JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY Featured Case
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2015cv02075
Filed: December 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Randolph D. Moss
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal 8 , the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is dismissed with prejudice. The parties will bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/10/2016. (lcrdm2, )
February 9, 2016 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Truong, John)
January 22, 2016 Set/Reset Deadline: Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before by 2/9/2016. (kt)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's motion for an extension of time 7 is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before February 9, 2016. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/21/2016. (lcrdm2, )
January 21, 2016 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Truong, John)
December 28, 2015 Set/Reset Deadline: Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 1/22/2016. (kt)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's motion for an extension of time 6 is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before January 22, 2016. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/28/2015. (lcrdm2, )
December 23, 2015 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Truong, John)
December 11, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Cuong Truong on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Truong, John)
December 8, 2015 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/8/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/7/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/7/2015., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 12/7/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Burke, Lauren)
December 2, 2015 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md)
December 1, 2015 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (md)
December 1, 2015 Filing 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Burke, Lauren)
December 1, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4332992) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons DHS)(Burke, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Represented By: Lauren M. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: John Cuong Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?