TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL et al v. BURWELL et al
Plaintiff: TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL and SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL
Defendant: SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, MARILYN B. TAVENNER and CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2014cv02060
Filed: December 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 51 MANDATE of USCA as to #49 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, MARILYN B. TAVENNER ; USCA Case Number 18-5238. (Attachments: #1 USCA Order)(zrdj)
August 7, 2018 USCA Case Number 18-5238 for #49 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, MARILYN B. TAVENNER. (zrdj)
August 6, 2018 Filing 50 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the appeal was filed by the government re #49 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (jf)
August 3, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #48 Judgment by MARILYN B. TAVENNER, SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Luh, James)
June 4, 2018 Filing 48 JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs against Defendants. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 06/04/18. (mac)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DENYING #25 defendants' motion to dismiss and motion for summary judgment and GRANTING #26 plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 1, 2018. (lcegs2)
June 1, 2018 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 1, 2018. (lcegs2)
April 9, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL (Edens, Geraldine)
February 13, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Edens, Geraldine)
June 30, 2017 Filing 43 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Edens, Geraldine)
June 22, 2017 Filing 42 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Edens, Geraldine)
June 21, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Edens, Geraldine)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Earlier today, an attorney from Baker & Hostetler LLP left a message on Chambers' voicemail in which the attorney stated she had a question regarding the courtesy copies of the summary judgment filing. Parties are advised to seek clarification of Court orders, including minute orders, via motion on the docket. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 6, 2017. (lcegs2)
April 24, 2017 Filing 40 NOTICE (Defendants' Notice of Amendment to Regulation) by SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, MARILYN B. TAVENNER (Luh, James)
March 8, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Edens, Geraldine)
November 9, 2016 Filing 38 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on 6-29-16; Page Numbers: (1-76). Date of Issuance:7-6-16. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 11/30/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2017.(Wallace, Scott)
August 25, 2016 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Case Stayed Pending Motions In The Related Case (CV 14-2060) Texas Children's Hospital et al v. Burwell et al (mac)
July 11, 2016 Filing 37 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Summary Judgment) (Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum) filed by SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, MARILYN B. TAVENNER. (Luh, James)
July 11, 2016 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM by SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL. (Edens, Geraldine)
July 6, 2016 Filing 35 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Demonstrative Exhibits Presented at the June 29, 2016 Hearing by SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Demonstrative Exhibit 1, #2 Demonstrative Exhibit 2, #3 Demonstrative Exhibit 3)(Edens, Geraldine)
June 29, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Motion Hearing held on 6/29/2016 in re #25 Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction And For Summary Judgment and #26 Plaintiffs' Motion For Summary Judgment. Supplemental Memorandum (5-7 Pages In Length), If Necessary, due in 10 Days. (Court Reporter SCOTT WALLACE.) (mac)
May 6, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (mac)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Due to the Court's calendar, it is necessary to reschedule the motions hearing currently scheduled for May 17, 2016. The motions hearing will now take place on June 29, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 24A. The Court regrets any inconvenience to the parties. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 5, 2016. (lcegs3)
March 30, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE of Change of Address by Bridget Springer McCabe (Attachments: #1 Praecipe, #2 Address Change Request)(McCabe, Bridget)
March 28, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan.) (mac)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court, sua sponte, schedules a motions hearing on #25 defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and for summary judgment and #26 plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment. The hearing will take place on May 17, 2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 24A. All proceedings before the Honorable Emmet G. Sullivan are hereby STAYED pending the resolution of the pending motions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/28/2016. (lcegs1)
March 14, 2016 Filing 33 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Edens, Geraldine)
November 3, 2015 Filing 32 RESPONSE re #31 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' October 29, 2015, Notice) filed by SYLVIA M. BURWELL, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, MARILYN B. TAVENNER. (Luh, James)
October 29, 2015 Filing 31 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Edens, Geraldine)
May 6, 2015 Filing 30 REPLY to opposition to motion re #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL. (Edens, Geraldine)
April 15, 2015 Filing 29 Memorandum in opposition to re #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, MARILYN B. TAVENNER. (Luh, James)
April 15, 2015 Filing 28 REPLY to opposition to motion re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Summary Judgment) (Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, MARILYN B. TAVENNER. (Luh, James)
April 1, 2015 Filing 27 Memorandum in opposition to re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Summary Judgment) filed by SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL. (Edens, Geraldine)
April 1, 2015 Filing 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment by SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Statement of Facts)(Edens, Geraldine)
March 18, 2015 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Summary Judgment) by SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, MARILYN B. TAVENNER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1)(Luh, James)
March 9, 2015 Filing 24 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on 2-18-15; Page Numbers: 1-12. Date of Issuance:3-9-15. Court Reporter/Transcriber Barbara DeVico, Telephone number 202-354-3118, Court Reporter Email Address : barbctr76@gmail.com.

<

<

< Redaction Request due 3/30/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2015.(DeVico, Barbara)
February 18, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment due by 3/18/2015. Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion, Combined With Their Cross Motion For Summary Judgment due by 4/1/2015. Defendants Reply In Further Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment, Combined With Their Opposition To Plaintiff's Cross Motion due by 4/15/2015. Plaintiffs' Reply In Further Support Of Their Cross Motion due by 5/6/2015. (zmac, )
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In accordance with the discussion on the record during the February 18, 2015 status hearing, the parties are hereby directed to comply with the following briefing schedule: The defendants shall file their motion for summary judgment by no later than March 18, 2015. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to defendants' motion, combined with their cross motion for summary judgment, by no later than April 1, 2015. Defendants shall file their reply in further support of their motion for summary judgment, combined with their opposition to plaintiffs' cross motion, by no later than April 15, 2015. Plaintiffs shall file their reply in further support of their cross motion for summary judgment by no later than May 6, 2015. The Court will not grant requests for extension of this schedule absent an exceedingly persuasive justification. The parties' respective opening briefs shall be limited to forty-five pages in length, and their respective reply briefs shall be limited to twenty-five pages in length. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 18, 2015. (lcegs2)
February 18, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Status Conference held on 2/18/2015. Order To Be Presented. (Court Reporter BARBARA DEVICO.) (mac)
February 16, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget Springer McCabe on behalf of SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL (McCabe, Bridget)
February 11, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/18/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (mac)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court, sua sponte, schedules a status hearing for February 18, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 24A. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 10, 2015. (lcegs2)
February 10, 2015 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report in Response to February 3, 2015, Order) by SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, MARILYN B. TAVENNER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Luh, James)
February 4, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/10/2015 (mac)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to file a status report, including recommendations for further proceedings, by no later than February 10, 2015. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 3, 2015. (lcegs2)
February 3, 2015 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, MARILYN B. TAVENNER.(Luh, James)
December 29, 2014 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 29, 2014. (lcegs2)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #3 plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 29, 2014. (lcegs2)
December 21, 2014 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon reviewing the pleadings related to #3 plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction, the Court determines that no hearing is necessary and that the motion may be resolved on the papers. Plaintiffs have indicated that they require a decision by no later than December 31, 2014. See Joint Status Report, ECF No. 7 at 10; Transcript of Dec. 8, 2014 Hearing, ECF No. 13 at 21:17-19. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 65.1 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65, the Court will provide them a decision in advance of that date. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 21, 2014. (lcegs2)
December 19, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheila Mae Lieber on behalf of SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, MARILYN B. TAVENNER (rdj)
December 19, 2014 Filing 17 SURREPLY to filed by SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, MARILYN B. TAVENNER. (Luh, James)
December 18, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: Government Surreply due by 12/19/2014. (mac)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The plaintiffs' #15 reply brief attached a variety of new evidence, and the Court would find it useful to receive the government's written response in advance of the December 22, 2014 hearing. Accordingly, the government is directed to file a surreply, of no more than fifteen pages, by no later than December 19, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. The surreply shall address only arguments or evidence raised in #15 the plaintiffs' reply brief. No further pleadings shall be filed after that surreply. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 17, 2014. (lcegs2)
December 15, 2014 Filing 16 ERRATA Corrected Exhibit A to Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Application for a Preliminary Injunction by SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL #15 Reply to opposition to Motion, filed by SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [Corrected])(Marraro, Christopher)
December 15, 2014 Filing 15 REPLY to opposition to motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing MOTION for Hearing filed by SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Exhibit B)(Marraro, Christopher)
December 12, 2014 Filing 14 Memorandum in opposition to re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing MOTION for Hearing (Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Application for a Preliminary Injunction) filed by SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, MARILYN B. TAVENNER. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Luh, James)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Susan G. Conway is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 11, 2014. (lcegs7)
December 10, 2014 Filing 13 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on 12-8-14; Page Numbers: 1-24. Date of Issuance:12-10-14. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Court Reporter Email Address : scottlyn01@aol.com.

<

<

< Redaction Request due 12/31/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/10/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2015.(Wallace, Scott)
December 9, 2014 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Susan G. Conway, :Firm- Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody, P.C., :Address- 401 Congress Avenue, Suite 2200, Austin, TX 78701. Phone No. - 512-480-5600. Fax No. - 512-478-1976 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-3929959. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Declaration Conway)(Marraro, Christopher)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. On December 8, 2014 the Court held a status hearing with counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants. At the status hearing, the Court ordered briefing on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction and entered the following briefing schedule: Defendants' opposition to #3 Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction shall be filed by no later than December 12, 2014 at noon. Defendants shall also file on December 12, 2014 at noon any administrative record supporting their litigation position, along with the identification of any language of the record and an executive summary as appropriate. Plaintiffs' reply shall be filed by no later than December 15, 2014 at noon. A hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction will be held on December 22, 2014 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 24A. By no later than noon on the day of filing their respective responses and replies, the parties are further directed to deliver to the chambers of the Honorable Emmet G. Sullivan three copies of their pleadings and exhibits as well as three binders containing copies of the principal points and authorities relied upon by the parties (i.e., counsel should provide copies of principal cases, statutes, regulations, etc., but need not provide copies of cases relied upon merely for the standard of review or other well-established principles). SO ORDERED.Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 8, 2014. (lcegs7)
December 8, 2014 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES served on 12/5/2014 (Edens, Geraldine)
December 8, 2014 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MARILYN B. TAVENNER served on 12/5/2014 (Edens, Geraldine)
December 8, 2014 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL served on 12/5/2014 (Edens, Geraldine)
December 8, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by James C. Luh on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Peter C. Pfaffenroth (Attachments: #1 Certification of Familiarity with Local Rules of Court)(Luh, James)
December 8, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Status Conference held on 12/8/2014. Defendants Response #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction due by 12/12/2014 at 12:00PM. Plaintiffs Reply due by 12/15/2014 at 12:00PM. Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Order To Be Issued (Court Reporter SCOTT WALLACE.) (mac)
December 8, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants Response #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction due by 12/12/2014 at 12:00PM. Plaintiffs Reply due by 12/15/2014 at 12:00PM. Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Order To Be Issued. (mac)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Due to the Court's calendar, the status hearing previously scheduled for today at 11:30 a.m. will now take place at 11:45 a.m. Local counsel are requested to appear in Courtroom 24A for the hearing; out-of-town counsel may call in using the teleconference information provided on December 5, 2014. The Court regrets any inconvenience to the parties. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 8, 2014. (lcegs7)
December 8, 2014 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Attachment 1)(Edens, Geraldine)
December 6, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C. Pfaffenroth on behalf of SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, MARILYN B. TAVENNER (Pfaffenroth, Peter)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a joint status report by no later than 9:00 a.m. on December 8, 2014 that addresses the questions the Court posed to the parties on the record during the December 5, 2014 status hearing. Plaintiffs are FURTHER ORDERED to provide to chambers by no later than 9:00 a.m. on December 8, 2014 two courtesy copies of #3 their motion for preliminary injunction, and associated exhibits, in three-ring binders. The Court schedules a telephonic status hearing for 11:30 a.m. on December 8, 2014. The dial-in number for the status hearing is 1-877-336-1839, and the passcode is 5524636. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 5, 2014. (lcegs7)
December 5, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 12/5/2014. Joint Submission due by 9:00AM on 12/8/2014. Telephone Conference set for 12/8/2014 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (Court Reporter CRYSTAL PILGRIM.) (mac)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to place a joint conference call to chambers at 4:00 p.m. today, December 5, 2014, for an on-the-record conference call to discuss #3 plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. The dial-in number for the conference is 1-877-336-1839. The passcode is 5524636. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 5, 2014. (lcegs7)
December 5, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher H. Marraro on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Marraro, Christopher)
December 5, 2014 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3)Issued Electronically as to SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, MARILYN B. TAVENNER. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(sth, )
December 5, 2014 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (sth, )
December 5, 2014 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing by SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Christopher Marraro, #4 Exhibit 1-A, #5 Exhibit 1-B, #6 Exhibit 1-C, #7 Exhibit 1-D, #8 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Robert Simon, #9 Exhibit 2-A, #10 Exhibit 2-B, #11 Exhibit 2-C, #12 Exhibit 2-D, #13 Exhibit 2-E, #14 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Jerry Kinzig, #15 Exhibit 3-A, #16 Exhibit 3-B, #17 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Kelly Wallace, #18 Exhibit 4-A, #19 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Steven Scarborough, #20 Exhibit 5-A, #21 Exhibit 5-B)(Edens, Geraldine). Added MOTION for Hearing on 12/8/2014 (rdj).
December 5, 2014 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL. (Marraro, Christopher)
December 5, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, in her official capacity, Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services; MARILYN B. TAVENNER, in her official capacity, Administrator, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services; CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3926580) filed by TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons BURWELL, #3 Summons TAVENNER, #4 Summons CMS)(Edens, Geraldine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL et al v. BURWELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL
Represented By: Peter C. Pfaffenroth
Represented By: James C. Luh
Represented By: Sheila Mae Lieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARILYN B. TAVENNER
Represented By: Peter C. Pfaffenroth
Represented By: James C. Luh
Represented By: Sheila Mae Lieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
Represented By: Peter C. Pfaffenroth
Represented By: James C. Luh
Represented By: Sheila Mae Lieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: Susan G. Conway
Represented By: Geraldine E. Edens
Represented By: Bridget Springer McCabe
Represented By: Christopher H. Marraro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: Susan G. Conway
Represented By: Geraldine E. Edens
Represented By: Bridget Springer McCabe
Represented By: Christopher H. Marraro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?