WISDOM v. UNITED STATES TRUSTEE PROGRAM
Plaintiff: ALLEN L. WISDOM
Defendant: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE PROGRAM
Case Number: 1:2015cv01821
Filed: October 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: James E. Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/1/17. (lcjeb1)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DIRECTING further briefing. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall include in their briefing (set by Minute Order of January 30, 2017) a discussion of the private and public interests implicated by the three performance evaluations produced for in camera review. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/8/2017. (lcjeb1)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 28 Order on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/13/2017. (lcjeb1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WISDOM v. UNITED STATES TRUSTEE PROGRAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEN L. WISDOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE PROGRAM
Represented By: Fred Elmore Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?