SOTO, et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Plaintiff: MAURICIO ROJAS SOTO, AMALIA SIERRA CORREAL, NATHALIA ROJAS SIERRA and ISABELLA ROJAS SIERRA
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Case Number: 1:2014cv00604
Filed: April 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M. Collyer
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a second amended complaint 38 . See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/25/2017. (lcrdm2, ) Modified on 3/27/2017 (kt).
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OPINION: For the reasons set out in this Memorandum Opinion, the Court will grant the Department's motion for summary judgment, deny the plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration, and deny the plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment. The Court will delay the entry of judgment in this case for two weeks, until July 1, 2016. See Memorandum Opinion for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/17/2016. (lcrdm2, )
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 12 and DENYING Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment 15 . It is further ORDERED that on or before August 28, 2015, the Department shall file an additional affidavit providing further detail as to whether each document pertains to the issuance, denial, or revocation of a visa. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/6/2015. (lcrdm2, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOTO, et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAURICIO ROJAS SOTO
Represented By: Peter S. Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMALIA SIERRA CORREAL
Represented By: Peter S. Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHALIA ROJAS SIERRA
Represented By: Peter S. Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISABELLA ROJAS SIERRA
Represented By: Peter S. Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?