FISHERIES SURVIVAL FUND et al v. JEWELL et al
Plaintiff: FISHERIES SURVIVAL FUND, BOROUGH OF BARNEGAT LIGHT, NJ, TOWN DOCK, SEAFREEZE SHORESIDE, SEA FRESH USA, GARDEN STATE SEAFOOD ASSOCIATION, RHODE ISLAND FISHERMEN'S ALLIANCE, LONG ISLAND COMMERCIAL FISHING ASSOCIATION, INC., TOWN OF NARRAGANSETT, RHODE ISLAND, NARRANGANSETT CHAMBER OF COMMERCE, CITY OF NEW BEDFORD, MASSACHUSETTS and POINT PLEASANT (NJ) DOCK CO-OPERATIVE
Defendant: SALLY JEWELL and BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT
Case Number: 1:2016cv02409
Filed: December 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Tanya S. Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:4332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Plaintiffs' 61 Motion to Alter/Amend. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/14/2020. (lcdl)
September 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 42 ; Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 39 ; Defendant-Intervenor's Motion 40 . Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/30/18. (DJS)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 3 Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/15/2017. (lctsc2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FISHERIES SURVIVAL FUND et al v. JEWELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FISHERIES SURVIVAL FUND
Represented By: David Earl Frulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOROUGH OF BARNEGAT LIGHT, NJ
Represented By: David Earl Frulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOWN DOCK
Represented By: David Earl Frulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAFREEZE SHORESIDE
Represented By: David Earl Frulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEA FRESH USA
Represented By: David Earl Frulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARDEN STATE SEAFOOD ASSOCIATION
Represented By: David Earl Frulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHODE ISLAND FISHERMEN'S ALLIANCE
Represented By: David Earl Frulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LONG ISLAND COMMERCIAL FISHING ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: David Earl Frulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOWN OF NARRAGANSETT, RHODE ISLAND
Represented By: David Earl Frulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NARRANGANSETT CHAMBER OF COMMERCE
Represented By: David Earl Frulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF NEW BEDFORD, MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: David Earl Frulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POINT PLEASANT (NJ) DOCK CO-OPERATIVE
Represented By: David Earl Frulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALLY JEWELL
Represented By: Ty Bair
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT
Represented By: Ty Bair
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?