June 8, 2022 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion due by 7/21/2022. Response due by 9/9/2022 Reply due by 9/23/2022. (tb)
|
June 7, 2022 |
Filing 194
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
|
June 7, 2022 |
Filing 193
ORDER granting #188 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. See order as revised by the Court for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/7/2022. (DMK)
|
June 7, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #191 federal defendant's unopposed motion for leave to file document under seal. The Clerk of Court is directed to file on the docket UNDER SEAL the exhibit to the motion [191-2]. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/7/22. (DMK)
|
June 5, 2022 |
Filing 192
NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shapiro, Elizabeth)
|
June 5, 2022 |
Filing 191
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Shapiro, Elizabeth)
|
June 3, 2022 |
Filing 190
NOTICE of Proposed Order Revised by TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, JOHNNY GONZALEZ, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, MARIO SAMPEDRO, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR re #188 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval (Girard, Daniel)
|
June 3, 2022 |
Set/Reset Hearing: Fairness Hearing set for 10/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (In Person) before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth)
|
June 3, 2022 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Video (VTC)Motion Hearing held on 6/3/2022 re: #188 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Fairness Hearing set for 10/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (In Person) before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (jth)
|
May 10, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that a Video (VTC) Hearing re: #188 Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Providing for Notice is set for 6/3/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. The Court's Deputy Clerk will provide the video connection information to the lead attorneys who may forward that information to other counsel in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/10/2022. (jth)
|
May 9, 2022 |
Filing 189
FRIST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS.(zjf)
|
May 9, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' stipulation #187 , the Clerk of Court is directed to file the First Amended Consolidated Complaint [187-1] on the docket. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/9/22. (DMK)
|
May 6, 2022 |
Filing 188
MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval by TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, JOHNNY GONZALEZ, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, MARIO SAMPEDRO, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit 1 (Notice), #4 Exhibit 2 (Claim Form), #5 Exhibit 3 ([Proposed] Preliminary Approval Order), #6 Exhibit 4 ([Proposed] Final Approval Order and Judgment), #7 Exhibit 5 (Notice Plan), #8 Declaration of Daniel C. Girard, #9 Declaration of Cameron R. Azari, #10 Declaration of Marcus J. Glasgow, #11 Declaration of Michael V. Sorrento)(Girard, Daniel)
|
May 6, 2022 |
Filing 187
STIPULATION to Amend Complaint by TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, MYRNA BROWN, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, JOHNNY GONZALEZ, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, MARIO SAMPEDRO, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Girard, Daniel)
|
May 3, 2022 |
Filing 186
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Elizabeth)
|
May 3, 2022 |
MINTUE ORDER granting #186 Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that the parties shall file a motion for preliminary approval of their settlement by May 6, 2022. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/3/22. (DMK)
|
May 2, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #184 Unopposed Motion to Substitute Party Name. The Clerk of Court is directed to change the name of defendant Perspecta Risk Decision Inc. to "Peraton Risk Decision Inc." in this case and all cases consolidated into the case. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/2/22. (DMK)
|
April 27, 2022 |
Filing 185
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PERSPECTA RISK DECISION INC (Mendro, Jason)
|
April 27, 2022 |
Filing 184
Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Name by PERSPECTA RISK DECISION INC. (Mendro, Jason)
|
April 19, 2022 |
Filing 183
NOTICE of Change of Address by Gary Edward Mason (Mason, Gary)
|
April 19, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the joint status report #182 , it is ORDERED that the parties shall file a motion for preliminary approval of their settlement by May 4, 2022. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/19/2022. (DMK)
|
April 18, 2022 |
Filing 182
Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Girard, Daniel)
|
February 22, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the joint status report #181 , it is ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by April 18, 2022 if the matter is not resolved in the interim. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/22/22. (DMK)
|
February 18, 2022 |
Filing 181
Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Girard, Daniel)
|
January 18, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' joint status report #180 , it is ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on February 18, 2022 if the matter is not resolved in the interim. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/18/22. (DMK)
|
January 14, 2022 |
Filing 180
Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Girard, Daniel)
|
December 6, 2021 |
Filing 179
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,,, Set Deadlines,, filed by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Girard, Daniel)
|
November 30, 2021 |
Filing 178
Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Girard, Daniel)
|
November 30, 2021 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the joint status report #178 , it is ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on January 14, 2022 if the matter is not resolved in the interim. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/30/21. (DMK)
|
November 29, 2021 |
MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the dockets in In re: OPM Management Data Security Breach Litigation, 15-mc-01394, and Parton v. United States, 18-cv-1416, the Court notes that the joint status reports filed in the miscellaneous matter concerning mediation efforts indicate that they concern ALL CASES, but there is also a ripe motion to dismiss the Parton matter. It is therefore ORDERED that the parties, including plaintiff Parton, shall advise the Court by December 6, 2021 whether the Parton case is included in the mediation and the motion to dismiss should be held in abeyance. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/29/21. (DMK)
|
November 15, 2021 |
Filing 177
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. Attorney Elliott M. Davis terminated. (Davis, Elliott)
|
October 29, 2021 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the joint status report #176 , it is ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by November 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/29/21. (DMK)
|
October 27, 2021 |
Filing 176
Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Girard, Daniel)
|
September 27, 2021 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' joint status report #175 , the referral of this matter to the Hon. John D. Bates is extended by 30 days. The parties shall file a further joint status report by November 1, 2021 if the matter has not been resolved in the interim. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/27/21. (DMK)
|
September 23, 2021 |
Filing 175
Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Girard, Daniel)
|
July 30, 2021 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the joint status report #174 submitted by the parties on July 19, 2021, and the matters discussed during the telephone conference on July 28, 2021, the matter is hereby referred to the Hon. John D. Bates for a period of 60 days for settlement of the remaining issue on which the parties are at an impasse. These mediation efforts shall be conducted in accordance with a schedule and any procedures that he establishes in his discretion. The parties must file a status report with this Court on October 1, 2021 if the matter has not been resolved in the interim, and the referral may be extended as appropriate. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/30/21. (DMK)
|
July 30, 2021 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties must file a status report with this Court on October 1, 2021 if the matter has not been resolved in the interim, and the referral may be extended as appropriate. (jth)
|
July 28, 2021 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Telephone Conference Call held on 7/28/2021. (Court Reporter: Nancy Meyer) (jth)
|
July 21, 2021 |
MINUTE ORDER. A telephone conference is set for July 28, 2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. In a separate email, the Court's Deputy Clerk will provide counsel for the parties with the dial-in information needed to access the conference. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/21/21. (DMK)
|
July 19, 2021 |
Filing 174
Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Girard, Daniel)
|
June 21, 2021 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of #173 the parties' joint status report, it is ORDERED that the referral of this matter to mediation is extended through July 19, 2021 and that the parties shall file a further status report by that date. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/21/21. (DMK)
|
June 18, 2021 |
Filing 173
Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Girard, Daniel)
|
March 22, 2021 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of #172 the parties' joint status report, it is ORDERED that by June 19, 2021 the parties shall file a motion for preliminary approval or otherwise update the Court on the completion of their negotiations. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/22/21. (DMK)
|
March 19, 2021 |
Filing 172
STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Girard, Daniel)
|
January 28, 2021 |
Filing 171
NOTICE of Change of Address by Graham B. LippSmith (LippSmith, Graham)
|
January 25, 2021 |
Filing 170
NOTICE of Change of Address by Tina Wolfson (Wolfson, Tina)
|
January 6, 2021 |
Set/Reset Deadline: Mediation to conclude by 3/19/2021. (jth)
|
January 6, 2021 |
Filing 169
Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Girard, Daniel)
|
January 6, 2021 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' joint status report #169 , it is ORDERED that the referral of this matter to mediation is extended to March 19, 2021. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint report by that date advising the Court of the status of mediation if the case has not been resolved by then. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/6/21. (DMK)
|
October 22, 2020 |
Filing 168
Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Girard, Daniel)
|
October 22, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' joint status report #168 , it is ORDERED that the referral of this matter to mediation is extended to January 18, 2021. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint report by that date advising the Court of the status of mediation if the case has not been resolved by then. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/22/20. (DMK)
|
October 22, 2020 |
Set/Reset Deadline: Mediation to conclude by 1/18/2021. (jth)
|
July 23, 2020 |
Filing 167
Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, JOHNNY GONZALEZ, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Girard, Daniel)
|
July 23, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' joint status report #167 , it is ORDERED that the referral of this matter to mediation is extended to October 26, 2020. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint report by that date advising the Court of the status of mediation if the case has not been resolved by then. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/23/20. (DMK)
|
July 23, 2020 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Mediation to conclude by 10/26/2020. The parties shall file a Joint Report by that date advising the Court of the Status of mediation if the case has not already been resolved by that date. (jth)
|
June 3, 2020 |
Filing 166
ORDER ISSUED AS A MANDATE of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to #125 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by JOHNNY GONZALEZ, PAUL DALY, MICHAEL EBERT, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, KIMBERLY WINSOR, PETER ULIANO, JOHN DOE III, ZACHARY SHARPER, RYAN LOZAR, ROBERT SLATER, CHARLENE OLIVER, TONY BACHTELL, MONTY BOS, JANE DOE, MICHAEL HANAGAN, TIMOTHY SEBERT, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TERESA J. MCGARRY, MICHAEL JOHNSON, MARYANN HIBBS, TORALF PETERS, ROBERT CRAWFORD, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, MYRNA BROWN, DARREN STRICKLAND, JENNIFER GUM, GARDELL BRANCH, JANE DOE II, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, NANCY WHEATLEY, RYAN BONNER, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, ORIN GRIFFITH, MARIO SAMPEDRO, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, JOHN DOE II ; USCA Case Number 18-1182. (zrdj)
|
April 27, 2020 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Mediation to conclude by 7/27/2020. The parties shall file a Joint Report by that date advising the Court of the Status of mediation if the case has not already been resolved by that date. (jth)
|
April 27, 2020 |
Filing 165
Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, JOHNNY GONZALEZ, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Girard, Daniel)
|
April 27, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' joint status report #165 , it is ORDERED that the referral of this matter to mediation is extended to July 27, 2020. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint report by that date advising the Court of the status of mediation if the case has not been resolved by then. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/27/20. (DMK)
|
April 23, 2020 |
Filing 164
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Barbara L. Gibson on behalf of TERESA J. MCGARRY Substituting for attorney Denis F. Sheils (Gibson, Barbara)
|
April 16, 2020 |
Filing 163
TRANSCRIPT OF MOTIONS HEARING PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 3, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-54. Date of Issuance: April 16, 2020. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Scott Wallace; Telephone number: (703) 549-4626. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/7/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/17/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2020.(wz)
|
April 7, 2020 |
Filing 162
NOTICE of Change of Law Firm by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, JERAN BINNING, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MICAELA BROWN, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, NICHOLAS D. CAVIS, GARY S. COX, ROBERT CRAWFORD, ADAM DALE, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, ERIC W. EDGAR, WILLIAM FLEISHELL III, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, DAVID A. GOLDEN, LILIANA GOLDEN, RONNIE GOLDEN, JOHNNY GONZALEZ, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, VICTOR W. HOBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, IN RE: U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION, MICHAEL JOHNSON, CHAD KAPPERS, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, EDWARD W. KRIPPENDORF, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, JOHN ORAVIS, LAHOMA SUE PARTON, HECTOR PEREZ, TORALF PETERS, WILLIAM PRESTON, JOHN RABER, EDWARD L. ROBBELOTH, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ADEBIYI K. SHAMONDA, ADEDEJI SHAMONDA, ZACHARY SHARPER, DERRICK SIMS, ROBERT SLATER, HOWARD SMITH, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NICOLE WAID, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR, MARY C. WOO (Mason, Gary)
|
March 24, 2020 |
Filing 161
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #70 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PERSPECTA RISK DECISION INC. (Mendro, Jason)
|
March 3, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #158 motion for leave to file supplement to #148 Perspecta's supplemental brief. Defendant Perspecta may only supplement its supplemental brief if there is a specific argument, case citation, or issue that was omitted from its original filing entirely due to lack of space; it may not repeat anything set forth in the initial supplement or respond to the plaintiffs' filing. Any further supplement must be filed by March 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/3/20. (DMK)
|
February 21, 2020 |
Filing 160
REPLY to opposition to motion re #142 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (MacWilliams, Philip)
|
February 19, 2020 |
Filing 159
NOTICE of Proposed Order by PERSPECTA RISK DECISION INC re #158 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Mendro, Jason)
|
February 18, 2020 |
Filing 158
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by PERSPECTA RISK DECISION INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mendro, Jason)
|
February 12, 2020 |
Filing 157
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Michelle Kopplin on behalf of KATHERINE ARCHULETA, BETH F. COBERT, DONNA SEYMOUR, UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT (Kopplin, Rebecca)
|
February 7, 2020 |
Filing 156
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO #148 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, JOHNNY GONZALEZ, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Elias, Jordan)
|
February 7, 2020 |
Filing 155
RESPONSE re #142 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by LAHOMA SUE PARTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Lewis, Jason)
|
February 4, 2020 |
Filing 154
ANSWER to #63 Amended Complaint,,, by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT.(Gardner, Joshua)
|
January 28, 2020 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Mediation to conclude by 4/27/2020. The parties shall file a Joint Report by that date advising the Court of the Status of mediation if the case has not already been resolved by that date. (jth)
|
January 27, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #152 Defendant KeyPoint Government Solutions, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Substitute Party Name. The Clerk of the Court is directed to change the name of defendant KeyPoint Government Solutions, Inc. to "Perspecta Risk Decision Inc." in this case and all cases consolidated into the case. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/27/20. (DMK)
|
January 27, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' joint status report #153 , it is ORDERED that this matter is referred to private mediation to end by April 27, 2020. The parties shall file a joint report by that date advising the Court of the status of mediation if the case has not already been resolved by that date. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/27/20. (DMK)
|
January 24, 2020 |
Filing 153
Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, JOHNNY GONZALEZ, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Girard, Daniel)
|
January 24, 2020 |
Filing 152
Unopposed MOTION To Substitute Party Name re #146 Notice (Other) by KEYPOINT GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mendro, Jason)
|
January 22, 2020 |
Filing 151
FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 502(D) ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/22/20. (DMK)
|
January 22, 2020 |
Filing 150
PROTECTIVE ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/22/20. (DMK)
|
January 22, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #143 Joint Motion for the Entry of a Uniform Protective Order and Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) Order. The parties' proposed Protective Order will be entered on the docket as submitted. Their proposed Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Order will be entered with revisions to paragraphs 5 and 6, which will require the parties to have a teleconference with the Court about any disputed privilege assertion before filing a motion. No written motion subject to the order may be filed without a prior conference with the Court and leave of Court. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/22/20. (DMK)
|
January 21, 2020 |
NOTICE OF ERROR re #143 Motion for Protective Order; emailed to andrew.e.carmichael@usdoj.gov, cc'd 115 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. FYI - Signature on pleading must match login/password (zjf, )
|
January 21, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER. This order relates to Parton v. United States of America, 18-cv-1416. It is ORDERED that #133 defendant Office of Personnel Management's motion to stay or motion for extension of time to file response is DENIED as moot in light of the schedule set by the Court on December 3, 2019 and defendant's motion to dismiss #142 . Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/21/20. (DMK)
|
January 17, 2020 |
Filing 149
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Using Pseudonyms by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, JOHNNY GONZALEZ, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, KIMBERLY WINSOR (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Jane Doe, #3 Declaration of Jane Doe II, #4 Declaration of John Doe II, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Girard, Daniel)
|
January 17, 2020 |
Filing 148
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #70 MOTION to Dismiss filed by KEYPOINT GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Mendro, Jason)
|
January 17, 2020 |
Filing 147
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests Amended by KEYPOINT GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS (Mendro, Jason)
|
January 17, 2020 |
Filing 146
NOTICE of Name Change by KEYPOINT GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS (Mendro, Jason)
|
January 17, 2020 |
Filing 145
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Max Christiansen on behalf of KEYPOINT GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS (Christiansen, Jeremy)
|
January 17, 2020 |
Filing 144
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Rozen on behalf of KEYPOINT GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS (Rozen, Matthew)
|
January 17, 2020 |
Filing 143
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT (Carmichael, Andrew)
|
January 17, 2020 |
Filing 142
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(MacWilliams, Philip)
|
December 12, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadline: Joint Status Report due by 1/24/2020. (jth)
|
December 9, 2019 |
Filing 141
ORDER for the parties to meet and confer and submit an updated status report by January 24, 2020 providing specific information as set forth in the order. See order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/9/19. (DMK)
|
December 3, 2019 |
NOTICE OF ERROR re #140 Status Report; emailed to ppatterson@cooperkirk.com, cc'd 113 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. FYI DO NOT REFILE- Attorney signature must match login/password. (zeg, )
|
December 3, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER. This order relates to all cases and to Parton, No. 1:18-cv-409 (D.N.M.). As discussed at the status conference held on this date, it is ORDERED that defendant OPM's answer to the complaint is due February 4, 2020. It is FURTHER ORDERED that defendant KeyPoint Government Solutions' supplement to its motion to dismiss is due January 17, 2020 and plaintiffs' response is due February 7, 2020. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to dismiss the Parton tag-along matter, Parton v. United States, No. 1:18-cv-409 (D.N.M.), is due January 17, 2020; Parton's response is due February 7, 2020; and any reply is due February 21, 2020. It is FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' submission regarding those plaintiffs proceeding under pseudonyms is due January 17, 2020; the response is due February 7, 2020; and any reply is due February 21, 2020. The Court took the remaining scheduling issues under advisement. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/3/19. (DMK)
|
December 3, 2019 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Status Conference held on 12/3/2019. Scheduling Order(s) to be Issued. (Court Reporter: Scott Wallace) (jth)
|
December 3, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant OPM's answer to the complaint is due by 2/4/2020. Defendant KeyPoint Government Solutions' supplement to its Motion to dismiss is due by 1/17/2020; Plaintiffs' Response is due by 2/7/2020;. The motion to dismiss the Parton tag-along matter, Parton v. United States, No. 1:18-cv-409 (D.N.M.), is due by 1/17/2020; Parton's Response is due by 2/7/2020; any Reply is due by 2/21/2020. Plaintiffs' submission regarding those plaintiffs proceeding under pseudonyms is due by 1/17/2020; Response is due by 2/7/2020; any reply is due by 2/21/2020. (jth)
|
November 26, 2019 |
Filing 140
Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, JOHNNY GONZALEZ, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Patterson, Peter)
|
November 26, 2019 |
Filing 139
NOTICE by EUGENE GAMBARDELLA, STEPHEN HOWELL, NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION, JOHN ORTINO (Shah, Paras)
|
November 26, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER. This order relates to all cases. Pursuant to the June 21, 2019 the ruling of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit, plaintiffs National Treasury Employees Union, Eugene Gambardella, Stephen Howell, and Jonathon Ortino are dismissed from this consolidated action for failure to state a claim. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/26/19. (DMK)
|
November 25, 2019 |
Filing 138
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Edward Gardner on behalf of UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT (Gardner, Joshua)
|
November 14, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a proposed schedule for further proceedings by November 26, 2019. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a status conference is set for December 3, 2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/14/19. (DMK)
|
November 14, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: The parties shall meet and confer and file a proposed schedule for further proceedings by 11/26/2019. A Status Conference is set for 12/3/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth)
|
October 29, 2019 |
Filing 137
MANDATE of USCA as to #118 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION, JOHN ORTINO, STEPHEN HOWELL, EUGENE GAMBARDELLA, #122 Amended Notice of Appeal,, filed by JOHNNY GONZALEZ, PAUL DALY, MICHAEL EBERT, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, KIMBERLY WINSOR, PETER ULIANO, JOHN DOE III, ZACHARY SHARPER, RYAN LOZAR, ROBERT SLATER, CHARLENE OLIVER, TONY BACHTELL, MONTY BOS, JANE DOE, MICHAEL HANAGAN, TIMOTHY SEBERT, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TERESA J. MCGARRY, MARYANN HIBBS, TORALF PETERS, ROBERT CRAWFORD, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, MYRNA BROWN, DARREN STRICKLAND, JENNIFER GUM, GARDELL BRANCH, JANE DOE II, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, NANCY WHEATLEY, RYAN BONNER, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, ORIN GRIFFITH, MARIO SAMPEDRO, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, JOHN DOE II ; USCA Case Number 17-5217 Consolidated with 17-5232. (Attachments: #1 USCA Judgment)(zrdj)
|
October 1, 2018 |
Filing 136
NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, JOHNNY GONZALEZ, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR (Girard, Daniel)
|
July 19, 2018 |
Filing 135
REPLY to opposition to motion re #133 MOTION to Stay Or In the Alternative Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. (Davis, Elliott)
|
July 19, 2018 |
Filing 134
RESPONSE re #133 MOTION to Stay Or In the Alternative Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by LAHOMA SUE PARTON. (Lewis, Jason)
|
July 6, 2018 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Opposition to the #133 Motion to Stay is due by 7/19/2018. (jth)
|
July 6, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of defendants' motion to stay or in the alternative, for an extension of time to respond to the complaint in the Parton matter #133 , it is ORDERED that the deadline for defendants to respond to the complaint is held in abeyance pending the Court's ruling on defendants' motion. The Court notes that pursuant to LCvR 7(b), plaintiff's opposition to the motion is due by July 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/6/18. (DMK)
|
July 5, 2018 |
Filing 133
MOTION to Stay Or In the Alternative Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacWilliams, Philip). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply on 7/6/2018 (ztd).
|
June 24, 2018 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: In light of the transfer of Parton v. United States of America to this Court and pursuant to the Initial Practice and Procedure Order Dkt. #8 entered by this Court in 15-mc-1394, In Re: U.S. Office of Personnel Management Data Security Breach Litigation, Plaintiff must file by motion any objection to or request for relief from the Initial Practice and Procedure Order by 7/2/2018. Plaintiff shall further, file notice with the Court by 7/2/2018 stating whether plaintiff agrees to transfer the case for all purposes, waiving any right to remand under Lexecon Inc. v. Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach, 523 U.S. 26 (1998), and 28 U.S.C.1407(a). (jth)
|
June 22, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER. This order relates to Parton v. United States of America, 18-cv-1416. In light of the transfer of Parton v. United States of America to this Court and pursuant to the Initial Practice and Procedure Order #8 entered by this Court in 15-mc-1394, In Re: U.S. Office of Personnel Management Data Security Breach Litigation, it is ORDERED that plaintiffs must file by motion any objection to or request for relief from the Initial Practice and Procedure Order by July 2, 2018. It is FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file notice with the Court by July 2, 2018 stating whether plaintiffs agree to transfer the case for all purposes, waiving any right to remand under Lexecon Inc. v. Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach, 523 U.S. 26 (1998), and 28 U.S.C.1407(a). The Court notes that an appeal of its ruling dismissing the consolidated case is pending before the U.S. Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia, In re: U.S. Office of Personnel Management Data Security Breach Litigation, 17-5235. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/22/18. (DMK)
|
June 21, 2018 |
Filing 132
NOTICE of Change of Firm Address by MICHAEL HANAGAN (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LippSmith, Graham)
|
June 12, 2018 |
Filing 131
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-6) dated 6/12/18 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Amy Berman Jackson for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2664) (ztnr)
|
May 30, 2018 |
Filing 130
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by KATHERINE ARCHULETA, JOHN BERRY, BETH F. COBERT, DOES, ELAINE D. KAPLAN, DONNA SEYMOUR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. Case related to Case No. Parton v. US (1:18cv409 DNM). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Tag Along)(Carmichael, Andrew)
|
December 18, 2017 |
Filing 129
ORDER of USCA Federal Circuit as to #125 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by JOHNNY GONZALEZ, PAUL DALY, MICHAEL EBERT, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, KIMBERLY WINSOR, PETER ULIANO, JOHN DOE III, ZACHARY SHARPER, RYAN LOZAR, JOHN DOE, ROBERT SLATER, CHARLENE OLIVER, TONY BACHTELL, MONTY BOS, JANE DOE, MICHAEL HANAGAN, TIMOTHY SEBERT, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TERESA J. MCGARRY, MICHAEL JOHNSON, MARYANN HIBBS, TORALF PETERS, ROBERT CRAWFORD, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, MYRNA BROWN, DARREN STRICKLAND, JENNIFER GUM, GARDELL BRANCH, JANE DOE II, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, NANCY WHEATLEY, RYAN BONNER, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, ORIN GRIFFITH, MARIO SAMPEDRO, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, JOHN DOE II ; USCA Federal Circuit Case Number 18-1182-CB. (zrdj)
|
November 21, 2017 |
Filing 128
NOTICE of Transcript Purchase Order Form re #125 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit (zrdj)
|
November 15, 2017 |
USCA Federal Circuit Case Number 18-1182-CB for #125 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by JOHNNY GONZALEZ, PAUL DALY, MICHAEL EBERT, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, KIMBERLY WINSOR, PETER ULIANO, JOHN DOE III, ZACHARY SHARPER, RYAN LOZAR, JOHN DOE, ROBERT SLATER, CHARLENE OLIVER, TONY BACHTELL, MONTY BOS, JANE DOE, MICHAEL HANAGAN, TIMOTHY SEBERT, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TERESA J. MCGARRY, MICHAEL JOHNSON, MARYANN HIBBS, TORALF PETERS, ROBERT CRAWFORD, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, MYRNA BROWN, DARREN STRICKLAND, JENNIFER GUM, GARDELL BRANCH, JANE DOE II, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, NANCY WHEATLEY, RYAN BONNER, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, ORIN GRIFFITH, MARIO SAMPEDRO, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, JOHN DOE II. (zrdj)
|
November 9, 2017 |
Filing 127
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to Federal Circuit. The appeal fee was paid this date re #125 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit. (znmw)
|
November 9, 2017 |
Filing 126
ENTERED IN ERROR.....Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #125 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit. (znmw) Modified on 11/9/2017 (znmw).
|
November 9, 2017 |
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry #126 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA was entered in error and will be retransmitted to the Federal Circuit. (znmw)
|
November 8, 2017 |
Filing 125
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #116 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,, #117 Memorandum & Opinion by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, JOHNNY GONZALEZ, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, MICHAEL JOHNSON, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-5197882. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Girard, Daniel)
|
November 7, 2017 |
Filing 124
NOTICE of Change of Address by Tina Wolfson (Wolfson, Tina)
|
October 12, 2017 |
Filing 123
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #122 Amended Notice of Appeal; USCA Case Number: Unknown. (znmw)
|
October 12, 2017 |
USCA Case Number 17-5232 for #122 Amended Notice of Appeal,, filed by JOHNNY GONZALEZ, PAUL DALY, MICHAEL EBERT, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, KIMBERLY WINSOR, PETER ULIANO, JOHN DOE III, ZACHARY SHARPER, RYAN LOZAR, JOHN DOE, ROBERT SLATER, CHARLENE OLIVER, TONY BACHTELL, MONTY BOS, JANE DOE, MICHAEL HANAGAN, TIMOTHY SEBERT, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TERESA J. MCGARRY, MARYANN HIBBS, TORALF PETERS, ROBERT CRAWFORD, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, MYRNA BROWN, DARREN STRICKLAND, JENNIFER GUM, GARDELL BRANCH, JANE DOE II, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, NANCY WHEATLEY, RYAN BONNER, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, ORIN GRIFFITH, MARIO SAMPEDRO, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, JOHN DOE II, #118 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION, STEPHEN HOWELL, JOHN ORTINO, EUGENE GAMBARDELLA. (zrdj)
|
October 11, 2017 |
Filing 122
Amended NOTICE OF APPEAL re appeal #120 by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, JOHNNY GONZALEZ, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Girard, Daniel)
|
October 6, 2017 |
Filing 121
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #120 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (znmw)
|
October 5, 2017 |
Filing 120
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #116 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,, #117 Memorandum & Opinion by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, JOHNNY GONZALEZ, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, MICHAEL JOHNSON, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-5147740. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Girard, Daniel)
|
September 27, 2017 |
USCA Case Number 17-5217 for #118 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION, JOHN ORTINO, STEPHEN HOWELL, EUGENE GAMBARDELLA. (zrdj)
|
September 20, 2017 |
Filing 119
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #118 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (znmw)
|
September 19, 2017 |
Filing 118
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #116 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,, #117 Memorandum & Opinion by EUGENE GAMBARDELLA, STEPHEN HOWELL, NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION, JOHN ORTINO. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-5122668. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Shah, Paras)
|
September 19, 2017 |
Filing 117
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/19/17. (DMK)
|
September 19, 2017 |
Filing 116
ORDER granting #70 Defendant KeyPoint Government Solutions, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint; granting #72 Federal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint; and granting #81 Federal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the NTEU Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/19/17. (DMK)
|
August 15, 2017 |
Filing 115
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re #82 Memorandum in Opposition,,, filed by JOHNNY GONZALEZ, PAUL DALY, MICHAEL EBERT, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, KIMBERLY WINSOR, PETER ULIANO, JOHN DOE III, ZACHARY SHARPER, RYAN LOZAR, JOHN DOE, ROBERT SLATER, CHARLENE OLIVER, TONY BACHTELL, MONTY BOS, JANE DOE, MICHAEL HANAGAN, TIMOTHY SEBERT, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TERESA J. MCGARRY, MICHAEL JOHNSON, MARYANN HIBBS, TORALF PETERS, ROBERT CRAWFORD, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, MYRNA BROWN, DARREN STRICKLAND, JENNIFER GUM, GARDELL BRANCH, JANE DOE II, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, NANCY WHEATLEY, RYAN BONNER, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, ORIN GRIFFITH, MARIO SAMPEDRO, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, JOHN DOE II by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, JOHNNY GONZALEZ, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, MICHAEL JOHNSON, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Girard, Daniel) Modified event title on 8/16/2017 (znmw).
|
August 15, 2017 |
Filing 114
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re #70 MOTION to Dismiss filed by KEYPOINT GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS by KEYPOINT GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS. (Mendro, Jason) Modified event title on 8/16/2017 (znmw).
|
August 15, 2017 |
Filing 113
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re #72 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by KATHERINE ARCHULETA, #81 MOTION to Dismiss NTEU Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by BETH F. COBERT by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. (Carmichael, Andrew) Modified event title on 8/16/2017 (znmw).
|
August 4, 2017 |
Filing 112
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #81 MOTION to Dismiss NTEU Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by EUGENE GAMBARDELLA, STEPHEN HOWELL, NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION, JOHN ORTINO. (Shah, Paras)
|
August 1, 2017 |
Filing 111
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, JOHNNY GONZALEZ, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, MICHAEL JOHNSON, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Girard, Daniel)
|
August 1, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER. The Court has the motions to dismiss in this multidistrict litigation under advisement and is aware of the decision issued by the D.C. Circuit Court of Appeals in Attias v. CareFirst, Inc., case no. 16-7108. Given this, counsel need not file a notice of additional authority, but either side may address the application of the opinion to the issues pending before this Court in a submission no longer that five pages filed by August 15, 2017. Any submissions should not repeat arguments or authorities set forth previously. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/1/17. (DMK)
|
February 9, 2017 |
Filing 110
RESPONSE re #109 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by EUGENE GAMBARDELLA, STEPHEN HOWELL, NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION, JOHN ORTINO. (Shah, Paras)
|
February 8, 2017 |
Filing 109
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Beck v. McDonald)(Borson, Joseph)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing 108
RESPONSE re #106 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by KEYPOINT GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS. (Mendro, Jason)
|
January 26, 2017 |
Filing 107
RESPONSE re #106 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. (Carmichael, Andrew)
|
January 23, 2017 |
Filing 106
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by EUGENE GAMBARDELLA, STEPHEN HOWELL, NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION, JOHN ORTINO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shah, Paras)
|
December 15, 2016 |
Filing 105
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. Attorney Matthew A. Josephson terminated. (Josephson, Matthew)
|
November 16, 2016 |
Filing 104
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on November 10, 2016; Page Numbers: 1-84. Date of Issuance: November 14, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the
|
November 10, 2016 |
Minute Entry for Proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Motions Hearing held on 11/10/2016 re: KEYPOINT GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS #70 MOTION to Dismiss, and The Government's #72 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint, and #81 MOTION to Dismiss NTEU Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. All Motions #70 , #72 , and #81 were Heard and Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (jth)
|
November 9, 2016 |
Filing 103
RESPONSE re #102 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Citations filed by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, JOHNNY GONZALEZ, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, MICHAEL JOHNSON, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Girard, Daniel)
|
November 8, 2016 |
Filing 102
NOTICE of Supplemental Citations by KEYPOINT GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS (Mendro, Jason)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 101
NOTICE of Appearance by John Yanchunis on behalf of HECTOR PEREZ (Yanchunis, John)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 100
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick A. Barthle, II on behalf of HECTOR PEREZ (Barthle, Patrick)
|
November 3, 2016 |
Filing 99
NOTICE OF RECENT DECISION by KATHERINE ARCHULETA, JOHN BERRY, BETH F. COBERT, IN RE: U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION, ELAINE D. KAPLAN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Welborn v. IRS (D.D.C. Nov. 2, 2016))(Borson, Joseph)
|
November 2, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER. This Order relates to all cases. It is ORDERED that all parties, including plaintiffs in the NTEU case, may appear at the November 10, 2016 hearing to argue other issues raised in the motions to dismiss that were not argued at the October 27, 2016 hearing. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/2/16. (DMK)
|
October 31, 2016 |
Filing 98
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on October 27, 2016; Page Numbers: 1-112. Date of Issuance:October 31, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter r eferenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/21/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/29/2017.(Dickman, Janice)
|
October 28, 2016 |
Filing 97
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. Attorney Kieran Gavin Gostin terminated. (Josephson, Matthew)
|
October 27, 2016 |
Filing 96
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A. Patterson on behalf of RYAN BONNER (Patterson, Peter)
|
October 27, 2016 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Motions Hearing begun and held on 10/27/2016 re: #70 Motion to Dismiss filed by KEYPOINT GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS; #72 Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by KATHERINE ARCHULETA, #81 Motion to Dismiss NTEU Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by BETH F. COBERT. Motions Hearing continued to 11/10/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (jth)
|
October 17, 2016 |
Filing 95
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, JOHNNY GONZALEZ, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, MICHAEL JOHNSON, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Girard, Daniel)
|
October 13, 2016 |
Filing 94
NOTICE by EUGENE GAMBARDELLA, STEPHEN HOWELL, NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION, JOHN ORTINO (Shah, Paras)
|
October 5, 2016 |
Filing 93
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by EUGENE GAMBARDELLA, STEPHEN HOWELL, NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION, JOHN ORTINO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shah, Paras)
|
September 16, 2016 |
Filing 92
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by EUGENE GAMBARDELLA, STEPHEN HOWELL, NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION, JOHN ORTINO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shah, Paras)
|
August 29, 2016 |
Filing 91
REPLY to opposition to motion re #81 MOTION to Dismiss NTEU Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. (Carmichael, Andrew)
|
August 23, 2016 |
Filing 90
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opinion in Attias v. CareFirst)(Carmichael, Andrew)
|
August 8, 2016 |
Filing 89
NOTICE of Election by DAVID A. GOLDEN, LILIANA GOLDEN, RONNIE GOLDEN re Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines, Order,,, (Artrip, Eric)
|
August 8, 2016 |
Filing 88
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Artrip on behalf of DAVID A. GOLDEN, LILIANA GOLDEN, RONNIE GOLDEN (Artrip, Eric)
|
August 3, 2016 |
Filing 87
REPLY to opposition to motion re #72 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. (Josephson, Matthew)
|
August 3, 2016 |
Filing 86
REPLY to opposition to motion re #70 MOTION to Dismiss filed by KEYPOINT GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Warin, Francis)
|
August 2, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER. This order relates to ALL CASES. It is ORDERED that there will be hearing on defendant's motion to dismiss the NTEU complaint #81 on October 27, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. when the motions related to the consolidated amended complaint are already scheduled to be heard. Counsel are advised that this hearing will address the standing and jurisdictional issues raised in Section I of OPM's memorandum [72-1] at 16-37, and Section I of KeyPoint's memorandum #70 at 6-17, as well as Section I of defendant's memorandum in support of the motion to dismiss the NTEU complaint [81-1] at 6-14. The Court will also hear argument on Section II of OPM's argument concerning the failure to plead actual damages under the Privacy Act [72-1] at 37-42, and Section II of KeyPoint's argument concerning government contractor immunity #70 at 17-22. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/2/16.(DMK)
|
August 1, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER. This order relates to Golden v. OPM, 16-cv-1253. The Court has twice ordered plaintiffs to notify the Court whether they agree to transfer the case to this Court for all purposes and to waive their right to remand to the N.D. of Alabama upon completion of the pretrial proceedings. See Minute Orders of June 21, 2016 and July 14, 2016. Both times, plaintiffs have failed to respond. Therefore, it is ORDERED that if plaintiffs in Golden v. OPM, 16-cv-1253 object to the transfer of the the case to this district for all purposes, and wish to assert their right to remand under Lexecon Inc. v. Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach, 523 U.S. 26 (1998), and 28 U.S.C.1407(a), they must notify the Court by August 8, 2016. Failure to note an objection by that date may be deemed to be a waiver of plaintiffs' right to remand. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/1/16.(DMK)
|
August 1, 2016 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: This relates to Golden v. OPM, case No. 16-cv-1253. Plaintiffs shall file notice by 8/8/2016 stating whether they agree to transfer the case for all purposes, waiving any right to remand under Lexecon Inc. v. Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach, 523 U.S. 26 (1998), and 28 U.S.C.1407(a). (jth)
|
July 27, 2016 |
Filing 85
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by KEYPOINT GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mendro, Jason)
|
July 27, 2016 |
Filing 84
Memorandum in opposition to re #81 MOTION to Dismiss NTEU Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by EUGENE GAMBARDELLA, STEPHEN HOWELL, NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION, JOHN ORTINO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shah, Paras)
|
July 27, 2016 |
Filing 83
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Josephson, Matthew)
|
July 27, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #83 defendant OPM's unopposed motion for leave to file excess pages. This order relates to all cases except NTEU v. Cobert, 15-cv-1808-ABJ (D.D.C.). It is ORDERED that OPM is permitted to file a reply not to exceed 35 pages in support of its motion to dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/27/16. (DMK)
|
July 27, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #85 KeyPoint's unopposed motion for leave to file excess pages. This order relates to all cases except NTEU v. Cobert, 15-cv-1808-ABJ (D.D.C.). It is ORDERED that KeyPoint is permitted to file a reply not to exceed 35 pages in support of its motion to dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the reply briefs of both defendants should not repeat arguments set forth in their initial briefs. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/27/16. (DMK)
|
July 14, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER. This order relates to Golden v. OPM, 16-cv-1253. On June 21, 2016, the Court ordered plaintiffs in that case to file by July 5, 2016 any objection or request for relief from the Initial Practice and Procedure Order and notice of their position on waiver of remand. Receiving no filing from plaintiffs by the deadline, the Court notes that plaintiffs are bound by the Initial Practice and Procedure Order #8 . Further, it is ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file notice by July 25, 2016 stating whether they agree to transfer the case for all purposes, waiving any right to remand under Lexecon Inc. v. Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach, 523 U.S. 26 (1998), and 28 U.S.C.1407(a). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/14/16. (DMK)
|
July 14, 2016 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: This relates to Golden v. OPM, case No. 16-cv-1253. Plaintiffs shall file notice by 7/25/2016 stating whether they agree to transfer the case for all purposes, waiving any right to remand under Lexecon Inc. v. Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach, 523 U.S. 26 (1998), and 28 U.S.C.1407(a). (jth)
|
June 30, 2016 |
Filing 82
Memorandum in opposition to re #70 MOTION to Dismiss , #72 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, JOHNNY GONZALEZ, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, MICHAEL JOHNSON, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Girard, Daniel)
|
June 27, 2016 |
Filing 81
MOTION to Dismiss NTEU Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by BETH F. COBERT (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Josephson, Matthew)
|
June 22, 2016 |
Filing 80
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Evan Borson on behalf of KATHERINE ARCHULETA, BETH F. COBERT, DONNA SEYMOUR, UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT (Borson, Joseph)
|
June 22, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #79 unopposed motion for leave to file. This order relates to all cases except NTEU v. Cobert, 15-cv-1808-ABJ (D.D.C.). It is ORDERED that plaintiffs are permitted to file a consolidated opposition to defendants' motions to dismiss the consolidated amended complaint, which shall not exceed 110 pages. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/22/16. (DMK)
|
June 21, 2016 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' in 16-cv-1253, Golden v. OPM, must file by motion any objection to or request for relief from the Initial Practice and Procedure Order by 7/5/2016. Plaintiffs shall also file notice with the Court by 7/5/2016 stating whether they agree to transfer the case for all purposes, waiving any right to remand under Lexecon Inc. v. Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach, 523 U.S. 26 (1998), and 28 U.S.C.1407(a). (jth)
|
June 21, 2016 |
Filing 79
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum in Support of Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, ROBERT CRAWFORD, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, JOHNNY GONZALEZ, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, MICHAEL JOHNSON, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, CHARLENE OLIVER, TORALF PETERS, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ZACHARY SHARPER, ROBERT SLATER, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Girard, Daniel)
|
June 21, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER. This order relates to Golden v. U.S. Office of Personnel Management, 16-cv-1253. In light of the transfer of Golden v. U.S. Office of Personnel Management to this Court and pursuant to the Initial Practice and Procedure Order #8 entered by this Court in 15-mc-1394, In Re: U.S. Office of Personnel Management Data Security Breach Litigation, it is ORDERED that plaintiffs must file by motion any objection to or request for relief from the Initial Practice and Procedure Order by July 5, 2016. It is further ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file notice with the Court by July 5, 2016 stating whether plaintiffs agree to transfer the case for all purposes, waiving any right to remand under Lexecon Inc. v. Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach, 523 U.S. 26 (1998), and 28 U.S.C.1407(a). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/21/16. (DMK)
|
June 17, 2016 |
Filing 78
COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) dated 6/17/16 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Amy Berman Jackson for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2664) (ztnr)
|
June 17, 2016 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: The Government's anticipated Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint in NTEU v. Colbert, 15-cv-1808 (ABJ) is due 6/27/2016; Plaintiff's Opposition is due 7/27/2016; the Government's Reply is due 8/29/2016. Plaintiffs' Oppositions to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint are due by 6/30/2016; Defendants' Replies are due by 8/3/2016. (jth)
|
June 16, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #77 Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule. This order relates to all cases. It is ORDERED that the government's anticipated motion to dismiss the amended complaint in National Treasury Employees Union v. Colbert, 15-cv-1808-ABJ, is due June 27, 2016; plaintiff's opposition is due July 27, 2016; and the government's reply is due August 29, 2016. It is further ORDERED that plaintiffs' oppositions to defendants' motions to dismiss the consolidated amended complaint are due June 30, 2016 and defendants' replies are due August 3, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/16/16. (DMK)
|
June 15, 2016 |
Filing 77
Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by KATHERINE ARCHULETA, BETH F. COBERT, DONNA SEYMOUR, UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Josephson, Matthew)
|
June 9, 2016 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Hearing on OPM's Motion to Dismiss 72 and KeyPoint's Motion to Dismiss 70 is scheduled for 10/27/2016 at 10:00 AM, and the hearing will continue on 11/10/2016 at 10:00 AM. (jth)
|
June 7, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER. This order relates to all cases except NTEU v. Cobert, 15-cv-1808-ABJ (D.D.C.). In light of the notice of proposed hearing dates #74 , a hearing on OPM's motion to dismiss #72 and KeyPoint's motion to dismiss #70 is scheduled for October 27, 2016 at 10:00 a.m., and the hearing will continue on November 10, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/7/16. (DMK)
|
June 7, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER. This order relates to NTEU v. Cobert, 15-cv-1808-ABJ (D.D.C.), denying as moot #73 Federal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the NTEU Plaintiffs' Complaint. In light of the amended complaint filed by the NTEU plaintiffs #75 , federal defendant's motion to dismiss is denied as moot. Federal defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by June 21, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/7/16. (DMK)
|
June 3, 2016 |
Filing 76
NOTICE Regarding Filing of Amended Complaint by NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION (Shah, Paras)
|
June 3, 2016 |
Filing 75
AMENDED COMPLAINT against BETH F. COBERT filed by NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION.(Shah, Paras)
|
May 27, 2016 |
Filing 74
NOTICE of Proposed Hearing Dates by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, TRAVIS ARNOLD, TONY BACHTELL, JERAN BINNING, RYAN BONNER, MONTY BOS, GARDELL BRANCH, MICAELA BROWN, MYRNA BROWN, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, NICHOLAS D. CAVIS, GARY S. COX, ROBERT CRAWFORD, ADAM DALE, PAUL DALY, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE II, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, MICHAEL EBERT, ERIC W. EDGAR, WILLIAM FLEISHELL III, KELLY FLYNN, ALIA FULI, JOHNNY GONZALEZ, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, ORIN GRIFFITH, JENNIFER GUM, MICHAEL HANAGAN, MARYANN HIBBS, VICTOR W. HOBBS, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, STEPHEN HOWELL, IN RE: U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION, MICHAEL JOHNSON, CHAD KAPPERS, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, EDWARD W. KRIPPENDORF, RYAN LOZAR, TERESA J. MCGARRY, NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION, CHARLENE OLIVER, JOHN ORAVIS, JOHN ORTINO, HECTOR PEREZ, TORALF PETERS, WILLIAM PRESTON, JOHN RABER, EDWARD L. ROBBELOTH, MARIO SAMPEDRO, TIMOTHY SEBERT, ADEBIYI K. SHAMONDA, ADEDEJI SHAMONDA, ZACHARY SHARPER, DERRICK SIMS, ROBERT SLATER, HOWARD SMITH, DARREN STRICKLAND, PETER ULIANO, NICOLE WAID, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR, MARY C. WOO re Order,, Order, Set Deadlines (Mason, Gary)
|
May 18, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER. This order relates to all cases. The notice required by the minute order issued on May 17, 2016 shall be filed by May 27, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 05/18/2016. (zjth)
|
May 17, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER. This order relates to all cases. It is ORDERED that liaison counsel shall confer with interim lead class counsel, other plaintiffs' counsel, and defense counsel and file a notice listing all of the dates from the following list on which the parties would be available for a hearing on OPM's motion to dismiss and/or Keypoint's motion to dismiss the consolidated amended complaint: August 9, 10, 11, 30, 31; September 1; October 26, 27, 28; and November 4, 8, 9, and 10. The Court will schedule the hearing on OPM's motion to dismiss the NTEU complaint separately. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/17/16. (DMK)
|
May 13, 2016 |
Filing 73
MOTION to Dismiss the NTEU Complaint by KATHERINE ARCHULETA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Josephson, Matthew)
|
May 13, 2016 |
Filing 72
MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint by KATHERINE ARCHULETA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - OPM Announcement (June 5, 2015), #3 Exhibit 2 - OPM Announcement (July 9, 2015), #4 Exhibit 3 - Chart of Plaintiff's Alleged Damages)(Josephson, Matthew)
|
May 13, 2016 |
Filing 71
Corporate Disclosure Statement by KEYPOINT GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS. (Warin, Francis)
|
May 13, 2016 |
Filing 70
MOTION to Dismiss by KEYPOINT GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Warin, Francis)
|
May 4, 2016 |
Filing 69
NOTICE of Change of Address by Gary Edward Mason (Mason, Gary)
|
May 4, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #68 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. This order relates to all cases except NTEU v. Cobert, 15-cv-1808-ABJ (D.D.C.). The federal defendant is granted leave to file a memorandum of no more than 70 pages in support of its motion to dismiss the three substantive counts against it and that portion of Count 4 that applies to it. The Court notes that any footnotes in the memorandum, like the rest of the memorandum, must be in 12 point font. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/4/16. (DMK)
|
May 3, 2016 |
Filing 68
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint by KATHERINE ARCHULETA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Josephson, Matthew)
|
April 26, 2016 |
Filing 67
NOTICE of Appearance by Kieran Gavin Gostin on behalf of KATHERINE ARCHULETA, JOHN BERRY, BETH F. COBERT, ELAINE D. KAPLAN, DONNA SEYMOUR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT (Gostin, Kieran)
|
April 21, 2016 |
Filing 66
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven William Teppler on behalf of JOHN ORAVIS, HECTOR PEREZ (Teppler, Steven)
|
April 11, 2016 |
NOTICE OF ERROR re #65 Notice of Change of Address; emailed to rhg@girardgibbs.com, cc'd 94 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. You must file a notice of apperance (jf, )
|
April 8, 2016 |
Filing 65
NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard Henry Gordin (Gordin, Richard)
|
March 24, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER. This order relates to Adedeji Shamonda v. Department of Homeland Security, No. 16-0178, and Adebiyi Shamonda v. Department of Homeland Security, No. 16-0392. In light of waiver of the right to remand under 28 U.S.C. 1407 and Lexecon Inc. v. Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach, 523 U.S. 26 (1998), filed by plaintiffs [Dkt. # 61 and #64], the consolidated amended complaint [Dkt. # 63] will serve as the superseding, operative complaint in the following additional cases: Adedeji Shamonda v. Department of Homeland Security, No. 16-0178, and Adebiyi Shamonda v. Department of Homeland Security, No. 16-0392. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/24/16. (DMK)
|
March 18, 2016 |
Filing 64
NOTICE by ADEBIYI K. SHAMONDA re Minute Order filed on 03/01/2016 (jf)
|
March 17, 2016 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint, and the NTEU Complaint are due 5/13/2016, Oppositions are due 6/27/2016, Replies are due 7/18/2016. (jth)
|
March 15, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER. This order relates to all cases. Pursuant to the Court's orders of December 15, 2015 and January 28, 2016, it is ORDERED that motions to dismiss the consolidated amended complaint and the NTEU complaint are due May 13, 2016, oppositions are due June 27, 2016, and replies are due July 18, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/15/16.(DMK)
|
March 14, 2016 |
Filing 63
AMENDED COMPLAINT against KEYPOINT GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS, UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT with Jury Demand filed by RYAN BONNER, MICHAEL HANAGAN, TERESA J. MCGARRY, ROBERT CRAWFORD, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, MARIO SAMPEDRO, GARDELL BRANCH, ROBERT SLATER, JANE DOE II, TORALF PETERS, MYRNA BROWN, CHARLENE OLIVER, DARREN STRICKLAND, CYNTHIA KING-MYERS, TRAVIS ARNOLD, MICHAEL JOHNSON, TONY BACHTELL, ZACHARY SHARPER, JENNIFER GUM, JOHN DOE III, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE, MICHAEL EBERT, DEBORAH HOFFMAN, PAUL DALY, LILLIAN GONZALEZ-COLON, KELLY FLYNN, PETER ULIANO, RYAN LOZAR, ORIN GRIFFITH, TIMOTHY SEBERT, JOHNNY GONZALEZ, MARYANN HIBBS, ALIA FULI, HEATHER BURNETT-RICK, MONTY BOS, JANE DOE, NANCY WHEATLEY, KIMBERLY WINSOR.(Girard, Daniel)
|
March 3, 2016 |
Filing 62
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to KATHERINE ARCHULETA, JOHN BERRY, BETH F. COBERT, ELAINE D. KAPLAN, DONNA SEYMOUR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. Attorney Paul G. Freeborne terminated. (Freeborne, Paul)
|
March 1, 2016 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Pro Se Plaintiff Adebiyi K. Shamonda (16-cv-392) must file, by motion, any objection to or request for relief from the Initial Practice and Procedure Order in case number 15-mc-1394 (Dkt. #8) by 3/14/2016, and Pro Se Plaintiff shall also file, by 3/14/2016, notice with the Court stating whether Pro Se Plaintiff agrees to transfer the case for all purposes, waiving any right to remand under Lexecon Inc. v. Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach, 523 U.S. 26 (1998), and 28 U.S.C.1407(a). (jth)
|
February 29, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER. This order relates to Shamonda v. Department of Homeland Security, No. 16-cv-0392. In light of the transfer of Shamonda v. Department of Homeland Security, No. 16-cv-00392, to this Court and pursuant to the Initial Practice and Procedure Order #8 entered by this Court in 15-mc-1394, In Re: U.S. Office of Personnel Management Data Security Breach Litigation, it is ORDERED that plaintiff must file by motion any objection to or request for relief from the Initial Practice and Procedure Order by March 14, 2016. It is further ORDERED that plaintiff shall file notice with the Court by March 14, 2016 stating whether plaintiff agrees to transfer the case for all purposes, waiving any right to remand under Lexecon Inc. v. Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach, 523 U.S. 26 (1998), and 28 U.S.C.1407(a). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/29/16. (DMK) Modified on 3/1/2016 to reflect that this is a minute (paperless) order (jth).
|
February 26, 2016 |
Filing 61
NOTICE TO THE COURT by ADEDEJI SHAMONDA (jf)
|
February 25, 2016 |
Filing 60
COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) dated 2/25/16 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Amy Berman Jackson for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. (MDL 2664)(ztnr)
|
February 12, 2016 |
Filing 59
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by KATHERINE ARCHULETA, JOHN BERRY, BETH F. COBERT, DOES, ELAINE D. KAPLAN, DONNA SEYMOUR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. Case related to Case No. CAN 3:16-543. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Carmichael, Andrew)
|
February 8, 2016 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Pro Se Plaintiff Adedeji Shamonda (16-cv-178) must file, by motion, any objection to or request for relief from the Initial Practice and Procedure Order in case number 15-mc-1394 (Dkt. #8) by 2/19/2016, and Pro Se Plaintiff shall also file, by 2/19/2016, notice with the Court stating whether Pro Se Plaintiff agrees to transfer the case for all purposes, waiving any right to remand under Lexecon Inc. v. Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach, 523 U.S. 26 (1998), and 28 U.S.C.1407(a). (jth)
|
February 5, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER. This order relates to Shamonda v. Department of Homeland Security, No. 16-cv-0178. In light of the transfer of Shamonda v. Department of Homeland Security, No. 16-cv-0178, to this Court and pursuant to the Initial Practice and Procedure Order #8 entered by this Court in 15-mc-1394, In Re: U.S. Office of Personnel Management Data Security Breach Litigation, it is ORDERED that plaintiff must file by motion any objection to or request for relief from the Initial Practice and Procedure Order by February 19, 2016. It is further ORDERED that plaintiff shall file notice with the Court by February 19, 2016 stating whether plaintiff agrees to transfer the case for all purposes, waiving any right to remand under Lexecon Inc. v. Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach, 523 U.S. 26 (1998), and 28 U.S.C.1407(a). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/5/16. (DMK)
|
January 29, 2016 |
Set/Reset Deadline: The Consolidated Amended Complaint is due by 3/14/2016. (jth)
|
January 28, 2016 |
Filing 58
ORDER appointing counsel to leadership positions for plaintiffs, setting forth time keeping requirements, and ordering that the consolidated amended complaint is due by March 14, 2016. This order relates to all cases. See order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/28/16. (DMK)
|
January 28, 2016 |
Filing 57
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on January 21, 2016; Page Numbers: 1-84. Date of Issuance:January 24, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the
|
January 21, 2016 |
Minute Entry for Proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Motions Hearing held on 1/21/2016, Re: #26 #31 #33 Motions and Applications for Appointment as Counsel. All were Heard and Taken Under Advisement. (ORDER TO BE ISSUED) (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (jth)
|
January 19, 2016 |
Filing 56
COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) dated 1/19/2016 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Amy Berman Jackson for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. (MDL 2664)(ztnr)
|
January 19, 2016 |
Filing 55
NOTICE Regarding Application of Norman E. Siegel for Appointment as Interim Lead Class Counsel and Hassan Zavareei For Appointment as Liaison Counsel by MARY C. WOO (Siegel, Norman)
|
January 12, 2016 |
Filing 54
NOTICE by KATHERINE ARCHULETA, JOHN BERRY, BETH F. COBERT, DOES, ELAINE D. KAPLAN, DONNA SEYMOUR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT (Carmichael, Andrew)
|
January 8, 2016 |
Filing 53
NOTICE Plaintiff Jeran Binning's Notice of Consent to Transfer for Pretrial Purposes Without Waiving Right to Later Remand by JERAN BINNING (Shelquist, Robert)
|
January 7, 2016 |
Filing 52
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert K. Shelquist on behalf of JERAN BINNING (Shelquist, Robert)
|
January 5, 2016 |
Filing 51
RESPONSE of Federman & Sherwood to Applications for Lead, Liaison and/or Plaintiffs' Steering Committee filed by GARY S. COX. (Marcussen, Carin)
|
January 5, 2016 |
Filing 50
RESPONSE to Applications, and in Further Support of Application of Charles J. LaDuca, for Appointment to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, and Joinder in Application of Nicholas Koluncich for Appointment to Steering Committee filed by MICAELA BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LaDuca, Charles)
|
January 5, 2016 |
Filing 49
RESPONSE to Applications, and in Further Support of Application of Nicholas Koluncich, for Appointment to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee filed by MICAELA BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LaDuca, Charles)
|
January 5, 2016 |
Filing 48
RESPONSE re #35 Notice (Other) filed by RYAN BONNER. (Thompson, David)
|
January 5, 2016 |
Filing 47
RESPONSE re #29 Notice (Other) Applications for Appointment to the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee filed by VICTOR W. HOBBS. (Parekh, Behram)
|
January 5, 2016 |
Filing 46
RESPONSE re #34 Notice (Other), #23 Notice (Other),, #31 MOTION to Appoint Counsel John Yanchunis as Lead Class Counsel or Co-Lead Class Counsel, #25 Notice (Other), filed by MICHAEL HANAGAN. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith, #2 Certificate of Service)(LippSmith, Graham)
|
January 5, 2016 |
Filing 45
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by KATHERINE ARCHULETA, JOHN BERRY, BETH F. COBERT, DOES, ELAINE D. KAPLAN, DONNA SEYMOUR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. Case related to Case No. 4:15-cv-5083 (N.D. Cal.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Tag Along Action to JPML)(Carmichael, Andrew)
|
January 5, 2016 |
Filing 44
RESPONSE re #23 Notice (Other),, in Support of Appointment of Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel, Plaintiffs' Interim Lead Counsel and Members of the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee filed by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mason, Gary)
|
January 5, 2016 |
Filing 43
NOTICE OF KOHN, SWIFT & GRAF, P.C. IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS APPLICATION TO BE APPOINTED TO PLAINTIFFS STEERING COMMITTEE by TERESA J. MCGARRY re #24 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sheils, Denis)
|
January 5, 2016 |
Filing 42
RESPONSE re #26 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Mark Rosen) to Serve on Plaintiffs' Steering Committee filed by WILLIAM FLEISHELL III, CHAD KAPPERS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rosen, Mark)
|
December 30, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER. This order relates to Binning, No. 15-cv-2259. In light of the transfer of Binning, No. 15-cv-2259, to this Court and pursuant to the Initial Practice and Procedure Order #8 entered by this Court in 15-mc-1394, In Re: U.S. Office of Personnel Management Data Security Breach Litigation, it is ORDERED that plaintiff must file by motion any objection to or request for relief from the Initial Practice and Procedure Order by January 8, 2016. It is further ORDERED that plaintiff shall file notice with the Court by January 8, 2016 stating whether he agrees to transfer his case for all purposes, waiving any right to remand under Lexecon Inc. v. Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach, 523 U.S. 26 (1998), and 28 U.S.C.1407(a). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/30/15. (DMK)
|
December 30, 2015 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice due by 1/8/2016. Motion due by 1/8/2016. (zsm)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 41
COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) dated 12/29/15 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Amy Berman Jackson for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2664)(ztnr)
|
December 23, 2015 |
Filing 40
NOTICE of Corrected Application of Charles J. LaDuca for Appointment to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee by MICAELA BROWN re #38 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Cuneo, Gilbert & LaDuca, LLP Firm Resume, #2 Certificate of Service)(LaDuca, Charles)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing 39
NOTICE of Application of Nicholas Koluncich, III for Appointment to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee by MICAELA BROWN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A - Firm Resume, #2 Certificate of Service)(LaDuca, Charles)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing 38
NOTICE of Application of Charles J. LaDuca to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee by MICAELA BROWN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A - CGL Resume, #2 Certificate of Service)(LaDuca, Charles)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing 37
NOTICE of Application of Tina Wolfson of Ahdoot & Wolfson, PC for Appointment to Plaintiffs Steering Committee by HOWARD SMITH (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A)(Wolfson, Tina)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing 36
MEMORANDUM by RYAN BONNER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Thompson, David)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing 35
NOTICE of Application for Appointment of Cooper & Kirk, PLLC and Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel by RYAN BONNER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, David)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing 34
NOTICE Application for Appointment of Girard Gibbs LLP as Interim Lead Class Counsel by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, ROBERT CRAWFORD, ADAM DALE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel C. Girard, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Certificate of Service)(Girard, Daniel)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing 33
APPLICATION to Appoint Counsel Labaton Sucharow LLP and Labaton partner Joel H. Bernstein as Interim Lead Counsel and Sands Anderson, P.C. and Sands partner J. Jonathan Schraub as Liaison Counsel by NICHOLAS D. CAVIS, ERIC W. EDGAR, EDWARD W. KRIPPENDORF, WILLIAM PRESTON, JOHN RABER, EDWARD L. ROBBELOTH, NICOLE WAID (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joel H. Bernstein, #2 Declaration of J. Jonathan Schraub, #3 Declaration of Nicole Waid, #4 Declaration of Edward L. Robbeloth, #5 Declaration of Eric W. Edgar, #6 Declaration of William Preston, #7 Declaration of Nicholas D. Cavis, #8 Declaration of Edward W. Krippendorf, #9 Declaration of John Raber)(Bernstein, Joel)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing 32
NOTICE Application for Appointment of Federman & Sherwood to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee and Brief in Support by GARY S. COX re #19 Order,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Federman, William)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing 31
APPLICATION to Appoint Counsel John Yanchunis as Lead Class Counsel or Co-Lead Class Counsel by HECTOR PEREZ (Attachments: #1 Exhibit John A. Yanchunis Resume) (Valladares, Marcio)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing 30
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WILLIAM FLEISHELL III, CHAD KAPPERS re #27 Memorandum, #26 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Mark Rosen) to Serve on Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, #28 Notice of Proposed Order . (Rosen, Mark)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing 29
NOTICE APPLICATION OF BEHRAM V. PAREKH TO PLAINTIFFS' STEERING COMMITTEE by VICTOR W. HOBBS (Attachments: #1 Declaration Behram V. Parekh, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Certificate of Service)(Parekh, Behram)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing 28
NOTICE of Proposed Order by WILLIAM FLEISHELL III, CHAD KAPPERS re #27 Memorandum, #26 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Mark Rosen) to Serve on Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Rosen, Mark)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing 27
MEMORANDUM re #26 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Mark Rosen) to Serve on Plaintiffs' Steering Committee filed by WILLIAM FLEISHELL III, CHAD KAPPERS by WILLIAM FLEISHELL III, CHAD KAPPERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Firm Biography)(Rosen, Mark)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing 26
MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Mark Rosen) to Serve on Plaintiffs' Steering Committee by CHAD KAPPERS, WILLIAM FLEISHELL III (Rosen, Mark)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing 25
NOTICE Application of Norman E. Siegel for Appointment as Interim Lead Class Counsel and Hassan Zavareei for Appointment as Liaison Counsel by MARY C. WOO (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Siegel, Norman)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing 24
NOTICE Application of Kohn Swift & Graf, P.C. to be Appointed to the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, along with the Declaration of Denis F. Sheils by TERESA J. MCGARRY (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sheils, Denis)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing 23
NOTICE Application of Gary E. Mason for Appointment as Liaison Counsel by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, RYAN BONNER, MICAELA BROWN, NICHOLAS D. CAVIS, GARY S. COX, ROBERT CRAWFORD, ADAM DALE, ERIC W. EDGAR, MICHAEL HANAGAN, VICTOR W. HOBBS, STEPHEN HOWELL, EDWARD W. KRIPPENDORF, TERESA J. MCGARRY, NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION, JOHN ORAVIS, JOHN ORTINO, HECTOR PEREZ, WILLIAM PRESTON, JOHN RABER, EDWARD L. ROBBELOTH, DERRICK SIMS, HOWARD SMITH, NICOLE WAID, MARY C. WOO (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Mason, Gary)
|
December 21, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER clarifying Order of December 15, 2015. It is ORDERED that motions for appointment as plaintiffs' Liaison or Interim Lead Class may be filed in the form of an application instead of a motion. It is further ORDERED that applications for membership on the plaintiffs' steering committee are also due by December 22, 2015 and shall follow the schedule set forth in the December 15, 2015 Order: applications are due by December 22, 2015; plaintiffs' responses, if any, are due by January 5, 2016; defendants' responses, if any, are due by January 12, 2016; and a hearing on the applications will be held on January 21, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3. Any attorney who has submitted an application seeking membership only to the steering committee, but not as Liaison or Interim Lead Counsel, may attend the hearing by telephone. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/21/15. (DMK)
|
December 18, 2015 |
Filing 22
NOTICE of Change of Address by Hassan A. Zavareei (Zavareei, Hassan)
|
December 17, 2015 |
Filing 21
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 15, 2015; Page Numbers: 1-60. Date of Issuance: December 17, 2015. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the
|
December 17, 2015 |
Filing 20
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by KEYPOINT GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS. Case related to Case No. 15-cv-2686 (S.D. Cal.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mendro, Jason)
|
December 16, 2015 |
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Motions for Appointment as Plaintiffs' Liaison or Interim Lead Class Counsel are due 12/22/2015; Plaintiffs' Responses are due 1/5/2016; Defendants' Responses are due 1/12/2016; A Hearing on the Motions is set for 1/21/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth)
|
December 15, 2015 |
Filing 19
ORDER setting schedule for further proceedings. It is ORDERED that motions for appointment as plaintiffs' Liaison or Interim Lead Class Counsel are due December 22, 2015; plaintiffs' responses are due January 5, 2016; defendants' responses are due January 12, 2016; and a hearing on the motions is set for January 21, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3. It is further ORDERED that a consolidated amended complaint shall be filed approximately 30 days after appointment of Interim Lead Class Counsel. It is further ORDERED that motions to dismiss will be due approximately 60 days after the filing of the CAC, oppositions will be due approximately 45 days after that, and replies will be due approximately 21 days thereafter. Finally, it is ORDERED that discovery is stayed pending resolution of the motions to dismiss. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/15/15. (DMK)
|
December 15, 2015 |
Filing 18
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander H. Southwell on behalf of KEYPOINT GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS (Southwell, Alexander)
|
December 15, 2015 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Initial Scheduling and Case Management Conference held on 12/15/2015. (Scheduling Order to be Issued) (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (jth)
|
December 14, 2015 |
Filing 17
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Daniel Reilly For Consideration as Liaison Counsel by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, RYAN BONNER, MICAELA BROWN, NICHOLAS D. CAVIS, GARY S. COX, ROBERT CRAWFORD, ADAM DALE, ERIC W. EDGAR, MICHAEL HANAGAN, VICTOR W. HOBBS, STEPHEN HOWELL, EDWARD W. KRIPPENDORF, TERESA J. MCGARRY, NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION, JOHN ORAVIS, JOHN ORTINO, HECTOR PEREZ, WILLIAM PRESTON, JOHN RABER, EDWARD L. ROBBELOTH, NICOLE WAID, MARY C. WOO (Mason, Gary)
|
December 14, 2015 |
Set/Reset Hearings: The Initial Scheduling and Case Management Conference is scheduled for Tuesday, December 15, 2015, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth)
|
December 10, 2015 |
Filing 16
NOTICE of Appearance by Carin L. Marcussen on behalf of GARY S. COX (Marcussen, Carin)
|
December 8, 2015 |
Filing 15
Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHERINE ARCHULETA, JOHN BERRY, BETH F. COBERT, ELAINE D. KAPLAN, KEYPOINT GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS, DONNA SEYMOUR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. (Theis, John)
|
December 7, 2015 |
Filing 14
NOTICE of Appearance by Denis F. Sheils on behalf of TERESA J. MCGARRY (Sheils, Denis)
|
November 19, 2015 |
Filing 13
NOTICE of Appearance by David Henry Thompson on behalf of RYAN BONNER (Thompson, David)
|
November 18, 2015 |
Filing 12
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Girard on behalf of AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO (Girard, Daniel)
|
November 16, 2015 |
Filing 11
NOTICE of Appearance by Norman E. Siegel on behalf of MARY C. WOO (Siegel, Norman)
|
November 16, 2015 |
Filing 10
NOTICE of Appearance by Graham B. LippSmith on behalf of MICHAEL HANAGAN (LippSmith, Graham)
|
November 13, 2015 |
Filing 9
NOTICE of Appearance by Behram Parekh on behalf of VICTOR W. HOBBS (Parekh, Behram)
|
November 10, 2015 |
Filing 8
INITIAL PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/10/15. (DMK)
|
November 2, 2015 |
Filing 7
NOTICE of Appearance by Leon Dayan on behalf of STEPHEN HOWELL, NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION, JOHN ORTINO (Dayan, Leon)
|
November 2, 2015 |
Filing 6
NOTICE of Appearance by Devki Kaur Virk on behalf of STEPHEN HOWELL, NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION, JOHN ORTINO (Virk, Devki)
|
October 29, 2015 |
Filing 4
NOTICE of Appearance by Larry J. Adkins on behalf of STEPHEN HOWELL, NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION, JOHN ORTINO (Adkins, Larry)
|
October 29, 2015 |
Filing 3
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory J. O'Duden on behalf of STEPHEN HOWELL, NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION, JOHN ORTINO (O'Duden, Gregory)
|
October 29, 2015 |
Filing 2
NOTICE of Appearance by Paras N. Shah on behalf of STEPHEN HOWELL, NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION, JOHN ORTINO (Shah, Paras)
|
October 27, 2015 |
Filing 5
COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) dated 10/27/15 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Amy Berman Jackson for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2664) (ztnr)
|
October 9, 2015 |
Filing 1
COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER dated 10/9/2015 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Amy Berman Jackson for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2664) (ztnr)
|