UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. ANTHEM, INC. et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF IOWA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF GEORGIA and STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Defendant: ANTHEM, INC, CIGNA CORP. and ANTHEM, INC.
Petitioner: KAISER PERMANENTE HEALTH PLAN, INC., TUFTS ASSOCIATED HEALTH PLANS, INC., MERCER, CATERPILLAR INC., BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA (CALIFORNIA PHYSICIAN'S SERVICE), HUMANA INC., HARTFORD HEALTHCARE CORPORATION, INNOVATION HEALTH HOLDINGS, LLC, SUTTER HEALTH, PIEDMONT HEALTHCARE, NORTHWELL HEALTH, INC., MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES, AON PLC, GEISINGER HEALTH PLAN, TRUSTMARK SERVICES COMPANY, PATIENT FIRST CORPORATION, CENTURA HEALTH CORPORATION, CALIFORNIA PUBLIC EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM, EMBLEMHEALTH, INC., CENTENE CORPORATION, DENVER HEALTH MEDICAL PLAN, INC., HEALTHSMART BENEFIT SOLUTIONS, INC., MEDICAL MUTUAL OF OHIO, HEALTHSCOPE BENEFITS, INC., NORTHEAST GEORGIA HEALTH SYSTEM, ASCENSION HEALTH, ALLIED BENEFIT SYSTEMS, INC., INTEL CORPORATION, INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH PLANS, INC., HARVARD PILGRIM HEALTH CARE, INC., LRGHEALTHCARE, CONCORD HOSPITAL, INC., WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC, BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF KANSAS CITY, NEW WEST PHYSICIANS, P.C., BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD ASSOCIATION, CONNECTICARE, INC., COLLECTIVEHEALTH, THOMAS DELACEY, YALE MEDICINE, VIRGINIA HEALTH NETWORK, INC, SENTARA HEALTHCARE, BUCK CONSULTANTS LLC, CENTRA HEALTH AND PIEDMONT COMMUNITY HEALTH, UNIVERSITY OF COLORADO HEALTH, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED, SHARP HEALTHCARE, UPMC HEALTH PLAN, INC., CONSORTIUM HEALTH PLANS, INC.., MINUTEMAN HEALTH INC., BON SECOURS HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., PAUL FLOTKEN, DENVER HEALTH AND HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, AETNA INC., WORKPLACE BENEFIT SOLUTIONS, HCA HOLDINGS, INC., DAVITA INC., STAMFORD HEALTH, INC., MVP HEALTH CARE, PHYSICIAN'S HEALTH PLAN OF NORTH INDIANA, INC., HTA LIMITED COOPERATIVE, BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NORTH CAROLINA, MEDCOST BENEFIT SERVICES and INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH, INC.
Special Master: RICHARD A. LEVIE
Case Number: 1:2016cv01493
Filed: July 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Referring Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:25
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER Granting #538 Plaintiff States' Consent Motion to Approve Payments of Attorney's Fees and Costs. (See the Order for Complete Details). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/9/2018. (jth)
April 6, 2018 Filing 538 Consent MOTION for Order re Payment of Attorneys' Fees by STATE OF CONNECTICUT (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support re Payment of Attorneys' Fees, #2 Text of Proposed Order Re Payment of Attorneys' Fees)(Davis, Rachel)
March 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file another Joint Status Report by 4/16/2018 if the matter of attorneys fees and costs is not resolved by that date. (jth) Modified on 3/19/2018 to reflect that the correct date for the Joint Status Report is 4/16/2018 not 3/16/2018. (jth).
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the joint status report #537 , it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by April 16, 2018 if the matter of attorneys fees and costs is not resolved by that date. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/19/18. (DMK)
March 16, 2018 Filing 537 Joint STATUS REPORT by ANTHEM, INC.. (Curran, Christopher)
February 20, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file another Joint Status Report by 3/16/2018 if the matter of attorneys fees and costs is not resolved by that date. (jth)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the joint status report #536 , it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by March 16, 2018 if the matter of attorneys fees and costs is not resolved by that date. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/20/18. (DMK)
February 16, 2018 Filing 536 Joint STATUS REPORT by ANTHEM, INC.. (Curran, Christopher)
February 1, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file a notice with the Court by 2/16/2018 stating whether the matter of attorneys fees and costs is resolved and if not, the reason for the delay. (jth)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the joint status report #535 , it is ORDERED that the parties shall file notice with the Court by February 16, 2018 stating whether the matter of attorneys fees and costs is resolved or the reason for the delay, if it is not. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/1/18. (DMK)
January 31, 2018 Filing 535 Joint STATUS REPORT by ANTHEM, INC.. (Curran, Christopher)
January 12, 2018 Filing 534 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Max Merrick Miller on behalf of STATE OF IOWA Substituting for attorney Layne M. Lindebak (Miller, Max)
December 19, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Mediation is extended to 1/31/2018. The parties shall submit another joint status report by 1/31/2018, providing, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule for plaintiff states' motion for award of attorneys' fees and costs. (jth)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the joint status report #533 , it is ORDERED that the deadline for mediation is extended to January 31, 2018. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if the matter of attorneys fees and costs is not resolved by then, the parties shall submit another joint status report by January 31, 2018, providing, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule for plaintiff states' motion for award of attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/19/17. (DMK)
December 18, 2017 Filing 533 Joint STATUS REPORT by ANTHEM, INC.. (Curran, Christopher)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Given that the attorneys' fees matter has been referred to mediation #532 , the briefing schedule set in the October 3, 2017 minute order is vacated. The Court will set a schedule for further proceedings, if necessary, at a later date. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/18/17. (DMK)
October 18, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Mediation to conclude by 12/18/2017. The parties shall submit a Report to the Court on the Status of the Mediation by 12/18/2017 and they shall promptly notify the Court if the attorneys' fees to be paid to the plaintiff states issue is resolved before then. (jth)
October 17, 2017 CASE DIRECTLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for non-binding mediation pursuant to #532 Referral Order. (jd)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER REFERRING issue of any attorneys' fees to be paid to plaintiff states to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for mediation. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/17/17. (DMK)
October 10, 2017 Filing 531 Joint STATUS REPORT re Mediation by COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF TENNESSEE. (Davis, Rachel)
October 5, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff States' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs is due by 11/13/2017; Defendants' Response or Opposition is due by 12/4/2017; Plaintiff States' Reply is due 12/18/2017. The parties shall inform the Court by 10/10/2017 of their joint position on whether it would be of assistance to refer the matter of the amount of any attorneys' fees to be paid to the plaintiff states to a neutral mediator, and if so, whether they would request that it be referred to a Magistrate Judge, the Court's alternative dispute resolution program, or the Special Master. (jth)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the joint status report #530 , it is ORDERED that the plaintiff states' motion for attorneys' fees and costs is due November 13, 2017, defendants' responsive pleading or opposition is due December 4, 2017, and the plaintiff states' reply is due December 18, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and inform the Court by October 10, 2017 of their joint position on whether it would be of assistance to refer the matter of the amount of any attorneys' fees to be paid to the plaintiff states to a neutral mediator, and if so, whether they would request that it be referred to a Magistrate Judge, the Court's alternative dispute resolution program, or the Special Master (which would be at the parties' expense). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/3/17. (DMK)....BRIEFING SCHEDULE PORTION VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 10/18/2017.....Modified on 10/19/2017 (znmw).
October 2, 2017 Filing 530 Joint STATUS REPORT by COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF TENNESSEE. (Davis, Rachel)
August 27, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: The stay of the deadline to file a motion for attorneys' fees and costs is continued. The parties shall submit a further status report by 10/2/2017. (jth)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the joint status report #529 , it is ORDERED that the stay of the deadline to file a motion for attorneys' fees and costs is continued and that parties shall submit a further status report by October 2, 2017. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/18/17. (DMK)
August 16, 2017 Filing 529 Joint STATUS REPORT by ANTHEM, INC.. (Curran, Christopher)
July 14, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: The stay of the deadline to file a motion for attorneys' fees and costs is continued. The parties shall submit a further status report by 8/16/2017. (jth)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the joint status report #528 , it is ORDERED that the stay of the deadline to file a motion for attorneys' fees and costs is continued and that parties shall submit a further status report by August 16, 2017. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/12/17. (DMK)
July 11, 2017 Filing 528 Joint STATUS REPORT by ANTHEM, INC.. (Curran, Christopher)
June 20, 2017 Filing 527 MANDATE of USCA as to #503 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by ANTHEM, INC. ; USCA Case Number 17-5024. (Attachments: #1 USCA Order)(td)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' joint status report #526 , it is ORDERED that the parties file another report by July 11, 2017 advising the Court of the status of Anthem's petition for a writ of certiorari. It is further ORDERED that the deadline to file any motions for attorneys' fees and costs is stayed until further order from the Court. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/10/17. (DMK)
May 9, 2017 Filing 526 Joint STATUS REPORT by ANTHEM, INC.. (Curran, Christopher)
February 23, 2017 USCA Case Number 17-5028 for #519 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by CIGNA CORP.. (td)
February 23, 2017 Filing 525 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted Corrected Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #521 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA ; (td)
February 22, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report by 5/10/2017, advising the Court about the status of the appeal, and, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule for any motions for attorneys' fees and costs. (jth)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #524 Plaintiff States' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. It is ORDERED that the motion for extension of time to move for attorneys' fees and costs is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint status report by May 10, 2017, advising the Court about the status of the appeal, and, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule for any motions for attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/22/17. (DMK)
February 21, 2017 Filing 524 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move fot Attorneys Fees and Costs by STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff States Memorandum of Points And Authorities in Support, #2 Declaration of Paula Gibson, #3 Order)(Gibson, Paula)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 523 MEMORANDUM OPINION (REDACTED). Upon review and consideration of comments of non-parties provided to the Special Master in this matter, the Court is docketing a public version of the Memorandum Opinion #499 entered on February 8, 2017 with certain references to sealed material redacted. While in the absence of any objection, many other references in the opinion to sealed material will not be redacted, it is ORDERED that the release of the public portions of the opinion does not otherwise alter or amend any of the sealing orders in this case, and that any other material that has been previously sealed remains under seal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that any agreement by a party or non-party to the public disclosure of any portion of the opinion does not constitute a waiver of that entity's right to seek enforcement of the seal covering other testimony or exhibits. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/21/17. (DMK)
February 21, 2017 Filing 522 SEALED Special Master Report filed by RICHARD A. LEVIE. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Chart)(zjf)
February 21, 2017 Filing 521 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date 2/17/17 re #519 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,. (td)
February 21, 2017 NOTICE OF ERROR re #518 Motion for Extension of Time to; emailed to paula.gibson@doj.ca.gov, cc'd 247 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Please refile document with the correct case number. (ztd, )
February 18, 2017 Filing 520 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF SPECIAL MASTER REPORT TO THE COURT by JUDGE RICHARD A. LEVIE (RET.) (Levie, Richard)
February 17, 2017 Filing 519 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #498 Order,,,, #499 Memorandum & Opinion (Applicable Party Restriction) by CIGNA CORP.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-4847902. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Rule, Charles)
February 17, 2017 Filing 518 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . . MOTION for Extension of Time to Pending REsolution of Appeal by STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support in Plaitniff States' Motion to Extend, #2 Declaration of Paula Gibson in Supprt)(Gibson, Paula) Modified on 2/21/2017 (ztd).
February 17, 2017 Filing 517 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNIVERSITY OF COLORADO HEALTH. Attorney Eric P. Waeckerlin terminated. (Waeckerlin, Eric)
February 15, 2017 Filing 516 SEALED TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 22, 2016; Page Numbers: 4347 - 4476. Court Reporter/Transcriber Elizabeth SaintLoth, RPR, FCRR, Telephone number 202-354-3267, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
February 15, 2017 Filing 515 SEALED TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 15, 2016; Page Numbers: 3037 - 3129. Court Reporter/Transcriber Elizabeth SaintLoth, RPR, FCRR, Telephone number 202-354-3242, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
February 15, 2017 Filing 514 SEALED TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on November 21, 2016; Page Numbers: 700 - 754. Court Reporter/Transcriber Elizabeth Saint-Loth, RPR, FCRR, Telephone number 202-354-3242, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court provides notice that the request of University of Colorado Health ("UCHealth") in its response #505 to the Court's order is moot because the memorandum opinion did not quote or refer to any information or materials from UCHealth. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/15/17. (DMK)
February 13, 2017 Filing 513 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #512 Sealed Document / Notice of Filing of Public Version of Exhibit 1 to Anthem, Inc.'s Response to the Court's February 8, 2017 Order by ANTHEM, INC. (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Jasinski, Douglas)
February 10, 2017 USCA Case Number 17-5024 for #503 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by ANTHEM, INC. (zrdj)
February 10, 2017 Filing 512 SEALED Notice of Submission filed by ANTHEM, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(zjf)
February 10, 2017 Filing 511 SEALED TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 19, 2016; Page Numbers: 3352 - 3473. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (zrdj)
February 10, 2017 Filing 510 SEALED TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 14, 2016; Page Numbers: 2746 - 2951. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (zrdj)
February 10, 2017 Filing 509 SEALED TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 12, 2016; Page Numbers: 2331 - 2497. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, (zrdj) (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)
February 10, 2017 Filing 508 SEALED TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 2, 2016; Page Numbers: 2061 - 2205. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of Anthem's filing #502 , the Court directs the Special Master to communicate with counsel for third parties concerning any references to sealed material in the memorandum opinion to ascertain whether they object to publication of the opinion. The Special Master will then communicate any objections by third parties to the Court. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/10/17. (DMK)
February 10, 2017 Filing 507 *RESUBMISSION* Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #503 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,. (jf)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #502 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket Anthem's notice of submission [502-1] on the public docket and Exhibit 1 to the notice [502-2] under seal. It is ORDERED that Anthem shall file a public version of Exhibit 1 redacting confidential portions by February 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/10/17. (DMK)
February 10, 2017 Filing 506 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #503 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,. (jf)
February 9, 2017 Filing 505 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #498 Order,,,, #499 Memorandum & Opinion (Applicable Party Restriction) filed by UNIVERSITY OF COLORADO HEALTH. (Smith, Ryan)
February 9, 2017 Filing 504 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Anthony Smith on behalf of UNIVERSITY OF COLORADO HEALTH (Smith, Ryan)
February 9, 2017 Filing 503 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #498 Order,,,, #499 Memorandum & Opinion (Applicable Party Restriction) by ANTHEM, INC.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-4837350. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Curran, Christopher)
February 9, 2017 Filing 502 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ANTHEM, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission of Anthem, Inc.'s Response to the Court's February 8, 2017 Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jasinski, Douglas)
February 9, 2017 Filing 501 NOTICE of Defendant Cigna Corporation's Position on Unsealing the Memorandum Opinion by CIGNA CORP. (Bial, Joseph)
February 9, 2017 Filing 500 NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS' POSITION ON UNSEALING THE OPINION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Fitzgerald, Scott)
February 8, 2017 Filing 499 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Access to the PDF Document is limited to Counsel of Record for the parties and the Court. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/8/17. (DMK)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER. It is ORDERED that the merger of Anthem Inc. and Cigna Corp., as reflected in their merger agreement dated July 23, 2015, is ENJOINED. See Order and Memorandum Opinion for details. The Memorandum Opinion accompanying this Order contains references to materials that were discussed in open court but remain sealed at the request of one of the parties or third parties providing information. For this reason, the full opinion is being docketed under seal at this time. In drafting the opinion, the Court has endeavored to avoid the disclosure of the substance of any business sensitive material, and it is the Court's strong preference to place the entire opinion on the public record as soon as possible. Therefore, it is FURTHER ORDERED that each party shall file notice with the Court by close of business February 9, 2017 of whether it has any objection to the Court unsealing the Memorandum Opinion docketed on this date in its entirety and if so, specifying what portions it believes should remain under seal and why. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/8/17. (DMK)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER adopting #492 Report & Recommendation No. 22 of the Special Master in its entirety. For the reasons set forth in the Report & Recommendation, the Court GRANTS the Motions to Seal submitted by Anthem, Cigna, and Plaintiffs that are the subject of the Report & Recommendation. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/3/17. (DMK)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER adopting #490 Report & Recommendation No. 21 of the Special Master in its entirety. For the reasons set forth in the Report & Recommendation, the Court GRANTS (1) Mercer's supplemental Motion to Seal the document addressed in its motion, (2) Patient First's supplemental Motion to Seal the nine exhibits addressed in its motion, (3) Sentara's supplemental Motion to Seal the testimony addressed in its motion, and (4) the motion of Workplace Benefit Solutions, submitted on behalf of itself and its employee Thomas Delacey, to seal the testimony addressed in its motion. The Court grants these motions pursuant to the "complete non-disclosure" provision of its November 4 Order. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/2/17. (DMK)
January 30, 2017 Filing 497 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #493 Sealed Document, / Notice of Filing of Redacted Versions of Defendants' Demonstrative List and Defendants' Admitted Exhibit Lists by ANTHEM, INC. (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Gidley, John)
January 25, 2017 Filing 496 RESPONSE #495 TO ANTHEM'S SUPPLEMENTAL CONCLUSIONS OF LAW filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Jacobs, Jon) Modified to add linkage on 1/26/2017 (td).
January 25, 2017 Filing 495 SUPPLEMENTAL Conclusions of Law Relating to the January 23, 2017 Opinion in United States v. Aetna, filed by ANTHEM, INC. (jf)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #494 Motion for Leave to File. While the court was well aware of the Aetna opinion and would have denied any motion for leave to file such a pleading if Anthem had asked before docketing it, the motion will be granted. Plaintiffs may file their own succinct supplement if they choose to do so. Plaintiffs need not address section II -- the Court does not intend to adopt factual findings lifted from the Aetna opinion that were based on a record that was not presented to this Court, particularly since that evidentiary record was focused on entirely different markets than the markets involved in this case. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter Anthem's Supplemental Conclusions of Law [494-1] on the docket. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/25/17. (DMK)
January 25, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Anthem shall file public versions of the (Defendants' Demonstrative List and Defendants' Admitted Exhibit Lists) attachments redacting the confidential portions by 1/30/2017. (jth)
January 25, 2017 Filing 494 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplement to Its Proposed Conclusions of Law and Memorandum in Support by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Anthem's Supplemental Conclusions of Law Relating to the January 23, 2017 Opinion in United States v. Aetna, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Curran, Christopher)
January 23, 2017 Filing 493 SEALED DOCUMENT (Notice of Filing of Defendants' Demonstrative List and Defendants' Admitted Exhibit Lists) filed by ANTHEM, INC.. re Minute Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #482 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter on the docket under seal the attachments to Anthem's motion, [482-1] through [482-6]. It is further ORDERED that Anthem shall file public versions of the attachments redacting the confidential portions by January 30, 2017. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/23/17. (DMK)
January 18, 2017 Filing 492 Report & Recommendation No. 22 of the Special Master (re: Motions to Seal submitted by Plaintiffs, Defendant Anthem, and Defendant Cigna).Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on January 18, 2017. (Levie, Richard)
January 18, 2017 Filing 491 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Response to January 5, 2017 Minute Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jacobs, Jon)
January 18, 2017 Filing 490 Report & Recommendation No. 21 of the Special Master (re: non-party Motions to Seal submitted by Mercer, Patient First, Sentara, and Workplace Benefit Solutions). Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on on January 18, 2017. (Levie, Richard)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Jennifer Farer's #489 motion to withdraw as counsel for non-party Caterpillar Inc. The Clerk is directed to remove Ms. Farer as attorney of record in this case. An attorney from the same firm has entered an appearance as counsel for Caterpillar Inc. and the representation continues. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/18/2017. (lcabj3)
January 18, 2017 Filing 489 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CATERPILLAR INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)(Farer, Jennifer)
January 18, 2017 Filing 488 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Hutson on behalf of CATERPILLAR INC. (Hutson, Elizabeth)
January 18, 2017 Filing 487 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Response to January 5, 2017 Minute Order (List of Sealed Phase I Exhibits and Demonstratives) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jacobs, Jon)
January 18, 2017 NOTICE OF ERROR re #481 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance; emailed to penny.nagler@doj.ca.gov, cc'd 246 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Incorrect document/case, 3. Please refile document, 4. ENTERED IN ERROR; Incorrect court header; not a form of this Court. Refile as a general Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance (no special form required). (znmw, )
January 17, 2017 Filing 486 NOTICE of Filing Defendants' List of Sealed Exhibits and Demonstratives by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Jasinski, Douglas)
January 17, 2017 Filing 485 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Response to January 5, 2017 Minute Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re Order,,,, (Jacobs, Jon)
January 17, 2017 Filing 484 NOTICE of Submission of Anthem, Inc.'s Supplement to Its January 11, 2017 Letter Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits and Designated Deposition Testimony by ANTHEM, INC. re #440 Notice (Other) (Jasinski, Douglas)
January 17, 2017 Filing 483 Proposed Findings of Fact by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Jacobs, Jon)
January 17, 2017 Filing 482 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ANTHEM, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Defendants' Demonstrative List and Defendants' Admitted Exhibit Lists, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
January 17, 2017 Filing 481 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF CALIFORNIA. Attorney Patricia L. Nagler terminated. (Nagler, Patricia) Modified on 1/18/2017 (znmw).
January 17, 2017 Filing 480 Proposed Findings of Fact by ANTHEM, INC.. (Curran, Christopher)
January 13, 2017 Filing 479 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on January 4, 2017; Page Numbers: 4842-4954. Date of Issuance: January 5, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Dickman, Janice)
January 13, 2017 Filing 478 TRANSCRIPT OF BENCH TRIAL ~ AFTERNOON SESSION before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on January 3, 2017; Page Numbers: 4633-4841. Date of Issuance:January 13, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa A. Moreira, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 202-354-3187, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Moreira, Lisa)
January 13, 2017 Filing 477 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on January 3, 2017 - morning session; Page Numbers: 4512-4632. Date of Issuance: January 4, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from t he court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Dickman, Janice) Modified on 1/17/2017 (znmw).
January 13, 2017 Filing 476 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 23, 2016; Page Numbers: 4477-4511. Date of Issuance: December 24, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Dickman, Janice)
January 13, 2017 Filing 475 TRANSCRIPT OF BENCH TRIAL, AFTERNOON SESSION, before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on 12-22-2016; Page Numbers: 4347-4476. Date of Issuance:01-13-2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Elizabeth SaintLoth, Telephone number 202-354-3242, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Saint-Loth, Elizabeth)
January 13, 2017 Filing 474 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 22, 2016 - morning session; Page Numbers: 4199-4346. Date of Issuance: December 23, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Dickman, Janice)
January 13, 2017 Filing 473 TRANSCRIPT OF BENCH TRIAL ~ AFTERNOON SESSION before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 21, 2016; Page Numbers: 4063-4198. Date of Issuance:January 13, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa A. Moreira, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 202-354-3187, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Moreira, Lisa)
January 13, 2017 Filing 472 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 21, 2016 - morning session; Page Numbers: 3901-4062. Date of Issuance: December 22, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Dickman, Janice)
January 13, 2017 Filing 471 TRANSCRIPT OF BENCH TRIAL ~ AFTERNOON SESSION before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 20, 2016; Page Numbers: 3771-3900. Date of Issuance:January 13, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa A. Moreira, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 202-354-3187, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Moreira, Lisa) Modified on 1/17/2017 (znmw).
January 13, 2017 Filing 470 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 20, 2016 - morning session; Page Numbers: 3648-3770. Date of Issuance: December 21, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Dickman, Janice)
January 13, 2017 Filing 469 TRANSCRIPT OF BENCH TRIAL ~ AFTERNOON SESSION before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 19, 2016; Page Numbers: 3477-3647. Date of Issuance:January 13, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa A. Moreira, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 202-354-3187, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Moreira, Lisa)
January 13, 2017 Filing 468 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 19, 2016 - morning session; Page Numbers: 3352-3476. Date of Issuance: December 20, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased fr om the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Dickman, Janice) Modified on 1/17/2017 (znmw).
January 13, 2017 Filing 467 TRANSCRIPT OF BENCH TRIAL, AFTERNOON SESSION, before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on 12-16-2016; Page Numbers: 3220-3351. Date of Issuance:01-13-2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Elizabeth SaintLoth, Telephone number 202-354-3242, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Saint-Loth, Elizabeth) Modified on 1/17/2017 (znmw).
January 13, 2017 Filing 466 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 16, 2016 - morning session; Page Numbers: 3130-3219. Date of Issuance: December 17, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased fr om the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Dickman, Janice) Modified on 1/17/2017 (znmw).
January 13, 2017 Filing 465 TRANSCRIPT OF BENCH TRIAL, AFTERNOON SESSION, before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on 12-15-2016; Page Numbers: 3039-3129. Date of Issuance:01-13-2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Elizabeth SaintLoth, Telephone number 202-354-3242, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Saint-Loth, Elizabeth) Modified on 1/17/2017 (znmw).
January 13, 2017 Filing 464 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 15, 2016 - part 1; Page Numbers: 2952-3038. Date of Issuance: December 16, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Dickman, Janice)
January 13, 2017 Filing 463 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 14, 2016; Page Numbers: 2746-2951. Date of Issuance: December 15, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Dickman, Janice)
January 13, 2017 Filing 462 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 13, 2016; Page Numbers: 2625-2745. Date of Issuance: December 14, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Dickman, Janice)
January 13, 2017 Filing 461 TRANSCRIPT OF BENCH TRIAL, AFTERNOON SESSION, before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on 12-12-2016; Page Numbers: 2498-2624. Date of Issuance:01-13-2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Elizabeth SaintLoth, Telephone number 202-354-3242, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Saint-Loth, Elizabeth)
January 13, 2017 Filing 460 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 12, 2016 - morning session; Page Numbers: 2331-2497. Date of Issuance:December 13, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Dickman, Janice)
January 13, 2017 Filing 459 TRANSCRIPT OF BENCH TRIAL ~ AFTERNOON SESSION before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 2, 2016; Page Numbers: 2206-2330. Date of Issuance:January 13, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa A. Moreira, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 202-354-3187, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal o r purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Moreira, Lisa)
January 13, 2017 Filing 458 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 2, 2016 - morning session; Page Numbers: 2061-2205. Date of Issuance: December 3, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Dickman, Janice)
January 13, 2017 Filing 457 TRANSCRIPT OF BENCH TRIAL, AFTERNOON SESSION, before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on 12-01-2016; Page Numbers: 1940-2060. Date of Issuance:01-13-2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Elizabeth SaintLoth, Telephone number 202-354-3242, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Saint-Loth, Elizabeth)
January 13, 2017 Filing 456 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on December 1, 2016 - morning session; Page Numbers: 1766-1939. Date of Issuance: December 2, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Dickman, Janice)
January 13, 2017 Filing 455 TRANSCRIPT OF BENCH TRIAL ~ AFTERNOON SESSION before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on November 30, 2016; Page Numbers: 1576-1765. Date of Issuance:January 13, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa A. Moreira, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 202-354-3187, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Moreira, Lisa)
January 13, 2017 Filing 454 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on November 30, 2016 - morning session; Page Numbers: 1394-1575. Date of Issuance: Novemer 30, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Dickman, Janice)
January 13, 2017 Filing 453 TRANSCRIPT OF BENCH TRIAL, AFTERNOON SESSION, before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on 11-29-2016; Page Numbers: 1253-1393. Date of Issuance:1-13-2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Elizabeth SaintLoth, Telephone number 202-354-3242, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Saint-Loth, Elizabeth)
January 13, 2017 Filing 452 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on November 29, 2016 - morning session; Page Numbers: 1094-1252. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Dickman, Janice)
January 13, 2017 Filing 451 TRANSCRIPT OF BENCH TRIAL ~ AFTERNOON SESSION before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on November 28, 2016; Page Numbers: 933-1093. Date of Issuance:January 13, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Moreira, Telephone number 202-354-3187, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Moreira, Lisa)
January 13, 2017 Filing 450 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on November 28, 2016 - morning session; Page Numbers: 755-932. Date of Issuance: November 29, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Dickman, Janice) Modified on 1/17/2017 (znmw).
January 13, 2017 Filing 449 TRANSCRIPT OF BENCH TRIAL, AFTERNOON SESSION, before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on 11-23-2016; Page Numbers: 700-754. Date of Issuance:1-13-2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Elizabeth SaintLoth, Telephone number 202-354-3242, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Saint-Loth, Elizabeth) (Main Document 449 replaced on 1/13/2017) (ztd).
January 13, 2017 Filing 448 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on November 23, 2016 - Morning Session; Page Numbers: 630-699. Date of Issuance: November 24, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Dickman, Janice)
January 13, 2017 Filing 447 TRANSCRIPT OF BENCH TRIAL ~ AFTERNOON SESSION before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on November 22, 2016; Page Numbers: 472-635. Date of Issuance:January 13, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Moreira, Telephone number 202-354-3187, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Moreira, Lisa)
January 13, 2017 Filing 446 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on November 22, 2016 - Morning Session; Page Numbers: 306-471. Date of Issuance: November 23, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Dickman, Janice) Modified on 1/17/2017 (znmw).
January 13, 2017 Filing 445 TRANSCRIPT OF BENCH TRIAL, AFTERNOON SESSION, before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on 11-21-2016; Page Numbers: 152-305. Date of Issuance:1-13-2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Elizabeth SaintLoth, Telephone number 202-354-3242, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Saint-Loth, Elizabeth)
January 13, 2017 Filing 444 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on November 21, 2016; Page Numbers: 1-151. Date of Issuance: November 22, 2016j. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2017.(Dickman, Janice)
January 12, 2017 Filing 443 NOTICE of Submission of Letter Motion to Seal Designated Deposition Testimony by THOMAS DELACEY, Workplace Benefit Solutions (Grove, Callyson)
January 12, 2017 Filing 442 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Motion to Seal Exhibits by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jacobs, Jon)
January 12, 2017 Filing 441 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Position on Unsealing Exhibits Used During Phase 2 of Trial by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re Order,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Jon)
January 12, 2017 NOTICE OF ERROR re #438 Notice (Other); emailed to scott.fitzgerald@usdoj.gov, cc'd 244 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. The signature on the document should be the person who is electronically filing (td, )
January 12, 2017 NOTICE OF ERROR re #437 Notice (Other); emailed to scott.fitzgerald@usdoj.gov, cc'd 244 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. The signature on the document should be the person who is electronically filing. (td, )
January 12, 2017 Filing 440 NOTICE of Submission of Anthem, Inc.'s Letter Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits and Designated Deposition Testimony by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Submission to Special Master)(Jasinski, Douglas)
January 12, 2017 Filing 439 NOTICE of Anthem, Inc.'s Response to January 5, 2017 Minute Order by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Jasinski, Douglas)
January 11, 2017 Filing 438 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .NOTICE of Response to January 5, 2017 Minute Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fitzgerald, Scott) Modified on 1/12/2017 (td).
January 11, 2017 Filing 437 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Motion to Seal Exhibits by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Fitzgerald, Scott) Modified on 1/12/2017 (td).
January 11, 2017 Filing 436 NOTICE of Cigna's Response to January 5, 2017 Minute Order by CIGNA CORP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bial, Joseph)
January 11, 2017 Filing 435 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master by CIGNA CORP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bial, Joseph)
January 11, 2017 Filing 434 NOTICE of Letter Motion to Seal A Trial Exhibit by MERCER (Foster, Matthew)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Given that no party has requested certification to appeal the Special Master's Report & Recommendation Nos. 19 and 20, the Court adopts them in their entirety. For the reasons set forth in Report & Recommendation No. 19, the Court GRANTS Anthem's supplemental motions to seal with respect to all of the noted deposition excerpts, except the Court DENIES it with respect to transcript lines 141:23; 142:3-4; and 171:22 of the Augur deposition. For the reasons set forth in Report & Recommendation No. 20, the Court GRANTS Cigna's supplemental motion to seal with respect to all of the noted deposition excerpts, except the Court DENIES it with respect to transcript lines 118:20 of the Guilmette deposition. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/10/17. (DMK)
January 10, 2017 Filing 433 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master by SENTARA HEALTHCARE (Burns, James)
January 10, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: The Parties shall file public versions of the Phase II Proposed Findings of Fact, redacting the confidential portions, by 1/17/2017. (jth)
January 10, 2017 Filing 432 SEALED DOCUMENT (Proposed Findings of Fact) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd)
January 10, 2017 Filing 431 SEALED DOCUMENT (Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact) filed by ANTHEM, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #428 Anthem's Motion for Leave to its Phase II Proposed Findings of Fact Under Seal; granting #429 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Phase 2 Proposed Findings of Fact Under Seal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file public versions of these submissions, redacting the confidential portions, by January 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/10/17. (DMK)
January 9, 2017 Filing 430 ERRATA for Anthem's Phase II Findings of Fact and Anthem's Phase II Conclusions of Law by ANTHEM, INC. #428 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ANTHEM, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by ANTHEM, INC., #427 Trial Brief filed by ANTHEM, INC.. (Curran, Christopher)
January 6, 2017 Filing 429 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact (Phase II))(Jacobs, Jon)
January 6, 2017 Filing 428 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ANTHEM, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Anthem's Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact Phase II: The Alleged Large Group and Monopsony Local Markets, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Curran, Christopher)
January 6, 2017 Filing 427 TRIAL BRIEF / Anthem's Post-Trial Conclusions of Law Phase II: "Large Group Employers" & "Monopsony" by ANTHEM, INC.. (Curran, Christopher)
January 6, 2017 Filing 426 NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (PHASE II) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jacobs, Jon)
January 6, 2017 Filing 425 Report & Recommendation No. 20 of the Special Master (re: Defendant Cigna's Supplemental Motion to Seal). Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on January 6, 2017. (Levie, Richard)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that any remaining motions to seal by parties or non-parties related to any exhibit, demonstrative exhibit, deposition excerpt, trial testimony, or any matter set forth in any party's Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law must be submitted to the Special Master by Wednesday, January 11, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that each side shall file with the Court by Wednesday, January 11, 2017 a list of exhibits for Phase II similar to the lists filed at Dkt. 379 and 380 for Phase I, identifying all exhibits that were displayed at the trial on direct or cross examination, the parties' positions as to whether they were shown to the public, any objections to their being shown to the public, and the parties' positions as to whether they may be unsealed at this time. It is FURTHER ORDERED that each side shall file with the Court by Tuesday, January 17, 2017 a list of only the numbers of all of its exhibits and demonstratives, in numerical order, that remain under seal in whole or in part. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/5/17. (DMK)
January 5, 2017 Filing 424 Report & Recommendation No. 19 (re: Defendant Anthem's Supplemental Motions to Seal). Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on January 5, 2017. (Levie, Richard)
January 5, 2017 Filing 423 NOTICE of Letter Motion to Seal Proposed Evidence by PATIENT FIRST CORPORATION (Hanes, Patrick)
January 4, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Bench Trial resumed and concluded on 1/4/2017. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (jth)
January 3, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Bench Trial resumed and held on 1/3/2017. Defense Witness: Dr. Robert Willig; Plaintiffs Witness: Dr. David Dranove. Bench Trial continued to 1/4/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (Court Reporters: Janice Dickman AM / Lisa Moreira PM) (jth)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER adopting #421 Report & Recommendation No. 18 of the Special Master in its entirety. For the reasons set forth in Report & Recommendation No. 18, the Court GRANTS Sentara's supplemental Motion to Seal the designated portions of the two depositions, and the portions of Anthem's proposed findings of fact which rely upon Sentara confidential information, all under the "complete non-disclosure" provision of the Court's November 4, 2016 Order. Further, the Court GRANTS Yale Medicine's supplemental Motion to Seal the designated excerpts of its employee's deposition under the "partial non-disclosure" provision of the Court's November 4, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/3/17. (DMK)
January 3, 2017 Filing 422 NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE by ANTHEM, INC. (Tabas, Matthew)
January 3, 2017 Filing 421 Report & Recommendation No. 18 of the Special Master (re: Motions to Seal submitted by Sentara Healthcare and Yale Medicine). Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on January 3, 2016. (Levie, Richard)
December 29, 2016 Filing 420 NOTICE of Submission of letter motion to the Special Master in the Action by YALE MEDICINE (Park, Chong)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Bench Trial in this matter presently scheduled to resume January 3, 2017, at 9:30 AM will now resume on January 3, 2017, at 10:00 AM. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/23/2016. (jth)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER adopting #418 Report & Recommendation No. 17 of the Special Master in its entirety. For the reasons set forth in Report & Recommendation No. 17, the Court GRANTS Geisinger Health Plan's supplemental motion to seal the two documents at issue under the complete non-disclosure provision of the November 4 Order. The Court FURTHER GRANTS Bon Secours Health System, Inc.'s supplemental motion to seal the nine exhibits at issue under the complete non-disclosure provision of the November 4 Order. The Court FURTHER GRANTS LRGHealthcare's supplemental motion to seal the designated portions of the exhibit that defendant Anthem has indicated it may use at trial under the complete non-disclosure provision of the November 4 Order. The Court FURTHER GRANTS Patient First Corporation's supplemental motion to seal the two exhibits at issue under the complete non-disclosure provision of the November 4 Order. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/23/16. (DMK)
December 23, 2016 Filing 419 NOTICE of Submission of Anthem, Inc.'s Letter Motion to Seal Designated Deposition Testimony by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Submission to Special Master)(Jasinski, Douglas)
December 23, 2016 Filing 418 Report & Recommendation No. 17 of the Special Master (re: Motions to Seal submitted by non-parties Geisinger Health Plan, Bon Secours Health System, LRGHealthcare, and Patient First Corporation). Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on December 23, 2016. (Levie, Richard)
December 23, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Bench Trial resumed and held on 12/23/2016. Defense Witness: Dr. Mark A. Israel. Bench Trial continued to 1/3/2017 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (jth)
December 22, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Bench Trial resumed and held on 12/22/2016. Defense Witnesses: Dr. Lorna Fowdur and Dr. Mark A. Israel. Bench Trial continued to 12/23/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (Court Reporters: Janice Dickman and Elizabeth Saint-Loth) (jth)
December 21, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Bench Trial resumed and held on 12/21/2016. Plaintiffs' Witness: Dr. David Dranove; Defense Witnesses: Christine Burke, Paige Rothermel. Bench Trial continued to 12/22/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (Court Reporters: Janice Dickman AM / Lisa Moreira PM) (jth)
December 20, 2016 Filing 417 Proposed Findings of Fact by ANTHEM, INC.. (Curran, Christopher) (Main Document 417 replaced on 12/21/2016; marked face of document as Redacted) (znmw).
December 20, 2016 Filing 416 Proposed Findings of Fact by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Jacobs, Jon)
December 20, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Bench Trial resumed and held on 12/20/2016. Plaintiffs' Witnesses: Victoria Mahoney, Dr. David Dranove. Bench Trial continued to 12/21/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (Court Reporters: Janice Dickman AM / Lisa Moreira PM) (jth)
December 20, 2016 Filing 415 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master by SENTARA HEALTHCARE (Burns, James)
December 20, 2016 Filing 414 NOTICE NON-PARTY PATIENT FIRSTS NOTICE OF LETTER MOTION TO SEAL PROPOSED EVIDENCE by PATIENT FIRST CORPORATION (Hanes, Patrick)
December 20, 2016 Filing 413 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master by BON SECOURS HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. (Mumford, John)
December 20, 2016 Filing 412 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master by GEISINGER HEALTH PLAN (Amezcua, Carrie)
December 19, 2016 Filing 411 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by ANTHEM, INC.. (Curran, Christopher) Modified event title on 12/20/2016 (znmw).
December 19, 2016 Filing 410 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Jacobs, Jon) Modified event title on 12/20/2016 (znmw).
December 19, 2016 Filing 409 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master by CIGNA CORP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bial, Joseph)
December 19, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Bench Trial resumed and held on 12/19/2016. Plaintiffs' Witnesses: Claire Harlin, George Wheeler, Lisa Guertin, Eugene Rapisardi. Bench Trial continued to 12/20/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (Court Reporters: Janice Dickman AM; Lisa Moreira PM) (jth)
December 19, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: each side shall file Redacted versions of the proposed findings of fact for phase one on the docket by 12/20/2016. (jth)
December 17, 2016 Filing 406 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Comenetz on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Comenetz, Aaron)
December 16, 2016 Filing 408 SEALED DOCUMENT (Proposed Findings of Fact Phase I) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF TENNESSEE. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(znmw)
December 16, 2016 Filing 407 SEALED DOCUMENT (Proposed Findings of Fact Phase I) filed by ANTHEM, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(znmw)
December 16, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Bench Trial resumed and held on 12/16/2016. Plaintiffs' Witnesses: Martin Francis Gorse, Jr., Paul Andrew Mifsud, and Henry D. Lipman. Bench Trial continued to 12/19/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (Court Reporters: Janice Dickman and Elizabeth Saint-Loth) (jth)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #402 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #403 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. It is ORDERED that the motions for leave to file under seal the proposed findings of fact for phase one are GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that each side shall file redacted versions of the proposed findings of fact for phase one on the docket by December 20, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/16/16. (DMK)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that the Court will hear testimony full days as follows: Monday, December 19 starting at 9:30 a.m.; Tuesday, December 20 starting at 10:00 a.m.; Wednesday, December 21 starting at 9:30 a.m.; and Thursday, December 22 starting at 9:30 a.m. The Court can sit until 12:00 noon on Friday, December 23, if necessary. It is further ORDERED that December 27 and 28, previously set as trial days, are removed from the calendar. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/16/16. (DMK)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #377 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting #405 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Court notes that Alex Romain has re-entered an appearance on behalf of Willis Towers Watson, PLC #399 as of December 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/16/16. (DMK)
December 15, 2016 Filing 405 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maier, Gloria)
December 15, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Bench Trial resumed and held on 12/15/2016. Plaintiff Witnesses: Thomas Baskerville Hawthorne, Burke King. Bench Trial continued to 12/16/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (Court Reporters: Janice Dickman, Elizabet Saint-Loth) (jth)
December 15, 2016 Filing 404 TRIAL BRIEF / Anthem's Post-Trial Conclusions of Law Phase I: "National Accounts" by ANTHEM, INC.. (Curran, Christopher)
December 15, 2016 Filing 403 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Proposed Findings of Fact Phase I)(Jacobs, Jon)
December 15, 2016 Filing 402 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ANTHEM, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Anthem's Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact Phase I: "National Accounts", #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Curran, Christopher)
December 15, 2016 Filing 401 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Proposed Conclusions of Law by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Kiernan, Kathleen)
December 15, 2016 Filing 400 NOTICE by Non-Party LRGHealthcare of Submission of Motion to Seal to Special Master by LRGHEALTHCARE (Harlan, Emily)
December 15, 2016 Filing 399 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Giscard Romain on behalf of WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC (Romain, Alex)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER adopting #392 Report & Recommendation No. 15 of Special Master and #396 Report & Recommendation No. 16 of Special Master in their entirety. For the reasons set forth in Report & Recommendation No. 15, the Court GRANTS ConnectiCare, Inc.'s supplemental Motion to Seal the redacted portions of the document at issue under the complete non-disclosure provision of the November 4 Order. It further GRANTS Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas City's supplemental Motion to Seal the exhibit and attachments at issue under the complete non-disclosure provision of the November 4 Order. For the reasons set forth in Report & Recommendation No. 16, the Court GRANTS Medical Mutual of Ohio's supplemental Motion to Seal the redacted portions of the document at issue under the complete non-disclosure provision of the November 4 Order. It further GRANTS EmblemHealth, Inc.'s supplemental Motion to Seal the highlighted redactions under the complete non-disclosure provision of the November 4 Order. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/15/16. (DMK)
December 14, 2016 Filing 398 NOTICE of Submission of Anthem, Inc.'s Letter Motion to Seal Designated Deposition Testimony by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Submission to Special Master)(Jasinski, Douglas)
December 14, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Bench Trial resumed and held on 12/14/2016. Plaintiff Witnesses: Rachel Rowe, Harold Berfiend. Bench Trial continued to 12/15/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (jth)
December 14, 2016 Filing 397 NOTICE of Appearance by Soyoung Choe on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Choe, Soyoung)
December 13, 2016 Filing 396 Report & Recommendation No. 16 of Special Master (re: Motions to Seal submitted by non-parties Medical Mutual of Ohio and EmblemHealth, Inc.) Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on December 13, 2016. (Levie, Richard)
December 13, 2016 Filing 395 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Daniel Brenner on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Brenner, Nathan)
December 13, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Bench Trial resumed and held on 12/13/2016. Bench Trial continued to 12/14/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (jth)
December 12, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Bench Trial resumed and held on 12/12/2016. Plaintiff Witnesses: Dr. David Dranove, Ron Quintero. Bench Trial continued to 12/13/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (Court Reporters Janice Dickman AM; Elizabeth Saint-Loth PM) (jth)
December 12, 2016 Filing 394 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Non-Party EmblemHealth, Inc.'s Letter Motion Pursuant to the Stipulated and Protected Order on the Use of Confidential Information at Trial by EMBLEM HEALTH, INC. (Nielsen, Mark)
December 12, 2016 Filing 393 NOTICE OF LETTER MOTION TO SEAL PROPOSED EVIDENCE by Medical Mutual of Ohio (Lietz, David)
December 11, 2016 Filing 392 Report & Recommendation No. 15 of the Special Master (re: non-party ConnectiCare and Blue Cross Blue Shield - Kansas City Motions to Seal). Signed by Judge Rchard A. Levie (Ret.) on December 11, 2016. (Levie, Richard)
December 10, 2016 Filing 391 NOTICE OF LETTER MOTION TO SEAL PROPOSED EVIDENCE by BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF KANSAS CITY (Kramer, Jacob)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER adopting Report & Recommendation No. 14 #389 in its entirety. For the reasons set forth in the Special Master's Report & Recommendation No. 14, the Court GRANTS Aon's supplemental motion to seal the document at issue under the complete non-disclosure provision of the Court's order of November 4. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/9/16. (DMK)
December 9, 2016 Filing 390 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Non-Party Connecticare, Inc.'s Letter Motion Pursuant to the Stipulated Order on the use of Confidential Information at Trial by CONNETICARE, INC. (Nielsen, Mark)
December 9, 2016 Filing 389 Report & Recommendation No. 14 of Special Master (re: non-party Aon's Motion to Seal). Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on December 9, 2016. (Levie, Richard)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #385 Motion for Leave to Present Limited Rebuttal Testimony by Dr. Mark Israel. It is ORDERED that defendant's motion is DENIED. Dr. Israel already did rebut, or he had the opportunity to rebut, Dr. Dranove's testimony. And while the defense has the burden to come forward with any efficiencies evidence or other evidence that the merger is not likely to be anticompetitive, as stated in United States v. Baker Hughes Inc., 908 F.2d 981, 983 (D.C. Cir. 1990), the burden of proof remains with plaintiffs at all times. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/8/16. (DMK)
December 8, 2016 Filing 388 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Letter Motion to Seal by AON PLC (Reeves, Amanda)
December 7, 2016 Filing 387 REPLY to opposition to motion re #385 MOTION for Leave to Present Limited Rebuttal Testimony by Dr. Mark Israel filed by ANTHEM, INC.. (Curran, Christopher)
December 7, 2016 Filing 386 Memorandum in opposition to re #385 MOTION for Leave to Present Limited Rebuttal Testimony by Dr. Mark Israel filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Fitzgerald, Scott)
December 7, 2016 Filing 385 MOTION for Leave to Present Limited Rebuttal Testimony by Dr. Mark Israel by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curran, Christopher)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER denying non-party witness Thomas DeLacey's #375 Motion to Quash. Because the government has complied with 15 U.S.C. 23, the motion to quash is DENIED. In light of the government's response to Mr. DeLacey's motion, the #376 consent motion to require the government to respond by December 8, 2016 is DENIED AS MOOT. See Order for complete details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/7/2016. (lcabj3)
December 7, 2016 Filing 383 REPLY to opposition to motion re #375 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena filed by THOMAS DELACEY. (Grove, Callyson)
December 6, 2016 Filing 382 NOTICE of Anthem, Inc.'s Corrected Response to November 28, 2016 Minute Order by ANTHEM, INC. re #379 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Jasinski, Douglas)
December 6, 2016 Filing 381 RESPONSE re #375 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bachman, Bryson)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that at the start of Phase 2 of the trial on December 14, 2016, each side shall have 30 minutes to make an opening statement concerning this phase. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/5/16. (DMK)
December 4, 2016 Filing 380 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Response to November 28, 2016 Minute Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fitzgerald, Scott)
December 2, 2016 Filing 379 NOTICE of Anthem's Response to November 28, 2016 Minute Order by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Jasinski, Douglas)
December 2, 2016 Filing 378 NOTICE of Defendant Cigna Corporation's Statement of Position on the Public Filing of Trial Exhibits by CIGNA CORP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bial, Joseph)
December 2, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Bench Trial resumed and held on 12/2/2016. Defense Witnesses: Dr. Mark A. Israel, Dr. Robert Willig; Plaintiff Witness: Dr. David Dranove; Bench Trial continued to 12/12/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (Court Reporters: Janice Dickman AM; Lisa Moreira PM) (jth)
December 2, 2016 Filing 377 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Romain, Alex)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER adopting Report & Recommendation No. 13 #373 in its entirety. For the reasons set forth in the Special Master's Report & Recommendation No. 13, the Court (a) GRANTS Harvard Pilgrim Health Care, Inc.'s supplemental Motion to Seal the redacted portions of the document at issue under the "complete non-disclosure" provision of the Court's November 4 Order, and (b) GRANTS Kaiser Permanente Health Plan, Inc.'s supplemental Motion to Seal the redacted portions of the document at issue under the "partial non-disclosure" provision of the Court's November 4 Order. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/2/16. (DMK)
December 1, 2016 Filing 376 Consent MOTION To Shorten Time for Any Opposition To Thomas Delacey's Motion To Quash Trial Subpoena re #375 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena by THOMAS DELACEY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grove, Callyson)
December 1, 2016 Filing 375 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena by THOMAS DELACEY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Grove, Callyson)
December 1, 2016 Filing 374 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Simpson Kiernan on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Kiernan, Kathleen)
December 1, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Bench Trial resumed and held on 12/1/2016. The parties are directed to supply the Court with a revised plan for phase 2 of the trial by 12/2/2016. Defense Witnesses: Shubham Singhal, Dr. Mark A. Israel. Bench Trial continued to 12/2/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (Court Reporters: Janice Dickman AM; Elizabeth Saint-Loth PM) (jth)
December 1, 2016 Filing 373 Report & Recommendation No. 13 of Special Master (re: Non-party Harvard Pilgrim Health Care & Kaiser Permanente Motions to Seal). Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on December 1, 2016. (Levie, Richard)
November 30, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Bench Trial resumed and held on 11/30/2016. Defendants' Witnesses: Stephen Schlegel, Dennis Matheis, Colin Drozdowski, Wayne DeVeydt. Bench Trial continued to 12/1/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (Court Reporters: Janice Dickman AM; Lisa Moreira PM) (jth)
November 29, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Bench Trial resumed and held on 11/29/2016. Plaintiffs Witness: Dr. David Dranove; Defendants' Witnesses: Charles M. Kendrick, Jr., Swati Mathai, Dr. Lorna Fowdur. Bench Trial continued to 11/30/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (Court Reporters: Janice Dickman AM; Elizabeth Saint-Loth PM) (jth)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that each side's proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law for each phase of the trial shall not exceed 175 pages. Text shall be double spaced and in 12 point font, including footnotes, although footnotes may be single spaced. For each side's proposed findings, facts shall be set forth by numbered paragraph and not repeated, although a paragraph may reference multiple places in the record where that fact can be found. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/29/16. (DMK)
November 29, 2016 Filing 372 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Non-Party Harvard Pilgrim Health Care, Inc.'s Motion to Seal by HARVARD PILGRIM HEALTH CARE, INC. (Biagioli, Anthony)
November 29, 2016 Filing 371 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryson Love Bachman on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Bachman, Bryson)
November 29, 2016 NOTICE OF ERROR re #365 Notice (Other); emailed to jon.jacobs@usdoj.gov, cc'd 223 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. In future: Attorneys registered as ECF filers should file own appearances; Unregistered attorneys should request ECF accounts as soon as possible. (znmw, )
November 29, 2016 Filing 370 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #358 Exhibit List, / Notice of Filing of Redacted Joint Deposition Designations and Admitted Exhibit Lists by ANTHEM, INC. (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Gidley, John)
November 29, 2016 Filing 369 NOTICE Non-Party Kaiser Permanente Health Plan, Inc.'s Notice of Letter Motion to Seal Proposed Evidence by KAISER PERMANENTE HEALTH PLAN, INC. (Scully, Elizabeth)
November 28, 2016 Filing 368 NOTICE of Appearance of John R. Read by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jacobs, Jon)
November 28, 2016 Filing 367 NOTICE of Appearance of Jennifer Hane by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jacobs, Jon)
November 28, 2016 Filing 366 NOTICE of Appearance of Bryson Bachman by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jacobs, Jon)
November 28, 2016 Filing 365 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesus Alvarado-Rivera by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jacobs, Jon)
November 28, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Bench Trial resumed and held on 11/28/2016. Plaintiff Witnesses: Dr. Charles Smith, Elizabeth "Beth" Bierbower, and Dr. David Dranove. The parties are directed to provide the Court by the end of this week a list of exhibits that have been displayed during either direct or cross examination, the parties positions as to whether they were shown to the public, objections to them being shown to the public and the parties positions as to whether they may be unsealed. Bench Trial continued to 11/29/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (Court Reporters: Janice Dickman AM; Lisa Moreira PM) (jth)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #360 Cigna's motion to redact portions of the public record. It is ORDERED that the confidential customer names inadvertently stated on the record in testimony on November 23, 2016, and as identified in the attachment to Cigna's motion, shall be redacted from the public transcript. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/28/16. (DMK)
November 27, 2016 Filing 364 NOTICE of Submission Regarding Unsealing of Testimony of Joseph Swedish and David Cordani by CIGNA CORP. (Bial, Joseph)
November 27, 2016 Filing 363 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Scott Struve on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Struve, Ryan)
November 27, 2016 Filing 362 NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS' POSITION ON UNSEALING TRIAL TESTIMONY AND RELATED DOCUMENTS by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Struve, Ryan)
November 27, 2016 Filing 361 NOTICE /Anthem's Response to the Court's Minute Order Regarding the Sealing of Transcripts by ANTHEM, INC. (Curran, Christopher)
November 25, 2016 Filing 360 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by CIGNA CORP. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #2 Redactions to the Public Record)(Bial, Joseph)
November 23, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Anthem is directed to file a public version of exhibits one through nine to the Joint Deposition Designations and Admitted Exhibit Lists redacting the confidential portions by 11/29/2016. (jth)
November 23, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Bench Trial resumed held on 11/23/2016. Plaintiff Witnesses: Gerald Kertesz, Jeffrey Thackeray. Bench Trial continued to 11/28/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (Court Reporters Janice Dickman and Elizabeth Saint-Loth) (jth)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #359 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. It is ORDERED that Anthem's Motion to Seal exhibits one through nine to the JointDeposition Designations and Admitted Exhibit Lists is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Anthem will file a public version of these exhibits redacting the confidential portions by November 29, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/23/16. (DMK)
November 22, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Bench Trial resumed and held on 11/22/2016. Plaintiff Witnesses: Joseph Swedish; David Cordani; Gerald Kertesz. Bench Trial continued to 11/23/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. The parties are directed to inform the Court by Monday morning, November 28, 2016, which portions, if any, of the transcripts may be unsealed. (Court Reporters: Janice Dickman AM; Lisa Moreira PM;) (jth)
November 21, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Bench Trial begun and held on 11/21/2016. Plaintiff Witnesses: Randall Abbott; and Joseph Swedish; Bench Trial continued to 11/22/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (Court Reporters: Janice Dickman AM; Elizabeth Saint-Loth PM) (jth)
November 21, 2016 Filing 359 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ANTHEM, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal Exhibits One Through Nine to the Joint Deposition Designations and Admitted Exhibit Lists #358 )(Gidley, John)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER adopting Report & Recommendation No. 9 #345 , Report & Recommendation No. 10 #349 , Report & Recommendation No. 11 #351 , and Report & Recommendation No. 12 #353 , in their entirety. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/21/16. (DMK)
November 21, 2016 Filing 358 Exhibit List / Joint Deposition Designations and Admitted Exhibit Lists by ANTHEM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Gidley, John)
November 21, 2016 Filing 357 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam T. Severt on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Severt, Adam)
November 21, 2016 Filing 356 NOTICE of Appearance of David L. Snyder by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jacobs, Jon)
November 21, 2016 Filing 355 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Schwingler by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jacobs, Jon)
November 21, 2016 Filing 354 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry J. Hauser by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jacobs, Jon)
November 20, 2016 Filing 353 Report & Recommendation no. 12 of Special Master (re: Non-Party McKinsey Supplemental Motion to Seal). Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on November 20, 2016. (Levie, Richard)
November 20, 2016 Filing 352 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF MCKINSEYS SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO SEAL CERTAIN CONFIDENTIAL TRIAL EXHIBITS by MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES re #214 Order (Schmidt, Amelia)
November 20, 2016 Filing 351 Report & Recommendation No. 11 of Special Master (re: Non-party Harvard Pilgrim Health Motion to Seal). Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on November 20, 2016. (Levie, Richard)
November 20, 2016 Filing 350 NOTICE of Submission To Special Master Of Non-Party Harvard Pilgrim Health Care, Inc.'s Motion To Seal by HARVARD PILGRIM HEALTH CARE, INC. (Biagioli, Anthony)
November 20, 2016 Filing 349 Report & Recommendation No. 10 of the Special Master (Re: Party Motions to Seal Trial Exhibits and Deposition Testimony). Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on November 20, 2016. (Levie, Richard)
November 19, 2016 Filing 348 Memorandum in opposition to re #209 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Anthem's Redacted Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Declaration of Shubham Singhal and Testimony of Defendants' Experts Relying Upon That Declaration filed by ANTHEM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Claude G. Szyfer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Declaration of Jack E. Pace III, #9 Exhibit A, #10 Exhibit B)(Curran, Christopher)
November 19, 2016 Filing 347 Memorandum in opposition to re #210 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Anthem's Redacted Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Defendants' Declaration and Testimony from Defendants' Expert Witnesses Relying Upon Those Declarations filed by ANTHEM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Curran, Christopher)
November 19, 2016 Filing 346 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on November 17, 2016; Page Numbers: 1-73. Date of Issuance: November 18, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 12/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/17/2017.(Dickman, Janice)
November 19, 2016 Filing 345 Report & Recommendation of Special Master No. 9 (re: Non-party Motions to Seal submitted by Bon Secours and HealthSmart). Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on November 19, 2016. (Levie, Richard)
November 18, 2016 Filing 344 NOTICE of Submission of Anthem, Inc.'s Second Supplement to Its November 8, 2016 Letter Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits by ANTHEM, INC. re #299 Notice (Other), #335 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Submission to Special Master)(Jasinski, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 343 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master by CIGNA CORP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bial, Joseph)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER adopting Report & Recommendation No. 8 #340 in its entirety. The Court notes that at the conclusion of the trial in this matter, it may revisit the sealing of documents relied upon by the parties or the Court in connection with its findings of fact. The Court will solicit input from non-parties at that time. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/18/16. (DMK)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER on Report & Recommendation No. 7 and Objections to Remaining Exhibits. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/18/16. (DMK)
November 18, 2016 Filing 341 NOTICE of Filing of Response to Special Master Order No. 4 by HEALTHSMART BENEFIT SOLUTIONS, INC. (Whitelock, Julia)
November 17, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Bench Trial set for 11/21/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth)
November 17, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Pretrial Conference resumed and held on 11/17/2016. Pretrial Conference concluded on 11/17/2016. ORDER TO BE ISSUED. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (jth)
November 16, 2016 Filing 340 Report & Recommendation No. 8 of the Special Master. Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on November 16, 2016. (Levie, Richard)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 339 Special Master Order No. 4 (Re: Non-Party Motions to Seal filed by Bon Secours Health Systems, Inc. and HealthSmart Benefit Solutions, Inc.). Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on November 16, 2016. (Levie, Richard)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying as moot #307 defendants' Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/16/16. (DMK)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER on Motions in Limine #209 #210 #211 and #212 and on objections to certain exhibits. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/16/16. (DMK)
November 16, 2016 Filing 337 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel McCuaig on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (McCuaig, Daniel)
November 16, 2016 Filing 336 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master by PHYSICIAN'S HEALTH PLAN OF NORTH INDIANA, INC. "Leave to file GRANTED" signed by Judge Amy B. Jackson on 11/16/2016 (jf)
November 15, 2016 Filing 335 NOTICE of Submission of Anthem, Inc.'s Supplement to November 8, 2016 Letter Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits by ANTHEM, INC. re #299 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Submission to Special Master)(Jasinski, Douglas)
November 15, 2016 Filing 334 OBJECTIONS re #328 Special Master Report & Recommendation No. 7 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jacobs, Jon) Modified on 11/16/2016 to correct docket event (jf). Modified on 11/17/2016 (znmw).
November 15, 2016 Filing 333 NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE PURSUANT TO NOVEMBER 10, 2016 MINUTE ORDER (Public) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jacobs, Jon)
November 15, 2016 Filing 332 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on 11/14/16; Page Numbers: 1-65. Date of Issuance:11/15/16. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/16/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/13/2017.(Dickman, Janice) Modified on 11/16/2016 (znmw). Modified on 11/21/2016 (zrdj).
November 14, 2016 Filing 331 NOTICE / Anthem's Notice Pursuant to the Court's November 8, 2016 Minute Order [Public Version] by ANTHEM, INC. (Curran, Christopher)
November 14, 2016 Filing 330 NOTICE / Anthem's Notice Pursuant to the Court's November 10, 2016 Minute Order by ANTHEM, INC. (Curran, Christopher)
November 14, 2016 Filing 329 SEALED VERSION re #328 Report & Recommendation No. 7 of Special Master (regarding Deposition Designations) signed by RICHARD A. LEVIE (Ret.) on November 14, 2016. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
November 14, 2016 Filing 328 Report & Recommendation No. 7 of Special Master (regarding Deposition Designations). Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on November 14, 2016. (Levie, Richard)
November 14, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Pretrial Conference begun and held on 11/14/2016. Pretrial Conference continued to 11/17/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Order to be Issued. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (jth)
November 13, 2016 Filing 327 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Hammond on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hammond, Matthew)
November 11, 2016 Filing 326 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Risdon Hanes on behalf of PATIENT FIRST CORPORATION (Hanes, Patrick)
November 10, 2016 Filing 325 PRETRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs' Pretrial Brief by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Jacobs, Jon) Modified event title on 11/14/2016 (znmw).
November 10, 2016 Filing 324 PRETRIAL BRIEF / Anthem's Pretrial Brief by ANTHEM, INC.. (Curran, Christopher) Modified event title on 11/14/2016 (znmw).
November 10, 2016 Filing 323 NOTICE of Submission by CALIFORNIA PUBLIC EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Renigar, Gwendolyn)
November 10, 2016 Filing 322 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Jacobs, Jon)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 320 Special Master Order No. 3 (Regarding Non-Party Motions to Seal). Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on November 10, 2016. (Levie, Richard)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. If Anthem believes that the document at docket # 307-1 (as opposed to the declarations themselves) needs to be sealed, it must specifically identify by Monday, November 14, 2016, the confidential information that the list of names contains. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/10/2016. (lcabj3)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting N. Kent Smith's #315 , #316 , #317 , and #318 motions to withdraw as counsel. The Clerk is directed to remove Mr. Smith as attorney of record in this case. An attorney from the same firm has #311 #312 #313 #314 entered an appearance as counsel on behalf of each movant and the representation continues. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/10/2016.(lcabj3)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file notice with the Court by 5:00 today, November 10, 2016 stating which, if any, of the declarants identified in defendants' November 9, 2016 notice [307-1] have been deposed by plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/10/2016.(lcabj3)
November 10, 2016 Filing 318 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by NEW WEST PHYSICIANS, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Nolan)
November 10, 2016 Filing 317 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CENTRA HEALTH AND PIEDMONT COMMUNITY HEALTH (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Nolan)
November 10, 2016 Filing 316 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CENTURA HEALTH CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Nolan)
November 10, 2016 Filing 315 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH PLANS, INC., INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Nolan)
November 10, 2016 Filing 314 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Honig on behalf of NEW WEST PHYSICIANS, P.C. (Honig, David) (Main Document 314 replaced on 11/14/2016) (znmw).
November 10, 2016 Filing 313 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Honig on behalf of CENTRA HEALTH AND PIEDMONT COMMUNITY HEALTH (Honig, David) (Main Document 313 replaced on 11/14/2016) (znmw).
November 10, 2016 Filing 312 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Honig on behalf of CENTURA HEALTH CORPORATION (Honig, David) (Main Document 312 replaced on 11/14/2016) (znmw).
November 10, 2016 Filing 311 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Honig on behalf of INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH PLANS, INC., INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH, INC. (Honig, David) (Main Document 311 replaced on 11/14/2016) (znmw).
November 10, 2016 Filing 310 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Foster on behalf of STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE (Foster, Joseph)
November 9, 2016 Filing 321 NOTICE of Non-Party Submissions to Special Master by PAUL FLOTKEN. "Leave to File Granted" by Judge Amy B. Jackson. (zrdj) Modified on 11/14/2016 (znmw).
November 9, 2016 Filing 319 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION TO SPECIAL MASTER by DENVER HEALTH AND HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, DENVER HEALTH MEDICAL PLAN, INC. (zrdj)
November 9, 2016 Filing 309 NOTICE OF NON-PARTY SUBMISSIONS OF MOTIONS TO SEAL by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jacobs, Jon)
November 9, 2016 Filing 308 NOTICE (Second) of Submission by MEDCOST BENEFIT SERVICES (Mauler, Daniel)
November 9, 2016 Filing 307 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ANTHEM, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Anthem's Notice Pursuant to November 8, 2016 Minute Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Curran, Christopher)
November 9, 2016 Filing 306 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master by HTA Limited Cooperative (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lokker, Ellen)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #235 , #236 , #237 , and #263 , Motions for Leave of Wesley R. Powell, Francis H. Casola, Sean P. Gates, and Sara Y. Razi to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that each lawyer admitted, or at least one member of each lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/9/16. (DMK)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that the #247 Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney Danielle M. Garten of Arnold & Porter LLP as Counsel for defendant Anthem, Inc. is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to remove Danielle M. Garten as attorney of record in this case. Attorneys from the same firm have entered their appearances as counsel on behalf of defendant and their representation continues. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/09/2016. (jth)
November 9, 2016 Filing 305 NOTICE of Submission by ALLIED BENEFIT SYSTEMS, INC. (McWilliams, O'Kelly)
November 9, 2016 NOTICE OF ERROR re #223 Notice (Other); emailed to ejs@stevenslee.com, cc'd 211 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. Attorney Stein's membership with the bar of this court has lapsed and needs to be renewed. Instructions can be found here: http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-and-renewal-information (znmw, )
November 9, 2016 NOTICE OF ERROR re #290 Notice of Appearance; emailed to bmwhite@perkinscoie.com, cc'd 211 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. Attorney White's membership with the bar of this court has lapsed and needs to be renewed. Instructions can be found here: http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-and-renewal-information (znmw, )
November 9, 2016 NOTICE OF ERROR re #285 Notice (Other); emailed to aromain@wc.com, cc'd 211 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. Attorney Romain's membership with the bar of this court has lapsed and needs to be renewed. Instructions can be found here: http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-and-renewal-information (znmw, )
November 9, 2016 NOTICE OF ERROR re #272 Notice of Appearance; emailed to Steven.Albertson@skadden.com, cc'd 211 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. Attorney Albertson's membership with the bar of this court has lapsed and needs to be renewed. Instructions can be found here: http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-and-renewal-information (znmw, )
November 9, 2016 Filing 304 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Sentara's Motion for an Order Requiring that Certain Confidential Information be Filed Under Seal by Sentara Healthcare (Burns, James)
November 9, 2016 Filing 303 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #210 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS DECLARATIONS AND TESTIMONY FROM DEFENDANTS EXPERT WITNESSES RELYING UPON THOSE DECLARATIONS, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Jon)
November 9, 2016 Filing 302 NOTICE of Appearance by James Michael Burns on behalf of Sentara Healthcare (Burns, James)
November 9, 2016 Filing 301 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of BCBSNC's Motion for an Order Requiring that Certain Confidential Information be Filed Under Seal by Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Carolina (Burns, James)
November 9, 2016 Filing 300 NOTICE of Appearance by James Michael Burns on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Carolina (Burns, James)
November 9, 2016 NOTICE OF ERROR re #269 Notice (Other); emailed to dmauler@rpb-law.com, cc'd 201 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. Attorney Mauler's membership with the bar of this court has lapsed and needs to be renewed; Instructions can be found here: http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-and-renewal-information (znmw, )
November 9, 2016 NOTICE OF ERROR re #259 Notice (Other); emailed to fosterm@pepperlaw.com, cc'd 197 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. Attorney Foster's membership with the bar of this court has lapsed and needs to be renewed; Instructions can be found here: http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-and-renewal-information (znmw, )
November 9, 2016 NOTICE OF ERROR re #241 Notice (Other); emailed to mcn@groom.com, cc'd 194 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. Attorney Nielsen's membership with the bar of this court has lapsed and needs to be renewed. Instructions can be found here: http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-and-renewal-information (znmw, )
November 8, 2016 Filing 299 NOTICE of Submission of Anthem, Inc.'s Notice of Letter Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits and Designated Deposition Testimony by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Submission to Special Master)(Jasinski, Douglas)
November 8, 2016 Filing 298 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master by CIGNA CORP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bial, Joseph)
November 8, 2016 Filing 297 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Third Party Motion to Seal Specified Documents by Northwell Health, Inc. (Curran, Patrick)
November 8, 2016 Filing 296 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick John Curran on behalf of Northwell Health, Inc. (Curran, Patrick)
November 8, 2016 Filing 295 NOTICE of Submission of Letter Motion to Seal to Special Master Levie by UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Documents Subject to Motion to Seal)(Botti, Mark)
November 8, 2016 Filing 294 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Non-Party to Seal Documents and Deposition Excerpts by SHARP HEALTHCARE (Curran, Patrick)
November 8, 2016 Filing 293 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick John Curran on behalf of SHARP HEALTHCARE (Curran, Patrick)
November 8, 2016 Filing 292 NOTICE (Notice of Submission to Special Master of Non-Party Centene Corporation's Motion to Seal) by Centene Corporation (Albertson, Steven)
November 8, 2016 Filing 291 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master by INTEL CORPORATION (White, Brandon)
November 8, 2016 Filing 290 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Michael White on behalf of INTEL CORPORATION, INTEL CORPORATION (White, Brandon)
November 8, 2016 Filing 289 NOTICE of Motion to Seal Proposed Evidence at Trial by UNIVERSITY OF COLORADO HEALTH (Waeckerlin, Eric)
November 8, 2016 Filing 288 NOTICE of Submission of Letter Motion to Seal by Innovation Health Holdings, LL (Fee, J.)
November 8, 2016 Filing 287 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master by DAVITA INC. (Bower, Elizabeth)
November 8, 2016 Filing 286 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Bower on behalf of DAVITA INC. (Bower, Elizabeth)
November 8, 2016 Filing 285 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Motion to Seal by WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC (Romain, Alex)
November 8, 2016 Filing 284 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Non-Party Aetna Inc.'s Letter Motion to Seal Confidential Information by AETNA INC. (Majoras, John)
November 8, 2016 Filing 283 NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie G. Amezcua on behalf of GEISINGER HEALTH PLAN (Amezcua, Carrie)
November 8, 2016 Filing 282 NOTICE of Submission of Letter Motion to the Special Master by HCA HOLDINGS, INC. (Herrick, Peter)
November 8, 2016 Filing 281 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master by CATERPILLAR INC. (Farer, Jennifer)
November 8, 2016 Filing 280 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION TO SPECIAL MASTER by NORTHEAST GEORGIA HEALTH SYSTEM (Spigel, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2016 Filing 279 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master by BUCK CONSULTANTS LLC (Murdock, John)
November 8, 2016 Filing 278 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION TO SPECIAL MASTER by SUTTER HEALTH (Spigel, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2016 Filing 277 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master re Motion to Seal Documents and Testimony by CONSORTIUM HEALTH PLANS, INC.. (Conner, Ian) Modified event title on 11/9/2016 (znmw).
November 8, 2016 Filing 276 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION TO SPECIAL MASTER by PIEDMONT HEALTHCARE (Spigel, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2016 Filing 275 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master by TRUSTMARK SERVICES COMPANY (Jeffery, Joseph)
November 8, 2016 Filing 274 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master re Motion to Seal Documents by BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD ASSOCIATION (Conner, Ian) Modified event title on 11/9/2016 (znmw).
November 8, 2016 Filing 273 NOTICE of Minuteman Health Inc.'s Letter to Seal Testimony and Documents by Minuteman Health Inc. (Foster, Matthew)
November 8, 2016 Filing 272 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M Albertson on behalf of Centene Corporation (Albertson, Steven)
November 8, 2016 Filing 271 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Jeffery on behalf of TRUSTMARK SERVICES COMPANY (Jeffery, Joseph)
November 8, 2016 Filing 270 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master re Motion to File Under Seal by BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA (CALIFORNIA PHYSICIAN'S SERVICE) (Conner, Ian) Modified event title on 11/9/2016 (znmw).
November 8, 2016 Filing 269 NOTICE of Submission of Motion to Seal by MedCost Benefit Services (Mauler, Daniel)
November 8, 2016 Filing 268 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Robert Conner on behalf of BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA (CALIFORNIA PHYSICIAN'S SERVICE) (Conner, Ian)
November 8, 2016 Filing 267 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Letter Motion to Seal by AON PLC (Reeves, Amanda)
November 8, 2016 Filing 266 NOTICE of Submission of Letter Motion by Healthsmart Benefit Solutions, Inc. (Whitelock, Julia)
November 8, 2016 Filing 265 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Robert Conner on behalf of BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD ASSOCIATION (Conner, Ian)
November 8, 2016 Filing 264 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Robert Conner on behalf of CONSORTIUM HEALTH PLANS, INC.. (Conner, Ian)
November 8, 2016 Filing 263 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sara Y. Razi, :Firm- Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP, :Address- 900 G Street, NW, Washington DC 20001. Phone No. - (202) 636-5582. Fax No. - (202) 636-5502 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4737765. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HCA HOLDINGS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Herrick, Peter)
November 8, 2016 Filing 262 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Letter Motion to Seal Certain Documents by ASCENSION HEALTH re #214 Order (Petteway, Kara)
November 8, 2016 Filing 261 NOTICE of Submission of Letter Motion to Seal by Hartford HealthCare Corporation (Camden, James)
November 8, 2016 Filing 260 NOTICE Non-Party Kaiser Permanente Health Plan, Inc.'s Notice of Letter Motion to Seal Proposed Evidence by Kaiser Permanente Health Plan, Inc. (Scully, Elizabeth)
November 8, 2016 Filing 259 NOTICE of Non-Party Mercer's Letter Motion to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits and Deposition Testimony by Mercer (Foster, Matthew)
November 8, 2016 Filing 258 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Anne Scully on behalf of Kaiser Permanente Health Plan, Inc. (Scully, Elizabeth)
November 8, 2016 Filing 257 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Third Pary to Seal Specified Documents by Indiana University Health Plans, Inc., Indiana University Health, Inc. (Smith, Nolan)
November 8, 2016 Filing 256 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master by MVP Health Care (Pusateri, Michael) Modified on 11/8/2016 (td).
November 8, 2016 Filing 255 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Third Party to Seal Specified Documents by New West Physicians, P.C. (Smith, Nolan)
November 8, 2016 Filing 254 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Third Party to Seal Specified Documents by Centura Health Corporation (Smith, Nolan)
November 8, 2016 Filing 253 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Third Party to Seal Specified Documents by Centra Health and Piedmont Community Health (Smith, Nolan)
November 8, 2016 Filing 252 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION TO SPECIAL MASTER by HEALTHSCOPE BENEFITS, INC. (Bramnick, Michael)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that defendants shall file notice with the Court by November 10, 2016 stating which if any of the declarants whose declarations are at stake in plaintiffs' motion in limine #210 were named as witnesses in defendants' initial, supplemental, or final witness list. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/8/16. (DMK)
November 8, 2016 Filing 251 NOTICE of Appearance by Nolan Kent Smith on behalf of Centra Health and Piedmont Community Health (Smith, Nolan) (Main Document 251 replaced on 11/9/2016) (znmw).
November 8, 2016 Filing 250 NOTICE of Appearance by Nolan Kent Smith on behalf of Centura Health Corporation (Smith, Nolan) (Main Document 250 replaced on 11/9/2016) (znmw).
November 8, 2016 Filing 249 NOTICE of Submission To Special Master Of Non-Party Harvard Pilgrim Health Care, Inc.s Motion To Seal by HARVARD PILGRIM HEALTH CARE, INC. re #214 Order (Biagioli, Anthony)
November 8, 2016 Filing 248 NOTICE of Appearance by Nolan Kent Smith on behalf of Indiana University Health, Inc., Indiana University Health Plans, Inc. (Smith, Nolan) (Main Document 248 replaced on 11/9/2016) (znmw).
November 8, 2016 Filing 247 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Danielle M. Garten by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Garten, Danielle)
November 8, 2016 Filing 246 NOTICE of Appearance by Nolan Kent Smith on behalf of New West Physicians, P.C. (Smith, Nolan) (Main Document 246 replaced on 11/9/2016) (znmw).
November 8, 2016 Filing 245 NOTICE of Submission of Letter Motion to Seal by VIRGINIA HEALTH NETWORK, INC (Bowser, Joseph)
November 8, 2016 Filing 244 NOTICE of Submission of McKinsey's Motion To Seal Certain Trial Exhibits by McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States re #214 Order (Schmidt, Amelia)
November 8, 2016 Filing 243 NOTICE Of Submission To The Special Master by HUMANA INC. (Johnson, Shawn)
November 8, 2016 Filing 242 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION TO THE SPECIAL MASTER OF NON-PARTY CONNECTICARE, INC.S LETTER MOTION PURSUANT TO THE STIPULATED ORDER ON THE USE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AT TRIAL by CONNETICARE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Nielsen, Mark)
November 8, 2016 Filing 241 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION TO THE SPECIAL MASTER OF NON-PARTY EMBLEMHEALTH, INC.S LETTER MOTION PURSUANT TO THE STIPULATED ORDER ON THE USE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AT TRIAL by EMBLEM HEALTH, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Nielsen, Mark)
November 8, 2016 Filing 240 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C. Herrick on behalf of HCA HOLDINGS, INC. (Herrick, Peter)
November 8, 2016 Filing 239 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master by BON SECOURS HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. (Mumford, John)
November 8, 2016 Filing 238 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION TO THE SPECIAL MASTER OF MOTION BY COLLECTIVEHEALTH, INC. TO SEAL TRIAL EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITION TESTIMONY by CollectiveHealth (Willcox, Thomas)
November 8, 2016 Filing 237 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sean P. Gates, :Firm- Charis Lex P.C., :Address- 16 N. Marengo Ave., Suite 300. Phone No. - 626.508.1717. Fax No. - 626.508.1730 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4737164. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CollectiveHealth (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Declaration of Sean P. Gates in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion)(Willcox, Thomas)
November 8, 2016 Filing 236 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Francis H. Casola, :Firm- Woods Rogers PLC, :Address- PO Box 14125. Phone No. - 540-983-7716. Fax No. - 540-983-7711 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4737171. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by VIRGINIA HEALTH NETWORK, INC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Francis H. Casola, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowser, Joseph)
November 8, 2016 Filing 235 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Wesley R. Powell, :Firm- WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP, :Address- 787 Seventh Avenue, New York, NY 10019. Phone No. - (212) 728-8264. Fax No. - (212) 728-8111 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4736829 Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DAVITA INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bower, Elizabeth) Modified on 11/8/2016 to add payment receipt number (zrdj).
November 8, 2016 Filing 234 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Joseph Botti on behalf of UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED (Botti, Mark)
November 8, 2016 Filing 233 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Letter Motion to Seal by TUFTS ASSOCIATED HEALTH PLANS, INC. (Wollin, David)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' Sealed Motions #230 #232 for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter defendants' opposition briefs and attachments [230-1 through 230-9] and [232-1 through 232-12] on the docket under seal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall file public versions of these documents by November 21, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/8/16.(DMK)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #225 Motion for Leave of Gloria K. Maier to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/8/16. (DMK)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #215 #216 Motions for Leave of Stacey Fode and Amanda Wofford to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyers admitted, or at least one member of each lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/8/16. (DMK)
November 8, 2016 Filing 232 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ANTHEM, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Anthem's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Declaration of Shubham Singhal and Testimony from Defendants' Experts Relying Upon that Declaration #204 #209 , #2 Declaration of Jack E. Pace III, #3 Exhibit A to Pace Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Pace Declaration, #5 Declaration of Claude G. Szyfer, #6 Exhibit 1 to Szyfer Declaration, #7 Exhibit 2 to Szyfer Declaration, #8 Exhibit 3 to Szyfer Declaration, #9 Exhibit 4 to Szyfer Declaration, #10 Exhibit 5 to Szyfer Declaration, #11 Exhibit 6 to Szyfer Declaration, #12 Text of Proposed Order, #13 Text of Proposed Order Granting Sealing)(Curran, Christopher)
November 7, 2016 Filing 231 Memorandum in opposition to re #206 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL, #211 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) / Anthem's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony in Senator Benjamin Nelson's Declaration and Testimony of Experts Relying Upon that Declaration filed by ANTHEM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Heather M. Burke, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Curran, Christopher)
November 7, 2016 Filing 230 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ANTHEM, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Anthem's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Defendants' Declarations and Testimony from Defendants' Expert Witness Relying Upon Those Declarations #205 #210 , #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Text of Proposed Order Granting Sealing)(Curran, Christopher)
November 7, 2016 Filing 229 Memorandum in opposition to re #207 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, #212 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) / Anthem's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Purported Benefits Outside the Relevant Markets filed by ANTHEM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curran, Christopher)
November 7, 2016 Filing 228 NOTICE of Submission by Stamford Health, Inc. re #214 Order (Park, Chong)
November 7, 2016 Filing 227 NOTICE of Submission by Yale Medicine re #214 Order (Park, Chong)
November 7, 2016 Filing 226 ENTERED IN ERROR PER COUNSEL AND REFILED AS DOCKET ENTRY NO. #227 . . . . .NOTICE of Submission by Stamford Health, Inc. re #214 Order (Park, Chong) Modified on 11/8/2016 (td). Modified on 11/8/2016 (td).
November 7, 2016 Filing 225 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Gloria K. Maier, :Firm- Williams & Connolly LLP, :Address- 725 12th St. N.W. Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 202-434-5213. Fax No. - 202-434-5029 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4736053. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Romain, Alex)
November 7, 2016 Filing 224 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Giscard Romain on behalf of WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC (Romain, Alex)
November 7, 2016 Filing 223 NOTICE of Submission of Letter Motion by CONCORD HOSPITAL, INC. (Stein, Elliott)
November 7, 2016 Filing 222 NOTICE of Letter Motion to Seal by Geisinger Health Plan (Amezcua, Carrie)
November 7, 2016 Filing 221 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn R. Johnson on behalf of HUMANA INC. (Johnson, Shawn)
November 7, 2016 Filing 220 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Paul Bowser on behalf of Virginia Health Network, Inc. (Bowser, Joseph)
November 7, 2016 Filing 219 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #212 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PURPORTED BENEFITS OUTSIDE THE RELEVANT MARKETS, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Jon)
November 7, 2016 Filing 218 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #211 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINION TESTIMONY IN SENATOR BENJAMIN NELSONS DECLARATION AND TESTIMONY FROM DEFENDANTS EXPERTS RELYING UPON THAT DECLARATION, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Jon)
November 7, 2016 Filing 217 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #209 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE DECLARATION OF ANTHEMS EFFICIENCIES EXPERT, SHUBHAM SINGHAL, AND TESTIMONY FROM DEFENDANTS EXPERTS RELYING UPON THAT DECLARATION, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Jon)
November 4, 2016 Filing 216 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Amanda Wofford, :Firm- Rose Law Firm, PA, :Address- 120 East Fourth Street, Little Rock, AR 72201. Phone No. - 5013770349. Fax No. - 5013751309 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4733476. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HEALTHSCOPE BENEFITS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bramnick, Michael)
November 4, 2016 Filing 215 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stacey Fode, :Firm- Brown Law Group, :Address- 600 B Street, Ste 650 San Diego, CA 92101. Phone No. - 619-330-1713. Fax No. - 619-330-1701 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4733276. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Buck Consultants LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Murdock, John)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 214 STIPULATED ORDER ON THE USE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AT TRIAL #213 . Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/4/2016. (jth)
November 3, 2016 Filing 213 Joint MOTION For Entry Of A Stipulated Order On The Use Of Confidential Information At Trial by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Order On The Use Of Confidential Information At Trial)(Gidley, John)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that the November 4, 2016 deadline for parties to submit motions to file exhibits or deposition excerpts under seal to the Special Master, set in the October 18, 2016 order #196 , is extended to November 8, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/3/16. (DMK)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that the November 4, 2016 deadline for nonparties to submit motions to seal documents or deposition excerpts to the Special Master, which is set forth in the order of October 18, 2016 #196 , is extended to November 8, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/3/16. (DMK)
November 2, 2016 Filing 212 SEALED MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PURPORTED BENEFITS OUTSIDE THE RELEVANT MARKETS filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zjf)
November 2, 2016 Filing 211 SEALED MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINION TESTIMONY IN SENATOR BENJ filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(zjf)
November 2, 2016 Filing 210 SEALED MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS DECLARATIONS AND TESTIMONY FROM DEFENDANTS EXPERT WITNESSES RELYING UPON THOSE DECLARATIONS filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(zjf)
November 2, 2016 Filing 209 SEALED MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE DECLARATION OF ANTHEMS EFFICIENCIES EXPERT, SHUBHAM SINGHAL, AND TESTIMONY FROM DEFENDANTS EXPERTS RELYING UPON THAT DECLARATION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(zjf) Modified on 11/3/2016 (zjf).
November 2, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Pursuant to the Minute Order filed on 11/2/2016, public versions of documents are to be filed by 11/14/2016. (tb)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Sealed Motions #204 , #205 , #206 , and #207 for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. It is ORDERED that plaintiffs' sealed motions for leave to file their motions in limine under seal are GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter motion and attachments [204-1 through 204-6] on the docket under seal. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to enter motion and attachments [205-1 through 205-7] on the docket under seal. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to enter motion and attachments [206-1 through 206-4] on the docket under seal. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to enter motion and attachments [207-1 through 207-2] on the docket under seal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file public versions of these documents by November 14, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/2/16. (DMK)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Special Master Order No. 3Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on November 1, 2016. (Levie, Richard)
October 31, 2016 Filing 207 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PURPORTED BENEFITS OUTSIDE THE RELEVANT MARKETS, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Jon) Modified event title on 11/1/2016 (znmw).
October 31, 2016 Filing 206 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINION TESTIMONY IN SENATOR BENJAMIN NELSONS DECLARATION AND TESTIMONY FROM DEFENDANTS EXPERTS RELYING UPON THAT DECLARATION, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Jon) Modified event title on 11/1/2016 (znmw).
October 31, 2016 Filing 205 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS DECLARATIONS AND TESTIMONY FROM DEFENDANTS EXPERT WITNESSES RELYING UPON THOSE DECLARATIONS, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Jon) Modified event title on 11/1/2016 (znmw).
October 31, 2016 Filing 204 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE DECLARATION OF ANTHEMS EFFICIENCIES EXPERT, SHUBHAM SINGHAL, AND TESTIMONY FROM DEFENDANTS EXPERTS RELYING UPON THAT DECLARATION, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Jon) Modified event title on 11/1/2016 (znmw).
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #203 Motion for Leave of Erica R. Sutter to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/31/16. (DMK)
October 31, 2016 Filing 203 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Erica R. Sutter, :Firm- White & Case LLP, :Address- 3000 El Camino Real, 5 Palo Alto Sq., 9th Floor, Palo Alto, CA 94360. Phone No. - (650) 213-0338. Fax No. - (650) 213-8158 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4726913. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erica R. Sutter in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Special Master Order No. 2. Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on Oct. 27, 2016. (Levie, Richard)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Special Master Order No. 1. Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on 10/24/2016. (Levie, Richard)
October 21, 2016 Filing 200 STIPULATION / Joint Stipulation by ANTHEM, INC., CIGNA CORP.. (Gidley, John)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #198 Motion for Leave of Philip M. Busman to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/21/16. (DMK)
October 20, 2016 Filing 199 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis C. Fredericks, Jr on behalf of STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE (Fredericks, Francis)
October 19, 2016 Filing 198 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Philip M. Busman, :Firm- Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP, :Address- 101 Constitution Avenue, NW Suite 900, Washington, DC 20001. Phone No. - (202) 712-2800. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4715079. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philp M. Busman in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Leddicotte, Matthew)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #194 Motion for Leave of William E. Dolan to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/19/16. (DMK)
October 19, 2016 Filing 197 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on October 18, 2016; Page Numbers: 1-39. Date of Issuance: October 19, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 11/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2017.(Dickman, Janice)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER amending Order #66 appointing Special Master and Final Case Management Order #91 . See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/18/16.(DMK)
October 18, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Case was called as a Telephone Status Conference, but the parties appeared in the Courtroom. Status Conference held on 10/18/2016. Revised Order to be issued. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (jth)
October 18, 2016 Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Kanter on behalf of CIGNA CORP. (Kanter, Jonathan)
October 18, 2016 Filing 194 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- William E. Dolan, :Firm- Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP, :Address- 2001 K Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20006. Phone No. - 202-223-7337. Fax No. - 202-204-5216 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4712329. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CIGNA CORP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William E. Dolan, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Howley, Daniel)
October 17, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: A Telephone Conference Call has been scheduled for Tuesday, October 18, 2016, at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. In a separate email Counsel for all parties will be provided with the dial in numbers and procedures to participate on the call. (jth)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #192 #193 Motions for Leave of Margot Campbell and Sasha Freedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/17/16. (DMK)
October 14, 2016 Filing 193 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sasha Freedman, :Firm- Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP, :Address- 2001 K Street, N. W. Washington, DC 20006. Phone No. - 202-223-7371. Fax No. - 202-204-7395 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4709517. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CIGNA CORP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sasha Freedman, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Howley, Daniel)
October 14, 2016 Filing 192 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Margot Campbell, :Firm- Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP, :Address- 2001 K Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20006. Phone No. - 202-223-7368. Fax No. - 202-204-7368 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4709451. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CIGNA CORP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Margot Campbell, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Howley, Daniel)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER ADOPTING Report and Recommendation No. 6. See order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/14/16. (DMK)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER ADOPTING Report and Recommendation No. 5. See order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/14/16. (DMK)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER ADOPTING Report and Recommendation No. 4. See order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/14/16. (DMK)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #188 Motion for Leave of Thomas Flynn to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/14/16. (DMK)
October 13, 2016 Filing 188 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas Flynn, :Firm- White & Case LLP, :Address- 3000 El Camino Real, 5 Palo Alto Sq., 9th Floor, Palo Alto, California 94306. Phone No. - (202) 276-3292. Fax No. - (650) 213-8158 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4706908. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas Flynn in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
October 10, 2016 Filing 187 Report & Recommendation No. 6 of the Special Master Regarding Anthem Motion to Compel [Dkt. 167] Responses to Anthem's Interrogatories Nos. 8 & 13 (Relevant Markets).Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on October 10, 2016. (Levie, Richard)
October 7, 2016 Filing 186 NOTICE of Joint Report Requested by the Court by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Fitzgerald, Scott)
October 7, 2016 Filing 185 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Rosenthal on behalf of ANTHEM, INC. (Rosenthal, Daniel)
October 7, 2016 Filing 184 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine N. Chang on behalf of ANTHEM, INC. (Chang, Christine)
October 7, 2016 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Dale Grimes on behalf of ANTHEM, INC. (Grimes, Robert)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #180 and #181 Motions for Leave of Jared S. Sunshine and Michelle Parikh to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/6/16. (DMK)
October 6, 2016 Filing 182 Report and Recommendation No. 5 of Special Master (Concerning Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Breach of Contract Letters [Dkt. No. 146]) Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on October 6, 2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Chart of In Camera Determinations) (Levie, Richard)
October 6, 2016 Filing 181 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michelle Parikh, :Firm- Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP, :Address- 2001 K Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20006. Phone No. - 202-223-7332. Fax No. - 202-204-7367 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4700302. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CIGNA CORP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michelle Parikh, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Howley, Daniel)
October 6, 2016 Filing 180 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jared S. Sunshine, :Firm- Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP, :Address- 1285 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10019. Phone No. - 212-373-3217. Fax No. - 212-373-2705 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4700286. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CIGNA CORP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jared S. Sunshine, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Howley, Daniel)
October 5, 2016 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth J. Wiener on behalf of ANTHEM, INC. (Wiener, Seth)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER regarding revisions to the Case Management Order. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/4/16. (DMK)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #164 , #165 , #168 , #176 , and #177 Motions for Leave of Cale Tolbert, Andrew Mann, Leon Miniovich, Pan Lee, and Travis Bustamante to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/4/16. (DMK)
October 3, 2016 Filing 177 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Travis A. Bustamante, :Firm- Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP, :Address- 42nd Floor, 100 North Tryon Street, Charlotte, North Carolina 28202. Phone No. - (704) 417-3044. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4696115. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Travis A. Bustamante in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Leddicotte, Matthew)
October 3, 2016 Filing 176 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Pan Lee, :Firm- White & Case LLP, :Address- 3000 El Camino Real, 5 Palo Alto Sq., 9th Floor, Palo Alto, CA 94360. Phone No. - (650) 213-0362. Fax No. - (650) 213-8158 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4695218. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pan Lee in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
October 3, 2016 Filing 175 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on 9-30-16; Page Numbers: 1-73. Date of Issuance:10-3-16. Court Reporter/Transcriber Barbara DeVico, Telephone number 202-354-3118, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 10/24/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/3/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/1/2017.(DeVico, Barbara)
October 2, 2016 Filing 174 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Anthem's Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel Plaintiff United States' Responses to Anthem's Interrogatories 8 and 13 by ANTHEM, INC. re #167 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 To Submission To Special Master)(Gidley, John)
October 1, 2016 Filing 173 NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES RESPONSE TO ANTHEMS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES RESPONSES TO ANTHEMS INTERROGATORY NOS. 8 AND 13 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #167 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Struve, Ryan)
September 30, 2016 Filing 172 Report & Recommendation No. 4 of the Special Master. Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on Sept. 30, 2016. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Levie, Richard)
September 30, 2016 Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Aaron Benson on behalf of CIGNA CORP. (Benson, Craig)
September 30, 2016 Filing 170 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Anthony Gallo on behalf of CIGNA CORP. (Gallo, Kenneth)
September 30, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Status Conference held on 9/30/2016. Order to be Issued. (Court Reporter: Barbara DeVico) (jth)
September 30, 2016 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Alan Dietert on behalf of CIGNA CORP. (Dietert, Zachary)
September 29, 2016 Filing 168 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Leon Miniovich, :Firm- White & Case LLP, :Address- 1155 Avenue of the Americas, New York, NY 10036-2787. Phone No. - (212) 819-7923. Fax No. - (212) 354-8113 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4692278. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leon Miniovich in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
September 29, 2016 Filing 167 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Anthem's Motion to Compel Plaintiff United States' Responses to Anthem's Interrogatories Nos. 8 & 13 (Relevant Markets) by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Submission to Special Master)(Gidley, John)
September 28, 2016 Filing 166 NOTICE OF PROPOSED AGENDA by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fitzgerald, Scott)
September 27, 2016 Filing 165 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Andrew Mann, :Firm- White & Case LLP, :Address- 701 Thirteenth Street, NW, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - (202) 637-6174. Fax No. - (202) 639-9355 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4688952. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Mann in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
September 27, 2016 Filing 164 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Cale Tolbert, :Firm- White & Case LLP, :Address- 3000 El Camino Real, 5 Palo Alto Sq., 9th Floor, Palo Alto, CA 94360. Phone No. - (650) 213-0392. Fax No. - (650) 213-8158 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4688910. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cale Tolbert in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
September 26, 2016 Filing 163 STIPULATION Regarding Plaintiffs' Allegations Concerning the Sale of Individual Insurance Policies on Public Exchanges by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Jacobs, Jon)
September 26, 2016 Filing 162 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Plaintiff United States of America's Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel Production of Breach of Contract Letters by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #146 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Submission to Special Master)(Jacobs, Jon)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 SECOND AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. (See Order for Complete Details). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/26/2016. (jth)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION NO. 3. The Clerk will enter the Second Amended Protective Order on the Docket. (See the Order for complete details). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/26/2016. (jth) (zjth).
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #148 Motion for Leave of Jared R. Danilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/26/16. (DMK)
September 26, 2016 Filing 159 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Anthem's Supplemental Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by ANTHEM, INC. re #146 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Submission to Special Master [Redacted])(Pace, Jack)
September 26, 2016 Filing 158 NOTICE of No Appeal by UNIVERSITY OF COLORADO HEALTH (Waeckerlin, Eric)
September 26, 2016 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Plaintiff's #155 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION TO SPECIAL MASTER OF PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES' RESPONSE TO ANTHEM'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES' RESPONSES TO ANTHEM'S INTERROGATORY NOS. 1 AND 10, was entered in error and was refiled by Counsel as #157 . (jth)
September 26, 2016 Filing 157 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION TO SPECIAL MASTER OF PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES' RESPONSE TO ANTHEM'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES' RESPONSES TO ANTHEM'S INTERROGATORY NOS. 1 AND 10 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #152 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 and attachments)(Struve, Ryan)
September 25, 2016 Filing 156 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Anthem's Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel Plaintiff United States' Responses to Anthem's Interrogatories 1 and 10 by ANTHEM, INC. re #152 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Submission to Special Master)(Gidley, John)
September 24, 2016 Filing 155 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF SUBMISSION TO SPECIAL MASTER OF PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES' RESPONSE TO ANTHEM'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES' RESPONSES TO ANTHEM'S INTERROGATORY NOS. 1 AND 10 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #152 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 and attachments)(Struve, Ryan) Modified on 9/26/2016 (jth).
September 24, 2016 Filing 154 NOTICE of No Appeal by UPMC HEALTH PLAN, INC. re #149 Report of Special Master, Report and Recommendation,, (Woodward, Gordon)
September 24, 2016 Filing 153 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION TO SPECIAL MASTER OF PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES' RESPONSE TO ANTHEM'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES' RESPONSES TO ANTHEM'S INTERROGATORY NOS. 1 AND 10 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #152 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 and attachments)(Struve, Ryan)
September 22, 2016 Filing 152 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Anthem's Motion to Compel Plaintiff United States' Responses to Anthem's Interrogatories 1 and 10 by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Submission to Special Master)(Gidley, John)
September 22, 2016 Filing 151 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Cigna's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Breach of Contract Letters by CIGNA CORP. re #146 Notice (Other), (Rule, Charles)
September 22, 2016 Filing 150 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Anthem's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by ANTHEM, INC. re #146 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Submission to Special Master [Redacted])(Pace, Jack)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Report of Special Master, REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #116 MOTION to Amend/Correct #67 Protective Order filed by UNIVERSITY OF COLORADO HEALTH and re #108 MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order filed by UPMC Health Plan, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on Sept. 22, 2016. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Second Amended Protective Order) (Levie, Richard)
September 22, 2016 Filing 148 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jared R. Danilson, :Firm- White & Case LLP, :Address- 1155 Avenue of the Americas, New York, NY 10036. Phone No. - (212) 819-2614. Fax No. - (212) 354-8113 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4683704. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Lancaster in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
September 22, 2016 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Christopher Moore on behalf of ANTHEM, INC. (Moore, Charles)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #145 Motion for Leave of Amanda Lee Czocher to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/21/16. (DMK)
September 21, 2016 Filing 146 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Plaintiff United States of America's Motion to Compel Production of Breach of Contract Letters by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Submission to Special Master [Redacted])(Jacobs, Jon)
September 20, 2016 Filing 145 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Amanda Lee Czocher, :Firm- White & Case LLP, :Address- 701 13th St., NW, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - (202) 637-6185. Fax No. - (202) 639-9355 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4680745. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amanda Lee Czocher in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #134 , #138 , #139 , #140 and #141 Motions for Leave of S. Albert Wang, Jaclyn Epstein, Eric Krause, Eric Lancaster, and Allen Wang to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyers admitted, or at least one member of the lawyers' firms, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/20/16.(DMK)
September 19, 2016 Filing 144 ANSWER to Complaint by CIGNA CORP..(Rule, Charles)
September 19, 2016 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Trisha Grant on behalf of ANTHEM, INC. (Grant, Trisha)
September 19, 2016 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathyrn J Mims on behalf of ANTHEM, INC. (Mims, Kathyrn)
September 19, 2016 Filing 141 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Allen Wang, :Firm- White & Case LLP, :Address- 3000 El Camino Real, 5 Palo Alto Sq., 9th Floor, Palo Alto, CA 94360. Phone No. - (650) 213-0300. Fax No. - (650) 213-8158 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4678517. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allen Wang in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
September 19, 2016 Filing 140 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eric Lancaster, :Firm- White & Case LLP, :Address- 3000 El Camino Real, 5 Palo Alto Sq., 9th Floor, Palo Alto, CA 94360. Phone No. - (650) 213-0300. Fax No. - (650) 213-8158 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4678504. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Lancaster in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
September 19, 2016 Filing 139 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eric Krause, :Firm- White & Case LLP, :Address- 3000 El Camino Real, 5 Palo Alto Sq., 9th Floor, Palo Alto, CA 94360. Phone No. - (650) 213-0300. Fax No. - (650) 213-8158 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4678470. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Krause in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
September 19, 2016 Filing 138 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jaclyn Epstein, :Firm- White & Case LLP, :Address- 701 13th St., NW, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - (202) 626-3699. Fax No. - (202) 639-9355 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4678462. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jaclyn Epstein in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
September 19, 2016 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather P Greenfield on behalf of ANTHEM, INC. (Greenfield, Heather)
September 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER ADOPTING Report and Recommendation No. 2 #130 in its entirety and DENYING #97 Aon PLC' motion for additional relief under the protective order and #99 UnitedHealth Group Inc.'s motion to amend the protective order. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/17/16. (DMK)
September 16, 2016 Filing 135 NOTICE that UnitedHealth Group Will Not Appeal Special Master Order re Amended Protective Order by UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED re #130 Report and Recommendation, (Shors, Matthew)
September 16, 2016 Filing 134 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- S. Albert Wang, :Firm- Arnold & Porter LLP, :Address- 44th Floor, 777 South Figueroa Street, Los Angeles, CA 90017-5844. Phone No. - (213) 243-4076. Fax No. - (213) 243-4199 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4677562. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of S. Albert Wang in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tabas, Matthew)
September 16, 2016 Filing 133 REPLY to opposition to motion re #116 MOTION to Amend/Correct #67 Protective Order filed by UNIVERSITY OF COLORADO HEALTH. (Waeckerlin, Eric)
September 16, 2016 Filing 132 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of UPMC Health Plan, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Submission Regarding Protective Order by UPMC Health Plan, Inc. re #108 Notice (Other), #87 Report of Special Master (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support UPMC Health Plan, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Submission Regarding Protective Order)(Woodward, Gordon)
September 16, 2016 Filing 131 NOTICE that Aon PLC Will Not Appeal Special Master Order re Amended Protective Order by AON PLC re #130 Report and Recommendation, (Reeves, Amanda)
September 15, 2016 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #112 AMENDED Protective Order was entered in error and was refiled as docket entry #129 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. (zrdj)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION No. 2 of the Special Master re #99 Third Party MOTION to Amend Protective Orders filed by UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED, #97 MOTION for Additional Relief Under the Protective Orders filed by AON PLC Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on Sept. 15, 2016. (Levie, Richard)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER (see the order for complete details). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/14/2016. (jth)
September 14, 2016 Filing 128 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Anthem's Response to UPMC's Submission Regarding Protective Order by ANTHEM, INC. re #108 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Submission to Special Master)(Gidley, John)
September 14, 2016 Filing 127 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Cigna's Opposition to UPMC Health Plan, Inc.'s Submission Regarding Protective Order by CIGNA CORP. re #108 Notice (Other) (Howley, Daniel)
September 14, 2016 Filing 126 NOTICE Notice of Submission to the Special Master of Plaintiffs' Responses to UPMC, University of Colorado Health, and Baylor Scott & White Holdings, et al.'s Motions for Modifications of the Protective Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Mucchetti, Peter)
September 14, 2016 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by John Donaldson on behalf of ANTHEM, INC. (Donaldson, John)
September 14, 2016 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas M. Jasinski on behalf of ANTHEM, INC. (Jasinski, Douglas)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #123 Motion for Leave of John D. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/14/16. (DMK)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #122 Motion for Leave of Julie Annette Flaming to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/14/16. (DMK)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #121 Motion for Leave of Heyward D. Bonyata to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/14/16. (DMK)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #120 Motion for Leave of Lucile H. Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/14/16. (DMK)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #119 Motion for Leave of Kevin H. Blake to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/14/16. (DMK)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #118 Motion for Leave of David A. Wollin to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/14/16. (DMK)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #117 Motion for Leave of Robert Counihan to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/14/16. (DMK)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #115 Motion for Leave of Michael E. Hamburger to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/14/16. (DMK)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #114 Motion for Leave of Kristen O'Shaughnessy to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/14/16. (DMK)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #113 Motion for Leave of C. Kelly Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/14/16. (DMK)
September 14, 2016 Filing 123 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John D. Martin, :Firm- Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP, :Address- 1320 Main Street / 17th Floor, Post Office Box 11070 (29211-1070), Columbia, SC 29201. Phone No. - (803) 255-9241. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4673579. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Martin in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Leddicotte, Matthew)
September 14, 2016 Filing 122 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Julie Annette Flaming, :Firm- Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP, :Address- 1320 Main Street / 17th Floor, Post Office Box 11070 (29211-1070), Columbia, SC 29201. Phone No. - (803) 255-9822. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4673517. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julie A. Flaming in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Leddicotte, Matthew)
September 14, 2016 Filing 121 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Heyward D. Bonyata, :Firm- Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP, :Address- 1320 Main Street / 17th Floor, Post Office Box 11070 (29211-1070), Columbia, SC 29201. Phone No. - (803) 255-9655. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4673502. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Heyward D. Bonyata in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Leddicotte, Matthew)
September 14, 2016 Filing 120 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lucile H. Cohen, :Firm- Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP, :Address- 1320 Main Street / 17th Floor, Post Office Box 11070 (29211-1070), Columbia, SC 29201. Phone No. - (803) 799-2000. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4673492. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lucile H. Cohen in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Leddicotte, Matthew)
September 13, 2016 Filing 119 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kevin Blake, :Firm- Hinckley, Allen & Snyder LLP, :Address- 100 Westminster Street, Suite 1500, Providence, RI 02903. Phone No. - 401-274-2000. Fax No. - 401-277-9600 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4671616. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Tufts Associated Health Plans, Inc. (Tuxbury, James)
September 13, 2016 Filing 118 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David A. Wollin, :Firm- Hinckley, Allen & Snyder LLP, :Address- 100 Westminster Street, Suite 1500, Providence, RI 02903. Phone No. - 401-274-2000. Fax No. - 401-277-9600 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4671601. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Tufts Associated Health Plans, Inc. (Tuxbury, James)
September 12, 2016 Filing 117 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert Counihan, :Firm- White & Case LLP, :Address- 1155 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York 10036. Phone No. - (212) 819-8255. Fax No. - (212) 354-8113 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4670597. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Counihan, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
September 12, 2016 Filing 116 MOTION to Amend/Correct #67 Protective Order by UNIVERSITY OF COLORADO HEALTH (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Non-Party University of Colorado Health's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Amend the Protective Order, #2 Exhibit A to Non-Party University of Colorado Health's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Amend the Protective Order, #3 Exhibit B to Non-Party University of Colorado Health's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Amend the Protective Order, #4 Exhibit C to Non-Party University of Colorado Health's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Amend the Protective Order, #5 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Amended Protective Order)(Waeckerlin, Eric)
September 12, 2016 Filing 115 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael E. Hamburger, :Firm- White & Case LLP, :Address- 1155 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York 10036. Phone No. - (212) 819-8355. Fax No. - (212) 354-8113 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4670588. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael E. Hamburger, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
September 12, 2016 Filing 114 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kristen O'Shaughnessy, :Firm- White & Case LLP, :Address- 1155 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York 10036. Phone No. - (212) 819-7974. Fax No. - (212) 354-8113 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4670574. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen O'Shaughnessy, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
September 12, 2016 Filing 113 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- C. Kelly Newman, :Firm- White & Case LLP, :Address- 1155 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York 10036. Phone No. - (212) 819-2603. Fax No. - (212) 354-8113 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4670563. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Kelly Newman, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ENTERED IN ERROR.....AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER (see the order for complete details). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/12/2016. (jth) Modified on 9/15/2016 (zrdj).
September 12, 2016 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric P. Waeckerlin on behalf of UNIVERSITY OF COLORADO HEALTH (Waeckerlin, Eric)
September 12, 2016 Filing 110 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Unopposed Motion to Modify Protective Order by Tufts Associated Health Plans, Inc. (Tuxbury, James)
September 12, 2016 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by James L Tuxbury on behalf of Tufts Associated Health Plans, Inc. (Tuxbury, James)
September 12, 2016 Filing 108 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master by UPMC Health Plan, Inc. re #67 Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Woodward, Gordon)
September 9, 2016 Filing 107 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Reply Memorandum of Law in Support by AON PLC re #97 MOTION for Additional Relief Under the Protective Orders (Reeves, Amanda)
September 9, 2016 Filing 106 REPLY to opposition to motion re #99 Third Party MOTION to Amend Protective Orders filed by UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED. (Shors, Matthew)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #105 granting Motion for Leave of R. Gregory Parker to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/9/16. (DMK)
September 9, 2016 Filing 105 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- R. Gregory Parker, :Firm- Bass, Berry & Sims, PLC, :Address- 150 Third Avenue South, Suite 2800, Nashville, TN 37027. Phone No. - (615) 742-6200. Fax No. - (615) 742-6293 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4668422. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Gregory Parker in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
September 8, 2016 Filing 104 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Anthem's Opposition to Aon's Motion for Additional Relief Under the Protective Orders and Anthem's Opposition to UnitedHealth Group's Motion to Amend the Protective Order by ANTHEM, INC. re #99 Third Party MOTION to Amend Protective Orders, #97 MOTION for Additional Relief Under the Protective Orders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Submission to Special Master, #2 Exhibit B to Submission to Special Master)(Gidley, John)
September 8, 2016 Filing 103 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Defendant Cigna's Opposition to Unitedhealth Group Incorporated's Motion to Amend the Protective Order by CIGNA CORP. re #99 Third Party MOTION to Amend Protective Orders (Howley, Daniel)
September 8, 2016 Filing 102 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Defendant Cigna's Opposition to Aon PLC's Motion for Additional Relief Under the Protective Order by CIGNA CORP. re #97 MOTION for Additional Relief Under the Protective Orders (Howley, Daniel)
September 8, 2016 Filing 101 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION TO THE SPECIAL MASTER OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO AON PLCS AND UNITEDHEALTH GROUPS MOTIONS FOR ADDITIONAL RELIEF UNDER THE PROTECTIVE ORDER by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Mucchetti, Peter)
September 7, 2016 Filing 100 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Modify the Protective Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Mucchetti, Peter)
September 7, 2016 Filing 99 Third Party MOTION to Amend Protective Orders by UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shors, Matthew)
September 7, 2016 Filing 98 Notice of Appearance by UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED (Shors, Matthew) Modified on 9/8/2016 (jf).
September 6, 2016 Filing 97 MOTION for Additional Relief Under the Protective Orders by Aon plc (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reeves, Amanda)
September 6, 2016 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda P. Reeves on behalf of Aon plc (Reeves, Amanda)
September 4, 2016 Filing 95 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Anthem's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Compel Production Pursuant to Anthem's Third Set of Document Requests by ANTHEM, INC. re #93 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Submission to Special Master)(Gidley, John)
September 3, 2016 Filing 94 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Plaintiff United States' Response to Anthem's Motion to Compel Production Pursuant to Anthem's Third Set of Document Requests by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #92 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 and attachments)(Struve, Ryan)
September 1, 2016 Filing 93 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Anthem's Motion to Compel Production Pursuant to Anthem's Third Set of Document Requests by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Submission to Special Master [Redacted])(Gidley, John)
September 1, 2016 Filing 92 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Plaintiffs' Response to Concerns Raised by Protected Persons Regarding the Protective Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Mucchetti, Peter)
August 31, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Exchange of Exhibit Lists by 10/19/2016; Close of Fact Discovery by 10/21/2016; Objections to Exhibits and Exchange of Supplemental Exhibit Lists (to include only exhibits identified based on developments between October 19 and the close of fact discovery) by 10/24/2016. Close of Expert Discovery by 11/9/2016. (jth)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. See Order for details. Since the parties' Joint Proposed Scheduling and Case Management Order did not include a date for the exchange of exhibits, the Court has added dates after consultation with the Special Master. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/31/16. (DMK)
August 30, 2016 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Aaron Tabas on behalf of ANTHEM, INC. (Tabas, Matthew)
August 26, 2016 Filing 89 MOTION to Amend/Correct #74 Order to Correct Contact Information for Cigna Counsel by CIGNA CORP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Forman, Andrew)
August 26, 2016 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda J. Conti on behalf of STATE OF MAINE (Conti, Linda)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Special Master Order No. 1. Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on August 25, 2016. (Levie, Richard)
August 25, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/30/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsm)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #85 Motion for Leave of Martin M. Toto to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/25/16. (DMK)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that a status conference will be held on September 30, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 3. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/25/16. (DMK)
August 25, 2016 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by John David McDowell on behalf of STATE OF TENNESSEE (McDowell, John)
August 24, 2016 Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Martin M. Toto, :Firm- White & Case LLP, :Address- 1155 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York, 10036. Phone No. - (212) 819-8200. Fax No. - (212) 354-8113 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4650634. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin M. Toto in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
August 24, 2016 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Frankrone Merrick on behalf of STATE OF TENNESSEE (Merrick, Erin)
August 21, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiffs and Defendants Complete Production of Investigation Materials from Third Parties by 9/2/2016; Plaintiffs Complete Production of Investigation Materials from the Parties to the Health Insurance Cases by 9/8/2016; Exchange of Initial Fact Witness Lists by 9/9/2016; Supplemental Exchange of Initial Fact Witness Lists by 9/12/2016; Cigna'sAnswer to the Complaint due by 9/19/2016; Each Side Designates All Experts That it May Call in its Respective Case-in-Chief and Defense Case, Along with a Brief Statement of the Subject Matter on Which the Expert may Testify by 9/23/2016; Parties Exchange Expert Reports by 10/7/2016; Exchange of Final Witness Lists by 10/7/2016; Parties Exchange Rebuttal and Supplemental Experts Reports by 10/21/2016; Tentative Date for Close of Fact Discovery 10/21/2016; Expert Reports Submitted to the Court by 10/21/2016; Exhibits, Stipulations, and Deposition Designations Submitted to the Court by 10/28/2016; Motions in Limine due by 10/31/2016; Written Opening Statements (if ordered, and subject to instructions to be provided in a future order) by 11/4/2016; Oppositions to Motions in Limine are due by 11/7/2016; Tentative Date for Close of Expert Discovery 11/9/2016; Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2016 at 10:00 AM; Trial begins on 11/21/2016 at 10:00 AM. Unless otherwise noted all proceedings will take place in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Finding of Facts and Conclusions of Law are due by 1/4/2017. (jth)
August 19, 2016 Filing 83 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph J. Bial (Bial, Joseph)
August 19, 2016 Filing 82 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel J. Howley (Howley, Daniel)
August 19, 2016 Filing 81 NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles F Rule (Rule, Charles)
August 19, 2016 Filing 80 NOTICE of Change of Address by Andrew J. Forman (Forman, Andrew)
August 19, 2016 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Stephen Walsh on behalf of STATE OF GEORGIA (Walsh, Daniel)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs have filed #77 an appeal from #75 the Special Master's first report and recommendation, which recommended that each side be permitted "to conduct up to 275 hours of non-party depositions with any side having the ability to seek additional non-party deposition hours upon a showing of extraordinary good cause." This is a procedural matter, and so the Court reviews the Special Master's recommendation for an abuse of discretion. Fed. R. Civ. P. 53(f)(5). While the Court finds that the number of hours allotted to each side is extremely high, this case is significantly broader than the Aetna matter, and defendants have demonstrated sufficient need for this level of discovery, given the multiplicity of theories and allegations in the complaint. Accordingly, after consideration of the facts and circumstances set forth in #75 the report and recommendation and the arguments set forth in #77 plaintiffs' response, the Court concludes that the Special Master did not abuse his discretion, and it hereby adopts the recommendation. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/18/2016. (lcabj2)
August 18, 2016 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica Anne Sullivan on behalf of STATE OF GEORGIA (Sullivan, Monica)
August 18, 2016 Filing 77 RESPONSE re #75 Report of Special Master filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Jacobs, Jon)
August 17, 2016 Filing 76 RESPONSE re #75 Report of Special Master / Anthem's Response to Special Master Report & Recommendation No. 1 (Non-Party Deposition Limits) filed by ANTHEM, INC.. (Curran, Christopher)
August 17, 2016 Filing 75 Report and Recommendation No. 1 of Special Master. Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on Aug. 17, 2016. (Levie, Richard)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying as moot #72 Motion for Scheduling Order in light of the entry of #74 the Interim Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/15/2016. (lcabj2)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 INTERIM CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/15/2016. (lcabj2)
August 15, 2016 Filing 73 SEALED DOCUMENT re #71 Transcript OF PROCEEDINGS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
August 15, 2016 Filing 72 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Joint Proposed Scheduling and Case Management Order)(Jacobs, Jon)
August 15, 2016 Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on August 12, 2016; Page Numbers: 1-63. Date of Issuance: August 12, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 9/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2016.(Dickman, Janice)
August 15, 2016 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Mahr on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Mahr, Eric)
August 12, 2016 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Bial on behalf of CIGNA CORP. (znmw)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 SCHEDULING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/12/16. (DMK)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying as moot #56 Motion for Protective Order and #63 Supplemental Motion for Protective Order in light of entry of #67 Protective Order. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/12/16. (DMK)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 PROTECTIVE ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/12/16. (DMK)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #52 plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Appoint Special Master. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/12/16. (DMK) (Main Document 66 replaced on 8/12/2016) (zjth).
August 12, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Status and Scheduling Conference held on 8/12/2016. Orders to issue. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (jth)
August 11, 2016 Filing 65 RESPONSE re #61 Notice of Proposed Order, filed by ANTHEM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ex. A - Declaration of Jared R. Danilson, #2 Declaration Ex. B - Declaration of Richard B. Walsh, #3 Declaration Ex. C - Declaration of John J. Riffle, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Riffle Declaration, #5 Declaration Ex. D - Declaration of Steven J. Lauwers)(Curran, Christopher)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that the parties should be prepared to address at the scheduling conference set for August 12, 2016 whether the Court should enter a referral order identical to the order entered in United States v. Aetna, 16-1494-JDB, [Dkt. # 53]. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall not file written submissions on this issue. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/11/16. (DMK)
August 11, 2016 Filing 64 RESPONSE re #56 MOTION for Protective Order filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fitzgerald, Scott)
August 11, 2016 Filing 63 Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order)(Curran, Christopher)
August 10, 2016 Filing 62 RESPONSE re #56 MOTION for Protective Order / Cigna Corporation's Statement of Position as to Anthem's Motion for Protective Order; filed by CIGNA CORP.. (Rule, Charles)
August 10, 2016 Filing 61 NOTICE of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling and Case Management Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit A, #10 Exhibit B, #11 Exhibit C, #12 Exhibit D)(Jacobs, Jon)
August 10, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia L. Nagler on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Nagler, Patricia)
August 10, 2016 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Lawrence Rosen on behalf of ANTHEM, INC. (Rosen, Richard)
August 10, 2016 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle M. Garten on behalf of ANTHEM, INC. (Garten, Danielle)
August 10, 2016 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Wilson D. Mudge on behalf of ANTHEM, INC. (Mudge, Wilson)
August 10, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' response to #56 Anthem's Motion for Protective Order is due by 8/11/2016. The Court notes that the motion fails to set forth Cigna's position on the motion, so it is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion must be supplemented with that information, and if Cigna does not join in the motion, Cigna must file any opposition by 8/11/2016. (jth)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that plaintiffs' response to #56 Anthem's Motion for Protective Order is due by Thursday, August 11, 2016. The Court notes that the motion fails to set forth Cigna's position on the motion, so it is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion must be supplemented with that information, and if Cigna does not join in the motion, Cigna must file any opposition by August 11, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/9/16. (DMK)
August 9, 2016 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #55 Notice (Other) was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the correct docket event to be noted on the court's docket. Counsel should select under the Notice event "Notice of Appearance".(jf)
August 9, 2016 Filing 56 MOTION for Protective Order by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order)(Curran, Christopher)
August 9, 2016 Filing 55 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by STATE OF CALIFORNIA re #1 Complaint (Nagler, Patricia) Modified on 8/9/2016 (jf).
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #54 Motion for Protective Order. While the motion indicates that plaintiffs have not joined the motion, it does not include the statement required by Local Civil Rule 7(m) "as to whether the motion is opposed." Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/9/16. (DMK)
August 8, 2016 Filing 54 MOTION for Protective Order by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order)(Curran, Christopher)
August 8, 2016 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah A. Brumfield on behalf of ANTHEM, INC. (Brumfield, Noah)
August 8, 2016 Filing 52 Joint MOTION for Order to Appoint Special Master by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jacobs, Jon)
August 8, 2016 Filing 51 Civil Statement of Position as to the Appointment of a Special Master from Cigna Corporation. (Rule, Charles)
August 8, 2016 Filing 50 NOTICE / Anthem's Recommendations for Special Master by ANTHEM, INC. (Curran, Christopher)
August 8, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Tennis on behalf of STATE OF MARYLAND (Tennis, John)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #48 Motion for Leave of Jack E. Pace III to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/8/16. (DMK)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #47 Motion for Leave of Robert A. Milne to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/8/16. (DMK)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #46 Motion for Leave of Michael J. Gallagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/8/16. (DMK)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #45 Motion for Leave of Heather M. Abrams to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/8/16. (DMK)
August 5, 2016 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jack E. Pace III, :Firm- White & Case LLP, :Address- 1155 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York 10036. Phone No. - (212) 819-8200. Fax No. - (212) 354-8113 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4630036. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jack E. Pace III in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
August 5, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: The parties to the Anthem case are directed to submit any recommendations concerning that appointment to this Court, as well as to the court in United States v. Aetna, by filing them on the docket in both cases by 5:00 PM on 8/8/2016. A scheduling conference will be held in Courtroom 3 on Friday, 8/12/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. The parties are further ordered to meet and confer and submit a joint report pursuant to L.Cv.R. 16.3 by 5:00 PM on Wednesday, 8/10/2016. (jth)
August 5, 2016 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert A. Milne, :Firm- White & Case LLP, :Address- 1155 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York 10036. Phone No. - (212) 819-8200. Fax No. - (212) 354-8113 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4630021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert A. Milne in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
August 5, 2016 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael J. Gallagher, :Firm- White & Case LLP, :Address- 1155 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York 10036. Phone No. - (212) 819-8200. Fax No. - (212) 354-8113 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4630006. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Gallagher in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
August 5, 2016 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Heather M. Abrams, :Firm- White & Case LLP, :Address- 3000 El Camino Real, 5 Palo Alto Sq., 9th Floor, Palo Alto, CA 94360. Phone No. - (650) 213-0300. Fax No. - (650) 213-8158 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4629969. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Heather M. Abrams in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gidley, John)
August 5, 2016 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by George Lovell Paul on behalf of ANTHEM, INC. (Paul, George)
August 5, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Sterrett Leddicotte on behalf of ANTHEM, INC. (Leddicotte, Matthew)
August 5, 2016 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear was entered in error and refiled by counsel. (See Docket Entry #20 to view document)(jf)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the August 5, 2016 reassignment of United States v. Anthem, Inc. to this Court #41 , the Court has reviewed the status reports submitted by the parties #28 , #29 , and #30 , the transcript of the status conference held in this case and in United States v. Aetna, 16-1494 on August 4, 2016 #39 , as well as the Order issued in both cases on August 5, 2016 #40 . Since this Court agrees that it is advisable to appoint a single Special Master to facilitate efficient discovery in both of these cases, the parties to the Anthem case are directed to submit any recommendations concerning that appointment to this Court, as well as to the court in United States v. Aetna, by filing them on the docket in both cases by 5:00 pm on August 8, 2016. A scheduling conference will be held in Courtroom 3 on Friday, August 12 at 10:00 am. The parties are further ordered to meet and confer and submit a joint report pursuant to L.Cv.R. 16.3 by 5:00 pm on Wednesday, August 10. The report should include a proposed discovery schedule as well as each side's current best estimate as to the amount of time needed to present its case assuming that some portion of the evidence may be submitted in the form of written testimony well in advance of trial, and it should address counsels' availability -- and identify any dates on which they are not available -- in December 2016 and January 2017. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/5/16. (DMK)
August 5, 2016 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia Elaine Kinser on behalf of STATE OF TENNESSEE (Kinser, Cynthia)
August 5, 2016 Filing 41 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Judge John D. Bates no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER referring this case to the calendar committee for random reassignment. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/5/16. (lcjdb3)
August 4, 2016 Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT OF 8/4/16 STATUS HEARING before Judge John D. Bates, held on August 4, 2016. Page Numbers: 1-71. Date of Issuance: 8/4/16. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/25/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2016.(Wayne, Bryan)
August 4, 2016 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail Leah Smith on behalf of STATE OF COLORADO (znmw)
August 4, 2016 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Hutchinson Hunt on behalf of STATE OF COLORADO (znmw)
August 4, 2016 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Oxenham Allen on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA (Allen, Sarah)
August 4, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Bates: Status Conference held on 8/4/2016. (Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne) (jth)
August 4, 2016 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lynne Foley on behalf of STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE (Foley, Jennifer)
August 3, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Devin M. Laiho on behalf of STATE OF COLORADO (Laiho, Devin)
August 3, 2016 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Sarah Gere on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Gere, Elizabeth)
August 3, 2016 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #32 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests, #31 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading with a Motion to Intervene. (jf)
August 3, 2016 Filing 32 ENTERED IN ERROR.....LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED (Botti, Mark) Modified on 8/3/2016 (jf).
August 3, 2016 Filing 31 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Botti on behalf of UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED (Botti, Mark) Modified on 8/3/2016 (jf).
August 2, 2016 Filing 30 Civil Statement of Plaintiffs' Position on the Scope and Timing of Proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Jacobs, Jon)
August 2, 2016 Filing 29 Civil Statement / Cigna Corporation's Statement of Position as to Timing of Proceedings and Conduct of Case with Respect to 16-cv-1494. (Rule, Charles)
August 2, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE Anthem's Explanation Of Its Positions As To Timing Of Proceedings And Whether Proceedings Should Be Conducted Jointly With Those In Case 16-CV-1494 by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jared R. Danilson, #2 Exhibit A - Merger Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Decl. of Monnes, #4 Exhibit C - CT Press Release, #5 Exhibit D - Email from Belfi, #6 Exhibit E - Decl. of Glover, #7 Exhibit F - Denver Business Journal, #8 Exhibit G - Decl. of Pomerantz, #9 Exhibit H - Georgia Dept. Website, #10 Exhibit I - Decl. of Lauwers, #11 Exhibit J - Process and Timing Agreement, #12 Exhibit K - Decl. of Walsh, #13 Declaration Declaration of George L. Paul, #14 Exhibit 1 - Draft - proposed order)(Curran, Christopher)
August 2, 2016 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Timothy Henry on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA (Henry, Tyler)
August 2, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M. Moylan on behalf of STATE OF MAINE (Moylan, Christina)
August 2, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: A status conference is set for 8/4/2016, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 30A; by 8/2/2016, the parties shall file explanations of their positions as to the timing of proceedings and whether proceedings should or should not be conducted jointly with those in case 16-cv-1494, up to and including trial. This status conference will be held jointly with the parties to case 16-cv-1494. (jth)
August 2, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Irina Cristina Rodriguez on behalf of STATE OF NEW YORK (Rodriguez, Irina)
August 1, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor J. Domen, Jr on behalf of STATE OF TENNESSEE (Domen, Victor)
August 1, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula Lauren Gibson on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Gibson, Paula)
August 1, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel O. Davis on behalf of STATE OF CONNECTICUT (Davis, Rachel)
July 29, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen S. Cooper on behalf of STATE OF MARYLAND (Cooper, Ellen)
July 29, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Layne M. Lindebak on behalf of STATE OF IOWA (Lindebak, Layne)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #12 the motion for an expedited status conference, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that a status conference is set for August 4, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 30A; and it is further ORDERED that, by not later than August 2, 2016, the parties shall file explanations of their positions as to the timing of proceedings and whether proceedings should or should not be conducted jointly with those in case 16-cv-1494, up to and including trial. This status conference will be held jointly with the parties to case 16-cv-1494. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/29/16. (lcjdb3)
July 29, 2016 Filing 19 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Leave to Appear by STATE OF IOWA (Lindebak, Layne) Modified on 8/5/2016 (jf).
July 28, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Anne Jackson on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Jackson, Catherine)
July 28, 2016 Filing 17 REPLY to opposition to motion re #12 MOTION to Expedite /Anthem's Motion and Statement of Points and Authority for Expedited Status Conference filed by ANTHEM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Curran, Christopher)
July 28, 2016 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #12 MOTION to Expedite /Anthem's Motion and Statement of Points and Authority for Expedited Status Conference filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Jacobs, Jon)
July 26, 2016 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by ANTHEM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Curran, Christopher)
July 26, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon B. Jacobs on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jacobs, Jon)
July 26, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Ivan Fitzgerald on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Fitzgerald, Scott)
July 25, 2016 Filing 12 MOTION to Expedite /Anthem's Motion and Statement of Points and Authority for Expedited Status Conference by ANTHEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curran, Christopher)
July 25, 2016 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. CIGNA CORP. waiver sent on 7/21/2016, answer due 9/19/2016. (Mucchetti, Peter)
July 22, 2016 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CIGNA CORP.. (Rule, Charles)
July 22, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Howley on behalf of CIGNA CORP. (Howley, Daniel)
July 22, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Forman on behalf of CIGNA CORP. (Forman, Andrew)
July 22, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles F Rule on behalf of CIGNA CORP. (Rule, Charles)
July 21, 2016 Filing 6 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ANTHEM, INC. (Curran, Christopher)
July 21, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Mark Gidley on behalf of ANTHEM, INC. (Gidley, John)
July 21, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Curran on behalf of ANTHEM, INC. (Curran, Christopher)
July 21, 2016 Filing 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to ANTHEM, INC., CIGNA CORP. (Attachment: #1 Consent Forms)(jd)
July 21, 2016 Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (jd)
July 21, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Case related to Case No. 1:16-cv-1494. (Mucchetti, Peter)
July 21, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Anthem, Inc., #3 Summons to Cigna Corp.)(Mucchetti, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. ANTHEM, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHEM, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA CORP.
Represented By: Craig Aaron Benson
Represented By: Jonathan S. Kanter
Represented By: Jared S. Sunshine
Represented By: William E. Dolan
Represented By: Zachary Alan Dietert
Represented By: Margot Campbell
Represented By: Andrew J. Forman
Represented By: Daniel J. Howley
Represented By: Kenneth Anthony Gallo
Represented By: Charles F Rule
Represented By: Joseph J. Bial
Represented By: Michelle Parikh
Represented By: Sasha Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHEM, INC.
Represented By: Seth J. Wiener
Represented By: Cale Tolbert
Represented By: Erica R. Sutter
Represented By: Heyward Dodkin Bonyata
Represented By: Martin M. Toto
Represented By: Kathryn J. Mims
Represented By: Amanda Lee Czocher
Represented By: Heather P. Greenfield
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Leon Miniovich
Represented By: Allen Wang
Represented By: Lucile Hartley Cohen
Represented By: Matthew Aaron Tabas
Represented By: R. Gregory Parker
Represented By: Julie Annette Flaming
Represented By: Thomas Flynn
Represented By: Jaclyn Epstein
Represented By: Travis Andrew Bustamante
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Represented By: Douglas M. Jasinski
Represented By: Eric Lancaster
Represented By: Daniel J. Rosenthal
Represented By: George Lovell Paul
Represented By: Robert Counihan
Represented By: Wilson D. Mudge
Represented By: Jack E. Pace, III
Represented By: Trisha Grant
Represented By: Eric Krause
Represented By: Kristen O'Shaughnessy
Represented By: Noah A. Brumfield
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Represented By: Michael J. Gallagher
Represented By: Charles Christopher Moore
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Rosen
Represented By: Danielle M. Garten
Represented By: John D. Donaldson
Represented By: C. Kelly Newman
Represented By: Philip M. Busman
Represented By: Pan Lee
Represented By: Shanyah Albert Wang
Represented By: Jared R. Danilson
Represented By: Christine N. Chang
Represented By: Michael E. Hamburger
Represented By: Matthew Sterrett Leddicotte
Represented By: Robert A. Milne
Represented By: Robert Dale Grimes
Represented By: John Derrick Martin
Represented By: Andrew Keith Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Scott Ivan Fitzgerald
Represented By: Matthew C. Hammond
Represented By: Adam T. Severt
Represented By: Daniel McCuaig
Represented By: John R. Read
Represented By: Bryson Love Bachman
Represented By: Peter Joseph Mucchetti
Represented By: Jon B. Jacobs
Represented By: Jennifer Hane
Represented By: Aaron Comenetz
Represented By: Soyoung Choe
Represented By: Ryan Scott Struve
Represented By: Peter Joseph Schwingler
Represented By: Jesus Manuel Alvarado-Rivera
Represented By: Nathan Daniel Brenner
Represented By: David Lewis Snyder
Represented By: Henry J. Hauser
Represented By: Eric J. Mahr
Represented By: Kathleen Simpson Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MARYLAND
Represented By: John R. Tennis
Represented By: Ellen S. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Rachel O. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE
Represented By: Joseph A. Foster
Represented By: Francis C. Fredericks, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer Lynne Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA
Represented By: Sarah Oxenham Allen
Represented By: Tyler Timothy Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF COLORADO
Represented By: Jennifer Hutchinson Hunt
Represented By: Devin M. Laiho
Represented By: Abigail Leah Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF IOWA
Represented By: Layne M. Lindebak
Represented By: Max Merrick Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Elizabeth Sarah Gere
Represented By: Catherine Anne Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF TENNESSEE
Represented By: Erin Frankrone Merrick
Represented By: J. David McDowell
Represented By: Victor J. Domen, Jr.
Represented By: Cynthia Elaine Kinser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MAINE
Represented By: Christina M. Moylan
Represented By: Linda J. Conti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Irina Cristina Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF GEORGIA
Represented By: Monica Anne Sullivan
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Paula Lauren Gibson
Represented By: Patricia L. Nagler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KAISER PERMANENTE HEALTH PLAN, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TUFTS ASSOCIATED HEALTH PLANS, INC.
Represented By: Kevin H. Blake
Represented By: David Alan Wollin
Represented By: James L. Tuxbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MERCER
Represented By: Matthew D. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CATERPILLAR INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Hutson
Represented By: Jennifer L. Farer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA (CALIFORNIA PHYSICIAN'S SERVICE)
Represented By: Ian Robert Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HUMANA INC.
Represented By: Shawn R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HARTFORD HEALTHCARE CORPORATION
Represented By: James Buchanan Camden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: INNOVATION HEALTH HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: J. Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SUTTER HEALTH
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Spigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PIEDMONT HEALTHCARE
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Spigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NORTHWELL HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Patrick John Curran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC. UNITED STATES
Represented By: Amelia J. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AON PLC
Represented By: Amanda P. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GEISINGER HEALTH PLAN
Represented By: Carrie G. Amezcua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TRUSTMARK SERVICES COMPANY
Represented By: Joseph R. Jeffery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PATIENT FIRST CORPORATION
Represented By: Patrick Risdon Hanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CENTURA HEALTH CORPORATION
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: David B. Honig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CALIFORNIA PUBLIC EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM
Represented By: John Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EMBLEMHEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Mark Christopher Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CENTENE CORPORATION
Represented By: Steven M Albertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DENVER HEALTH MEDICAL PLAN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HEALTHSMART BENEFIT SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Julia Kim Whitelock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MEDICAL MUTUAL OF OHIO
Represented By: David Kevin Lietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HEALTHSCOPE BENEFITS, INC.
Represented By: Amanda K. Wofford
Represented By: Michael J. Bramnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NORTHEAST GEORGIA HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Spigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ASCENSION HEALTH
Represented By: Kara Petteway Wheatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALLIED BENEFIT SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: O'Kelly E. McWilliams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: INTEL CORPORATION
Represented By: Brandon Michael White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH PLANS, INC.
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: David B. Honig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HARVARD PILGRIM HEALTH CARE, INC.
Represented By: Anthony C. Biagioli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LRGHEALTHCARE
Represented By: Emily Crandall Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CONCORD HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Elliott Jonathan Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC
Represented By: Alex Giscard Romain
Represented By: Gloria K. Maier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF KANSAS CITY
Represented By: Jacob A. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NEW WEST PHYSICIANS, P.C.
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: David B. Honig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Ian Robert Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CONNECTICARE, INC.
Represented By: Mark Christopher Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: COLLECTIVEHEALTH
Represented By: Thomas C. Willcox
Represented By: Sean P. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: THOMAS DELACEY
Represented By: Callyson Taylor Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: YALE MEDICINE
Represented By: Chong Seok Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: VIRGINIA HEALTH NETWORK, INC
Represented By: Joseph Paul Bowser
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SENTARA HEALTHCARE
Represented By: James Michael Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BUCK CONSULTANTS LLC
Represented By: Stacy L. Fode
Represented By: John M. Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CENTRA HEALTH AND PIEDMONT COMMUNITY HEALTH
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: David B. Honig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNIVERSITY OF COLORADO HEALTH
Represented By: Eric P. Waeckerlin
Represented By: Ryan Anthony Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED
Represented By: Matthew M. Shors
Represented By: Mark Joseph Botti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SHARP HEALTHCARE
Represented By: Patrick John Curran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UPMC HEALTH PLAN, INC.
Represented By: Gordon Samuel Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CONSORTIUM HEALTH PLANS, INC..
Represented By: Ian Robert Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MINUTEMAN HEALTH INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BON SECOURS HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: John B. Mumford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PAUL FLOTKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DENVER HEALTH AND HOSPITAL AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AETNA INC.
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WORKPLACE BENEFIT SOLUTIONS
Represented By: Callyson Taylor Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HCA HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Peter C. Herrick
Represented By: Sara Young Razi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DAVITA INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bower
Represented By: Wesley R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STAMFORD HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Chong Seok Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MVP HEALTH CARE
Represented By: Michael A Pusateri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PHYSICIAN'S HEALTH PLAN OF NORTH INDIANA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HTA LIMITED COOPERATIVE
Represented By: Ellen R. Lokker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: James Michael Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MEDCOST BENEFIT SERVICES
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Represented By: David B. Honig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: RICHARD A. LEVIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?