FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, SALLY JEWELL and KEVIN WASHBURN
Case Number: 1:2015cv00105
Filed: January 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/10/2018. (lcckk3)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART and DENYING-IN-PART Defendant-Intervenors' 62 Motion to Complete the Administrative Record and to Exclude Documents from the Administrative Record, and DENYING Plaintiff's 63 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/12/2017. (lcckk3) Modified event title on 9/13/2017 (znmw).
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/14/2016. (lcckk1)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/14/2016. (lcckk1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY
Represented By: David Longly Bernhardt
Represented By: Scott D. Crowell(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Ryan Anthony Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kenneth Dean Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: Kenneth Dean Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALLY JEWELL
Represented By: Kenneth Dean Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN WASHBURN
Represented By: Kenneth Dean Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?