GREENE v. OFFICE OF REPRESENTATIVE BLAKE FARENTHOLD Featured Case

Plaintiff filed a complaint against Defendant The Office of Congressman Blake Farenthold for allegedly violating the anti-discrimination provisions of the Congressional Accountability Act by creating a hostile working environment and discriminating against her based on her gender, as well as retaliating against her after she complained about the discrimination and hostile work environment she was experiencing.

Plaintiff: LAUREN GREENE
Defendant: OFFICE OF REPRESENTATIVE BLAKE FARENTHOLD
Case Number: 1:2014cv02110
Filed: December 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: Violation of Congressional Accountability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2015 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by LAUREN GREENE. (Alderman, Leslie)
November 6, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery extended until 11/20/2015. Joint Status Report due by 11/20/2015. (gdf)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 19 the Parties' Joint Status Report and Request for Further Extension of the Mediation Period, it is hereby ORDERED that the mediation period and stay of discovery shall be extended until November 20, 2015. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if the matter has not been dismissed by the conclusion of the mediation period, the parties shall submit a joint status report on November 20, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/06/2015. (lcrc2)
November 6, 2015 Filing 19 Joint STATUS REPORT by LAUREN GREENE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alderman, Leslie)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 18 the Parties' Joint Status Report and Request for Further Extension of the Mediation Period, it is hereby ORDERED that the mediation period and stay of discovery shall be extended until November 6, 2015. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if the matter has not been dismissed by the conclusion of the mediation period, the parties shall submit a joint status report on November 6, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/16/2015. (lcrc2)
October 16, 2015 Filing 18 Joint STATUS REPORT by LAUREN GREENE. (Alderman, Leslie)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 17 the Parties' Joint Status Report and Request for Further Extension of the Mediation Period, it is hereby ORDERED that the mediation period and stay of discovery shall be extended until October 16, 2015. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if the matter has not been dismissed by the conclusion of the mediation period, the parties shall submit a joint status report on October 16, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/01/2015. (lcrc2)
October 1, 2015 Filing 17 Joint STATUS REPORT by LAUREN GREENE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alderman, Leslie)
July 30, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/1/2015 (tj)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The status conference previously scheduled for August 21, 2015, is hereby VACATED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/29/2015. (lcrc2)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Mediation Period: Upon consideration of the Parties' joint motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference set for July 29, 2015 is vacated, and the mediation period and stay of discovery shall be extended until October 1, 2015. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if the matter has not been dismissed by the conclusion of the mediation period, the parties shall submit a joint status report on October 1, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/28/2015. (lcrc2)
July 28, 2015 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to of Mediation Period by OFFICE OF REPRESENTATIVE BLAKE FARENTHOLD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gore, Russell)
July 10, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/29/2015 @ 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj)
June 25, 2015 Case Stayed Pursuant to Document #15. (gdf)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Parties' Joint Motion for Stay and Referral to Mediation. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/25/2015. (lcrc2)
June 24, 2015 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery, Joint MOTION for Mediation(Referral to District Court Mediation Program) by LAUREN GREENE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alderman, Leslie)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Parties' Joint Motion for Protective Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 04/22/2015. (lcrc2)
April 21, 2015 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Confidentiality, Disclosure, Non-Waiver, and Other Matters by OFFICE OF REPRESENTATIVE BLAKE FARENTHOLD (Gore, Russell)
March 2, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26(a)(1) due by 3/30/2015; Discovery due by 8/19/2015; Status Conference set for 8/21/2015 @ 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/27/2015. (lcrc2)
February 26, 2015 Filing 10 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Rogers, Ann)
February 13, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gloria Lett on behalf of OFFICE OF REPRESENTATIVE BLAKE FARENTHOLD (Lett, Gloria)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint report in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) and Local Civil Rule 16.3 on or before February 26, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/12/2015. (lcrc2)
February 12, 2015 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF REPRESENTATIVE BLAKE FARENTHOLD.(Gore, Russell)
February 12, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Hayes Gore on behalf of OFFICE OF REPRESENTATIVE BLAKE FARENTHOLD (Gore, Russell)
February 12, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann R. Rogers on behalf of OFFICE OF REPRESENTATIVE BLAKE FARENTHOLD (Rogers, Ann)
February 5, 2015 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/19/2014. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/17/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Alderman, Leslie)
February 5, 2015 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/19/14. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Alderman, Leslie)
February 5, 2015 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF REPRESENTATIVE BLAKE FARENTHOLD served on 12/18/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Alderman, Leslie)
December 15, 2014 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF REPRESENTATIVE BLAKE FARENTHOLD, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Cosnent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(rd)
December 12, 2014 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (rd)
December 12, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF REPRESENTATIVE BLAKE FARENTHOLD with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3934579) filed by LAUREN GREENE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons ATTORNEY GENERAL, # 3 Summons FARENTHOLD, # 4 Summons US ATTORNEY)(Alderman, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREENE v. OFFICE OF REPRESENTATIVE BLAKE FARENTHOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF REPRESENTATIVE BLAKE FARENTHOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAUREN GREENE
Represented By: Leslie David Alderman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?