GRACE et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Plaintiff: MATTHEW GRACE and PINK PISTOLS
Defendant: CATHY LANIER and DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Petitioner: NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA
Amicus Curiae: EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY and BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Case Number: 1:2015cv02234
Filed: December 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2018 Filing 63 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claim for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by MATTHEW GRACE, PINK PISTOLS. (Cooper, Charles)
January 9, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs shall file any motion for attorneys' fees and taxable costs by 1/31/2018. (jth)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #62 Motion to Stay. It is further ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file any motion for attorneys' fees and taxable costs on or before January 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/14/2017. (lcrjl2) Modified event title on 12/15/2017 (znmw).
December 11, 2017 Filing 62 Joint MOTION to Stay Briefing on Attorney's Fees by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY LANIER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saindon, Andrew)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #59 Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for an Order Setting Deadline for Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file any motion for attorneys' fees and taxable costs by December 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/23/2017. (lcrjl2)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the Memorandum Opinion entered this date, it is hereby ORDERED that defendants and their officers, agents, and employees are permanently enjoined from denying concealed carry licenses to applicants who meet all eligibility requirements other than the requirement that the applicant demonstrate a "good reason to fear injury to his or her person or property" or "any other proper reason for carrying a pistol," as established and further defined in D.C. Code 22-4506(a)-(b) and 7-2509.11(1)(A)-(B) and D.C. Mun. Regs. tit. 24, 2332.1(g), 2333.1, 2333.2, 2333.3, 2333.4, and 2334.1, and it is further ORDERED that defendants shall modify and reissue, forthwith, all District of Columbia concealed carry license application materials to be consistent with this Order and the Opinion issued by the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit. See Wrenn v. District of Columbia, 864 F.3d 650 (D.C. Cir. 2017). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/17/2017. (jth)
October 17, 2017 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/17/2017. (jth)
October 16, 2017 Filing 59 Consent MOTION for Scheduling Order Setting Deadline for Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by MATTHEW GRACE, PINK PISTOLS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
October 6, 2017 Filing 58 MANDATE of USCA as to #52 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY LANIER. USCA Case Number 16-7067. (Attachments: #1 judgment filed July 25, 2017)(zrdj)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #54 Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of a Scheduling Order. In light of the decision by our Court of Appeals, see Wrenn v. District of Columbia, 864 F.3d 650, 668 (D.C. Cir. 2017), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 09/25/2017. (lcrjl2)
January 25, 2017 Filing 57 NOTICE re: Wrenn stay of proceedings by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY LANIER (Saindon, Andrew)
December 29, 2016 Filing 56 REPLY to opposition to motion re #54 MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by MATTHEW GRACE, PINK PISTOLS. (Cooper, Charles)
December 23, 2016 Filing 55 Memorandum in opposition to re #54 MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY LANIER. (Blecher, Matthew)
December 9, 2016 Filing 54 MOTION for Scheduling Order by MATTHEW GRACE, PINK PISTOLS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
May 27, 2016 Filing 53 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the fee was an Appeal by the DC Government re #52 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (znmw)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #48 Motion to Stay. In light of the Court of Appeals' issuance this afternoon of an administrative stay of this Court's order granting plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction, defendants' Motion to Stay is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/27/2016. (lcrjl2, )
May 26, 2016 Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #46 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,,,,,, #45 Memorandum & Opinion by CATHY LANIER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Saindon, Andrew)
May 26, 2016 USCA Case Number 16-7067 for #52 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY LANIER. (vt)
May 24, 2016 Filing 51 REPLY to opposition to motion re #48 MOTION to Stay re #46 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,,,,,, #45 Memorandum & Opinion and Motion for Immediate Administrative Stay filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY LANIER. (Saindon, Andrew)
May 23, 2016 Filing 50 Memorandum in opposition to re #48 MOTION to Stay re #46 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,,,,,, #45 Memorandum & Opinion and Motion for Immediate Administrative Stay filed by MATTHEW GRACE, PINK PISTOLS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
May 20, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Chad A. Naso as counsel for defendants by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY LANIER (Saindon, Andrew)
May 20, 2016 NOTICE OF ERROR re #47 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance; emailed to chad.naso@dc.gov, cc'd 28 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Please refile document, 3. Entered in error; Incorrect case number and captionl; Please Refile. (znmw, )
May 19, 2016 Filing 48 MOTION to Stay re #46 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,,,,,, #45 Memorandum & Opinion and Motion for Immediate Administrative Stay by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY LANIER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saindon, Andrew)
May 19, 2016 Filing 47 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY LANIER. Attorney Chad Alan Naso terminated. (Naso, Chad) Modified on 5/20/2016 (znmw).
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: For the reason set forth in accompanying Memorandum Opinion entered this date, it is hereby ordered that the plaintiff's #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED; and it is further ordered that plaintiff's #6 Motion for Permanent Injunction is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and it is further ordered that plaintiff's #37 Motion to Consolidate the Preliminary Injunction Proceedings with the Determination on the Merits is DENIED. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETALS. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 05/17/16. (tb)
May 17, 2016 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 05/17/16. (tb) Modified on 5/17/2016 (tb). (Main Document 45 replaced on 5/17/2016) (jf).
March 25, 2016 Filing 44 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by MATTHEW GRACE, PINK PISTOLS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Caetano v. Massachusetts)(Cooper, Charles)
March 14, 2016 Filing 43 REPLY to opposition to motion re #37 MOTION To Consolidate the Preliminary Injunction Proceedings with the Determination on the Merits filed by MATTHEW GRACE, PINK PISTOLS. (Cooper, Charles)
March 7, 2016 Filing 42 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY LANIER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wrenn Order denying PI)(Saindon, Andrew)
March 4, 2016 Filing 41 Memorandum in opposition to re #37 MOTION To Consolidate the Preliminary Injunction Proceedings with the Determination on the Merits filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY LANIER. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Rule 56(d), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Saindon, Andrew)
February 24, 2016 Filing 40 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by MATTHEW GRACE, PINK PISTOLS. (Cooper, Charles)
February 24, 2016 Filing 39 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Defendants Opposition to Preliminary Injunction filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY LANIER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Founding Fathers statements, #2 Exhibit Small Declaration, #3 Exhibit Grace application)(Saindon, Andrew)
February 24, 2016 Filing 38 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Defendants' Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
February 16, 2016 Filing 37 MOTION To Consolidate the Preliminary Injunction Proceedings with the Determination on the Merits by MATTHEW GRACE, PINK PISTOLS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
February 16, 2016 Filing 36 RESPONSE re #35 Response to Document filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY LANIER. (Saindon, Andrew)
February 11, 2016 Filing 35 RESPONSE re #34 Notice of Related Case filed by MATTHEW GRACE, PINK PISTOLS. (Cooper, Charles)
February 11, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Defendants. Case related to Case No. 15-162. (Naso, Chad)
February 10, 2016 Filing 33 TRANSCRIPT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on February 2, 2016; Page Numbers: 1-78. Date of Issuance: February 10, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order Form.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/2/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2016.(wz)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. At the Hearing in this matter held on February 2, 2016, the Court allowed the parties to submit supplemental briefs within two (2) weeks of receipt of the transcript. Upon consideration thereof, it is ORDERED that the parties supplemental briefs may not exceed fifteen (15) pages in length. SO ORDERED. By Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/4/2016. (jth)
February 2, 2016 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/2/2016 before Judge Richard J. Leon re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by MATTHEW GRACE, PINK PISTOLS; Motion heard and taken under advisement. Parties may file supplemental briefs within two weeks from receipt of the transcript. Plaintiffs' motion for consolidation, if any, is due within two weeks of the hearing. (Court Reporter William Zaremba) (tb) Modified on 2/3/2016 (ztb).
January 29, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Michelle Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (Johnson, Holly)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 29 plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Short Response to the Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence's Amicus Curiae Brief. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that [27-2] plaintiffs' proposed memorandum in response is deemed filed in the above-captioned case. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/29/2016. (lcrjl2, )
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants by BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/29/2016. (lcrjl2, )
January 28, 2016 Filing 28 RESPONSE re #27 and 29 Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Short Response filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY LANIER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saindon, Andrew) Modified link on 1/29/2016 (znmw).
January 27, 2016 MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the defendant's #26 Motion to Reschedule Hearing; it is hereby ordered that the motion is GRANTED IN PART; and it is further order that the preliminary injunction hearing will commence at 1:30 p.m. on 02/02/16 before Judge Richard Judge Leon. SO ORDERED - Judge Richard J. Leon on 01/27/16. (tb)
January 26, 2016 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Short Response Brief by MATTHEW GRACE, PINK PISTOLS. (See Docket Entry #27 to view document). (znmw)
January 26, 2016 Filing 27 RESPONSE re #25 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief and Motion in the Alternative for Leave to File a Short Response Brief filed by MATTHEW GRACE, PINK PISTOLS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Memorandum in Reponse, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
January 26, 2016 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Reschedule PI Hearing by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY LANIER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saindon, Andrew)
January 22, 2016 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Brief, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Levin, Adam)
January 22, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam K. Levin on behalf of BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE (Levin, Adam)
January 22, 2016 Filing 23 REPLY to opposition to motion re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by MATTHEW GRACE, PINK PISTOLS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cooper, Charles)
January 22, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/2/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (tb)
January 20, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/2/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 30A before Judge Richard J. Leon. (tb)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a hearing on plaintiffs' [Dkt. #6] Application for a Preliminary and/or Permanent Injunction shall be held before the undersigned on February 2, 2016 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 18. It is further ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern the presentation of oral argument at the hearing: (1) each side shall have a total of 40 minutes; (2) each side may allocate up to 10 minutes of its time to amici; and (3) plaintiffs may reserve up to 10 minutes of their time for rebuttal. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/20/16. (lcrjl2, )
January 19, 2016 Filing 22 AMICUS BRIEF by EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 1, #2 Appendix Part 2, #3 Appendix Part 3)(znmw)
January 19, 2016 Filing 21 AMICUS BRIEF by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA. (znmw)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs by the NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/19/16. (lcrjl2, )
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants by EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/19/16. (lcrjl2, )
January 15, 2016 Filing 20 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY LANIER. (Saindon, Andrew)
January 15, 2016 Filing 19 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY LANIER. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Saindon, Andrew)
January 15, 2016 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Brief, #2 Appendix Appendix Part 1, #3 Appendix Appendix Part 2, #4 Appendix Appendix Part 3, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gupta, Deepak)
January 15, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Deepak Gupta on behalf of EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY (Gupta, Deepak)
January 12, 2016 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY LANIER.(Naso, Chad)
January 4, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by The National Rifle Association of America, Inc. (Clement, Paul)
January 4, 2016 Filing 14 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Erin Elizabeth Murphy on behalf of The National Rifle Association of America, Inc.. (Murphy, Erin)
January 4, 2016 Filing 13 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Paul Clement on behalf of The National Rifle Association of America, Inc.. (Clement, Paul)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/29/2015. (lcrjl2, )
December 29, 2015 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA served on 12/23/2015 (Cooper, Charles)
December 29, 2015 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CATHY LANIER served on 12/23/2015 (Cooper, Charles)
December 29, 2015 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on the Mayor of the District of Columbia. Date of Service Upon the Mayor for the District of Columbia on 12/23/2015. (Cooper, Charles)
December 29, 2015 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 12/23/2015. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 1/13/2016. (Cooper, Charles)
December 29, 2015 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Application for a Preliminary and/or Permanent Injunction by MATTHEW GRACE, PINK PISTOLS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
December 29, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' Application for a Preliminary and/or Permanent Injunction, if any, is due on or before 1/15/2016; Plaintiffs' reply, if any, is due on or before 1/22/2016. (kt)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties' #7 Consent Motion to Establish Schedule for Plaintiffs' Application for a Preliminary and/or Permanent Injunction is GRANTED. The following schedule shall govern the above-captioned case: (1) Defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' #6 Application for a Preliminary and/or Permanent Injunction, if any, is due on or before January 15, 2016; (2) Plaintiffs' reply, if any, is due on or before January 22, 2016. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/29/2015. (lcrjl2, )
December 28, 2015 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or, MOTION for Permanent Injunction by MATTHEW GRACE, PINK PISTOLS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration Matthew Grace, #4 Exhibit Denial Letter, #5 Declaration Gwendolyn S. Patton, #6 Exhibit Sample Application, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Cooper, Charles)
December 28, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Justin Cooper on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cooper, Charles)
December 23, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Saindon on behalf of All Defendants (Saindon, Andrew)
December 22, 2015 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to CATHY LANIER, METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, District of Columbia Attorney General, and the District of Columbia Mayor. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sth)
December 22, 2015 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A. Patterson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Patterson, Peter)
December 22, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4358488) filed by MATTHEW GRACE, PINK PISTOLS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Summons 3)(Thompson, David)
December 22, 2015 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (sth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRACE et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW GRACE
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: David Henry Thompson
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PINK PISTOLS
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: David Henry Thompson
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHY LANIER
Represented By: Andrew J. Saindon
Represented By: Holly Michelle Johnson
Represented By: Chad Alan Naso
Represented By: Matthew Robert Blecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Andrew J. Saindon
Represented By: Holly Michelle Johnson
Represented By: Chad Alan Naso
Represented By: Matthew Robert Blecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Murphy
Represented By: Paul Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By: Adam K. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?