SOURGOUTSIS v. UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE
Plaintiff: CHRISAVGI SOURGOUTSIS
Defendant: UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE
Case Number: 1:2016cv01096
Filed: June 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying Plaintiff's 142 Motion for Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/24/2020. (lcnj)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 143 Motion for Declaratory Judgment; and denying 154 Motion to Amend/Correct Clerk's Judgment. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 01/09/2020. (lckbj3)
September 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendant's 36 Motion to Enforce Protective Order. Order granting Motion to Enforce Protective Order, requiring redactions of material designated as confidential, and declining to consider request for sanctions. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 9/28/2018. (lcrm2)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OPINION, signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 11/21/2017. (lcrm2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOURGOUTSIS v. UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISAVGI SOURGOUTSIS
Represented By: John T. Harrington, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?