JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY Featured Case
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Case Number: 1:2015cv01776
Filed: October 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M. Collyer
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2016 Filing 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Ryan Law, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Heaps, Bailey)
January 11, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 3/4/2016. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/1/2016. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/15/2016. Plaintiff's Cross Motion due by 4/1/2016. Response to Cross Motion due by 4/15/2016. Reply to Cross Motion due by 4/29/2016. (cdw)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER adopting 6 Proposed Schedule. Defendant shall provide a search declaration by January 29, 2016. Plaintiff shall decide whether to proceed by February 5, 2016. If necessary, Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due March 4, 2016. Plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion, if any, is due April 1, 2016. Defendant's reply and opposition to cross-motion are due April 15, 2016. Plaintiffs reply in support of cross-motion is due April 29, 2016. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/11/2016. (lcrmc3, )
January 8, 2016 Filing 6 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE On Behalf of Both Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Heaps, Bailey)
December 2, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 1/8/2016. (cdw)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall meet, confer, and file by January 8, 2016 a proposed briefing schedule for this case. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/2/2015. (lcrmc3)
December 2, 2015 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Heaps, Bailey)
November 2, 2015 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/2/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/2/2015.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/2/2015., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 10/30/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of C. Rotaru)(Peterson, James)
October 22, 2015 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms.pdf)(zrdj)
October 21, 2015 Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (md)
October 21, 2015 Filing 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James)
October 21, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4286528) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Treasury, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Peterson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Represented By: James F. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?