion for summary judgment 27 . Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 12, 2015. (lcesh2)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 11/21/2014. (lcesh1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WASHINGTON ALLIANCE OF TECHNOLOGY WORKERS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WASHINGTON ALLIANCE OF TECHNOLOGY WORKERS
Represented By: John Michael Miano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?