FANNING et al v. MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PLCA NATIONAL PIPELINE TRAINING FUND, MICHAEL R. FANNING, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND and BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS NATIONAL TRAINING FUND
Defendant: MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.
Case Number: 1:2014cv01633
Filed: September 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2015 Filing 24 FINAL JUDGMENT BY CONSENT. (See Document for Complete Details). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/9/2015. (jth)
November 4, 2015 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Judgment against Defendant Midwest Underground, Inc. and to Close Case by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PLCA NATIONAL PIPELINE TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS NATIONAL TRAINING FUND, MICHAEL R. FANNING (Attachments: #1 Settlement Agreement and Release, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R.)
October 29, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file a Motion for Consent Judgment by 11/15/2015, or if settlement has not been finalized by that date, a further report advising the Court of the status of settlement discussions. (jth)
October 28, 2015 Filing 22 Joint STATUS REPORT by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PLCA NATIONAL PIPELINE TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS NATIONAL TRAINING FUND, MICHAEL R. FANNING. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R.)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of #22 the parties' joint status report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file a motion for consent judgment on or before November 15, 2015, or if the settlement has not been finalized by that date, a further report advising the Court of the status of the settlement discussions. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/28/2015. (lcabj2)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER cancelling the Settlement Conference set for 10/27/15, pursuant to a request by counsel. Counsel have indicated that they are negotiating a settlement of the case on their own. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 10/26/15. (DM)
October 7, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: The referral of this matter to Magistrate Judge Kay for mediation/settlement purposes is extended through 10/30/2015. (jth)
October 5, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report regarding mediation due by 10/30/2015. (tb)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of #21 plaintiffs' status report, it is ORDERED that the referral of this case to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for settlement purposes is extended through and including October 30, 2015. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a report to this Court on the status of the mediation no later than October 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/5/2015. (lcabj2)
October 2, 2015 Filing 21 STATUS REPORT by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PLCA NATIONAL PIPELINE TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS NATIONAL TRAINING FUND, MICHAEL R. FANNING. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R.)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to a request by counsel, the parties mutually agreed to mediate on October 27, 2015. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that mediation is set for October 27, 2015, at 2:00 PM in Chambers (room 2333) before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 9/11/2015. (lcak1)
September 11, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 10/27/2015 02:00 PM in Chambers (room 2333) before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. (lcak1)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties indicated interest in an October mediation date, as noted in their Status Report #20 and letter to the undersigned. The parties are advised that following dates/times are currently available for mediation: 10/2, 10/5, 10/7 (all at 10 AM or 2 PM); 10/21 at 2 PM; 10/22, 10/23, 10/26 (all at 10 AM or 2 PM). Counsel should contact chambers to confirm one of these dates as soon as possible as the undersigned is currently scheduling new mediations in October. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 09/09/15. (DM)
September 8, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file another Joint Report with the Court advising of the Status of the Discovery Disputes and the Rescheduling of any Settlement Conference on 10/2/2015. (jth)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of #20 the parties' joint report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall provide another joint report advising of the status of the discovery disputes and the rescheduling of any settlement conference on October 2, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/8/2015. (lcabj2)
September 4, 2015 Filing 20 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PLCA NATIONAL PIPELINE TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS NATIONAL TRAINING FUND, MICHAEL R. FANNING. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R.)
August 11, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall provide another Joint Report advising of the Status of the discovery disputes and the rescheduling of any settlement conference on 9/4/2015. (jth)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of #19 the parties' joint report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall provide another joint report advising of the status of the discovery disputes and the rescheduling of any settlement conference on September 4, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/11/2015. (lcabj2)
August 10, 2015 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT as required by Court's July 7, 2015, Minute Order, by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PLCA NATIONAL PIPELINE TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS NATIONAL TRAINING FUND, MICHAEL R. FANNING. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R.)
July 8, 2015 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT (refiled to comply with Clerk's ECF QC Notice of July 6, 2015) by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PLCA NATIONAL PIPELINE TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS NATIONAL TRAINING FUND, MICHAEL R. FANNING. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R.)
July 8, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: The Referral of this case to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for settlement purposes is extended through and including 9/30/2015; the parties shall provide Joint Reports advising of the Status of the discovery disputes and the rescheduling of any settlement conference on 8/10/2015, and again on 9/4/2015. (jth)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that: defendant shall provide to plaintiffs the agreed-upon spreadsheet containing data for the first three months at issue (June, July, and August 2012) on or before July 13, 2015; defendant shall produce to plaintiffs the agreed-upon spreadsheet containing the remaining data (September 2012 to December 2013) on or before August 10, 2015; plaintiffs shall advise defendant exactly what documents are sought in light of the completed spreadsheets on or before August 17, 2015; and defendant shall produce those documents to plaintiffs on or before August 31, 2015. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the referral of this case to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for settlement purposes is extended through and including September 30, 2015, and that the parties shall provide joint reports advising of the status of the discovery disputes and the rescheduling of any settlement conference on August 10, 2015, and again on September 4, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/7/2015. (lcabj2)
July 6, 2015 NOTICE OF ERROR re #17 Motion for Extension of Time to; emailed to rhopp@odonoghuelaw.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. Please refile document, 3. Same document using th
July 2, 2015 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Deadlines in Court's June 26, 2015, Minute Order and Status Report by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PLCA NATIONAL PIPELINE TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS NATIONAL TRAINING FUND, MICHAEL R. FANNING (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R.)
June 26, 2015 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #15 Status Report, Filed June 22, 2015 filed by MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.. (Francis, Paul)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Court's ruling dated May 29, 2015, and the representations contained in #16 defendant's response to #15 plaintiffs' status report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer regarding the content of the spreadsheet produced by defendant. If plaintiffs agree that defendant's spreadsheet contains all of the relevant categories of data that plaintiffs seek, even if in a different format than plaintiff requested, then defendant may continue to use defendant's version of the spreadsheet in responding to plaintiffs' requests, and it shall have until July 2, 2015 to produce the 2013 version of the spreadsheet. If, however, defendant's version of the spreadsheet is not acceptable to plaintiffs, then plaintiffs shall provide defendant with a usable digital version of the information contained in the Calibre report, or explain to the Court why it cannot do so, by July 2, 2015, and defendant must produce the 2012 and 2013 data in the spreadsheet format specifically provided by plaintiffs by July 10, 2015. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the deadlines in the Court's Minute Order of May 29, 2015 are extended as follows: after receipt of defendant's completed spreadsheets, plaintiffs shall advise defendant exactly what documents they seek in light of the spreadsheets on or before July 17, 2015; and defendant shall produce those documents on or before July 31, 2015. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the referral of this case to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for settlement purposes is extended through and including August 14, 2015. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall provide a status report to Magistrate Judge Kay advising of the status of the discovery disputes and the rescheduling of any settlement conference by August 10, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/26/2015. (lcabj2)
June 26, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: If plaintiffs agree that defendant's spreadsheet contains all of the relevant categories of data that plaintiffs seek then defendant may continue to use defendant's version of the spreadsheet in responding to plaintiffs' requests, and it shall have until 7/2/2015 to produce the 2013 version of the spreadsheet. If, however, defendant's version of the spreadsheet is not acceptable to plaintiffs, then plaintiffs shall provide defendant with a usable digital version of the information contained in the Calibre report, or explain to the Court why it cannot do so, by 7/2/2015, and defendant must produce the 2012 and 2013 data in the spreadsheet format specifically provided by plaintiffs by 7/10/2015. Plaintiffs' shall advise defendant exactly what documents they seek in light of the spreadsheets by 7/17/2015; Defendant shall produce those documents by 7/31/2015. The Referral of this case to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for settlement purposes is extended through 8/14/2015. The parties shall file a Status Report to Magistrate Judge Kay advising of the status of the discovery disputes and the rescheduling of any settlement conference by 8/10/2015. (jth)
June 23, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs' Status Report by 6/26/2015, and if it has failed to comply with the Court's Minute Order, show cause why it has failed to do so. (jth)
June 22, 2015 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT Regarding Compliance with the Court's Discovery Order by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PLCA NATIONAL PIPELINE TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS NATIONAL TRAINING FUND, MICHAEL R. FANNING. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R.)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations contained in #15 plaintiffs' status report regarding defendant's compliance with the Court's May 29, 2015 Minute Order regarding discovery, it is ORDERED that defendant shall respond to plaintiffs' status report by June 26, 2015, and if it has failed to comply with the Court's Minute Order, show cause why it has failed to do so. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/22/2015. (lcabj2)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER canceling the mediation set for 06/29/15 per the request of counsel. Counsel should contact chambers at 202-354-3030 to select a new mediation date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 06/08/15. (DM)
May 29, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Document production to be completed by 7/10/2015; The referral to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay is extended through and including 7/31/2015; A Status Report to Magistrate Judge Kay advising of the Status of the discovery disputes and the rescheduling of any settlement conference is due by 7/20/2015. (jth)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the issues discussed during the teleconference between the parties held on May 29, 2015, it is ORDERED that plaintiffs shall produce to defendant a sample spreadsheet indicating the information plaintiffs seek on or before June 1, 2015; that defendant shall produce to plaintiffs a completed spreadsheet with all relevant information on or before June 17, 2015; that plaintiffs shall advise defendant exactly what documents they seek in light of the spreadsheet on or before June 22, 2015; and that defendant shall produce those documents on or before July 10, 2015. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the referral of this case to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for settlement purposes is extended through and including July 31, 2015. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall provide a status report to Magistrate Judge Kay advising of the status of the discovery disputes and the rescheduling of any settlement conference by July 20, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/29/2015. (lcabj2)
May 29, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Telephone Conference held on 5/29/2015 (NO COURT REPORT PRESENT). (jth)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave of Paul S. Francis to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/27/15. (DMK)
May 26, 2015 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paul S. Francis, :Firm- Baker & Hostetler LLP, :Address- 811 Main Street, Suite 1100, Houston, TX 77002-6111. Phone No. - 713.646.1334. Fax No. - 713.751.1717 Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Paul S. Francis, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Scully, Elizabeth)
May 26, 2015 Filing fee: $ 100.00, receipt number 4616070268 re #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paul S. Francis (jf)
May 8, 2015 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PLCA NATIONAL PIPELINE TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS NATIONAL TRAINING FUND, MICHAEL R. FANNING. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R.)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER setting the Settlement Conference for 6/29/2015, at 03:00 PM in Chambers [room 2333] before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 04/29/15. (DM)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER- Counsel asked about available mediation dates in late June, 2015. Magistrate Judge Kay is available on June 17, 18, or 19 at 10:30 a.m. or 2:00 p.m. and on June 29 or June 30 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel should contact chambers at 202-354-3030 to confirm one of these dates or to select a different date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 04/28/15. (DM)
March 25, 2015 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PLCA NATIONAL PIPELINE TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS NATIONAL TRAINING FUND, MICHAEL R. FANNING. (See Docket Entry #11 to view document) (jf, )
March 25, 2015 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PLCA NATIONAL PIPELINE TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS NATIONAL TRAINING FUND, MICHAEL R. FANNING. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R.) Modified on 3/25/2015 (jf, ).
March 25, 2015 y (jf, )
March 25, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Mediation/Settlement is extended through and is to conclude by 7/3/2015. The parties are to submit reports on the status of the Mediation/Settlement by 5/8/2015 and by 7/3/2015. (jth)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of #11 the parties' joint status report, it is ORDERED that the referral of this case to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for settlement purposes is extended through and including July 3, 2015. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit further reports to this Court on the status of the settlement on or before May 8, 2015 and July 3, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/25/2015. (lcabj2)
February 23, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Mediation/Settlement is to conclude by 4/30/2015. The parties are to submit a report on the status of the Mediation/Settlement by 4/30/2015. (jth)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the cancellation of the settlement conference set for February 24, 2015, it is ORDERED that the referral of this case to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for settlement purposes is extended through and including April 30, 2015. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a report to this Court on the status of the mediation by April 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/23/2015. (lcabj2)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER cancelling the Settlement Conference set for 2/24/2015, per the request of counsel, to allow time to review certain documentation prior to the mediation. The Settlement Conference will be reset for sometime after March 24, 2015, and counsel should contact chambers around that time to obtain a new date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 02/20/15. (DM)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER cancelling the Settlement Conference set for 2/19/2015, per the request of counsel, and rescheduling the Settlement Conference for 2/24/2015, at 10:00 AM in Chambers [room 2333] before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 01/20/15. (DM)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting a Settlement Conference for 2/19/2015, at 10:00 AM in Chambers [room 2333] before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 01/13/15. (DM)
January 7, 2015 Filing 8 CASE DIRECTLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for settlement purposes. (sth, )
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to a Magistrate Judge. With the consent of the parties on January 7, 2015, it is ORDERED that this matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for settlement purposes to commence on January 8, 2015 and to conclude on March 9, 2015. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties submit a report to this Court on the status of the mediation by March 9, 2015, and if the case settles in whole or in part, both parties shall immediately advise the Court of the settlement by filing a stipulation. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/7/2015. (lcabj2)
January 7, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Mediation/Settlement is to conclude by 3/9/2015. The parties are to submit a report on the status of the Mediation/Settlement by 3/9/2015. (jth)
January 7, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Meet and Confer Hearing held on 1/7/2015. (Court Reporter Janice Dickman) (jth)
January 6, 2015 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC. filed by MICHAEL R. FANNING, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS NATIONAL TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PLCA NATIONAL PIPELINE TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND.(jf, )
January 6, 2015 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PLCA NATIONAL PIPELINE TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS NATIONAL TRAINING FUND, MICHAEL R. FANNING (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed First Amended Complaint (redlined with amendments), #3 Proposed First Amended Complaint (clean executed copy for filing), #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R.)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. The Clerk is directed to file plaintiffs' amended complaint [Dkt. # 6-3]. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/6/2015. (lcabj2)
December 16, 2014 Filing 5 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R.)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Meet and Confer Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2015 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. The parties shall meet, confer, and file a Joint Report pursuant to Local Rule 16.3 by 12/18/2014. Any dates contained in the Report should be expressed as specific dates (month/day/year) rather than as time frames (e.g., "60 days after the entry of the scheduling order"). Counsel are directed to contact the Court's Deputy Clerk in the first instance to request the rescheduling of court appearances. The party seeking the change in schedule must first confer with counsel for all other parties and be prepared to provide the Deputy Clerk with proposed mutually agreeable dates. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/3/2014. (jth)
December 2, 2014 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC..(Scully, Elizabeth)
October 9, 2014 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE by MICHAEL R. FANNING, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS NATIONAL TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PLCA NATIONAL PIPELINE TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC. waiver sent on 9/30/2014, answer due 11/29/2014. (Hopp, R.)
September 30, 2014 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Consent Form) (md, )
September 29, 2014 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (md, )
September 29, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3854480) filed by MICHAEL R. FANNING, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS NATIONAL TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PLCA NATIONAL PIPELINE TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hopp, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FANNING et al v. MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Scully
Represented By: Paul Sanders Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PLCA NATIONAL PIPELINE TRAINING FUND
Represented By: R. Richard Hopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL R. FANNING
Represented By: R. Richard Hopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND
Represented By: R. Richard Hopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS NATIONAL TRAINING FUND
Represented By: R. Richard Hopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?