UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS M.D. ANDERSON CANCER CENTER v. BURWELL
Plaintiff: THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS M.D. ANDERSON CANCER CENTER and UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS M.D. ANDERSON CANCER CENTER
Defendant: BURWELL, THOMAS E. PRICE and SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL
Case Number: 1:2016cv01054
Filed: June 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS M.D. ANDERSON CANCER CENTER (McBride, B.)
May 7, 2018 Case Stayed. Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 7/23/2018. (zcdw)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #21 Joint Status Report, this matter shall be stayed until July 23, 2018. The parties are directed to file a subsequent status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings on or before July 23, 2018, unless before that date they file a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/07/2018. (lcapm3)
May 7, 2018 Filing 21 Joint STATUS REPORT by THOMAS E. PRICE. (Orloff, Serena)
January 9, 2018 Case Stayed. Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 5/7/2018. (zcdw)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #20 Joint Status Report, this matter shall be stayed until May 7, 2018. The parties are directed to file a subsequent status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings on or before May 7, 2018, unless before that date they file a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/09/2018. (lcapm3)
January 8, 2018 Filing 20 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS M.D. ANDERSON CANCER CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McBride, B.)
January 5, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address by B. Scott McBride (McBride, B.)
October 3, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 1/8/2018. Case Stayed. (zcdw)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #18 the parties' Joint Status Report, this matter shall be stayed until January 8, 2018. The parties are directed to file a subsequent status report on or before January 8, 2018, unless before that date they file a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/03/2017. (lcapm3)
October 2, 2017 Filing 18 Joint STATUS REPORT by THOMAS E. PRICE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orloff, Serena)
August 2, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 10/2/2017. (zcdw)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #17 the parties' Joint Status Report, this matter shall be stayed for an additional 62 days, until October 2, 2017. The parties are directed to file a subsequent status report on or before October 2, 2017, updating the court on the status of settlement discussions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/02/2017. (lcapm3)
August 1, 2017 Filing 17 Joint STATUS REPORT by THOMAS E. PRICE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orloff, Serena)
June 2, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 8/1/2017. (cdw)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #16 the parties' Joint Status Report, this matter shall be stayed for an additional 60 days, until August 1, 2017. The parties are directed to file a subsequent status report on or before August 1, 2017, updating the court on the status of settlement discussions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/02/2017. (lcapm3)
June 2, 2017 Filing 16 Joint STATUS REPORT by SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orloff, Serena)
April 3, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 6/2/2017. (cdw)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #14 the parties' Joint Status Report, this matter shall be stayed for an additional 60 days, until June 2, 2017. The parties are directed to file a subsequent status report on or before June 2, 2017, updating the court on the status of settlement discussions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/03/2017. (lcapm3)
April 3, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL (Orloff, Serena)
April 3, 2017 Filing 14 Joint STATUS REPORT by SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orloff, Serena)
December 1, 2016 Case Stayed. Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/5/2017. (cdw)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 the parties' Joint Motion to Stay. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Amit P. Mehta on 12/01/2016. (lcapm2) (Main Document 13 replaced on 12/7/2016) (zcdw).
December 1, 2016 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay by University of Texas M.D. Anderson Cancer Center and by SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaCour, Alice)
December 1, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by B. Scott McBride on behalf of UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS M.D. ANDERSON CANCER CENTER (McBride, B.)
November 29, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice Shih LaCour on behalf of SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL (LaCour, Alice)
October 7, 2016 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General October 4, 2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Scully, Elizabeth)
October 4, 2016 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL served on 9/30/2016, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/3/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/2/2016.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service 9-30-2016, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service 10-03-2016)(Scully, Elizabeth)
October 4, 2016 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #7 Certificate of Service, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the proper Summons Returned Executed event (i.e. as to Federal Defendant, U.S. Attorney General & US Attorney). counsel IS instructed to refile said pleading.(zrdj)
October 4, 2016 Filing 7 ENTERED IN ERROR.....CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS M.D. ANDERSON CANCER CENTER re #5 Amended Complaint, #4 Summons Issued Electronically, #1 Complaint, Amended Proof of Service. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service 9-30-2016, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service 10-03-2016)(Scully, Elizabeth) Modified on 10/4/2016 (zrdj).
September 29, 2016 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS M.D. ANDERSON CANCER CENTER re #5 Amended Complaint, #4 Summons Issued Electronically, #1 Complaint, . (Scully, Elizabeth)
July 22, 2016 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL filed by UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS M.D. ANDERSON CANCER CENTER.(Caligur, Matthew)
June 7, 2016 Filing 4 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL. (Attachment: #1 Consent Forms)(jd)
June 6, 2016 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (jd)
June 6, 2016 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint, filed by the THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS M.D. ANDERSON CANCER CENTER. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by the THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS M.D. ANDERSON CANCER CENTER.(Scully, Elizabeth)
June 6, 2016 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by the THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS M.D. ANDERSON CANCER CENTER. (Scully, Elizabeth)
June 6, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL Secretary, US Dept. of Health and Human Services ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4556276) filed by the THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS M.D. ANDERSON CANCER CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover Sheet)(Scully, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS M.D. ANDERSON CANCER CENTER v. BURWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS E. PRICE
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Represented By: Alice Shih LaCour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Represented By: Alice Shih LaCour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS M.D. ANDERSON CANCER CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS M.D. ANDERSON CANCER CENTER
Represented By: B. Scott McBride
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Scully
Represented By: Matthew W. Caligur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?