KING & SPALDING, LLP v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: KING & SPALDING, LLP
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Case Number: 1:2016cv01616
Filed: August 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Amit P. Mehta
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting 74 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and vacating the court's February 10, 2020 Minute Order; and granting 78 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' ; Motion for Reconsideration. Unless Plaintiff notifies the court by April 9, 2020, that it intends to withdraw its fees request, the clerk of the court shall make available on the public docket Exhibits A and B in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees. See the attached Memorandum Opinion & Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/07/2020. (lcapm3)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION denying Defendants' Second Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 51 , and granting Plaintiff's Combined Motion for Reconsideration and Second Renewed Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 52 . See attached Memorandum Opinion for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/24/2019. (lcapm2)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 32 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's 33 Renewed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Please see the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/07/2018. (lcapm1)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice 20 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and 21 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. See the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/06/2017. (lcapm2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KING & SPALDING, LLP v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KING & SPALDING, LLP
Represented By: John C. Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?