September 22, 2022 |
Filing 192
Signature Page of Foreperson in Jury Verdict. (Access to the PDF Document is restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act. Access is limited to Counsel of Record and the Court.). (tj)
|
September 22, 2022 |
Filing 191
Jury Verdict Form in favor of plaintiff. (tj)
|
September 22, 2022 |
Filing 190
Signature Page of Foreperson in Jury Note #4. (Access to the PDF Document is restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act. Access is limited to Counsel of Record and the Court.). (tj)
|
September 22, 2022 |
Filing 189
Jury Note #4 dated 9/22/2022 (6:03pm) (tj)
|
September 22, 2022 |
Filing 188
Signature Page of Foreperson in Jury Note #3. (Access to the PDF Document is restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act. Access is limited to Counsel of Record and the Court.). (tj)
|
September 22, 2022 |
Filing 187
Jury Note #3 dated 9/22/2022 (5:05pm) (tj)
|
September 22, 2022 |
Filing 186
Signature Page of Foreperson in Jury Note #2. (Access to the PDF Document is restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act. Access is limited to Counsel of Record and the Court.). (tj)
|
September 22, 2022 |
Filing 185
Jury Note #2 dated 9/22/2022 (4:15pm) (tj)
|
September 22, 2022 |
Filing 184
Signature Page of Foreperson in Jury Note #1. (Access to the PDF Document is restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act. Access is limited to Counsel of Record and the Court.). (tj)
|
September 22, 2022 |
Filing 183
Jury Note #1 dated 9/2/2022. (12:25pm) (tj)
|
September 22, 2022 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Jury Deliberations resumed and concluded on 9/22/2022. Same Jury of 9 present. Jury returns a verdict in favor of plaintiff and against the defendant. (Court Reporter: Sara Wick) (tj)
|
September 21, 2022 |
Filing 182
ATTORNEYS' ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF TRIAL EXHIBITS. (tj)
|
September 21, 2022 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Jury Trial resumed and concluded on 9/21/2022. Same jury of 9 present. Jury Deliberations commence on 9/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 29A- In Person before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (Court Reporter: Sara Wick.) (tj)
|
September 20, 2022 |
Filing 180
NOTICE of Filing of Joint Verdict Form by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Klein, Stephen)
|
September 20, 2022 |
Filing 179
MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Klein, Stephen)
|
September 20, 2022 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Jury Trial resumed and held on 9/20/2022. Same 9 jurors present. Evidence entered, and Jury Trial continued to 9/21/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 29A- In Person before Judge Paul L. Friedman. Argument on Rule 50 motion, and the court reserves its ruling. Witness: Woodson Bradley Woodhouse. (Court Reporter: Sara Wick.) (tj)
|
September 19, 2022 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Jury Trial resumed and held on 9/19/2022. Same jury of 9 present. Evidence entered, and Jury Trial to resume on 9/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 29A-in Person before Judge Paul L. Friedman. Witnesses: Allison Maass; Scott Frey and James Okeefe. (Court Reporter: Sara Wick.) (tj)
|
September 16, 2022 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Jury Trial resumed and held on 9/16/2022. Same jury of 9 present. Evidence entered, and Jury Trial continued to 9/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 29A- In Person before Judge Paul L. Friedman. Witnesses: Christian Hartsock; Allison Maass. (Court Reporter: Sara Wick.) (ztj)
|
September 15, 2022 |
Filing 178
ORDER resolving evidentiary issues raised in defendants' #176 Final Status Report on Evidentiary Matters Likely to Arise in Plaintiffs' Opening Argument and with Plaintiffs' First Witness Robert Creamer. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 15, 2022. (ATM)
|
September 15, 2022 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Jury Trial begun and held on 9/15/2022. 9 jurors selected and sworn. Evidence entered, and Jury Trial continued to 9/16/2022 at 10:00 PM in Courtroom 29A- In Person before Judge Paul L. Friedman. Witness: Robert Creamer. (Court Reporter: Lorraine Herman) (tj)
|
September 15, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER: The Court having impaneled the jury in this action, it is hereby ORDERED that during trial and deliberations all meals for said jury shall be paid by the Clerk of the Court for the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia. (So Ordered Judge Paul L. Friedman on 9/15/2022). (tj)
|
September 14, 2022 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Jury Selection resumed and concluded on 9/14/2022. 9 jurors selected (not sworn). Jury Trial to begin 9/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 29A- In Person before Judge Paul L. Friedman.) (Court Reporter: Sara Wick.) (tj)
|
September 13, 2022 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Jury Selection held on 9/13/2022. Jury Selection continued to 9/14/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 29A- In Person before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (Court Reporter: Lorraine Herman.) (tj)
|
September 12, 2022 |
Filing 177
STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 73)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
September 12, 2022 |
Filing 176
Final STATUS REPORT on Evidentiary Matters Likely to Arise in Plaintiffs' Opening Argument and with Plaintiffs' First Witness Robert Creamer by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibits)(Calli, Paul)
|
September 9, 2022 |
Filing 175
Proposed Jury Instructions by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Calli, Paul)
|
September 8, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER: On or before September 9, 2022, the parties are directed to meet and confer and submit a joint revised filing of proposed jury instructions. The filing should incorporate the current versions of all instructions submitted by both sides, whether jointly proposed or objected to in whole or in part by the other side. The filing should reflect the parties' #137 Joint Submission Re Jury Instructions as amended by defendants' #173 Amended Submission Regarding Jury Instructions by the Project Veritas Parties. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 8, 2022. (lcjr)
|
September 7, 2022 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Final Pretrial Conference held on 9/7/2022. The court addresses trial procedures, and trial remains scheduled to commence on 9/13/2022. (Court Reporter; Lisa Moreira.) (tj)
|
September 7, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to plaintiffs' #160 Status Report, which stated that "Plaintiffs respectfully withdraw their Motion in Limine, to Preclude Defendants from Making Any Argument or Introducing Any Evidence for Purposes of Asserting a Journalism Defense," plaintiffs' #117 Motion in Limine is hereby terminated. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 7, 2022. (lcjr)
|
September 4, 2022 |
Filing 174
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation as to Lauren Windsor by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Calli, Paul)
|
September 2, 2022 |
Filing 173
Proposed Jury Instructions by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Calli, Paul)
|
September 1, 2022 |
Filing 172
NOTICE of Joint Statement of the Case for Jury Panel by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Calli, Paul)
|
September 1, 2022 |
Filing 171
Proposed Voir Dire by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Calli, Paul)
|
September 1, 2022 |
Filing 170
ORDER granting Mark Anthony Lancaster's #169 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs. Attorney Mark Anthony Lancaster terminated. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 1, 2022. (ATM)
|
September 1, 2022 |
Filing 169
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs by ROBERT CREAMER, DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC, STRATEGIC CONSULTING GROUP, NA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lancaster, Mark)
|
August 19, 2022 |
Filing 168
ORDER REGARDING TRIAL SCHEDULE AND PROCEDURES: On or before September 2, 2022, the parties may file additional voir dire questions and/or jury instructions. The parties should also provide, to the extent possible, an agreed upon statement of the case for the Court's use in briefly describing the case to the jury panel. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 19, 2022. (lcjr)
|
August 12, 2022 |
Filing 167
ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' #118 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Aaron Black; granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' #120 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Relating to Exposure of Defendant Allison Maass' Subsequent Attempt to Secretly Record Another Organization; granting plaintiffs' #119 Motion in Limine to Exclude Undercurrent Videos; and granting defendants' #128 Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Proposed Trial Exhibit 121. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 12, 2022. (ATM)
|
August 12, 2022 |
Filing 166
OPINION resolving the parties' pending motions in limine. See Opinion for details. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 12, 2022. (ATM)
|
August 12, 2022 |
Filing 165
NOTICE of Filing of Unredacted Version of Previously Sealed Brief by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC re #141 Memorandum in Opposition, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
August 11, 2022 |
Filing 164
NOTICE of filing Following Minute Order of August 11, 2022 by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND re Order,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to seal, #2 Exhibit Motion to seal)(Calli, Paul)
|
August 11, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' #163 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the following docket entries shall be unsealed: Project Veritas Parties' Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Proposed Trial Exhibit 121 [Dkt. No. 128]; Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Response to Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibit 121 [Dkt. No. 140-1]; and Project Veritas Parties' Reply in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Proposed Trial Exhibit 121 [Dkt. No. 150-1]. On or before August 12, 2022, the parties are directed to file unredacted versions of these briefs on the public docket. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 11, 2022. (lcjr)
|
August 10, 2022 |
Filing 163
Joint STATUS REPORT by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Calli, Paul)
|
August 9, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' #162 Unopposed Motion to Redact and Unseal Transcript. It is hereby ORDERED that the previously identified word appearing on page 76, line 4 of the #161 July 14, 2022 hearing transcript will be redacted; and pages 73-79 of the transcript shall be unsealed. It is further ORDERED that on or before August 10, 2022, the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint status report regarding whether the underlying briefs may be unsealed as well. See Project Veritas Parties' Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs Proposed Trial Exhibit 121 [Dkt. No. 125]; Plaintiffs Response [Dkt. No. 140]; Defendants Reply [Dkt. No. 150]. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 9, 2022. (lcjr)
|
August 5, 2022 |
Filing 162
Unopposed MOTION to Unseal Document #161 Transcript,,,,, , Unopposed MOTION to Redact re: Transcript #161 by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed order)(Calli, Paul)
|
July 21, 2022 |
Filing 161
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Paul L. Friedman held on July 14, 2022; Page Numbers: 1-81. Date of Issuance: July 21, 2022. Court Reporter: Janice Dickman, Telephone number: 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/11/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2022.(Dickman, Janice)
|
July 21, 2022 |
Filing 160
STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Sandler, Joseph)
|
July 19, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER granting the defendants' #159 Unopposed Motion to Authorize Release of Sealed Transcripts to Defendants Project Veritas Parties. The court reporter is hereby authorized to provide to defendants the transcript of the July 14, 2022 sealed hearing regarding defendants' #125 Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Proposed Trial Exhibit 121. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 19, 2022. (ATM)
|
July 18, 2022 |
Filing 159
Unopposed MOTION for Order to Authorize Release of Sealed Transcript by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Stephen)
|
July 14, 2022 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Motion Hearing held on 7/14/2022 re #120 MOTION in Limine, #118 MOTION in Limine, #117 MOTION in Limine #125 #119 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Undercurrent Videos filed by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. Oral argument heard, and the court takes the motion under advisement. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (tj)
|
July 13, 2022 |
Filing 158
ORDER setting forth additional procedures and restrictions for oral argument on the five pending motions in limine, which is scheduled for July 14, 2022, beginning at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 29. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 13, 2022. (lcjr)
|
July 12, 2022 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 29A- In Person before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (tj)
|
June 29, 2022 |
Filing 157
ORDER setting forth the procedures and schedule for oral argument on the five pending motions in limine, which will be heard on July 14, 2022, beginning at 1:00 p.m., in Courtroom 29 in the William B. Bryant Annex to the E. Barrett Prettyman Courthouse at 333 Constitution Avenue N.W., Washington, D.C. 20001. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 29, 2022. (ATM)
|
June 27, 2022 |
Filing 156
Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Sandler, Joseph)
|
June 22, 2022 |
Filing 155
ORDER: The Court will hear oral argument on the five pending motions in limine on July 14, 2022, beginning at 1:00 p.m., with further details to be provided by the Court at a later date. On or before June 28, 2022, the parties are directed to meet and confer and submit a joint status report providing further information regarding procedures for oral argument. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 22, 2022. (lcjr)
|
June 21, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER: On or before June 24, 2022, defendants are directed to provide to the Court the video exhibits cited in their #139 Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Aaron Black. Specifically, defendants shall prepare and deliver to chambers a thumb drive with PVA00013196 and PVA00013411. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 21, 2022. (lcjr)
|
June 17, 2022 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Status Conference held on 6/17/2022. The court addresses scheduling in this matter and scheduling in 21 mc 133. Orders to be issued by the court. (Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor) (tj)
|
June 16, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER: On June 17, 2022, the Court will convene a status conference in Democracy Partners v. Project Veritas, 17-cv-1047. The status conference will include discussion of anticipated pretrial filings, including the motion to quash filed in the related case American Federation of State, County & Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO v. Project Veritas ("American Federation"), 21-mc-00133. The petitioner in American Federation is therefore permitted to participate in the aforementioned status conference on June 17, 2022 via Zoom videoconference, the details of which will be sent the morning of or in advance of the hearing. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 16, 2022. (lcjr)
|
June 2, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a status conference is scheduled on June 17, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. via Zoom videoconference, the details of which will be sent the morning of or in advance of the hearing. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 2, 2022. (ATM)
|
May 31, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER: For scheduling reasons, the Court is no longer available for the status conference scheduled for June 1, 2022 at 12:00 p.m. The status conference of June 1, 2022 therefore is hereby VACATED. A rescheduled status conference will be announced by the Court at a later date. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 31, 2022. (lcjr)
|
May 25, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER: On February 8, 2022, the parties agreed on an amended schedule for trial, which is scheduled to begin on September 13, 2022. See Minute Entry (Feb. 8, 2022). At the upcoming status conference on June 1, 2022, the parties should be prepared to discuss any proposed or possible changes in the deadlines for an amended scheduling order, which should include any amended or newly filed pretrial filings. See Order [Dkt. No. 99]. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 25, 2022. (lcjr)
|
February 8, 2022 |
Minute Entry for Zoom Video Status Conference held before Judge Paul L. Friedman on 2/8/2022. Status Conference set for 6/1/2022 at 12:00 PM via Zoom. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/7/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 29A-In Person. Jury Selection set for 9/13/2022 at 9:30 AM in the Ceremonial Courtroom. Jury Trial set for 9/14/2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 29A- In Person. All hearings conducted before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (Court Reporter: Lisa Griffith) (zgdf)
|
January 18, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER: Status Conference is set for 2/8/2022 at 3:00 PM before Judge Paul L. Friedman via zoom video. Parties appearing in this action will receive an invitation prior to the scheduled hearing. (Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 1/18/22). (tj)
|
January 14, 2022 |
Filing 154
Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Sandler, Joseph)
|
January 10, 2022 |
Filing 153
ORDER regarding trial dates. The parties are directed to meet and confer and file a joint status report on or before January 24, 2022. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 10, 2022. (lcaa)
|
December 13, 2021 |
Filing 152
Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Sandler, Joseph)
|
November 22, 2021 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Status Conference held on 11/22/2021. The court tentatively sets the following trial schedule (parties to confirm availability): Pretrial Conference is set for March 2, 2022 at 10:00, and Jury Selection/Trial is scheduled to commence on March 9, 2021 at 10:00am. (Court Reporter: Nancy Meyer) (tj)
|
November 16, 2021 |
Filing 151
REPLY to opposition to motion re #125 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs Proposed Trial Exhibit 121 (redacted per order of the Court) filed by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Klein, Stephen)
|
November 15, 2021 |
Filing 150
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Project Veritas Parties Reply in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs Proposed Trial Exhibit 121, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Stephen)
|
November 15, 2021 |
Filing 149
REPLY to opposition to motion re #118 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Aaron Black filed by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 Excerpts of Maass Deposition, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 Maass Depo Exhibit, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 Maass Mepo Exhibit)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
November 15, 2021 |
Filing 148
REPLY to opposition to motion re #119 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Undercurrent Videos filed by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Sandler, Joseph)
|
November 15, 2021 |
Filing 147
REPLY to opposition to motion re #120 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Relating to Exposure of Defendant Allison Maass' Subsequent Attempt to Secretly Record Another Organization filed by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 Excerpts of Deposition of Lauren Windsor)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
November 15, 2021 |
Filing 146
REPLY to opposition to motion re #117 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Making Any Argument or Introducing Any Evidence for the Purpose of Establishing a Journalism Defense filed by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Sandler, Joseph)
|
November 11, 2021 |
Filing 145
ORDER granting #144 Motion to Continue Trial. The pretrial conference currently scheduled for 11/22/2021 is VACATED. The trial currently scheduled to begin on 12/6/2021 is VACATED. A status hearing is set for 10:00 a.m. on 11/22/2021 via Zoom videoconference. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 11, 2021. (lcaa)
|
November 11, 2021 |
Filing 144
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Calli, Paul)
|
November 10, 2021 |
Filing 143
Memorandum in opposition to re #125 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs Proposed Trial Exhibit 121 (redacted per order of the Court) (Opposition redacted per Order of the Court) filed by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Sandler, Joseph)
|
November 10, 2021 |
MINUTE ORDER: #142 Project Veritas Parties' Unopposed Emergency Motion to Strike and Seal Plaintiffs' Improperly Unredacted Pleading is GRANTED. The Clerk's Office is directed to strike and seal #141 Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Response to Project Veritas's Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibit 121. Plaintiffs are directed to re-file a properly redacted version of their opposition brief on the public docket. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 10, 2021. (lcaa)
|
November 9, 2021 |
Filing 142
Unopposed MOTION to Strike #141 Memorandum in Opposition, AND SEAL PLAINTIFFS IMPROPERLY UNREDACTED PLEADING by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Calli, Paul). Added MOTION to Seal Document on 11/10/2021 (znmw).
|
November 8, 2021 |
Filing 141
STRICKEN PRUSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 11/10/2021.....Sealed Memorandum in opposition to re #125 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs Proposed Trial Exhibit 121 (redacted per order of the Court) (Opposition redacted per Order of the Court) filed by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Sandler, Joseph) Modified on 11/10/2021 (znmw).
|
November 5, 2021 |
Filing 140
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Sealed Document--Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Sealed Motion in Limine)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
November 5, 2021 |
Filing 139
RESPONSE re #118 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Aaron Black filed by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpts, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Calli, Paul)
|
November 5, 2021 |
Filing 138
PRETRIAL STATEMENT by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Sandler, Joseph)
|
November 5, 2021 |
Filing 137
Proposed Jury Instructions by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Sandler, Joseph)
|
November 5, 2021 |
Filing 136
Proposed Voir Dire by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Calli, Paul)
|
November 4, 2021 |
Filing 135
ORDER granting #134 motion of Kerry Brainard Verdi and Benjamin R. Ogletree to withdraw as counsel for defendants. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 4, 2021. (MA)
|
November 2, 2021 |
Filing 134
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kerry Brainard Verdi and Benjamin R. Ogletree by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Verdi, Kerry) Modified event on 11/3/2021 (znmw).
|
November 2, 2021 |
Filing 133
RESPONSE re #117 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Making Any Argument or Introducing Any Evidence for the Purpose of Establishing a Journalism Defense filed by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript excerpts, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Calli, Paul)
|
November 1, 2021 |
Filing 132
NOTICE OF FILING PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 5.4(e)(1) by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Calli, Paul)
|
November 1, 2021 |
Filing 131
RESPONSE re #119 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Undercurrent Videos filed by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Video notice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Calli, Paul)
|
November 1, 2021 |
Filing 130
NOTICE OF FILING PURSUANT TO RULE 5.4(E)(1) by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Calli, Paul)
|
November 1, 2021 |
Filing 129
RESPONSE re #120 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Relating to Exposure of Defendant Allison Maass' Subsequent Attempt to Secretly Record Another Organization filed by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PV Trial Ex. 162, #2 Exhibit PV Trial Ex. 163, #3 Exhibit Notice of Recording, #4 Exhibit Deposition excerpts, #5 Exhibit Deposition exhibit, #6 Exhibit PV Trial Ex. 159, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Calli, Paul)
|
October 29, 2021 |
Filing 127
ORDER granting #126 motion of Dara Lindenbaum to withdraw as Attorney on behalf of plaintiffs. Attorney Dara Lindenbaum terminated. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 29, 2021. (MA)
|
October 29, 2021 |
Filing 126
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ROBERT CREAMER, DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STRATEGIC CONSULTING GROUP, NA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lindenbaum, Dara)
|
October 28, 2021 |
Filing 125
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs Proposed Trial Exhibit 121 (redacted per order of the Court) by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Stephen)
|
October 27, 2021 |
Filing 128
SEALED MOTION In Limine filed by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(znmw)
|
October 26, 2021 |
Filing 124
ORDER granting #123 Michael J. Madigan's motion to withdraw as counsel for defendants. Attorney Michael J. Madigan terminated. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 26, 2021. (MA)
|
October 26, 2021 |
Filing 123
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael Madigan by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Calli, Paul)
|
October 25, 2021 |
Filing 122
NOTICE of Filing Pursuant to LCvR 5.4(e)(1) by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC re #120 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Relating to Exposure of Defendant Allison Maass' Subsequent Attempt to Secretly Record Another Organization (Sandler, Joseph)
|
October 25, 2021 |
Filing 121
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion in Limine for Sealing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Stephen)
|
October 25, 2021 |
Filing 120
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Relating to Exposure of Defendant Allison Maass' Subsequent Attempt to Secretly Record Another Organization by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
October 25, 2021 |
Filing 119
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Undercurrent Videos by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
October 25, 2021 |
Filing 118
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Aaron Black by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
October 25, 2021 |
Filing 117
MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Making Any Argument or Introducing Any Evidence for the Purpose of Establishing a Journalism Defense by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
October 22, 2021 |
Filing 116
SEALED ORDER that defendants motion #115 for leave to file a highly confidential exhibit and motion in limine under seal pursuant to stipulated Protective Order is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART without prejudice. **See document for further details** (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/22/2021).(tj)
|
October 20, 2021 |
Filing 115
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit for Sealed Filing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Stephen)
|
October 14, 2021 |
Filing 114
OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #100 Project Veritas Parties' Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Politically-Motivated Efforts to Introduce Irrelevant Evidence. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 14, 2021. (lcaa)
|
October 4, 2021 |
Filing 113
NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Bustos on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bustos, Christina)
|
October 1, 2021 |
Filing 112
JOINT STIPULATIONS OF FACT by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Calli, Paul) Modified on 10/4/2021 to correct docket event/text (zjf).
|
September 21, 2021 |
Filing 111
OPINION AND ORDER denying #85 Defendants' Motion to Admit Creamer's Federal Felony Convictions for Bank Fraud and Tax Crimes. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 21, 2021. (lcaa)
|
August 27, 2021 |
Filing 110
NOTICE of PV Parties' Responses to Proposed Stipulations of Fact by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Calli, Paul)
|
August 27, 2021 |
Filing 109
NOTICE of Objections to Plaintiffs' Discovery Responses by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Calli, Paul)
|
August 27, 2021 |
Filing 108
NOTICE of PV Parties' Objections to Proposed Exhibits by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Calli, Paul)
|
August 27, 2021 |
Filing 107
NOTICE of PV Parties' Deposition Designations by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Calli, Paul)
|
July 26, 2021 |
Filing 106
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Anthony Lancaster on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lancaster, Mark)
|
July 22, 2021 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Motion Hearing held on 7/22/2021. 1) MOTION in Limine #85 Project Veritas Parties Motion to Admit Creamers Federal Felony Convictions for Bank Fraud and Tax Crimes and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by PROJECT VERITAS, JAMES O'KEEFE, ALLISON MAASS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND IS DENIED IN PART AND TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT IN PART BY THE COURT. 2) MOTION in Limine #100 to Exclude Plaintiffs Politically-Motivated Efforts to Introduce Irrelevant Evidence filed by PROJECT VERITAS, JAMES O'KEEFE, ALLISON MAASS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND is GRANTED IN PART AND TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT IN PART BY THE COURT. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Saint Loth.) (ztj)
|
July 21, 2021 |
Filing 105
ORDER concerning procedures for oral arguments on #85 Project Veritas Parties' Motion to Admit Creamer's Federal Felony Convictions and #100 Project Veritas Parties' Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Politically-Motivated Efforts to Introduce Irrelevant Evidence. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 21, 2021. (lcaf)
|
July 9, 2021 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2021 at 2:00 PM in before Judge Paul L. Friedman via Zoom Video. (tj)
|
June 30, 2021 |
MINUTE ORDER: The oral arguments previously scheduled to take place on July 19, 2021 are CANCELLED. Oral arguments on #85 Project Veritas Parties' Motion to Admit Creamer's Federal Felony Convictions and #100 Project Veritas Parties' Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Politically-Motivated Efforts to Introduce Irrelevant Evidence are RESCHEDULED to take place on July 22, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. via Zoom videoconference. The parties will be provided with a Zoom invitation prior to the hearing. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 30, 2021. (lcaf)
|
June 29, 2021 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge Paul L. Friedman via Zoom Video. (tj)
|
June 28, 2021 |
MINUTE ORDER: The parties are directed to appear via Zoom videoconference on July 19, 2021, at 2:30 p.m. to present oral arguments on #85 Project Veritas Parties' Motion to Admit Creamer's Federal Felony Convictions and #100 Project Veritas Parties' Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Politically-Motivated Efforts to Introduce Irrelevant Evidence. The parties will be provided with a Zoom invitation prior to the hearing. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 28, 2021. (lcaf)
|
June 26, 2021 |
MINUTE ORDER: In accordance with the representations made by the parties, the status conference currently scheduled for June 28, 2021 is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 26, 2021. (MA)
|
June 16, 2021 |
Filing 104
REPLY to opposition to motion re #100 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs Politically-Motivated Efforts to Introduce Irrelevant Evidence filed by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Calli, Paul)
|
June 9, 2021 |
Filing 103
Memorandum in opposition to re #100 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs Politically-Motivated Efforts to Introduce Irrelevant Evidence filed by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 Excerpts Transcript Depo James O'Keefe, #2 Exhibit Ex 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
May 26, 2021 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 6/9/2021. (tj)
|
May 24, 2021 |
Filing 102
ORDER granting #101 plaintiffs' unopposed motion for extension of time up to and including June 9, 2021 within which to file opposition to defendant's motion in limine to exclude plaintiffs' politically motivated efforts to introduce irrelevant evidence. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 24, 2021. (MA)
|
May 24, 2021 |
Filing 101
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #100 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs Politically-Motivated Efforts to Introduce Irrelevant Evidence by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
May 17, 2021 |
Filing 100
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs Politically-Motivated Efforts to Introduce Irrelevant Evidence by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order, #2 Exhibit Deposition excerpts, #3 Exhibit Letter)(Calli, Paul)
|
March 8, 2021 |
Filing 99
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. A pretrial conference is scheduled for November 22, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. This case is set for a jury trial to begin with jury selection on December 6, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 8, 2021. (lcaf)
|
March 8, 2021 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Admissions due by 6/25/2021. Exhibit List due by 8/6/2021. Witness List due by 8/6/2021. Attorney Meet and Confer Conference due by 9/10/2021. Proposed Voir Dire due by 11/5/2021. Pretrial Statement due by 11/5/2021. Motion in Limine due by 10/25/2021. Responses due by 11/8/2021 Replies due by 11/15/2021. Trial Briefs due by 11/12/2021 (tj)
|
March 5, 2021 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Telephone Conference held on 3/5/2021. Parties inform the court of the status of this action, and the court sets the following schedule: Status Conference set for 6/28/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul L. Friedman via Zoom Video.Pretrial Conference set for 11/22/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul L. Friedman, and Jury Selection set for 12/6/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul L. Friedman in a courtroom to be determined at a later date. (Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins) (tj)
|
February 19, 2021 |
Filing 98
ORDER directing the parties to appear for a telephonic status conference on March 5, 2021. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 19, 2021. (lcaf)
|
January 27, 2021 |
Filing 97
Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Sandler, Joseph)
|
January 13, 2021 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/3/2021. (tj)
|
January 13, 2021 |
MINUTE ORDER that on or before February 3, 2021, the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint status report stating how they wish to proceed and proposing a schedule for further proceedings, in light of the COVID-19 Standing Order 20-93 issued by the Chief Judge on December 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 13, 2021. (lcaf)
|
September 10, 2020 |
Filing 96
Case directly reassigned to Judge Paul L. Friedman by consent. Judge Ellen S. Huvelle is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
|
August 27, 2020 |
Filing 95
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #87 defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on Augsut 27, 2020. (AG)
|
August 12, 2020 |
Filing 94
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. Attorney Heather Renee Abraham terminated. (Francois, Aderson)
|
May 22, 2020 |
Filing 93
REPLY to opposition to motion re #87 MOTION for Reconsideration re #82 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Project Veritas Parties Motion for Reconsideration of Summary Judgment Order as to Clear Error of Fact Regarding AFSCME Rule 30(B)(6) Witness Scott Freys Testimony filed by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Calli, Paul)
|
May 18, 2020 |
Filing 92
Memorandum in opposition to re #87 MOTION for Reconsideration re #82 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Project Veritas Parties Motion for Reconsideration of Summary Judgment Order as to Clear Error of Fact Regarding AFSCME Rule 30(B)(6) Witness Scott Freys Testimony filed by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
May 13, 2020 |
Filing 91
REPLY to opposition to motion re #85 MOTION in Limine Project Veritas Parties Motion to Admit Creamers Federal Felony Convictions for Bank Fraud and Tax Crimes and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Government's Response to Defendant's Position on Sentencing, #2 Exhibit Frey deposition excerpts)(Calli, Paul)
|
May 8, 2020 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/18/2020. (zgdf)
|
May 8, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #89 Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File Opposition to #87 Project Veritas Parties' Motion for Reconsideration of Summary Judgment Order: Upon consideration of plaintiffs' consent motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiffs shall have until May 18, 2020, to file their Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Project Veritas Parties' Motion for Reconsideration of Summary Judgment Order. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on May 8, 2020. (AG)
|
May 7, 2020 |
Filing 90
Memorandum in opposition to re #85 MOTION in Limine Project Veritas Parties Motion to Admit Creamers Federal Felony Convictions for Bank Fraud and Tax Crimes and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
May 7, 2020 |
Filing 89
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #87 MOTION for Reconsideration re #82 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Project Veritas Parties Motion for Reconsideration of Summary Judgment Order as to Clear Error of Fact Regarding AFSCME Rule 30(B)(6) Witness Scott Freys Testimony by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
April 29, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #88 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #85 defendants' MOTION in Limine: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File an Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine, it is hereby ORDERED that the time for Plaintiffs to file their Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine is extended until May 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 29, 2020. (AG)
|
April 28, 2020 |
Filing 88
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #85 MOTION in Limine Project Veritas Parties Motion to Admit Creamers Federal Felony Convictions for Bank Fraud and Tax Crimes and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
April 27, 2020 |
Filing 87
MOTION for Reconsideration re #82 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Project Veritas Parties Motion for Reconsideration of Summary Judgment Order as to Clear Error of Fact Regarding AFSCME Rule 30(B)(6) Witness Scott Freys Testimony by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Excerpts)(Calli, Paul)
|
April 17, 2020 |
Filing 86
NOTICE Certification of Conferral With Respect to Project Veritas Parties Motion to Admit Creamers Federal Felony Convictions for Bank Fraud and Tax Crimes and Incorporated Memorandum of Law [D.E. 85] by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND re #85 MOTION in Limine Project Veritas Parties Motion to Admit Creamers Federal Felony Convictions for Bank Fraud and Tax Crimes and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Calli, Paul)
|
April 16, 2020 |
Filing 85
MOTION in Limine Project Veritas Parties Motion to Admit Creamers Federal Felony Convictions for Bank Fraud and Tax Crimes and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Creamer Plea Agreement to Bank Fraud and Tax Crimes, #2 Exhibit 6/8/97 article, #3 Exhibit Creamer Federal Indictment for Bank Fraud and Tax Crimes, #4 Exhibit Creamer Criminal Judgment for Bank Fraud and Tax Crimes, #5 Exhibit Excerpts of Creamer deposition, #6 Exhibit Excerpts of Creamer Sentencing Memo in Bank Fraud and Tax Crimes Case, #7 Exhibit 6/27/97 article, #8 Exhibit 4/12/81 article, #9 Exhibit 4/28/16 email)(Calli, Paul)
|
April 13, 2020 |
Filing 84
Joint STATUS REPORT by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Calli, Paul)
|
March 31, 2020 |
Filing 83
MEMORANDUM OPINION accompanying #82 Order granting in part and denying in part #63 defendants' motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 31, 2020. (AG)
|
March 31, 2020 |
Filing 82
ORDER granting in part and denying in part #63 defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 31, 2020. (AG)
|
March 31, 2020 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/20/2020. (zgdf)
|
February 21, 2020 |
Filing 81
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Micah Ian Bluming on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA Substituting for attorney Gregory Cumming (Bluming, Micah)
|
September 10, 2019 |
Filing 80
RESPONSE re #76 Notice (Other) TO THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAS DEFENSE OF THE CONSTITUTIONALITY OF D.C. CODE 23-542(B)(3) filed by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Calli, Paul)
|
August 29, 2019 |
Filing 79
ERRATA Regarding Notice of Decision Not to Intervene by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA #78 Notice (Other) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Healy, Christopher)
|
August 29, 2019 |
Filing 78
NOTICE of Decision Not to Intervene to Defend the Constitutionality of a Federal Statute by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Healy, Christopher)
|
August 23, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Omnibus Response due by 9/17/2019. (gdf)
|
August 23, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #77 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File: Upon consideration of the Project Veritas Parties' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Omnibus Response to Government Rule 5.1 Filings, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Project Veritas Parties shall have until September 17, 2019, to file a single Omnibus Response to both Rule 5.1 submissions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 23, 2019. (AG)
|
August 22, 2019 |
Filing 77
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Omnibus Response to Government Rule 5.1 Filings by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Calli, Paul)
|
August 19, 2019 |
Filing 76
NOTICE of Intervention Under Rule 5.1 to Defend the Constitutionality of a District of Columbia Statute by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA re #67 Order, #65 Notice (Other) (Cumming, Gregory)
|
July 2, 2019 |
Filing 75
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Intervene Under Rule 5.1 to Present Argument on the Constitutionality of a District of Columbia Statute by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cumming, Gregory)
|
July 2, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #75 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: Upon consideration of the District of Columbia's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Intervene Under Rule 5.1 to Present Argument on the Constitutionality of a District of Columbia Statute, and the entire record, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the District of Columbia shall have until August 19, 2019, to intervene and file a memorandum in defense of the constitutionality of the statute at issue. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 2, 2019. (AG)
|
July 2, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: To intervene and file a memorandum by 8/19/2019. (gdf)
|
June 29, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Intent to Intervene due by 9/3/2019. (gdf)
|
June 29, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #74 United States' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Intervene: Upon consideration of the United States' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Intervene, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the United States shall have until September 3, 2019, to decide whether to intervene and to file a memorandum in defense of the constitutionality of the challenged statute. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on June 29, 2019. (AG)
|
June 28, 2019 |
Filing 74
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Consider Intervention by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Bailey, Kate)
|
June 18, 2019 |
Filing 73
NOTICE of Filing Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.4(e)(1) by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND re #72 Affidavit,, (Klein, Stephen)
|
June 17, 2019 |
Filing 72
AFFIDAVIT re #71 Reply to opposition to Motion,, by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Teter directed verdict transcript, #2 Exhibit Excerpt of timeline, #3 Exhibit 6-23-17 email thread, #4 Exhibit 1-9-17 email thread, #5 Exhibit Windsor deposition, #6 Exhibit 1-10-17 email, #7 Exhibit Teter directed verdict transcript, #8 Exhibit 9-26-16 audio recording, #9 Exhibit 10-5-16 raw video, #10 Exhibit Creamer deposition, #11 Exhibit 10-12-16 raw video)(Calli, Paul)
|
June 17, 2019 |
Filing 71
REPLY to opposition to motion re #63 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Teter directed verdict transcript, #2 Exhibit Timeline, #3 Exhibit 6-23-17 email thread, #4 Exhibit 1-9-17 email thread, #5 Exhibit Windsor deposition, #6 Exhibit 1-10-17 email, #7 Exhibit Teter Rule 50 hearing transcript, #8 Exhibit 9-26-16 audio records, #9 Exhibit 10-5-16 raw video, #10 Exhibit Creamer deposition, #11 Exhibit 10-12-16 raw video)(Calli, Paul)
|
June 10, 2019 |
Filing 70
NOTICE OF FILING STATUS UPDATE OF SIMILAR LITIGATION by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Teter order)(Calli, Paul)
|
June 3, 2019 |
Filing 69
NOTICE of Filing Status Update of Similar Litigation by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summary judgment order, #2 Exhibit Attorneys fees notice, #3 Exhibit Teter transcript, #4 Exhibit Summary judgment ruling)(Calli, Paul)
|
June 3, 2019 |
Filing 68
Memorandum in opposition to re #63 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ROBERT CREAMER. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts Plaintiffs Statement of Material Facts, #2 Declaration of Robert Creamer, #3 Declaration of Joseph Sandler, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
May 10, 2019 |
Filing 67
CERTIFICATION to United States' Attorney General and District of Columbia Attorney General re #65 defendants' Notice of Constitutional Questions and ordering Clerk of Court to serve Certification on both Attorneys General. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on May 10, 2019. (AG)
|
May 9, 2019 |
Filing 66
NOTICE of Service Pursuant to FRCP 5.1(a)(2) by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt from U.S. Attorney General, #2 Exhibit Return Receipt from D.C. Attorney General)(Klein, Stephen)
|
May 7, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER re #65 Notice (Other) filed by PROJECT VERITAS, JAMES O'KEEFE, ALLISON MAASS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.1(a) and 28 U.S.C. 1403, defendants have filed a "Notice of Constitutional Questions," which states that their memorandum in support of their motion for summary judgment "calls into question the constitutionality of a federal statute, 18 U.S.C. 2511(2)(d), and a statute of the District of Columbia, D.C. Code 23-542(b)(3)." (ECF No. #65 .) Rule 5.1(a)(2) requires that the party filing such a notice must "serve the notice and paper on the Attorney General of the United States if a federal statute is questioned--or on the state attorney general if a state statute is questioned--either by certified or registered mail or by sending it to an electronic address designated by the attorney general for this purpose." Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.1(a)(2). The notice filed by defendants does not indicate whether such service has been made. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that defendants shall promptly serve the above-referenced notice and memorandum on the Attorney General for the United States and the District of Columbia Attorney General and file proof of such service with the Court. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on May 7, 2019. (AG)
|
May 6, 2019 |
Filing 65
NOTICE of Constitutional Questions by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND re #63 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Klein, Stephen)
|
May 6, 2019 |
Filing 64
NOTICE of Filing Pursuant to Local Rule 5.4(e)(1) by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Klein, Stephen)
|
May 6, 2019 |
Filing 63
MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Exhibit O'Keefe affidavit, #4 Exhibit Maass affidavit, #5 Exhibit Klein affidavit, #6 Exhibit YouTube videos, #7 Exhibit Creamer deposition, #8 Exhibit Hartsock meeting, #9 Exhibit 10-27-16 email, #10 Exhibit AUFC deposition, #11 Exhibit AFSCME deposition, #12 Exhibit 11-9-16 email, #13 Exhibit Consulting Agreement, #14 Exhibit Hartsock deposition, #15 Exhibit Foval call, #16 Exhibit Responses to Ints, #17 Exhibit Consulting Agreement, #18 Exhibit 6-1-17 email, #19 Exhibit 10-3-16 invoice, #20 Exhibit DPC deposition, #21 Exhibit 11-9-16 email, #22 Exhibit O'Keefe deposition, #23 Exhibit 7-28-16 email, #24 Exhibit 6-16-16 email, #25 Exhibit 6-24-16 email, #26 Exhibit 7-14-16 email, #27 Exhibit 8-18-16 email, #28 Exhibit 7-15-16 email, #29 Exhibit Maass call, #30 Exhibit request for admissions, #31 Exhibit Windsor deposition, #32 Exhibit 9-22-16 email, #33 Exhibit 9-22-16 email, #34 Exhibit 9-23-16 email, #35 Exhibit Windsor presentation, #36 Exhibit Maass videos, #37 Exhibit DP deposition, #38 Exhibit Plaintiff's answers to ints, #39 Exhibit Mobilize invoice, #40 Exhibit 3-13-15 email, #41 Exhibit door picture, #42 Exhibit 10-7-11 email, #43 Exhibit 1-3-17 email, #44 Exhibit 2-12-15 email, #45 Exhibit spreadsheet, #46 Exhibit AUFC invoice, #47 Exhibit 6-3 through 6-4-15 emails, #48 Exhibit AUFC invoice, #49 Exhibit AUFC invoice, #50 Exhibit Plaintiff's answers to ints, #51 Exhibit 3-18 through 3-20-15 emails, #52 Exhibit Factual Stipulation, #53 Exhibit Maass video, #54 Exhibit Maass video, #55 Exhibit Maass deposition, #56 Exhibit 10-14-16 email, #57 Exhibit 9-28-16 email, #58 Exhibit Consulting Agreement, #59 Exhibit 9-22-16 email, #60 Exhibit 9-22-16 email, #61 Exhibit 7-23-16 email, #62 Exhibit 10-6-16 email, #63 Exhibit 9-21-16 email, #64 Exhibit 10-5-16 email, #65 Exhibit 10-12 through 10-26-16 emails, #66 Exhibit 10-14 through 10-15-16 emails, #67 Exhibit 10-14 through 10-16-16 emails, #68 Text of Proposed Order)(Calli, Paul)
|
May 6, 2019 |
Filing 62
STIPULATION of the Parties by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Calli, Paul)
|
April 3, 2019 |
Filing 61
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle held on 3-6-19; Page Numbers: 1-12. Date of Issuance:4-3-19. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Griffith, Telephone number (202) 354-3247, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the
|
March 6, 2019 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Status Conference held on 3/6/2019. Summary Judgment motions due by 5/6/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/3/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/17/2019. (Court Reporter: Lisa Griffith) (gdf)
|
March 4, 2019 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/6/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
|
February 12, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER finding as moot #60 Consent Motion to Continue Status Conference: Counsel has informed the Court that they no longer seek to continue the Status Conference set for March 6, 2019. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the consent motion to continue is terminated as moot. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on February 12, 2019. (AG)
|
February 11, 2019 |
Filing 60
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Move status conference one day ,/i> by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Calli, Paul) Modified event title on 2/11/2019 (znmw).
|
December 13, 2018 |
Filing 59
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
December 13, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #59 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline, it is hereby ORDERED that the Scheduling Order entered in this case (ECF No. #33 ) is modified to require that all discovery be completed by January 18, 2019, except for the depositions of James O'Keefe, Scott Foval and Dialysis Patient Citizens, which shall be completed by March 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 13, 2018. (AG)
|
November 5, 2018 |
Filing 58
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference Due to Trial Conflict by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Calli, Paul)
|
November 5, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #58 Unopposed Motion to Continue: It is hereby ORDERED that the Status Conference presently set for January 22, 2019, is CONTINUED until 3/6/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 5, 2018. (AG)
|
September 26, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER: In light of #57 defendants' Notice of Withdrawal of #47 Motion for Leave to File Confidential Exhibits Under Seal, which the Court previously provisionally granted (see Order, ECF No. #52 ), it is hereby ORDERED that the exhibits referenced in that motion are unsealed. As those exhibits are not in a format compatible with electronic filing, they are accessible as set forth in defendants' Notice of Filing pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.4(e)(1), ECF No. #48 . Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 26, 2018. (AG)
|
September 25, 2018 |
Filing 57
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND re: Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Confidential Exhibits Under Seal Pursuant to Stipulated Confidentiality Order (ECF #47) (Verdi, Kerry)
|
September 14, 2018 |
Filing 56
NOTICE to Withdraw as Attorney (Yael Bromberg) by ROBERT CREAMER, DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC (Francois, Aderson) Modified text on 9/18/2018 (ztd).
|
August 15, 2018 |
Filing 54
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Heather Abraham, :Firm- Civil Rights Clinic, :Address- Georgetown University Law Center, 600 New Jersey Ave Suite 531, Washington D.C. 20001. Phone No. - 202-662-9535. Fax No. - 202-662-9634 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5639691. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration Heather Abraham, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bromberg, Yael)
|
August 15, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #54 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Upon consideration of the motion for pro hac vice admission of Heather Abraham, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Heather Abraham be admitted to appear and participate in the above-captioned matter as pro hac vice counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 15, 2018. (AG)
|
August 13, 2018 |
Filing 55
SEALED Exhibit re #49 Memorandum in Opposition filed by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
|
August 13, 2018 |
Filing 53
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #46 defendants' Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 13, 2018. (AG)
|
August 13, 2018 |
Filing 52
ORDER provisionally granting #47 defendants' Motion for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal; provisionally granting #50 plaintiffs' Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 13, 2018. (AG) Modified on 8/13/2018 (AG).
|
July 6, 2018 |
Filing 51
REPLY to opposition to motion re #46 MOTION for Sanctions pursuant to Rule 11 filed by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Calli, Paul)
|
July 6, 2018 |
Filing 50
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
July 6, 2018 |
Filing 49
Memorandum in opposition to re #46 MOTION for Sanctions pursuant to Rule 11 filed by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
June 22, 2018 |
Filing 48
NOTICE of Filing Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.4(e)(1) by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND re #46 MOTION for Sanctions pursuant to Rule 11 (Klein, Stephen)
|
June 22, 2018 |
Filing 47
WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO DOCKET ENTRY #57 .....Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Confidential Exhibits Under Seal Pursuant to Stipulated Confidentiality Order by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Calli, Paul) Modified event title on 6/26/2018 (znmw). Modified on 9/26/2018 (jf).
|
June 22, 2018 |
Filing 46
MOTION for Sanctions pursuant to Rule 11 by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Calli, Paul)
|
May 23, 2018 |
Filing 45
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. Attorney Joseph Scott Shannon terminated. (Shannon, Joseph)
|
May 23, 2018 |
Filing 44
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin R. Ogletree on behalf of ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Ogletree, Benjamin)
|
May 23, 2018 |
Filing 43
NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry Brainard Verdi on behalf of ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Verdi, Kerry)
|
May 16, 2018 |
Filing 42
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (approved by Court). Modified event title on 5/24/2018 (znmw). Modified on 6/25/2018 to correct document name (AG).
|
May 16, 2018 |
Filing 41
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bromberg, Yael)
|
May 16, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #41 Joint Motion for Protective Order: This matter comes before the Court on the parties' Joint Motion for Entry of a Stipulated Protective Order. Upon consideration of this motion and the record herein it appears that there is good cause to grant the motion. Accordingly it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall docket the parties' Stipulated Protective Order, which is attached to their motion as Exhibit 1. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on May 16, 2018. (AG)
|
May 15, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #38 Joint Motion for Protective Order: Upon consideration of the parties' joint motion for a protective order, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and it is further ORDERED that the parties may refile their motion with a revised proposed protective order that replaces paragraph 18 with the language that the Court yesterday provided to counsel by e-mail. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on May 15, 2018. (AG)
|
May 9, 2018 |
Filing 40
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paul A. Calli, :Firm- Calli Law, LLC, :Address- One Flagler Building, 14 Northeast 1st Avenue, Suite 1100, Miami, FL 33132. Phone No. - (786)504-0911. Fax No. - (786)504-0912 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5471987. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Paul A. Calli in support of the Motion for his admission to appear pro hac vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for the admission of Paul A. Calli to appear pro hac vice)(Shannon, Joseph)
|
May 9, 2018 |
Filing 39
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Charles P. Short, :Firm- Calli Law, LLC, :Address- One Flagler Building, 14 Northeast 1st Avenue, Suite 1100, Miami, FL 33132. Phone No. - (786)504-0911. Fax No. - (786)504-0912 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5471903. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Charles P. Short in support of the Motion for his Admission to appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for the admission of Charles P. Short to appear Pro Hac Vice)(Shannon, Joseph)
|
May 9, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #40 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Upon consideration of Defendants' motions for admission of attorneys Charles P. Short and Paul A. Calli pro hac vice, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that attorney Charles P. Short and attorney Paul A. Calli are admitted pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing in the above-captioned case. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on May 9, 2018. (AG)
|
May 8, 2018 |
Filing 38
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bromberg, Yael)
|
May 7, 2018 |
Filing 37
ORDER setting forth the Court's resolution of the parties' discovery dispute, as stated during today's telephone conference call with counsel. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on May 7, 2018. (AG)
|
May 7, 2018 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Telephone Conference held in Chambers on 5/7/2018. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (gdf)
|
April 3, 2018 |
Filing 36
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. Attorney Daniel D. Mauler terminated. (Mauler, Daniel)
|
March 30, 2018 |
Filing 35
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Scott Shannon on behalf of All Defendants (Shannon, Joseph)
|
January 25, 2018 |
Filing 34
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Barr on behalf of ALLISON MAASS (Barr, Benjamin)
|
January 23, 2018 |
Filing 33
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/18/2019. Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(1) due by 2/13/2018. Defendants' Rule 26(a)(1) due by 2/13/2018. Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(2) due by 7/2/2018. Defendants' Rule 26(a)(2) due by 8/31/2018. Status Conference set for 1/22/2019 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 23, 2018. (AG)
|
January 23, 2018 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Scheduling Conference held on 1/23/2018. Discovery completed due by 1/18/2019. Initial Disclosure due by 2/13/2018. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 7/2/2018. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 8/31/2018. Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) due by 10/1/2018. Status Conference set for 1/22/2019 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (Court Reporter: Lisa Griffith) (gdf)
|
January 22, 2018 |
Filing 32
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R. Klein on behalf of ALLISON MAASS (Klein, Stephen)
|
January 19, 2018 |
Filing 31
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Madigan on behalf of JAMES O'KEEFE (Madigan, Michael)
|
January 19, 2018 |
Filing 30
NOTICE of Appearance by Dara Lindenbaum on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lindenbaum, Dara)
|
January 18, 2018 |
Filing 29
ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND.(Mauler, Daniel) Modified to add link on 1/19/2018 (znmw).
|
January 18, 2018 |
Filing 28
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel D. Mauler on behalf of ALLISON MAASS (Mauler, Daniel)
|
January 16, 2018 |
Filing 27
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Mauler, Daniel)
|
January 16, 2018 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2018 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
|
January 12, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Initial Scheduling Conference presently set for January 23, 2018, at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 23A is CONTINUED until 2:15 p.m. that same day. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 12, 2018. (AG)
|
January 4, 2018 |
Filing 26
ORDER re Initial Scheduling Conference set for January 23, 2018, at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 23A. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 4, 2018. (AG)
|
January 4, 2018 |
Filing 25
MEMORANDUM OPINION accompanying Order (ECF No. #24 ) denying motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. #14 & #15 ) filed by defendants Project Veritas Action Fund, Project Veritas, and James OKeefe. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 4, 2018. (AG)
|
January 4, 2018 |
Filing 24
ORDER denying #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and #15 Motion to Dismiss Under the D.C. Anti-SLAPP Act filed by defendants Project Veritas Action Fund, Project Veritas, and James OKeefe for the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion (see ECF No. #25 ). Initial Scheduling Conference is set for January 23, 2018, at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 23A. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 4, 2018. (AG)
|
January 4, 2018 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
|
January 3, 2018 |
Filing 23
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALLISON MAASS served on 1/3/2018, answer due 1/24/2018 (Sandler, Joseph)
|
November 28, 2017 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Time to effectuate service upon Defendant Allison Maass by 1/26/2018. (gdf)
|
November 27, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #22 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Consent Motion to Extend Time for Service on Defendant Allison Maass, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall have until January 26, 2018, to serve Defendant Allison Maass and file proof of service with the Court. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 27, 2017. (AG)
|
November 21, 2017 |
Filing 22
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Allison Maass by ROBERT CREAMER, DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC, STRATEGIC CONSULTING GROUP, NA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
November 21, 2017 |
Filing 21
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Daniel Sandini (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
November 14, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO PROVE SERVICE OF PROCESS: Under Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a plaintiff must serve a defendant with a summons and a complaint within 90 days after the filing of the complaint. To date, the Court has no record that the defendants Allison Maass and Daniel Sandini have been served with a summons and complaint, and the 90-day time limit has expired. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that on or before November 21, 2017, plaintiff must either: (1) file with the Court proof that each defendant has been timely served, or (2) provide the Court with a written explanation for why service of process has not been completed. If plaintiff fails to comply with this order, or if the Court determines that plaintiff has not shown good cause for the failure to comply with Rule 4(m), this case as to these defendants will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. SO ORDERED.. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 14, 2017. (AG)
|
November 14, 2017 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Proof that each defendant has been timely served, or a written explanation for why service of process has not been completed due by 11/21/2017. (jl)
|
September 29, 2017 |
Filing 20
REPLY to opposition to motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss under D.C. Anti-SLAPP Act, #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (R. 12(b)(6)) filed by JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Mauler, Daniel)
|
September 15, 2017 |
Filing 19
Memorandum in opposition to re #15 MOTION to Dismiss under D.C. Anti-SLAPP Act, #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (R. 12(b)(6)) filed by ROBERT CREAMER, DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC, STRATEGIC CONSULTING GROUP, NA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
August 22, 2017 |
Filing 18
Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to Benjamin Barr; Type of Document Returned: Minute Order filed 8/7/17; Resent at New Address: N/A. (gdf)
|
August 7, 2017 |
Filing 17
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss under D.C. Anti-SLAPP Act, #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (R. 12(b)(6)) by ROBERT CREAMER, DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC, STRATEGIC CONSULTING GROUP, NA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
August 7, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #17 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (R. 12(b)(6)) and #15 MOTION to Dismiss under D.C. Anti-SLAPP Act: Upon consideration of plaintiffs' Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Motions to Dismiss, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file their opposition brief in response to the above-referenced Motions to Dismiss on or before September 15, 2017; and it is further ORDERED that the Defendants shall file their reply brief in support of their Motions to Dismiss on or before September 29, 2017. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 7, 2017. (AG) Modified on 8/8/2017 (AG).
|
July 28, 2017 |
Filing 16
MEMORANDUM re #15 MOTION to Dismiss under D.C. Anti-SLAPP Act filed by PROJECT VERITAS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND, #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (R. 12(b)(6)) filed by PROJECT VERITAS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND by JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Mauler, Daniel)
|
July 28, 2017 |
Filing 15
MOTION to Dismiss under D.C. Anti-SLAPP Act by JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mauler, Daniel)
|
July 28, 2017 |
Filing 14
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (R. 12(b)(6)) by JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mauler, Daniel)
|
July 11, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Upon consideration of the consent motions for admission pro hac vice of attorneys Benjamin T. Barr and Stephen R. Klein, filed by Defendants Project Veritas Action Fund, Project Veritas, and James OKeefe, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that attorneys Benjamin T. Barr and Stephen R. Klein are admitted pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing in the above-captioned case. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 11, 2017. (AG)
|
July 10, 2017 |
Filing 13
Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen R. Klein, :Firm- Stephen R. Klein, :Address- 500 Madison Street #419, Alexandria, VA 22314. Phone No. - 734-233-1705. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5025671. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Klein Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mauler, Daniel)
|
July 10, 2017 |
Filing 12
Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Benjamin Barr, :Firm- Law Office of Benjamin Barr, :Address- 444 North Michigan Avenue, Suite 1200, Chicago, IL 60611. Phone No. - 202-595-4617. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5025641. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Barr Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mauler, Daniel)
|
July 3, 2017 |
Filing 11
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Mauler, Daniel)
|
July 3, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint: Upon consideration of the Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed on June 30, 2017, by Defendants Project Veritas Action Fund, Project Veritas, and James O'Keefe (collectively, the "PV Defendants"), plaintiffs' consent to the motion, and for other good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the PV Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before August 4, 2017; and it is further ORDERED that the PV Defendants do not waive any rights, defenses, or arguments by virtue of this Motion or the relief granted herein. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 3, 2017. (AG)
|
July 3, 2017 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/4/2017. (gdf)
|
June 30, 2017 |
Filing 10
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mauler, Daniel)
|
June 30, 2017 |
Filing 9
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel D. Mauler on behalf of JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND (Mauler, Daniel)
|
June 23, 2017 |
Filing 8
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND served on 6/16/2017, answer due 7/7/2017 (Sandler, Joseph) Modified dates on 6/26/2017 (znmw).
|
June 23, 2017 |
Filing 7
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. PROJECT VERITAS served on 6/14/2017, answer due 7/5/2017 (Sandler, Joseph)
|
June 6, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Upon consideration of the MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Attorney Yael Bromberg is admitted pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing in the above-captioned case. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on June 6, 2017. (AG)
|
June 2, 2017 |
Filing 6
SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND, DANIEL SANDINI. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (md)
|
June 2, 2017 |
Filing 5
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Yael Bromberg, :Firm- Georgetown University Law Center Institute For Public Representation, :Address- 600 New Jersey Avenue NW Washington DC 20001. Phone No. - 202 662 9593. Fax No. - 202 662 9634 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4974915. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROBERT CREAMER, DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC (Francois, Aderson)
|
June 2, 2017 |
Filing 4
NOTICE of Appearance by Aderson Bellegarde Francois on behalf of ROBERT CREAMER, DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC (Francois, Aderson)
|
June 1, 2017 |
Filing 3
Corporate Disclosure Statement by STRATEGIC CONSULTING GROUP, NA, LLC. (Sandler, Joseph)
|
June 1, 2017 |
Filing 2
Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Sandler, Joseph)
|
June 1, 2017 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4973122) filed by ROBERT CREAMER, STRATEGIC CONSULTING GROUP, NA, LLC, DEMOCRACY PARTNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Project Veritas Action Fund Summons, #3 Summons Project Veritas Summons, #4 Summons James O'Keefe Summons, #5 Summons Allison Maass Summons, #6 Summons Daniel Sandini Summons)(Sandler, Joseph)
|
June 1, 2017 |
Case Assigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (md)
|