UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. BURWELL et al
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICHOICE OF NEW JERSEY, INC., ARIZONA PHYSICIANS IPA, INC., CARE IMPROVEMENT PLUS SOUTH CENTRAL INSURANCE COMPANY, CARE IMPROVEMENT PLUS OF TEXAS INSURANCE COMPANY, CARE IMPROVEMENT PLUS WISCONSIN INSURANCE COMPANY, HEALTH PLAN OF NEVADA, INC., MEDICA HEALTHCARE PLANS, INC., OXFORD HEALTH PLANS (CT), INC., OXFORD HEALTH PLANS (NJ), INC., OXFORD HEALTH PLANS (NY), INC., PACIFICARE LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY, PACIFICARE OF ARIZONA, INC., PACIFICARE OF COLORADO, INC., PACIFICARE OF NEVADA, INC., PHYSICIANS HEALTH CHOICE OF TEXAS LLC, PREFERRED CARE PARTNERS, INC., SIERRA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE BENEFITS OF TEXAS, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN OF OHIO, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN OF TEXAS, LLC, UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK, UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF ALABAMA, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF ARIZONA, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF ARKANSAS, INC., UHC OF CALIFORNIA, UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF FLORIDA, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF GEORGIA, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF NEW ENGLAND, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF NEW YORK, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF OHIO, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF OKLAHOMA, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF OREGON, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF THE MIDLANDS, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF THE MIDWEST, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF UTAH, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF WASHINGTON, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF WISCONSIN, INC. and UNITEDHEALTHCARE PLAN OF THE RIVER VALLEY, INC.
Defendant: SYLVIA M. BURWELL, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2016cv00157
Filed: January 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M. Collyer
Nature of Suit: Medicare Act
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/27/2020. (DAS)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/7/2018. (lcrmc3)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/1/18. (lcrmc3)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 28 Motion to Stay and granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants must Answer no later than July 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/14/2017. (DAS)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/31/2017. (lcrmc1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. BURWELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICHOICE OF NEW JERSEY, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARIZONA PHYSICIANS IPA, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE IMPROVEMENT PLUS SOUTH CENTRAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE IMPROVEMENT PLUS OF TEXAS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARE IMPROVEMENT PLUS WISCONSIN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEALTH PLAN OF NEVADA, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEDICA HEALTHCARE PLANS, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OXFORD HEALTH PLANS (CT), INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OXFORD HEALTH PLANS (NJ), INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OXFORD HEALTH PLANS (NY), INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PACIFICARE LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PACIFICARE OF ARIZONA, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PACIFICARE OF COLORADO, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PACIFICARE OF NEVADA, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYSICIANS HEALTH CHOICE OF TEXAS LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PREFERRED CARE PARTNERS, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIERRA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE BENEFITS OF TEXAS, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN OF OHIO, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN OF TEXAS, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF ALABAMA, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF ARIZONA, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF ARKANSAS, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHC OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF FLORIDA, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF GEORGIA, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF NEW ENGLAND, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF NEW YORK, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF OHIO, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF OKLAHOMA, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF OREGON, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF THE MIDLANDS, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF THE MIDWEST, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF UTAH, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF WASHINGTON, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF WISCONSIN, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITEDHEALTHCARE PLAN OF THE RIVER VALLEY, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Y. Ellis
Represented By: Roger Steven Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Meron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYLVIA M. BURWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?