STEELE, ET AL. v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Plaintiff: BRITTANY MONTROIS and ADAM STEELE
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2014cv01523
Filed: September 8, 2014
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Tanya S. Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re United States' Motion 66 for Partial Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Motion 67 for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/1/17. (lsj)
August 8, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on August 8, 2016.(lcrcl3)
February 9, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on February 9, 2016.(lcrcl3)
June 30, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/30/2015. (hs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEELE, ET AL. v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRITTANY MONTROIS
Represented By: Stuart J. Bassin
Represented By: Allen Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM STEELE
Represented By: Stuart J. Bassin
Represented By: Allen Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?