WILLIAMSPORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER et al v. BURWELL
Plaintiff: WILLIAMSPORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SMDC MEDICAL CENTER ESSENTIA HEALTH DULUTH, SOLDIERS & SAILORS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - ST. LUKES CAMPUS HOSPITAL, SUTTER COAST HOSPITAL, CHINESE HOSPITAL, VIRGINIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER HEALTH SACRAMENTO SIERRA REGION, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL EUREKA, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - PACIFIC CAMPUS, MISSION HOSPITAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER, INNOVIS HEALTH, LLC ESSENTIA HEALTH FARGO, COVENANT HOSPITAL LEVELLAND, ST. JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, DOCTOR'S HOSPITAL OF SAN PABLO, COVENANT HOSPITAL PLAINVIEW, EL CAMINO HOSPITAL, SUTTER AUBURN FAITH HOSPITAL, ST. MARY'S REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, SANTA CLARA VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, MILLS PENINSULA HEALTH SERVICES, SUTTER CENTRAL VALLEY HOSPITALS, SUTTER TRACY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, MENLO PARK HOSPITAL, SUTTER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER- DAVIES CAMPUS SNF, ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER - LAKESIDE CAMPUS, MADERA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SUTTER AMADOR HOSPITAL, SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS, NORTHBAY MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE, ALTA BATES SUMMIT MEDICAL CENTER, SAN FRANCISCO GENERAL HOSPITAL MEDICAL & TRAUMA CENTER, SUTTER MEDICAL CENTER OF SANTA ROSA, ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, NOVATO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, JOHN MUIR MEDICAL CENTER, QUEEN OF THE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LOS BANOS, PETALUMA VALLEY HOSPITAL, HOAG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL PRESBYTERIAN, SUTTER DAVIS HOSPITAL, DAVIS MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER EAST BAY HOSPITALS, ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JUDE HOSPITAL, INC., SUTTER MATERNITY & SURGERY CENTER OF SANTA CRUZ, SUTTER SOLANO MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA, STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS and SUTTER DELTA MEDICAL CENTER
Defendant: BURWELL and SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL
Case Number: 1:2016cv00200
Filed: February 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Lori Allison Rubin on behalf of All Plaintiffs Substituting for attorney Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez (Rubin, Lori)
April 18, 2019 Case STAYED. (kt)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. #17 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case is STAYED pending the outcome of the appeals of this Court's decision in Shands Jacksonville Med. Ctr., Inc. v. Azar, No. 14-1477, 2018 WL 6831167 (D.D.C. Dec. 28, 2018). Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/18/2019. (lcrdm1, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE Joint Report by SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL (Bensing, Daniel)
April 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/17/2019. (kt)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is unstayed. It is furthered ORDERED that, in light of this Court's final disposition of most of the cases consolidated with Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc. v. Sebelius, 14-cv-263, Dkt. 126 , the parties shall file a joint status report on or before April 17, 2019, describing what steps should be taken to bring this case to final resolution. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/10/2019. (lcrdm1, )
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Clarification Regarding Case Status #16 , the Court hereby VACATES its Minute Order of December 21, 2016, to the extent that it consolidates Case No. 16-cv-200 with Case No. 14-263. This case is to remain STAYED, but the Clerk of Court is hereby directed to unconsolidate 16-cv-200 from 14-cv-263. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/1/2017. (lcrdm1, )
April 28, 2017 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #15 Order,,, filed by WILLIAMSPORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Gonzalez, Joseph)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: At the status conference held on December 15, 2016, plaintiffs in 16-cv-200 represented that they wished to be consolidated with Shands, 14-cv-263. See No. 14-cv-263, Minute Order of Dec. 19, 2016. In the Joint Status Report filed on December 22, 2016, however, they "requested that [the case] remain stayed and not be consolidated with Shands." No. 14-cv-263, Dkt. 68 at 3 & n.3. On or before April 28, 2017, the parties in case 16-cv-200 are instructed to inform the Court whether they request that the stay remain in place and that the Court not consolidate 16-cv-200 with 14-cv-263. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/17/2017. (lcrdm1, ) Modified on 4/17/2017 to remove the word "Minute" in front of "Order" (kt).
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff Counsel's Motion to Withdraw Appearance #14 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. Robert J. Spagnoletti is granted leave to withdraw his appearance as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/13/2017. (lcrdm1, )
April 13, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs by ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, ALTA BATES SUMMIT MEDICAL CENTER, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - PACIFIC CAMPUS, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - ST. LUKES CAMPUS HOSPITAL, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER- DAVIES CAMPUS SNF, CHINESE HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA, COVENANT HOSPITAL LEVELLAND, COVENANT HOSPITAL PLAINVIEW, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER - LAKESIDE CAMPUS, DAVIS MEDICAL CENTER, DOCTOR'S HOSPITAL OF SAN PABLO, EL CAMINO HOSPITAL, ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER, HOAG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL PRESBYTERIAN, INNOVIS HEALTH, LLC ESSENTIA HEALTH FARGO, JOHN MUIR MEDICAL CENTER, MADERA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LOS BANOS, MENLO PARK HOSPITAL, MILLS PENINSULA HEALTH SERVICES, MISSION HOSPITAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHBAY MEDICAL CENTER, NOVATO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, PETALUMA VALLEY HOSPITAL, QUEEN OF THE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SAN FRANCISCO GENERAL HOSPITAL MEDICAL & TRAUMA CENTER, SANTA CLARA VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SMDC MEDICAL CENTER ESSENTIA HEALTH DULUTH, SOLDIERS & SAILORS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL EUREKA, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE, ST. JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JUDE HOSPITAL, INC., ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER-APPLE VALLEY, ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY'S REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS, SUTTER AMADOR HOSPITAL, SUTTER AUBURN FAITH HOSPITAL, SUTTER CENTRAL VALLEY HOSPITALS, SUTTER COAST HOSPITAL, SUTTER DAVIS HOSPITAL, SUTTER DELTA MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER EAST BAY HOSPITALS, SUTTER HEALTH SACRAMENTO SIERRA REGION, SUTTER MATERNITY & SURGERY CENTER OF SANTA CRUZ, SUTTER MEDICAL CENTER OF SANTA ROSA, SUTTER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SUTTER SOLANO MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER TRACY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS, VIRGINIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, WILLIAMSPORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Spagnoletti, Robert)
April 13, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gonzalez, Joseph)
March 22, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: The Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2017 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 10/11/2017, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The motions hearing scheduled on August 4, 2017, for cases 14-cv-263, 16-cv-200, and 16-cv-2301 is hereby VACATED. Should the parties in 16-cv-200 and/or 16-cv-2301 wish to be heard on the motions filed in lead related case 14-cv-263, the motions hearing in 14-cv-263 has been rescheduled for October 11, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. See March 21, 2017, Minute Order in 14-cv-263. From this date forward, all pleadings shall be filed only in the lead related case 14-cv-263. The parties are advised not to elect to "SPREAD" text when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/22/2017. (lcrdm1, )
February 22, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filings Administrative Record by KATHLEEN SEBELIUS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit)Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00263-RDM, 1:16-cv-00200-RDM(Bensing, Daniel)
February 1, 2017 Filing 11 Memorandum in opposition to re (70 in 1:14-cv-00263-RDM) MOTION for Order of Interest Payments, (71 in 1:14-cv-00263-RDM) MOTION for Order Awarding Interest, (69 in 1:14-cv-00263-RDM) MOTION for Order Awarding Interest filed by SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00263-RDM, 1:16-cv-00200-RDM(Bensing, Daniel)
December 22, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE Joint Status Report by SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00263-RDM, 1:16-cv-00200-RDM(Bensing, Daniel)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order VACATED ONLY IN REGARDS TO CONSOLIDATING 16-CV-200 WITH 14-CV-263 PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER DATED 5/1/17.....MINUTE ORDER: In light of the representations made by counsel at the status conference held on December 15, 2016, the Court hereby consolidates this case (14-cv-263) with related cases Williamsport Regional Medical Center, et al. v. Burwell, No. 16-cv-200, and Auburn Medical Center, et al. v. Burwell, No. 16-cv-2301. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) (permitting the court to consolidate actions "involv[ing] a common question of law or fact"); Local Civ. R. 40.5(a)(3). The parties are directed to file all future documents in Case No. 14-cv-263. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk's Office is directed to close Case Nos. 16-cv-200 and 16-cv-2301. It is FURTHER ORDERED that in the joint proposal identifying which cases should remain stayed that is due on or before December 22, 2016, the parties should also include a proposal as to whether any of the remaining cases that are associated with 14-cv-263 but not officially consolidated into it, should be consolidated and closed in a similar fashion as 14-cv-536, 14-cv-503, 14-cv-607, 14-cv-976, 14-cv-1477, 16-cv-200 and 16-cv-2301. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/21/2016. (lcrdm1, ) Modified on 5/5/2017 (ztnr).
December 15, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 12/15/2016. Related cases 16cv200 and 16cv2301 are to be consolidated with case 14cv263; Order forthcoming. The Court will enter a stay in case 16cv2301. The Court will issue an order regarding the interest briefing schedule outlined in the joint status report; Order forthcoming. The Administrative Record shall be filed on or before 2/22/2017; Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Motion is due by 3/24/2017; Government's Opposition and Cross Motion are due by 5/5/2017; Plaintiff's Reply and Opposition are due by 6/5/2017; and the Government's final brief is due by 6/26/2017. One week from today, the parties shall file a joint proposal to identify those cases that should remain stayed and those cases where the stay should be lifted. A Motion Hearing is set for 8/4/2017, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (Court Reporter: Pat Kaneshiro-Miller). (kt) Modified on 12/15/2016 to remove the word "tax" (kt).
December 8, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: A Status Conference is set for 12/15/2016, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on December 15, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. in order to discuss the scheduling issues raised in the Supplemental Status Report, Dkt. 65, filed in Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc. v. Sebelius, 14-cv-263 (RDM). The parties should also be prepared to discuss whether this action should be consolidated with 14-cv-263 for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/8/2016. (lcrdm1, )
October 25, 2016 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Minute Order dated 10/25/16 and Set/Reset Deadlines was entered in error for this case as the case is stayed. (ztnr)
October 25, 2016 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before 11/23/2016. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00263-RDM, 1:16-cv-00200-RDM.(kt) Modified on 10/25/2016 (kt).
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order ENTERED IN ERROR.....MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 63 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before November 23, 2016. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/25/2016. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00263-RDM, 1:16-cv-00200-RDM(lcrdm1, ) Modified on 10/25/2016 (ztnr).
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Unopposed Motion to Stay #9 , it is hereby ORDERED that this action is STAYED pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/15/2016. (lcrdm1, )
March 15, 2016 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL (Bensing, Daniel)
March 7, 2016 Set/Reset Deadline: On or before 3/18/2016, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report. (kt)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: On September 21, 2015, the Court issued a Memorandum Opinion in Civil Case No. 14-263, Shands v. Burwell, which is related to this case. It is hereby ORDERED that on or before March 18, 2016, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report regarding how to proceed in light of the decision in Case No. 14-263, including whether the action should be stayed. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/7/2016. (lcrdm1, )
February 25, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL (Cohen, Jason)
February 25, 2016 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/17/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/17/2016. (Spagnoletti, Robert)
February 25, 2016 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/17/2016. (Spagnoletti, Robert)
February 25, 2016 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL served on 2/16/2016 (Spagnoletti, Robert)
February 8, 2016 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Consent Forms)(jd, )
February 5, 2016 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (md)
February 5, 2016 Filing 3 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, ALTA BATES SUMMIT MEDICAL CENTER, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - PACIFIC CAMPUS, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - ST. LUKES CAMPUS HOSPITAL, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER- DAVIES CAMPUS SNF, CHINESE HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA, COVENANT HOSPITAL LEVELLAND, COVENANT HOSPITAL PLAINVIEW, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER - LAKESIDE CAMPUS, DAVIS MEDICAL CENTER, DOCTOR'S HOSPITAL OF SAN PABLO, EL CAMINO HOSPITAL, ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER, HOAG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL PRESBYTERIAN, INNOVIS HEALTH, LLC ESSENTIA HEALTH FARGO, JOHN MUIR MEDICAL CENTER, MADERA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LOS BANOS, MENLO PARK HOSPITAL, MILLS PENINSULA HEALTH SERVICES, MISSION HOSPITAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHBAY MEDICAL CENTER, NOVATO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, PETALUMA VALLEY HOSPITAL, QUEEN OF THE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SAN FRANCISCO GENERAL HOSPITAL MEDICAL & TRAUMA CENTER, SANTA CLARA VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SMDC MEDICAL CENTER ESSENTIA HEALTH DULUTH, SOLDIERS & SAILORS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL EUREKA, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE, ST. JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JUDE HOSPITAL, INC., ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER-APPLE VALLEY, ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY'S REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS, SUTTER AMADOR HOSPITAL, SUTTER AUBURN FAITH HOSPITAL, SUTTER CENTRAL VALLEY HOSPITALS, SUTTER COAST HOSPITAL, SUTTER DAVIS HOSPITAL, SUTTER DELTA MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER EAST BAY HOSPITALS, SUTTER HEALTH SACRAMENTO SIERRA REGION, SUTTER MATERNITY & SURGERY CENTER OF SANTA CRUZ, SUTTER MEDICAL CENTER OF SANTA ROSA, SUTTER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SUTTER SOLANO MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER TRACY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS, VIRGINIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, WILLIAMSPORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (md)
February 5, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, ALTA BATES SUMMIT MEDICAL CENTER, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - PACIFIC CAMPUS, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - ST. LUKES CAMPUS HOSPITAL, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER- DAVIES CAMPUS SNF, CHINESE HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA, COVENANT HOSPITAL LEVELLAND, COVENANT HOSPITAL PLAINVIEW, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER - LAKESIDE CAMPUS, DAVIS MEDICAL CENTER, DOCTOR'S HOSPITAL OF SAN PABLO, EL CAMINO HOSPITAL, ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER, HOAG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL PRESBYTERIAN, INNOVIS HEALTH, LLC ESSENTIA HEALTH FARGO, JOHN MUIR MEDICAL CENTER, MADERA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LOS BANOS, MENLO PARK HOSPITAL, MILLS PENINSULA HEALTH SERVICES, MISSION HOSPITAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHBAY MEDICAL CENTER, NOVATO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, PETALUMA VALLEY HOSPITAL, QUEEN OF THE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SAN FRANCISCO GENERAL HOSPITAL MEDICAL & TRAUMA CENTER, SANTA CLARA VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SMDC MEDICAL CENTER ESSENTIA HEALTH DULUTH, SOLDIERS & SAILORS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL EUREKA, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE, ST. JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JUDE HOSPITAL, INC., ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER-APPLE VALLEY, ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY'S REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS, SUTTER AMADOR HOSPITAL, SUTTER AUBURN FAITH HOSPITAL, SUTTER CENTRAL VALLEY HOSPITALS, SUTTER COAST HOSPITAL, SUTTER DAVIS HOSPITAL, SUTTER DELTA MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER EAST BAY HOSPITALS, SUTTER HEALTH SACRAMENTO SIERRA REGION, SUTTER MATERNITY & SURGERY CENTER OF SANTA CRUZ, SUTTER MEDICAL CENTER OF SANTA ROSA, SUTTER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SUTTER SOLANO MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER TRACY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS, VIRGINIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, WILLIAMSPORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. Case related to Case No. 14-263. (md)
February 5, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4403563) filed by MISSION HOSPITAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HOAG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL PRESBYTERIAN, SUTTER DELTA MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY'S REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, SUTTER SOLANO MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER AMADOR HOSPITAL, SOLDIERS & SAILORS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, WILLIAMSPORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER AUBURN FAITH HOSPITAL, COVENANT HOSPITAL PLAINVIEW, ALTA BATES SUMMIT MEDICAL CENTER, DOCTOR'S HOSPITAL OF SAN PABLO, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER- DAVIES CAMPUS SNF, SUTTER TRACY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SUTTER HEALTH SACRAMENTO SIERRA REGION, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER - LAKESIDE CAMPUS, ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER DAVIS HOSPITAL, MILLS PENINSULA HEALTH SERVICES, SAN FRANCISCO GENERAL HOSPITAL MEDICAL & TRAUMA CENTER, SUTTER MEDICAL CENTER OF SANTA ROSA, SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER, QUEEN OF THE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, MENLO PARK HOSPITAL, NORTHBAY MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER MATERNITY & SURGERY CENTER OF SANTA CRUZ, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA, ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER, SUTTER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LOS BANOS, COVENANT HOSPITAL LEVELLAND, ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, SANTA CLARA VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER-APPLE VALLEY, INNOVIS HEALTH, LLC ESSENTIA HEALTH FARGO, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL EUREKA, SUTTER EAST BAY HOSPITALS, STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS, SUTTER CENTRAL VALLEY HOSPITALS, CHINESE HOSPITAL, MADERA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, NOVATO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, VIRGINIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JUDE HOSPITAL, INC., JOHN MUIR MEDICAL CENTER, SMDC MEDICAL CENTER ESSENTIA HEALTH DULUTH, PETALUMA VALLEY HOSPITAL, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - ST. LUKES CAMPUS HOSPITAL, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE, EL CAMINO HOSPITAL, SUTTER COAST HOSPITAL, DAVIS MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - PACIFIC CAMPUS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Corporate Disclosure Certificate, #4 Summons Secretary, HHS, #5 Summons US Attorney General, #6 Summons US Attorney)(Spagnoletti, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMSPORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER et al v. BURWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAMSPORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMDC MEDICAL CENTER ESSENTIA HEALTH DULUTH
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLDIERS & SAILORS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - ST. LUKES CAMPUS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUTTER COAST HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHINESE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUTTER HEALTH SACRAMENTO SIERRA REGION
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL EUREKA
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER - PACIFIC CAMPUS
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MISSION HOSPITAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INNOVIS HEALTH, LLC ESSENTIA HEALTH FARGO
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COVENANT HOSPITAL LEVELLAND
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOCTOR'S HOSPITAL OF SAN PABLO
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COVENANT HOSPITAL PLAINVIEW
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EL CAMINO HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUTTER AUBURN FAITH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. MARY'S REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANTA CLARA VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILLS PENINSULA HEALTH SERVICES
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUTTER CENTRAL VALLEY HOSPITALS
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUTTER TRACY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MENLO PARK HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUTTER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER- DAVIES CAMPUS SNF
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER - LAKESIDE CAMPUS
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MADERA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUTTER AMADOR HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUTTER WEST BAY HOSPITALS
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTHBAY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALTA BATES SUMMIT MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAN FRANCISCO GENERAL HOSPITAL MEDICAL & TRAUMA CENTER
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUTTER MEDICAL CENTER OF SANTA ROSA
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOVATO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MUIR MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUEEN OF THE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LOS BANOS
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETALUMA VALLEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOAG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL PRESBYTERIAN
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUTTER DAVIS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVIS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUTTER EAST BAY HOSPITALS
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. JUDE HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUTTER MATERNITY & SURGERY CENTER OF SANTA CRUZ
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUTTER SOLANO MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUTTER DELTA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph Alfonso Gonzalez
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Robert James Spagnoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL
Represented By: Daniel Edward Bensing
Represented By: Jason Todd Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?