CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Plaintiff: CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Case Number: 1:2016cv01068
Filed: June 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OPINION, granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 29 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 09/11/2020. (lckbj2)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/1/2017. (lckbj2)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 9 Motion to Dismiss. See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on October 6, 2017. (lckbj2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY
Represented By: Anne L. Weismann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?