BEHRENS v. KERRY
Plaintiff: BEHRENS and NINA K. BEHRENS
Defendant: KERRY and JOHN F. KERRY
Case Number: 1:2016cv01590
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Referring Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING: (1) The Court strictly adheres to the dictates of Local Civil Rule 7(h), which requires that each party submitting a motion for summary judgment attach a statement of material facts for which that party contends there is no genuine dispute, with specific citations to those portions of the record upon which the party relies in fashioning the statement. The party opposing the motion must, in turn, submit a statement enumerating all material facts which the party contends are genuinely disputed and thus require trial. (2) The parties must furnish precise citations to the portions of the record on which they rely; the Court need not consider materials not specifically identified. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(c)(3). (3) The moving party's statement of material facts shall be a short and concise statement, in numbered paragraphs, of all material facts as to which the moving party claims there is no genuine dispute. The statement must contain only one factual assertion in each numbered paragraph. (4) The party responding to a statement of material facts must respond to each paragraph with a correspondingly numbered paragraph, indicating whether that paragraph is admitted or denied. If a paragraph is admitted only in part, the party must specifically identify which parts are admitted and which parts are denied. (5) The Court may assume that facts identified by the moving party in its statement of material facts are admitted, unless such facts are controverted in the statement filed in opposition to the motion. (6) The responding party must include any information relevant to its response in its correspondingly numbered paragraph, with specific citations to the record. However, if the responding party has additional facts that are not directly relevant to its response, it must identify such facts in consecutively numbered paragraphs at the end of its responsive statement of facts. If additional factual allegations are made, the opponent must file a responsive statement of its own. (7) The Court may strike any papers filed that are not in conformity with this order or the applicable rules. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/7/2018. (lctjk2)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' request at today's status conference, the Court hereby ORDERS that the deadline to complete discovery is extended to November 1, 2018, for the limited purpose discussed on the record at the status conference. Defendant shall file his motion for summary judgment by January 11, 2019. Plaintiff shall file her response by February 11, 2019. Defendant shall file his reply by February 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/2/2018. (lctjk2) (lctjk2, )
October 2, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Kelly: Status Conference held on 10/2/2018. Parties report the status of this case. Discovery to remain open for thirty (30) days for the limited purposes discussed on the record. Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 1/11/2019. Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/11/2019. Defendant's Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/25/2019. Order to be issued by the court. (Court Reporter: Timothy Miller) (kh)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting the parties' #22 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that the parties' motion is GRANTED. The deadline to complete discovery is extended to October 1, 2018. The post-discovery status conference set for August 2, 2018, is rescheduled to October 2, 2018, at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 11. The parties shall otherwise continue to comply with the terms of the #16 Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/9/2018. (lctjk2)
July 5, 2018 Filing 22 Second Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by NINA K. BEHRENS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gould, Jonathan) .
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER regarding discovery dispute. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/22/2018. (lctjk2)
May 18, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Compliance with Court Order dated May 17, 2018 by NINA K. BEHRENS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Gould, Jonathan)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties have jointly contacted chambers regarding a discovery dispute pursuant to Paragraph 7 of the Scheduling Order (ECF No. 16). It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall jointly call chambers on May 21, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. for a telephone conference regarding the dispute. The parties shall also jointly file on the docket, by close of business on May 18, 2018, a copy of the five document requests at issue. The joint submission may also include no more than 20 pages of relevant materials (such as prior correspondence between the parties) that the parties believe will assist the Court in understanding the dispute. The submission may not include any discovery motion or briefing. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/17/2018. (lctjk2)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' #19 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that the parties' motion is GRANTED. The deadline to complete discovery is extended to July 31, 2018. The post-discovery status conference set for June 5, 2018, is rescheduled to August 2, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11. The parties shall otherwise continue to comply with the terms of the #16 Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/26/2018. (lctjk2)
April 26, 2018 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by NINA K. BEHRENS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gould, Jonathan)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/19/2018. (lctjk2)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #17 Joint Motion for Protective Order. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that the parties' motion is GRANTED. The Court will enter a protective order in the form proposed by the parties with appropriate amendments made by the Court for good cause, including a substantive addition to Paragraph 2, which the Court has made to ensure that the privacy interests of non-parties are adequately protected. If the parties object to that amendment, they may move to modify the Protective Order for good cause. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/19/2018. (lctjk2)
February 22, 2018 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by JOHN F. KERRY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended pleadings due by 12/12/2017. Initial disclosures due by 12/19/2017. Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures, except for rebuttal disclosures, due by 1/18/2018. Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures due by 2/20/2018. Discovery shall close on 5/31/2018. Status conference set for June 5, 2018, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 11. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/29/2017. (lctjk2)
November 28, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Kelly: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 11/28/2017. Order to be issued by chambers. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 6/5/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (Court Reporter: Timothy Miller) (kh)
November 7, 2017 Filing 15 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Walker, Johnny)
October 30, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (tj)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: An Initial Scheduling Conference is set for November 28, 2017, at 09:30 a.m. before Judge Timothy J. Kelly in Courtroom 11. The parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint report pursuant to FRCP 26(f) and Local Rule 16.3. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/26/2017. (lctjk2)
September 26, 2017 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by JOHN F. KERRY.(Walker, Johnny)
September 18, 2017 Case directly reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
September 13, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/27/2017. (dot)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Defendant's #13 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. For good cause shown, that Motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file an answer to the complaint by SEPTEMBER 27, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/13/2017. (lcckk1)
September 7, 2017 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JOHN F. KERRY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Defendant's #9 Motion to Dismiss in Part is DENIED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/30/2017. (lcckk1)
November 14, 2016 Filing 11 REPLY to opposition to motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss in Part filed by JOHN F. KERRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13: Position Description for Interpreter, GS-15)(Walker, Johnny)
November 3, 2016 Filing 10 Memorandum in opposition to re #9 MOTION to Dismiss in Part filed by NINA K. BEHRENS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A--Joint Motion To Remand and Consolidate with Attachments, #3 Exhibit B--Complainant's Motion To Remand Amended Claims For Further Investigation, #4 Exhibit C--CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER)(Gould, Jonathan)
October 18, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's opposition to #9 due by 11/3/2016. Defendant's Reply due by 11/14/2016. (dot)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTED MINUTE ORDER: The Court notes that the deadline for the filing of Defendant's Reply as set by Minute Order issued earlier today falls on a Sunday. Accordingly, the November 13, 2016 deadline for the filing of Defendant's Reply is hereby vacated and said Reply shall be filed on or before November 14, 2016. The previously issued Minute Order remains otherwise unchanged and in full effect. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/18/2016. (lcckk1)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's #9 Motion to Dismiss in Part and hereby sets the following briefing schedule. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file her Opposition, if any, on or before NOVEMBER 3, 2016. And it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file his reply, if any, on or before NOVEMBER 13, 2016. If Plaintiff does not file her opposition by the deadline indicated, the Court may treat Defendant's Motion as conceded. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/18/2016. (lcckk1)
October 17, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss in Part by JOHN F. KERRY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1: Formal Complaint of Discrimination (Dec. 21, 2012), #3 Exhibit 2: Acceptance of Claim (Jan. 18, 2013), #4 Exhibit 3: Email re Behrens (new allegations) (May 28, 2013), #5 Exhibit 4: Order Granting Joint Motion to Amend Complaint (June 11, 2015), #6 Exhibit 5: Supplemental Investigative Report (July 29, 2015), #7 Exhibit 6: Formal Complaint of Discrimination (Sept. 12, 2014), #8 Exhibit 7: Acceptance of Claim (Oct. 22, 2014), #9 Exhibit 8: Formal Complaint of Discrimination (Mar. 25, 2015), #10 Exhibit 9: Acceptance of Claim (Apr. 3, 2015), #11 Exhibit 10: Complainants Motion to Amend (Sept. 25, 2015), #12 Exhibit 11: Complainants Second Motion to Amend (Oct. 21, 2015), #13 Exhibit 12: Letter of Warning (Mar. 9, 2015), #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny)
September 20, 2016 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOHN F. KERRY served 9/6/2016. (Gould, Jonathan) Modified on 9/21/2016 (znmw).
September 20, 2016 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General August 12, 2016. (Gould, Jonathan)
September 20, 2016 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/17/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/16/2016. (Gould, Jonathan)
August 19, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of JOHN F. KERRY (Walker, Johnny)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 8, 2016. (NS)
August 5, 2016 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to JOHN F. KERRY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Consent Form)(zsb)
August 5, 2016 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb)
August 5, 2016 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint filed by NINA K. BEHRENS. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by NINA K. BEHRENS. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Gould, Jonathan)
August 5, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nina K. Behrens with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4629372) filed by Nina K. Behrens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gould, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEHRENS v. KERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEHRENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NINA K. BEHRENS
Represented By: Jonathan Louis Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN F. KERRY
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?