ASSOCIATED MORTGAGE BANKERS, INC. v. CASTRO et al
Plaintiff: ASSOCIATED MORTGAGE BANKERS, INC.
Defendant: JULIAN CASTRO and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Case Number: 1:2017cv00075
Filed: January 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Ellen S. Huvelle
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 53 plaintiff's motion to modify the Court's January 4, 2019 Order. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 9, 2019. (lcesh1)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 46 defendants' partial motion to dismiss and 46 defendants' motion to remand. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 4, 2019. (lcesh1)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion for Reconsideration. See OPINION AND ORDER for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 15, 2017. (lcesh1)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 defendants' Motion to Dismiss: ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss with regard to Count II is GRANTED, and Count II is dismissed with prejudice; it is further ORDERED that defendants� 39; motion to dismiss with regard to Count I is DENIED only to the extent that Count I is a challenge to the AJ's decision; and it is further ORDERED that by October 11, 2017 the parties will submit a joint briefing schedule that provides dates for the filing of sequential summary judgment motions and the administrative record. Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/11/2017. See Memorandum Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 20, 2017. (lcesh1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASSOCIATED MORTGAGE BANKERS, INC. v. CASTRO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASSOCIATED MORTGAGE BANKERS, INC.
Represented By: David M. Souders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIAN CASTRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?