JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE Featured Case
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Case Number: 1:2015cv01414
Filed: August 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Beryl A. Howell
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DISMISSING this matter, with prejudice, and with no costs or fees awarded, upon consideration of the parties' 10 Stipulation of Dismissal. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 30, 2015. (lcbah2)
November 30, 2015 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Bekesha, Michael)
October 27, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint status report and proposed schedule to govern proceedings due by 12/7/2015. (tg)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, the parties to file a joint status report to the Court with a proposed schedule to govern any further proceedings in the case by December 7, 2015. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 26, 2015. (lcbah2)
October 23, 2015 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Carmichael, Andrew)
October 9, 2015 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Carmichael, Andrew)
September 9, 2015 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 9/9/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Bekesha, Michael)
September 9, 2015 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/09/15. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Bekesha, Michael)
September 9, 2015 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/9/2015. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/9/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Bekesha, Michael)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 31, 2015. (lcbah2)
August 31, 2015 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md)
August 31, 2015 Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (md)
August 31, 2015 Filing 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael)
August 31, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4227731) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons State Dept., # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 4 Summons U.S. Atty General)(Bekesha, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Represented By: Michael Bekesha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?