3E MOBILE, LLC v. GLOBAL CELLULAR, INC.
Plaintiff: 3E MOBILE, LLC
Defendant: GLOBAL CELLULAR, INC.
Case Number: 1:2014cv01975
Filed: November 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Emmet G. Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 3/19/19. (lcgmh1)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/22/2016. (lcegs4)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 11, 2015. (lcegs4)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 3E MOBILE, LLC v. GLOBAL CELLULAR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3E MOBILE, LLC
Represented By: Julia Kim Whitelock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLOBAL CELLULAR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?