STANDING ROCK SIOUX TRIBE v. UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Plaintiff: STANDING ROCK SIOUX TRIBE
Defendant: UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Intervenor_defendant: DAKOTA ACCESS LLC
Intervenor_plaintiff: CHEYENNE RIVER SIOUX TRIBE
Case Number: 1:2016cv01534
Filed: July 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: James E. Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 546 MEMORANDUM OPINION re Remedy. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/6/2020. (lcjeb3)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 496 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 495 Order on Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/25/2020. (lcjeb2)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 418 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 417 Order on Motion to Complete the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/8/2019. (lcjeb1)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 392 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 376 Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/10/2019. (lcjeb1)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 341 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 340 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/19/2018. (lcjeb2)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 303 Order On Interim Conditions. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/4/2017. (lcjeb2)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 283 Order regarding vacatur. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/11/2017. (lcjeb2)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 238 Order on Cross-Motions for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/14/2017. (lcjeb3)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 205 Order on Dakota Access's Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/7/2017. (lcjeb3)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 157 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/7/2017. (lcjeb3)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 38 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/9/2016. (lcjeb1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STANDING ROCK SIOUX TRIBE v. UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANDING ROCK SIOUX TRIBE
Represented By: Patti A. Goldman
Represented By: Jan Hasselman(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Stephanie Tsosie(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Represented By: Matthew M. Marinelli
Represented By: Erica M. Zilioli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: DAKOTA ACCESS LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Hope Caine
Represented By: Robert D. Comer(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Alan M. Glen(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: CHEYENNE RIVER SIOUX TRIBE
Represented By: Nicole E. Ducheneaux
Represented By: Conly J. Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?