JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE Featured Case
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Case Number: 1:2017cv00205
Filed: January 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Christopher R. Cooper
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2017 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/13/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/15/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/13/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 2/13/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Cotca, Ramona)
February 2, 2017 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd)
January 31, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (jd)
January 31, 2017 Filing 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona)
January 31, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4826131) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons DOS)(Cotca, Ramona)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Represented By: Ramona Raula Cotca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?