EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P. et al v. PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A
Plaintiff: EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P, EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC, EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P. and EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P.
Defendant: PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A, SEMBCORP INDUSTRIES LTD., KEPPEL OFFSHORE & MARINE LTD., JURONG SHIPYARD PTE LTD., ODEBRECHT S.A., PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A., KEPPEL CORPORATION LTD., ODEBRECHT PARTICIPAES E ENGENHARIA S.A. and SEMBCORP MARINE LTD.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00333
Filed: February 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-7101 for #112 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A. (zrdj)
August 30, 2019 Filing 113 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #112 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (znmw)
August 29, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT by PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-6349682. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Wolinsky, Robert)
August 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Reports due by 11/8/2019, 2/14/2020, and 7/2/2020. Fact Discovery shall conclude on 4/10/2020. Proponent Rule 26(a)(2) due by 5/18/2020. Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) due by 6/29/2020. Expert Discovery shall conclude on 7/29/2020. Status Conference set for 8/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #110 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The court sets the following deadlines in this matter: The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report regarding the status of fact discovery on or before November 8, 2019, and February 14, 2020; The parties shall be substantially completed with their production of documents by November 15, 2019; Fact discovery shall conclude on April 10, 2020; Proponent expert reports and disclosures, consistent with Rule 26(a)(2), shall be made on or before May 18, 2020; Rebuttal expert reports and disclosures, consistent with Rule 26(a)(2), shall be made on or before June 29, 2020; The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report regarding the status of expert discovery on or before July 2, 2020; Expert discovery shall conclude on July 29, 2020; and The Post-Discovery Status Conference previously scheduled for February 21, 2020 shall be adjourned to August 5, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/12/2019. (lcapm2)
August 9, 2019 Filing 110 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coburn, Barry)
August 9, 2019 Filing 109 Joint STATUS REPORT by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC. (Coburn, Barry)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 SEALED ORDER denying #100 Motion to Stay. See the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for additional details. This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/30/2019.(zjd)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 REDACTED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Defendant's #100 Motion to Stay. See the attached redacted Memorandum Opinion and Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/30/2019. (lcapm2) Modified document type on 7/31/2019 (zjd).
May 31, 2019 Filing 106 REPLY to opposition to motion re #100 MOTION to Stay filed by PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A.. (Wolinsky, Robert)
May 31, 2019 Filing 105 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Reply In Support of Motion to Stay, #4 Declaration of P. Barroso)(Wolinsky, Robert)
May 10, 2019 Filing 104 Memorandum in opposition to re #100 MOTION to Stay filed by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B Goldman, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Coburn, Barry)
May 10, 2019 Filing 103 Joint STATUS REPORT by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC. (Coburn, Barry)
April 23, 2019 Filing 102 TRANSCRIPT OF INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on January 11, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-34. Date of Issuance: April 23, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purch ased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/14/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/24/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2019.(wz)
April 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 5/10/2019. Reply due by 5/31/2019. (tb)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #101 Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Stay. The court sets the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: Plaintiffs' Opposition shall be filed on or before May 10, 2019 and Defendants' Reply shall be filed on or before May 31, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/16/2019. (lcapm3)
April 12, 2019 Filing 101 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #100 MOTION to Stay by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coburn, Barry)
April 5, 2019 Filing 100 MOTION to Stay by PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolinsky, Robert)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #98 MOTION FOR EXECUTION AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS OF REQUEST. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/15/2019. (zjd)
February 13, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION FOR EXECUTION AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS OF REQUEST by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Declaration, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Coburn, Barry)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #96 Joint Motion for Protective Order. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/11/2019. (lcapm2)
February 7, 2019 Filing 96 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coburn, Barry)
January 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Disclosures due by 2/1/2019. Joinder of Parties and Amendments of Pleadings due by 2/11/2019. Joint Status Reports due by 5/10/2019, 8/9/2019, and 1/24/2020. Fact Discovery shall conclude on 11/1/2019. Proponent Expert Reports and Disclosures due by 12/9/2019. Rebuttal Expert Reports and Disclosures due by 1/20/2020. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 2/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER setting the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: (1) The parties shall exchange initial disclosures, as required under Rule 26(a)(1), on or before February 1, 2019; (2) The deadline for joinder of parties and amendments of pleadings is February 11, 2019; (3) The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report regarding the status of fact discovery on or before May 10, 2019, and August 9, 2019; (4) Fact discovery shall conclude on November 1, 2019; (5) Proponent expert reports and disclosures, consistent with Rule 26(a)(2), shall be made on or before December 9, 2019; (6) Rebuttal expert reports and disclosures, consistent with Rule 26(a)(2), shall be made on or before January 20, 2020; (7) The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report regarding the status of expert discovery on or before January 24, 2020; (8) Expert discovery shall conclude on February 19, 2020; and (9) a Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for February 21, 2020, at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 10. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/11/2019. (lcapm2)
January 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 1/11/2019. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
January 4, 2019 Filing 94 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Coburn, Barry)
December 20, 2018 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Benjamin Wolinsky on behalf of PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A. (Wolinsky, Robert)
December 10, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/11/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference in this matter for January 11, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10 in front of Judge Amit P. Mehta. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/10/2018. (lcapm2)
December 4, 2018 Filing 91 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A..(Levin, Adam)
November 16, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/4/2018. (zjd)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying Defendant's #85 Motion to Stay. Defendant shall file an Answer in this case no later than December 4, 2018. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/16/2018. (lcapm2)
November 9, 2018 Filing 89 REPLY to opposition to motion re #85 MOTION to Stay filed by PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A.. (Stetson, Catherine)
November 6, 2018 Filing 88 Memorandum in opposition to re #85 MOTION to Stay filed by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Declaration, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Coburn, Barry)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #87 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Sam M. Koch is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/6/2018. (lcapm2)
November 5, 2018 Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sam Matthew Koch, :Firm- Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP, :Address- 1177 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York 10036. Phone No. - 212.715.9319. Fax No. - 212.715.8000 Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing from SDNY, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Coburn, Barry)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #86 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice without prejudice. The Motion is deficient pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(d). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/5/2018. (lcapm2)
November 5, 2018 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sam M. Koch, :Firm- Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP, :Address- 1177 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York 10036. Phone No. - 212.715.9319. Fax No. - 212.715.8000 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5775110. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Supplement Cert. of Good Standing from SDNY, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Coburn, Barry)
October 31, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Response due by 11/6/2018. (zjd)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendant's #85 Motion to Stay no later than November 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/31/2018. (lcapm2)
October 30, 2018 Filing 85 MOTION to Stay by PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Catherine)
October 29, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Emily Stetson on behalf of PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A. (Stetson, Catherine)
October 9, 2018 Filing 83 MANDATE of USCA as to #79 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A. ; USCA Case Number 17-7067. (Attachments: #1 USCA Judgment)(jf)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #82 Defendant Petroleo Brasileiro S.A.'s Unopposed Motion for Order to Remove Pending Deadlines. The deadlines set forth in the Order for Initial Scheduling Conference, ECF No. 78, are hereby vacated. This matter is stayed until the conclusion of appellate review. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/27/2017. (lcapm2)
April 27, 2017 Filing 82 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Remove Pending Deadlines by PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A. (Levin, Adam)
April 25, 2017 USCA Case Number 17-7067 for #79 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A. (zrdj)
April 24, 2017 Filing 81 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #79 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (jf)
April 21, 2017 Filing 80 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on January 31, 2017; Page Numbers: 1 - 218. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cathryn Jones, Telephone number 2023543246, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 5/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2017.(Jones, Cathryn)
April 21, 2017 Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #77 Order,, by PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-4922544. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Levin, Adam)
April 3, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (cdw)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 VACATED PURSUANT TO COURT'S ORDER OF 4/27/2017............ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference in this matter for May 19, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/03/2017. (lcapm1) Modified on 4/28/2017 (zcdw).
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #58 Defendant Petrobras' Motion to Dismiss and granting #51 Defendants Sembcorp Marine and Jurong's Motion to Dismiss; #54 Defendant Keppel's Motion to Dismiss; #55 Defendant Sembcorp Industries' Motion to Dismiss; #56 Defendant Odebrecht's Motion to Dismiss. Further, the court grants #69 Plaintiffs' Motion to Supplement the Record. See the attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/30/2017. (lcapm2)
March 30, 2017 Filing 76 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: #51 Defendants Sembcorp Marine and Jurong's Motion to Dismiss; #54 Defendant Keppel's Motion to Dismiss; #55 Defendant Sembcorp Industries' Motion to Dismiss; #56 Defendant Odebrecht's Motion to Dismiss; #58 Defendant Petrobras' Motion to Dismiss; and #69 Plaintiffs' Motion to Supplement the Record. See the attached Memorandum Opinion for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/30/2017. (lcapm2)
January 31, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Oral Arguments held on 1/31/2017 re #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by SEMBCORP INDUSTRIES LTD., #51 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by JURONG SHIPYARD PTE LTD., SEMBCORP MARINE LTD., #56 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ODEBRECHT S.A., ODEBRECHT PARTICIPAES E ENGENHARIA S.A., #54 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by KEPPEL OFFSHORE & MARINE LTD., KEPPEL CORPORATION LTD.. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (hs)
January 26, 2017 Filing 75 REPLY to opposition to motion re #69 MOTION To Supplement The Record re #62 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, filed by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC. (Coburn, Barry)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #74 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Claudia Pak is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/24/2017. (lcapm2)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #73 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney C. Morgan Branch is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendants SembCorp Marine and Jurong. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/24/2017. (lcapm2)
January 24, 2017 Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Claudia Pak, :Firm- Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP, :Address- 1177 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10036. Phone No. - 212-715-9137. Fax No. - 212-715-8337 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4815358. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Claudia Pak, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Coburn, Barry)
January 23, 2017 Filing 73 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- C. Morgan Branch, :Firm- Sidley Austin LLP, :Address- 1501 K Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 202-736-8000. Fax No. - 202-736-8711 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4814023. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JURONG SHIPYARD PTE LTD., SEMBCORP MARINE LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohn, Jonathan)
January 19, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Telephone Conference held on 1/19/2017. (cdw)
January 19, 2017 Filing 72 Memorandum in opposition to re #69 MOTION To Supplement The Record re #62 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, filed by ODEBRECHT PARTICIPAES E ENGENHARIA S.A., ODEBRECHT S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burck, William)
January 19, 2017 Filing 71 RESPONSE re #69 MOTION To Supplement The Record re #62 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, filed by PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A.. (Levin, Adam)
January 18, 2017 Filing 70 NOTICE OF PROPOSED HEARING STRUCTURE by JURONG SHIPYARD PTE LTD., KEPPEL CORPORATION LTD., KEPPEL OFFSHORE & MARINE LTD., ODEBRECHT PARTICIPAES E ENGENHARIA S.A., ODEBRECHT S.A., PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A., SEMBCORP INDUSTRIES LTD., SEMBCORP MARINE LTD. re Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Levin, Adam)
January 5, 2017 Filing 69 MOTION To Supplement The Record re #62 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A (Plea Agreement), #3 Exhibit B (Press Release), #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Coburn, Barry)
November 10, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Oral Argument scheduled for 1/31/2017 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (cdw)
October 28, 2016 Filing 68 REPLY to opposition to motion re #56 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ODEBRECHT PARTICIPAES E ENGENHARIA S.A., ODEBRECHT S.A.. (Burck, William)
October 28, 2016 Filing 67 REPLY to opposition to motion re #58 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Levin, Adam)
October 28, 2016 Filing 66 REPLY to opposition to motion re #54 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by KEPPEL CORPORATION LTD., KEPPEL OFFSHORE & MARINE LTD.. (Barbur, Peter)
October 28, 2016 Filing 65 REPLY to opposition to motion re #51 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by JURONG SHIPYARD PTE LTD., SEMBCORP MARINE LTD.. (Cohn, Jonathan)
October 28, 2016 Filing 64 REPLY to opposition to motion re #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by SEMBCORP INDUSTRIES LTD.. (Ogden, David)
October 27, 2016 Filing 63 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gregory S. Bruch (Bruch, Gregory)
October 7, 2016 Filing 62 Memorandum in opposition to re #51 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, #56 MOTION to Dismiss , #54 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, #58 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Goldman, #3 Declaration Declaration of Jose Rogerio Cruz e Tucci, #4 Declaration Declaration of Brian E. Maxted, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit P, #21 Exhibit Q, #22 Exhibit R, #23 Exhibit S, #24 Exhibit T)(Coburn, Barry)
September 28, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiffs' consolidated response due by 10/7/2016. Defendants' reply due by 10/28/2016. (cdw)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #61 Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' consolidated opposition brief shall be due on or before October 7, 2016, and Defendants' reply briefs, if any, shall be due on or before October 28, 2016. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/28/2016. (lcapm2)
September 27, 2016 Filing 61 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Law, Kerri)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #60 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs may file a consolidated opposition brief to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss of up to 100 pages. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/13/2016. (lcapm2)
September 13, 2016 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldman, Daniel)
August 15, 2016 Filing 59 SEALED Exhibits 2, 3, 4, and 10 filed by PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A. re #58 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
August 12, 2016 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 13)(Levin, Adam)
August 12, 2016 Filing 57 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 10)(Levin, Adam)
August 12, 2016 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss by ODEBRECHT PARTICIPAES E ENGENHARIA S.A., ODEBRECHT S.A. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burck, William)
August 12, 2016 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by SEMBCORP INDUSTRIES LTD. (Ogden, David)
August 12, 2016 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint by KEPPEL CORPORATION LTD., KEPPEL OFFSHORE & MARINE LTD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barbur, Peter)
August 12, 2016 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KEPPEL CORPORATION LTD., KEPPEL OFFSHORE & MARINE LTD.. (Barbur, Peter)
August 12, 2016 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ODEBRECHT PARTICIPAES E ENGENHARIA S.A., ODEBRECHT S.A.. (Burck, William)
August 12, 2016 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by JURONG SHIPYARD PTE LTD., SEMBCORP MARINE LTD. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohn, Jonathan)
August 12, 2016 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric C. Lyttle on behalf of ODEBRECHT PARTICIPAES E ENGENHARIA S.A., ODEBRECHT S.A. (Lyttle, Eric)
August 11, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua J. Fougere on behalf of JURONG SHIPYARD PTE LTD., SEMBCORP MARINE LTD. (Fougere, Joshua)
August 8, 2016 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn A. DeLone on behalf of PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A. (DeLone, Carolyn)
August 8, 2016 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by David Martin Foster on behalf of PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A. (Foster, David)
July 29, 2016 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SEMBCORP INDUSTRIES LTD.. (Ogden, David)
July 8, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Answer Or Response To The Amended Complaint due by 8/12/2016. Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition Brief due by 9/30/2016. Defendants Reply Briefs due by 10/21/2016. (mac)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #45 Joint Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule. The court hereby vacates the prior briefing schedule, ECF No. 35. The briefing schedule in this case is as follows: Defendants' answer or response to the Amended Complaint shall be due on or before August 12, 2016; Plaintiffs' consolidated opposition brief shall be due on or before September 30, 2016; Defendants' reply briefs, if any, shall be due on or before October 21, 2016. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/08/2016. (lcapm3)
July 8, 2016 Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by JURONG SHIPYARD PTE LTD., KEPPEL CORPORATION LTD., KEPPEL OFFSHORE & MARINE LTD., ODEBRECHT PARTICIPAES E ENGENHARIA S.A., ODEBRECHT S.A., PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A., SEMBCORP INDUSTRIES LTD., SEMBCORP MARINE LTD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Jonathan)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #44 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Michael B. Carlinsky is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of the Odebrecht Defendants. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/06/2016. (lcapm3)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the appearances entered by counsel for the Odebrecht Defendants, the parties shall meet and confer about the need, if any, to adjust the present schedule. The court requests that the parties agree to a single date for the filing of responsive pleadings by all Defendants and a single date for a consolidated opposition by Plaintiffs, if any Defendant files a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/06/2016. (lcapm3)
July 6, 2016 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael B. Carlinsky, :Firm- Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP, :Address- 51 Madison Avenue, 22nd Floor, New York, NY 10010. Phone No. - (212) 849-7000. Fax No. - (212) 849 7100 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4592731. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ODEBRECHT PARTICIPAES E ENGENHARIA S.A., ODEBRECHT S.A. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael B. Carlinsky, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burck, William)
July 5, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Gordon Cooper on behalf of ODEBRECHT PARTICIPAES E ENGENHARIA S.A., ODEBRECHT S.A. (Cooper, Jonathan)
July 5, 2016 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Burck on behalf of ODEBRECHT PARTICIPAES E ENGENHARIA S.A., ODEBRECHT S.A. (Burck, William)
June 28, 2016 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Jason Calb on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Calb, Michael)
June 28, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel B. Goldman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Goldman, Daniel)
June 28, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerri Ann Law on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Law, Kerri)
June 27, 2016 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor M. Broad on behalf of KEPPEL CORPORATION LTD., KEPPEL OFFSHORE & MARINE LTD. (Broad, Trevor)
June 27, 2016 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter T. Barbur on behalf of KEPPEL CORPORATION LTD., KEPPEL OFFSHORE & MARINE LTD. (Barbur, Peter)
June 22, 2016 Filing 36 NOTICE TO PARTIES. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/22/2016. (lcapm2)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #32 #33 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Peter T. Barbur and Trevor M. Broad are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendants Keppel Corporation Ltd. and Keppel Offshore & Marine Ltd. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/22/2016. (lcapm2)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting the Parties' #34 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants To Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Proposed Briefing Schedule. Please see the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/22/2016. (lcapm2)
June 21, 2016 Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Proposed Briefing Schedule by JURONG SHIPYARD PTE LTD., KEPPEL CORPORATION LTD., KEPPEL OFFSHORE & MARINE LTD., PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A., SEMBCORP INDUSTRIES LTD., SEMBCORP MARINE LTD. (Ogden, David)
June 21, 2016 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Trevor M. Broad, :Firm- Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP, :Address- Worldwide Plaza, 825 Eighth Avenue, New York, NY 10019. Phone No. - 212-474-1220. Fax No. - 212-474-3700 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4576155. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by KEPPEL CORPORATION LTD., KEPPEL OFFSHORE & MARINE LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Trevor M. Broad, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bruch, Gregory)
June 21, 2016 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Peter T. Barbur, :Firm- Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP, :Address- Worldwide Plaza, 825 Eighth Avenue, New York, NY 10019. Phone No. - 212-474-1058. Fax No. - 212-474-3700 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4576114. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by KEPPEL CORPORATION LTD., KEPPEL OFFSHORE & MARINE LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Peter T. Barbur, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bruch, Gregory)
June 21, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Bowker on behalf of SEMBCORP INDUSTRIES LTD. (Bowker, David) Modified on 6/22/2016 (zrdj).
June 21, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory S. Bruch on behalf of KEPPEL CORPORATION LTD., KEPPEL OFFSHORE & MARINE LTD. (Bruch, Gregory)
June 21, 2016 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JURONG SHIPYARD PTE LTD., SEMBCORP MARINE LTD.. (Cohn, Jonathan)
June 21, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan F. Cohn on behalf of JURONG SHIPYARD PTE LTD., SEMBCORP MARINE LTD. (Cohn, Jonathan)Modified on 6/22/2016 (zrdj).
June 21, 2016 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by David William Ogden on behalf of SEMBCORP INDUSTRIES LTD. (Ogden, David) Modified on 6/21/2016 (zrdj).
June 21, 2016 Filing 26 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ODEBRECHT S.A. served on 6/20/2016, answer due 7/11/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Fedex Label, #2 Exhibit 2- Confirmation of delivery)(Calb, Michael)
June 21, 2016 Filing 25 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ODEBRECHT PARTICIPAES E ENGENHARIA S.A. served on 6/17/2016, answer due 7/8/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Fedex Label, #2 Exhibit 2-Confirmation of delivery)(Calb, Michael)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #17 Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Directing Service of the Summons and First Amended Complaint on Defendants Odebrecht S.A. and Odebrecht Participacoes e Engenharia S.A. by Alternative Means. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/14/2016. (lcapm2)
June 13, 2016 Filing 23 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SEMBCORP MARINE LTD. served on 6/2/2016, answer due 6/23/2016 (Calb, Michael)
June 13, 2016 Filing 22 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SEMBCORP INDUSTRIES LTD. served on 6/1/2016, answer due 6/22/2016 (Calb, Michael)
June 13, 2016 Filing 21 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KEPPEL OFFSHORE & MARINE LTD. served on 6/3/2016, answer due 6/24/2016 (Calb, Michael)
June 13, 2016 Filing 20 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KEPPEL CORPORATION LTD. served on 6/1/2016, answer due 6/22/2016 (Calb, Michael)
June 13, 2016 Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JURONG SHIPYARD PTE LTD. served on 6/2/2016, answer due 6/23/2016 (Calb, Michael)
June 9, 2016 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM re #17 MOTION for entry of an Order directing service of the summons and First Amended Complaint in this action on non-U.S. Defendants Odebrecht S.A. (Odebrecht) and Odebrecht Participaes e Engenharia S.A. (Odebrecht Engenharia) by alternative means filed by EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Coburn, Barry)
June 9, 2016 Filing 17 MOTION for entry of an Order directing service of the summons and First Amended Complaint in this action on non-U.S. Defendants Odebrecht S.A. (Odebrecht) and Odebrecht Participaes e Engenharia S.A. (Odebrecht Engenharia) by alternative means by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Certificate of Service)(Coburn, Barry)
June 1, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant Petrobas' answer or other response to Amended Complaint due by 7/8/2016. Response due by 8/5/2016. Reply due by 8/19/2016. (cdw)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Joint Motion for Extension of Time and setting the following schedule for further proceedings: Defendant Petroleo Brasileiro S.A. -- PETROBRAS ("Petrobas") shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' #11 Amended Complaint on or before July 8, 2016; should Petrobas file a motion in response, Plaintiffs shall file their opposition on or before August 5, 2016; and, Petrobas shall file its reply on or before August 19, 2016. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/01/2016. (lcapm2)
June 1, 2016 Filing 16 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A. (Levin, Adam)
June 1, 2016 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 Amended Complaint,, and to Set Briefing Schedule by PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A. (Levin, Adam)
June 1, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam K. Levin on behalf of PETRLEO BRASILEIRO S.A. (Levin, Adam)
May 19, 2016 Filing 13 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to JURONG SHIPYARD PTE LTD., KEPPEL CORPORATION LTD., KEPPEL OFFSHORE & MARINE LTD., ODEBRECHT PARTICIPAES E ENGENHARIA S.A., ODEBRECHT S.A., SEMBCORP INDUSTRIES LTD., SEMBCORP MARINE LTD.. (znmw)
May 18, 2016 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC re #11 Amended Complaint,, . (Coburn, Barry)
May 18, 2016 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC, EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Summons ODEBRECHT S.A., #2 Summons ODEBRECHT PARTICIPAES E ENGENHARIA S.A., #3 Summons KEPPEL CORPORATION LTD., #4 Summons KEPPEL OFFSHORE & MARINE LTD., #5 Summons SEMBCORP INDUSTRIES LTD., #6 Summons SEMBCORP MARINE LTD., #7 Summons JURONG SHIPYARD PTE LTD.)(Coburn, Barry)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 #9 #10 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Daniel B. Goldman, Kerri Ann Law, and Michael Jason Calb are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/02/2016. (lcapm2)
April 29, 2016 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael Calb, :Firm- Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP, :Address- 1177 Avenue of the Americas New York, New York 10036. Phone No. - 212.715.9198. Fax No. - 212.715.8000 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4506643. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Michael Calb, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Coburn, Barry)
April 29, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kerri Ann Law, :Firm- Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP, :Address- 1177 Avenue of the Americas New York, New York 10036. Phone No. - 212.715.9128. Fax No. - 212.715.8128 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4506618. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Kerri Ann Law, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Coburn, Barry)
April 29, 2016 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel B. Goldman, :Firm- Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP, :Address- 1177 Avenue of the Americas New York, New York 10036. Phone No. - 212.715.9162. Fax No. - 212.715.8162 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4506586. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Daniel B. Goldman, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Coburn, Barry)
March 31, 2016 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to PETRLEO BRASILEIRO S.A. served on 3/29/2016, answer due 5/28/2016. (Coburn, Barry)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Plaintiffs' Motion for Execution and Issuance of Letter Rogatory. Please see the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/26/2016. (lcapm2)
February 25, 2016 Filing 5 MOTION For Execution and Issuance of Letter Rogatory by EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P., EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P., EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Coburn, Barry)
February 24, 2016 Filing 4 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to PETRLEO BRASILEIRO S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sth)
February 23, 2016 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (sth)
February 23, 2016 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EIG Energy Fund XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV-A, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV-B, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV-A, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV-B, L.P., EIG Management Company, LLC. (Coburn, Barry)
February 23, 2016 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EIG Energy Fund XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV-A, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV-B, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV-A, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV-B, L.P., EIG Management Company, LLC. (Coburn, Barry)
February 23, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Petrleo Brasileiro S.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4423721) filed by EIG Energy Fund XV-A, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV-B, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV-B, L.P., EIG Management Company, LLC, EIG Energy Fund XIV-A, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV (CAYMAN), L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Coburn, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P. et al v. PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-B, L.P.
Represented By: Kerri Ann Law
Represented By: Daniel B. Goldman
Represented By: Claudia Pak
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Represented By: Sam Matthew Koch
Represented By: Michael Jason Calb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EIG ENERGY FUND XV, L.P.
Represented By: Kerri Ann Law
Represented By: Daniel B. Goldman
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Represented By: Sam Matthew Koch
Represented By: Michael Jason Calb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EIG ENERGY FUND XIV (CAYMAN), L.P.
Represented By: Kerri Ann Law
Represented By: Daniel B. Goldman
Represented By: Claudia Pak
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Represented By: Sam Matthew Koch
Represented By: Michael Jason Calb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EIG ENERGY FUND XIV, L.P.
Represented By: Kerri Ann Law
Represented By: Daniel B. Goldman
Represented By: Claudia Pak
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Represented By: Sam Matthew Koch
Represented By: Michael Jason Calb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EIG MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Kerri Ann Law
Represented By: Daniel B. Goldman
Represented By: Claudia Pak
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Represented By: Michael Jason Calb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EIG ENERGY FUND XV (CAYMAN), L.P.
Represented By: Kerri Ann Law
Represented By: Daniel B. Goldman
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Represented By: Sam Matthew Koch
Represented By: Michael Jason Calb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EIG ENERGY FUND XIV-A, L.P.
Represented By: Kerri Ann Law
Represented By: Daniel B. Goldman
Represented By: Claudia Pak
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Represented By: Sam Matthew Koch
Represented By: Michael Jason Calb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EIG ENERGY FUND XV-A, L.P.
Represented By: Kerri Ann Law
Represented By: Daniel B. Goldman
Represented By: Claudia Pak
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Represented By: Sam Matthew Koch
Represented By: Michael Jason Calb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EIG ENERGY FUND XV-B, L.P.
Represented By: Kerri Ann Law
Represented By: Daniel B. Goldman
Represented By: Claudia Pak
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Represented By: Sam Matthew Koch
Represented By: Michael Jason Calb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEMBCORP INDUSTRIES LTD.
Represented By: David W. Bowker
Represented By: David William Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEPPEL OFFSHORE & MARINE LTD.
Represented By: Trevor M. Broad
Represented By: Peter T. Barbur
Represented By: Gregory S. Bruch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JURONG SHIPYARD PTE LTD.
Represented By: C. Morgan Branch
Represented By: Jonathan F. Cohn
Represented By: Joshua J. Fougere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ODEBRECHT S.A.
Represented By: Eric C. Lyttle
Represented By: Michael B. Carlinsky
Represented By: Jonathan Gordon Cooper
Represented By: William A. Burck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A.
Represented By: Robert Benjamin Wolinsky
Represented By: Catherine Emily Stetson
Represented By: Adam K. Levin
Represented By: David Martin Foster
Represented By: Carolyn A. DeLone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEPPEL CORPORATION LTD.
Represented By: Trevor M. Broad
Represented By: Peter T. Barbur
Represented By: Gregory S. Bruch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ODEBRECHT PARTICIPAES E ENGENHARIA S.A.
Represented By: Eric C. Lyttle
Represented By: Michael B. Carlinsky
Represented By: Jonathan Gordon Cooper
Represented By: William A. Burck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEMBCORP MARINE LTD.
Represented By: C. Morgan Branch
Represented By: Jonathan F. Cohn
Represented By: Joshua J. Fougere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?