FBME BANK LTD. et al v. LEW et al
Plaintiff: FBME BANK LTD. and FBME LTD.
Defendant: JACOB J. LEW, DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, JENNIFER SHASKY CALVERY and FINANCIAL CRIMES ENFORCEMENT NETWORK
Case Number: 1:2015cv01270
Filed: August 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Christopher R. Cooper
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 88 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; 89 Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; 92 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/14/2017. (lccrc1)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 61 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; 62 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; 64 Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Supplement the Administrative Record; 72 Plaintiffs' Motion to Cross-Examine or Depose Richard May. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/20/2016. (lccrc1)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 38 Motion to Remand: It is hereby ORDERED that 38 FinCEN's Motion to Remand is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, no later than November 30, 2015, FinCEN will publish notice of its intent to reopen t he Final Rule and provide relevant unclassified materials to plaintiffs and the public. It is further ORDERED that the deadline for comments on the reopened Final Rule shall be set for no later than two months following FinCEN's notice of inten t to reopen the Final Rule. It is further ORDERED that, no later than two months following the deadline for comments, FinCEN will render a decision on the reopened Final Rule. It is further ORDERED that, no later than two weeks after FinCEN render s a decision on the reopened Final Rule, the parties shall meet and confer and submit to the Court a joint status report. It is further ORDERED that this action be STAYED pending completion of the remand proceedings. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/6/2015. (lccrc3)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/27/2015. (lccrc3) .
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FBME BANK LTD. et al v. LEW et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACOB J. LEW
Represented By: Lynn Yuhee Lee
Represented By: Amy E. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
Represented By: Lynn Yuhee Lee
Represented By: Amy E. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER SHASKY CALVERY
Represented By: Lynn Yuhee Lee
Represented By: Amy E. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FINANCIAL CRIMES ENFORCEMENT NETWORK
Represented By: Lynn Yuhee Lee
Represented By: Amy E. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FBME BANK LTD.
Represented By: Derek Lawrence Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FBME LTD.
Represented By: Derek Lawrence Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?