JORDAN v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Plaintiff: JACK JORDAN
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Case Number: 1:2016cv01868
Filed: September 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 67 Motion for Relief from Judgment: See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/1/19. (lcrc1)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 55 Plaintiff's "Motion to Disqualify Judge Contreras"; denying 50 Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration of order granting Defendant's motion for extension of time; denying 40 Plaintiff's "Motion for Disclosure and Inclusion of Portions of the Emails and Other Non-Privileged Ex Parte Communications"; denying 41 Defendant's renewed motion for summary judgment; and denying 43 Defendant's motion for a protective order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 30, 2018. (lcrc2)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 19 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint; denying 16 Plaintiff's Corrected Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 20 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 10 Plaintiff's First Motion for Sanctions Under Rule 11; denying 24 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Depositions of Todd Smyth and Diane Johnson; denying 25 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike the Smyth Declaration; denying 29 Pla intiff's Motion to Compel Production of Evidence Regarding Smyth Declaration; denying 31 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Prohibited Ex Parte Communication and Vacate October 26 Minute Order; denying 33 Plaintiff's Second Motion for Sanctions Under Rule 11; denying 36 Plaintiff's Motion Regarding the APA as Basis for Decisions. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/4/2017. (lcrc2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JORDAN v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACK JORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Represented By: Jason Todd Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?