ZADEH et al v. TRUMP et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Zadeh, an Iranian national, is a lawful permanent resident of the United States. He is married to Plaintiff Raghimi, an Iranian national, who was issued an F21 Spouse of Permanent Resident visa. Plaintiff Iye is an American citizen. He is married to Plaintiff Abdille, a Somali national, who was issued an IR-1 Spouse of a U.S. Citizen visa. Plaintiffs Raghimi and Abdille were denied boarding pursuant to President Trumps executive order entitled "Protecting the Nation From Foreign Terrorist Entry Into the United States." Plaintiffs alleged that the order violates the Equal Protection Clause of the Fifth Amendment because it discriminated against them based on national origin and religion; the Establishment Clause of the First Amendment because it favored one religion and was motivated by anti-Muslim animus; the Due Process Clause of the Fifth Amendment for failing to provide minimal safeguards to persons who were already vetted and approved for entry; and the Administrative Procedure Act because it discriminated against persons in the issuance of visas based on race, nationality, place of birth or place of residence.

Plaintiff: FARSHID M. ZADEH, SAMANEH RAGHIMI, MOHAMED IYE and SAIDO A. ABDILLE
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U. S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PATROL, DANA J. BOENTE, JOHN KELLY, LORI SCIALABBA and KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Movant: HIAS
Case Number: 1:2017cv00243
Filed: February 3, 2017
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Tanya S. Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2017 19 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by SAIDO A. ABDILLE, MOHAMED IYE, SAMANEH RAGHIMI, FARSHID M. ZADEH re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Joint Statement and Stipulation to Withdraw Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Bunch, S.)
February 7, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Teresa Nelson is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/7/17. (DJS)
February 6, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice regarding withdrawal of the TRO due by COB on 2/7/2017. (tb)
February 6, 2017 Minute Entry: Telephone Conference held on 2/6/2017 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. The parties shall meet and confer and file a notice regarding the withdrawal of the TRO in this case by COB on 02/07/17. (Court Reporter Jan Dickman) (tb)
February 6, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5:00 est. on 2/7/2017. (tb)
February 6, 2017 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Teresa Nelson, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Minnesota, :Address- 2300 Myrtle Avenue, Suite 180, St. Paul, MN 55113. Phone No. - 651-529-1692. Fax No. - 651-647-5948 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4832168. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SAIDO A. ABDILLE, MOHAMED IYE, SAMANEH RAGHIMI, FARSHID M. ZADEH (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Teresa Nelson, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spitzer, Arthur)
February 6, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record in court, the hearing previously scheduled for 2:00 p.m. is hereby VACATED. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report by 5:00 p.m. EST tomorrow, 2/7/2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/6/2017. (lctsc2)
February 6, 2017 17 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order that Defendants' response is due by 12:00 p.m. on 02/06/2017 filed by DANA J. BOENTE, JOHN KELLY, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, LORI SCIALABBA, DONALD J. TRUMP, U. S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PATROL, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Press, Joshua)
February 6, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The conference call previously scheduled for 12:00 p.m. is hereby RESCHEDULED for 12:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/6/2017. (lctsc2)
February 6, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's response due by 12:00 on 2/6/2017. (tb)
February 6, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 2/6/2017 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (tb)
February 6, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: A conference call is hereby set for 12:00 p.m. today in Courtroom 2. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/6/2017. (lctsc2)
February 6, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Regina M. Jeffries is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/6/17. (DJS)
February 6, 2017 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Regina M. Jeffries, :Firm- University of Minnesota Law School, Center for New Americans, :Address- 229 19th Avenue South, Minneapolis, MN 55455. Phone No. - (612) 625-5515. Filin was entered in error and counsel refiled said pleading as docket entry no. 16 . (td)
February 6, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: TRO Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (tb)
February 5, 2017 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Regina M. Jeffries, :Firm- University of Minnesota Law School, Center for New Americans, :Address- 229 19th Avenue South, Minneapolis, MN 55455. Phone No. - (612) 625-5515. CORRECTED Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by SAIDO A. ABDILLE, MOHAMED IYE, SAMANEH RAGHIMI, FARSHID M. ZADEH (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Bunch, S.)
February 5, 2017 15 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . .MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Regina M. Jeffries, :Firm- University of Minnesota Law School, Center for New Americans, :Address- 229 19th Avenue South, Minneapolis, MN 55455. Phone No. - (612) 625-5515. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4831243. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SAIDO A. ABDILLE, MOHAMED IYE, SAMANEH RAGHIMI, FARSHID M. ZADEH (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Bunch, S.) Modified on 2/6/2017 (td).
February 5, 2017 14 STATUS REPORT by SAIDO A. ABDILLE, MOHAMED IYE, SAMANEH RAGHIMI, FARSHID M. ZADEH. (Bunch, S.)
February 5, 2017 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Michelman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Michelman, Scott)
February 5, 2017 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of SAIDO A. ABDILLE, MOHAMED IYE, SAMANEH RAGHIMI, FARSHID M. ZADEH (Spitzer, Arthur)
February 5, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Adam William Hansen is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/5/17. (DJS)
February 5, 2017 11 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Adam W. Hansen, :Firm- Apollo Law LLC, :Address- 400 S. Fourth St., Suite 401M 250, Minneapolis, MN 55415. Phone No. - (612) 927-2969. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by SAIDO A. ABDILLE, MOHAMED IYE, SAMANEH RAGHIMI, FARSHID M. ZADEH (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Bunch, S.)
February 5, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Denying without prejudice 7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for failing to fully comply with Local Civil Rule 83.2, which requires "a certification that the attorney [seeking admission] either HAS or HAS NOT BEEN DISCIPLINED by any bar, and if the attorney has been disciplined by any bar, the circumstances and details of the discipline." Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/5/17. (DJS)
February 5, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kevin Charles Riach is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/5/17. (DJS)
February 5, 2017 10 RESPONSE re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Temporary Restraining Order filed by DANA J. BOENTE, JOHN KELLY, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, LORI SCIALABBA, DONALD J. TRUMP, U. S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PATROL, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Press, Joshua)
February 5, 2017 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Samuel Press on behalf of All Defendants (Press, Joshua)
February 4, 2017 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kevin C. Riach, :Firm- Fredrikson & Byron, P.A., :Address- 200 South Sixth Street, Suite 4000, Minneapolis, Minnesota. Phone No. - (612) 492-7000. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4831206. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SAIDO A. ABDILLE, MOHAMED IYE, SAMANEH RAGHIMI, FARSHID M. ZADEH (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Bunch, S.)
February 4, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendants shall file their response to 2 Plaintiffs' Motion by 12:00 p.m. tomorrow, 2/5/2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/4/2017. (lctsc2)
February 4, 2017 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Adam W. Hansen, :Firm- Apollo Law LLC, :Address- 400 S. Fourth St., Suite 401M 250, Minneapolis, MN 55415. Phone No. - (612) 927-2969. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4831204. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SAIDO A. ABDILLE, MOHAMED IYE, SAMANEH RAGHIMI, FARSHID M. ZADEH (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Bunch, S.)
February 4, 2017 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Temporary Restraining Order by DANA J. BOENTE, JOHN KELLY, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, LORI SCIALABBA, DONALD J. TRUMP, U. S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PATROL, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
February 4, 2017 5 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by SAIDO A. ABDILLE, MOHAMED IYE, SAMANEH RAGHIMI, FARSHID M. ZADEH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bunch, S.)
February 4, 2017 4 NOTICE of Appearance by S. Douglas Bunch on behalf of SAIDO A. ABDILLE, MOHAMED IYE, SAMANEH RAGHIMI, FARSHID M. ZADEH (Bunch, S.)
February 4, 2017 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of All Defendants (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
February 4, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: A hearing is hereby set for 2/6/2017 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs' motion by 8:00 p.m. tonight, 2/4/2017. In their response, Defendants shall address the applicability of recently issued nationwide orders in 17-cv-0786 (C.D. Cal. Jan. 31, 2017) and 17-cv-0141 (W.D. Wash. Feb. 3, 2017). Plaintiffs shall also file a statement of no more than 10 pages by 8:00 p.m. tonight regarding the applicability of these orders. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/4/2017. (lctsc2)
February 3, 2017 SUMMONS Not Issued as to DANA J. BOENTE, JOHN KELLY, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, LORI SCIALABBA, DONALD J. TRUMP, U. S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PATROL, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (zrdj)
February 3, 2017 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by SAIDO A. ABDILLE, MOHAMED IYE, SAMANEH RAGHIMI, FARSHID M. ZADEH (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Notice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj)
February 3, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against DANA J. BOENTE, JOHN KELLY, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, LORI SCIALABBA, DONALD J. TRUMP, U. S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PATROL, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by SAMANEH RAGHIMI, SAIDO A. ABDILLE, FARSHID M. ZADEH, MOHAMED IYE. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616082856) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZADEH et al v. TRUMP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FARSHID M. ZADEH
Represented By: Abdinasir M. Abdulahi(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Sarah Brenes(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: S. Douglas Bunch
Represented By: R. Linus Chan(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: John B. Gordon(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Sally M. Handmaker
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Julia Horwitz
Represented By: Regina M. Jeffries(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Amir Malik(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Scott Michelman
Represented By: Teresa J. Nelson(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kit A. Pierson
Represented By: Kevin C. Riach(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Benjamin Casper Sanchez(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMANEH RAGHIMI
Represented By: Abdinasir M. Abdulahi(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Sarah Brenes(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: S. Douglas Bunch
Represented By: R. Linus Chan(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: John B. Gordon(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Sally M. Handmaker
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Julia Horwitz
Represented By: Regina M. Jeffries(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Amir Malik(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Scott Michelman
Represented By: Teresa J. Nelson(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kit A. Pierson
Represented By: Kevin C. Riach(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Benjamin Casper Sanchez(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMED IYE
Represented By: Abdinasir M. Abdulahi(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Sarah Brenes(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: S. Douglas Bunch
Represented By: R. Linus Chan(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: John B. Gordon(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Sally M. Handmaker
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Julia Horwitz
Represented By: Regina M. Jeffries(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Amir Malik(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Scott Michelman
Represented By: Teresa J. Nelson(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kit A. Pierson
Represented By: Kevin C. Riach(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Benjamin Casper Sanchez(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAIDO A. ABDILLE
Represented By: Abdinasir M. Abdulahi(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Sarah Brenes(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: S. Douglas Bunch
Represented By: R. Linus Chan(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: John B. Gordon(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Sally M. Handmaker
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Julia Horwitz
Represented By: Regina M. Jeffries(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Amir Malik(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Scott Michelman
Represented By: Teresa J. Nelson(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kit A. Pierson
Represented By: Kevin C. Riach(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Benjamin Casper Sanchez(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PATROL
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA J. BOENTE
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN KELLY
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORI SCIALABBA
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: HIAS
Represented By: James E. B. Bobseine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?