UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. et al v. TRUMP et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC., JOHN DOE and JANE DOE
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN KELLY, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, REX W. TILLERSON and JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III
Case Number: 1:2017cv00537
Filed: March 24, 2017
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Tanya S. Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Denying without prejudice 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Denying without prejudice 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failing to fully comply with Local Civil Rule 83.2(d)(4), which requires "a certification that the attorney [seeking admission] either HAS or HAS NOT BEEN DISCIPLINED by any bar, and if the attorney has been disciplined by any bar, the circumstances and details of the discipline." Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/4/17. (DJS)
April 3, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Denying without prejudice 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failing to fully comply with Local Civil Rule 83.2(d)(4), which requires "a certification that the attorney [seeking admission] either HAS or HAS NOT BEEN DISCIPLINED by any bar, and if the attorney has been disciplined by any bar, the circumstances and details of the discipline." Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/3/17. (DJS)
April 3, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response due by 4/10/2017 Reply due by 4/17/2017. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (tb)
April 3, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion for Briefing Schedule. Defendants' Response is due by 4/10/2017. Plaintiffs' Reply is due by 4/17/2017. A hearing is hereby set for 4/21/2017 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2. During this hearing, the court will also hear arguments for the pending preliminary injunction motion in Pars Equality Center et al. v. Trump et al. (17-cv-0255). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/3/2017. (lctsc2)
April 3, 2017 20 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by JOHN KELLY, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, REX W. TILLERSON, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad)
April 3, 2017 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad P. Rosenberg on behalf of All Defendants (Rosenberg, Brad)
March 28, 2017 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Alan Blanchard on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Blanchard, Charles)
March 28, 2017 17 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms, Declaration of John Doe #1, and Declaration of Jane Doe #1 by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration)(Weiner, David)
March 28, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's redaction of documents due by 3/31/2017. (tb)
March 27, 2017 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Aziz Huq, :Firm- University of Chicago School of Law, :Address- 1111 East 60th Street, Chicago, IL 60637. Phone No. - 773-687-8127. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Weiner, David)
March 27, 2017 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Andrew Bergman, :Firm- Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP, :Address- 700 Louisiana Street, Suite 1600, Houston. Phone No. - +1 713 576 2430. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Weiner, David)
March 27, 2017 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Emily Dillingham, :Firm- Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP, :Address- 70 West Madison Street, Suite 4200, Chicago, Illinois 60602. Phone No. - 312-583-2435. Fax No. - (312) 583-2535 Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. (Weiner, David)
March 27, 2017 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(td)
March 24, 2017 13 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. (td)
March 24, 2017 12 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC.. Case related to Case No. 17-255 TSC. (td)
March 24, 2017 10 COMPLAINT against JOHN KELLY, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, REX W. TILLERSON, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616083694) filed by JOHN DOE, UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC., JANE DOE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Declaration UMAA, # 3 Declaration David J. Weiner)(td)
March 24, 2017 9 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC.. re 6 Sealed Order, 4 Order on Motion for Order, 2 MOTION for Order filed by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd)
March 24, 2017 8 SEALED DOCUMENT (Declarations) filed by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC.. re 5 Order on Motion for Order, 3 MOTION for Order filed by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd)
March 24, 2017 7 SEALED DOCUMENT (Memorandum) filed by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC.. re 5 Order on Motion for Order, 1 MOTION for Order filed by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd)
March 24, 2017 6 Featured Case SEALED ORDER re 1 MOTION for Order filed by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC., 2 MOTION for Order filed by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC..(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/24/17.(ztd)
March 24, 2017 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Motion to Seal Their Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and Supporting Declarations and that redacted versions of these documents be file by no later than March 31, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/24/17. (td).
March 24, 2017 4 Featured Case REDACTED ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms ; granting 2 Motion to File Under Seal the DOE Plaintiffs' Names and Addresses. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/24/17. (td) Modified text on 3/27/2017 (td).
March 24, 2017 3 MOTION to Seal Their Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and Supporting Declarations by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(td)
March 24, 2017 2 MOTION to File Under Seal the DOE Plaintiffs' Names and Addresses by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(td)
March 24, 2017 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(td)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. et al v. TRUMP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Andrew D. Bergman(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Charles Alan Blanchard
Represented By: Emily Newhouse Dillingham(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Gillian B. Gillers(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kristi L. Graunke(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Aziz Zahirul Huq(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Naomi R. Tsu(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David J. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE
Represented By: Andrew D. Bergman(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Charles Alan Blanchard
Represented By: Emily Newhouse Dillingham(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Gillian B. Gillers(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kristi L. Graunke(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Aziz Zahirul Huq(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Naomi R. Tsu(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David J. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Represented By: Andrew D. Bergman(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Charles Alan Blanchard
Represented By: Emily Newhouse Dillingham(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Gillian B. Gillers(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kristi L. Graunke(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Aziz Zahirul Huq(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Naomi R. Tsu(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David J. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By: Brad P. Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Garrett Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Brad P. Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Garrett Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Represented By: Brad P. Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Garrett Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: Brad P. Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Garrett Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Brad P. Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Garrett Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN KELLY
Represented By: Brad P. Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Garrett Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Represented By: Brad P. Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Garrett Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REX W. TILLERSON
Represented By: Brad P. Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Garrett Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III
Represented By: Brad P. Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Garrett Schwei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?