UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ESTATE OF LAYTON P. STUART ET AL
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: RICHARD A. TORTI, SR., ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, HUNTER P. STUART, TOMMYE H. STUART, ESTATE OF LAYTON P. STUART, STUART FAMILY 1997 TRUSTS and KIRBY STUART
Case Number: 1:2015cv01044
Filed: July 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2017 Filing 42 United States Marshal's Bill of Sale re #40 Order on Motion for Order of Sale (zrdj)
April 19, 2017 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #40 Order on Motion for Order of Sale, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Public Notice of Execution Sale of 344,577 Shares of One Bank & Trust, N.A.)(Tarosky, Adam)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: The United States Marshals Service shall conduct an execution sale of the stock that it seized and has been holding in escrow since November 3, 2015, according to the procedures set forth in 28 U.S.C. 3203(g). See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/7/2017. (lcrdm2, )
March 23, 2017 Filing 39 MOTION for Order of Sale of Bank Stock to Partially Satisfy Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Appendix, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tarosky, Adam)
January 11, 2016 Filing 38 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against One Financial Corporation.. Signed by Kristin Thompson, Deputy Clerk, on 1/11/2016. (kt)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: The United States's renewed motion for a default judgment (Dkt. #36 ) is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk shall enter judgment against Defendant One Financial Corporation on Counts I and II of the Amended Complaint in the amount of $47,905,500. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/8/2016. (lcrdm2, )
December 22, 2015 Filing 36 MOTION for Default Judgment as to One Financial Corporation by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Tarosky, Adam)
December 17, 2015 Filing 35 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Randolph D. Moss held on December 9, 2015; Page Numbers: 1 - 12. Date of Issuance: December 16, 2015. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeff Hook; Telephone number 202-354-3373. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 1/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2016.(Hook, Jeff)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record during the December 9, 2015 status conference, the United States shall file a renewed motion for a default judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(b)(2). If any interested person or entity believes that a hearing should be held on the United States's motion for a default judgment, that person or entity shall file a request for a hearing, which shall identify any contested issues, within one week of the filing of the United States's renewed motion. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/09/2015. (lcrdm2, )
December 9, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 12/9/2015. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook). (kt)
December 1, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing: A Status Conference is set for 12/9/2015, at 2:00 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: The United States is hereby ordered to appear for a status conference on December 9, 2015, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 21, on its Motion for Default Judgment #31 . The United States is further ordered to serve a copy of the docketed Order on the parties named in the Order, who may also appear at the December 9, 2015 status conference. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/1/2015. (lcrdm2, )
November 25, 2015 Filing 33 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Randolph D. Moss held on November 6, 2015; Page Numbers: 1 - 13. Date of Issuance: November 25, 2015. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeff Hook; Telephone number 202-354-3373. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 12/16/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2016.(Hook, Jeff)
November 19, 2015 NOTICE OF ERROR re #32 Certificate of Service; emailed to adam.r.tarosky@usdoj.gov, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. In future, separately filed certificates of service should include full case caption. (znmw, )
November 18, 2015 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #31 MOTION for Default Judgment as to One Financial Corporation . (Tarosky, Adam)
November 10, 2015 Filing 31 MOTION for Default Judgment as to One Financial Corporation by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Clerk to Enter Default Judgment on Sum Certain)(Tarosky, Adam)
November 6, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 11/6/2015. Issues addressed. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook) (kt)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the United States's Status Report #30 , it is hereby ordered that parties shall appear at the status conference scheduled for November 6, 2015, at 11:30 a.m. Eastern Standard Time, notwithstanding the seizure of the Bank Stock. Any party that wishes to appear telephonically is directed to contact the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Ms. Kristin Thompson, at (202) 354-3084, to arrange for the telephonic status conference. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/3/2015. (lcrdm2, )
November 3, 2015 Filing 30 STATUS REPORT on Execution of Writ of Attachment and Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Tarosky, Adam)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the United States's Response to the Order to Show Cause #29 , the Court hereby ORDERS that all documents filed to date under seal in this case shall be unsealed. The Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to unseal all sealed documents filed to date in this matter. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/2/2015. (lcrdm2, )
November 2, 2015 Filing 29 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #28 Order on Sealed Motion . (Tarosky, Adam)
October 31, 2015 Set/Reset Deadline/Hearing: Any such brief shall be filed on or before 11/5/2015. A Telephone Conference is set for 11/6/2015, at 11:30 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: The United States's Sealed Motion #27 is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/30/2015. (lcrdm2, )
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tarosky, Adam) Modified on 11/3/2015 pursuant to 11/2/2015 MINUTE ORDER Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss (zrdj).
October 30, 2015 Filing 26 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION (znmw)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The telephonic status conference scheduled for October 30, 2015, at 2:00 p.m., is hereby cancelled. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/29/2015. (lcrdm2, )
October 29, 2015 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT of One Financial Corporation by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tarosky, Adam)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE OF PREJUDGMENT ATTACHMENT. (zkt) Modified on 11/3/2015 pursuant to 11/2/2015 MINUTE ORDER Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss (zrdj).
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 10/26/2015.(zkt) Modified on 11/3/2015 pursuant to 11/2/2015 MINUTE ORDER Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss (zrdj).
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AND ORDER Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/26/2015.(zkt) Modified on 11/3/2015 pursuant to 11/2/2015 MINUTE ORDER Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss (zrdj).
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment A, #3 Attachment B, #4 Attachment C, #5 Attachment D, #6 Attachment E)(Tarosky, Adam) Modified on 11/3/2015 pursuant to 11/2/2015 MINUTE ORDER Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss (zrdj).
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Upon consideration of the Stipulation of Dismissal #19 , the United States' claims against the Stuart Interests are hereby dismissed with prejudice. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/20/2015. (lcrdm2, )
October 19, 2015 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal of the Stuart Interests by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tarosky, Adam)
October 14, 2015 Filing 18 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION served on 10/7/2015, answer due 10/28/2015 (Tarosky, Adam)
October 7, 2015 Set/Reset Deadline: The Stuart Interests shall respond to the United States's Complaint on or before 11/9/2015. (kt)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The United States's Consent Motion for Extension of Time #17 is hereby GRANTED. The Stuart Interests shall respond to the United States's Complaint on or before November 9, 2015. No other deadlines are affected by this Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/6/2015. (lcrdm2, )
October 6, 2015 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Cover Sheet, Complaint, #10 Amended Complaint for Stuart Interests by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tarosky, Adam)
October 2, 2015 Filing 16 SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION (zrdj)
October 1, 2015 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to One Financial Corporation by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #10 Amended Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Related document: #10 Amended Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Tarosky, Adam)
September 16, 2015 Filing 14 SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to HUNTER P. STUART (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(zrdj)
September 15, 2015 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to Hunter P. Stuart by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #1 Cover Sheet, Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Related document: #1 Cover Sheet, Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Tarosky, Adam)
September 14, 2015 Filing 12 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(zrdj)
September 14, 2015 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to One Financial Corporation by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #10 Amended Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Related document: #10 Amended Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Tarosky, Adam)
September 10, 2015 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ESTATE OF LAYTON P. STUART, HUNTER P. STUART, KIRBY STUART, TOMMYE H. STUART, STUART FAMILY 1997 TRUSTS, RICHARD A. TORTI, SR, ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION with Jury Demand filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(zrdj)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Amend/Correct #9 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The amended complaint [9-1] is deemed FILED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on September 10, 2015. (lcrdm3, )
September 9, 2015 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Cover Sheet, Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tarosky, Adam)
August 11, 2015 Set/Reset Deadline: Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 10/9/2015. (kt)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time #8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before October 9, 2015. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/10/2015. (lcrdm2, )
August 10, 2015 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by ESTATE OF LAYTON P. STUART, HUNTER P. STUART, KIRBY STUART, TOMMYE H. STUART, STUART FAMILY 1997 TRUSTS, RICHARD A. TORTI, SR (Jacobs, Jonathan)
July 16, 2015 Filing 7 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to HUNTER P. STUART, KIRBY STUART, TOMMYE H. STUART, RICHARD A. TORTI, SR. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(zrdj)
July 16, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R. Tarosky on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Tarosky, Adam) Modified on 7/16/2015 (zrdj).
July 15, 2015 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Kirby L. Stuart by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Tarosky, Adam)
July 15, 2015 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Hunter P. Stuart by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Tarosky, Adam)
July 15, 2015 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Tommye H. Stuart by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Tarosky, Adam)
July 15, 2015 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to Richard A. Torti, Sr., as representative of the Estate of Layton P. Stuart and the Stuart Family 1997 Trusts by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Tarosky, Adam)
July 1, 2015 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (md)
July 1, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, against ALL DEFENDANTS with Jury Demand (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Russell, Beverly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ESTATE OF LAYTON P. STUART ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD A. TORTI, SR.
Represented By: Jonathan Spencer Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTER P. STUART
Represented By: Jonathan Spencer Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOMMYE H. STUART
Represented By: Jonathan Spencer Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESTATE OF LAYTON P. STUART
Represented By: Jonathan Spencer Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STUART FAMILY 1997 TRUSTS
Represented By: Jonathan Spencer Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRBY STUART
Represented By: Jonathan Spencer Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Beverly Maria Russell
Represented By: Adam R. Tarosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?