BLUMENTHAL et al v. TRUMP

Plaintiff: RICHARD BLUMENTHAL, CATHERINE CORTEZ MASTO, BRIAN SCHATZ, JERROLD NADLER, LUIS V. GUTIERREZ, JAMES E. CLYBURN, MARTIN HEINRICH, CHRISTOPHER A. COONS, JOHN CONYERS, JR., MICHAEL F. BENNET, JEFF MERKLEY, TED W. LIEU, KAREN BASS, HENRY C. HANK JOHNSON, JR., TOM CARPER, EDWARD J. MARKEY, CORY A. BOOKER, RON WYDEN, RICHARD J. DURBIN, BERNARD SANDERS, PATRICK LEAHY, TED DEUTCH, STEVE COHEN, KAMALA D. HARRIS, HAKEEM JEFFRIES, KIRSTEN E. GILLIBRAND, SHELDON WHITEHOUSE, TIM KAINE, LINDA T. SANCHEZ, MARIA CANTWELL, SHEILA JACKSON LEE, CHRIS VAN HOLLEN, STENY H. HOYER, TOM UDALL, JAMIE RASKIN, NANCY PELOSI, JACK REED, CEDRIC L. RICHMOND, DAVID N. CICILLINE, TAMMY DUCKWORTH, ELIZABETH WARREN, ERIC SWALWELL, CHRIS MURPHY, BENJAMIN L. CARDIN, JOSEPH CROWLEY, AMY KLOBUCHAR, ZOE LOFGREN, PATTY MURRAY, AL FRANKEN and MAZIE K. HIRONO
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Amicus Curiae: HAROLD H. BRUFF, PETER SMITH, BOB CARR, RICHARD M. THOMAS, DICK ZIMMER, LESLIE WILCOX, TOM HARKIN, MARILYN GLYNN, FORMER NATIONAL SECURITY OFFICIALS, GEORGE MILLER, PETER L. STRAUSS, JACK RAKOVE, BRAD MILLER, MICHAEL BARNES, HARVEY WILCOX, SIMON STERN, PHILIP SHARP, BARBARA BOXER, GAUTHAM RAO, LEONARD BOSWELL, BOB INGLIS, HENRY WAXMAN, JED H. SHUGERMAN, LAWRENCE R. REYNOLDS, FEDERAL JURISDICTION AND CONSTITUTIONAL LAW SCHOLARS, TRIP ROTHSCHILD, NEIL KINKOPF, TOM COLEMAN, CARL LEVIN, LEE HAMILTON, JUDICIAL EDUCATION PROJECT, AMY COMSTOCK RICK, KEVIN M. STACK, CHRIS SHAYS, SETH BARRETT TILLMAN, JOHN MIKHAIL, MICKEY EDWARDS, GARY HART, REBECCA L. BROWN, KAREN KUCIK, WALTER SHAUB, PETER M. SHANE, MARK UDALL, DON FOX, KATHLEEN WHALEN and CHRISTOPHER H. SCHROEDER
Case Number: 1:2017cv01154
Filed: June 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley P. Humphreys on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Humphreys, Bradley)
May 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer To The Amended Complaint And Parties To File Their Local Civil Rule 16.3 Report due by 5/28/2019. (mac)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #68 consent motion for extension of time to answer and to file Local Civil Rule 16.3 Report. The defendant shall file his answer to the amended complaint, and the parties shall file their Local Civil Rule 16.3 Report by no later than May 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/7/2019. (lcegs1)
May 7, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #69 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 16.3 Report (same document as Docket No. 68) was entered in error as a duplicate filing.(jf)
May 3, 2019 Filing 69 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 16.3 Report (same document as Docket No. 68) by DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean) Modified on 5/7/2019 (jf).
May 3, 2019 Filing 68 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint,,, and to File Rule 16.3 Report by DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean)
May 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: President Supplemental Brief due by 5/14/2019. Plaintiff Opposition due by 5/21/2019. President Reply due by 5/28/2019. (mac)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #66 Order and #67 Memorandum Opinion, the Court HEREBY ORDERS supplemental briefing on #60 Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal. The President shall file a supplemental brief by no later than May 14, 2019, plaintiffs shall file an opposition by no later than May 21, 2019, and the President shall file a reply by no later than May 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/30/2019. (lcegs1)
April 30, 2019 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/30/2019. (lcegs1)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying in part #15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/30/2019. (lcegs1)
April 11, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DONALD J. TRUMP. Attorney Brett A. Shumate terminated. (Shumate, Brett)
February 1, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lin, Jean)
January 30, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by KAREN BASS, MICHAEL F. BENNET, RICHARD BLUMENTHAL, CORY A. BOOKER, MARIA CANTWELL, BENJAMIN L. CARDIN, TOM CARPER, DAVID N. CICILLINE, JAMES E. CLYBURN, STEVE COHEN, CHRISTOPHER A. COONS, CATHERINE CORTEZ MASTO, TED DEUTCH, TAMMY DUCKWORTH, RICHARD J. DURBIN, KIRSTEN E. GILLIBRAND, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MARTIN HEINRICH, MAZIE K. HIRONO, STENY H. HOYER, SHEILA JACKSON LEE, HAKEEM JEFFRIES, HENRY C. HANK JOHNSON, JR, TIM KAINE, AMY KLOBUCHAR, PATRICK LEAHY, TED W. LIEU, ZOE LOFGREN, EDWARD J. MARKEY, JEFF MERKLEY, CHRIS MURPHY, PATTY MURRAY, JERROLD NADLER, NANCY PELOSI, JAMIE RASKIN, JACK REED, CEDRIC L. RICHMOND, LINDA T. SANCHEZ, BERNARD SANDERS, BRIAN SCHATZ, ERIC SWALWELL, TOM UDALL, CHRIS VAN HOLLEN, ELIZABETH WARREN, SHELDON WHITEHOUSE, RON WYDEN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gorod, Brianne)
November 9, 2018 Filing 62 REPLY to opposition to motion re #60 MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal of the Court's September 28, 2018 Order filed by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Lin, Jean)
November 2, 2018 Filing 61 Memorandum in opposition to re #60 MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal of the Court's September 28, 2018 Order filed by KAREN BASS, MICHAEL F. BENNET, RICHARD BLUMENTHAL, CORY A. BOOKER, MARIA CANTWELL, BENJAMIN L. CARDIN, TOM CARPER, DAVID N. CICILLINE, JAMES E. CLYBURN, STEVE COHEN, CHRISTOPHER A. COONS, CATHERINE CORTEZ MASTO, JOSEPH CROWLEY, TED DEUTCH, TAMMY DUCKWORTH, RICHARD J. DURBIN, KIRSTEN E. GILLIBRAND, LUIS V. GUTIERREZ, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MARTIN HEINRICH, MAZIE K. HIRONO, STENY H. HOYER, SHEILA JACKSON LEE, HAKEEM JEFFRIES, HENRY C. HANK JOHNSON, JR, TIM KAINE, AMY KLOBUCHAR, PATRICK LEAHY, TED W. LIEU, ZOE LOFGREN, EDWARD J. MARKEY, JEFF MERKLEY, CHRIS MURPHY, PATTY MURRAY, JERROLD NADLER, NANCY PELOSI, JAMIE RASKIN, JACK REED, CEDRIC L. RICHMOND, LINDA T. SANCHEZ, BERNARD SANDERS, BRIAN SCHATZ, ERIC SWALWELL, TOM UDALL, CHRIS VAN HOLLEN, ELIZABETH WARREN, SHELDON WHITEHOUSE, RON WYDEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gorod, Brianne)
October 22, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal of the Court's September 28, 2018 Order by DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Lin, Jean)
September 28, 2018 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/28/2018. (lcegs1)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying in part and deferring in part #15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/28/2018. (lcegs1)
August 20, 2018 NOTICE OF ERROR re #57 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY; emailed to brian@theusconstitution.org, cc'd 20 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. DO NOT REFILE-Signature on pleadings should match Login/Password (zjf, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by KAREN BASS, MICHAEL F. BENNET, RICHARD BLUMENTHAL, CORY A. BOOKER, MARIA CANTWELL, BENJAMIN L. CARDIN, TOM CARPER, DAVID N. CICILLINE, JAMES E. CLYBURN, STEVE COHEN, CHRISTOPHER A. COONS, CATHERINE CORTEZ MASTO, JOSEPH CROWLEY, TED DEUTCH, TAMMY DUCKWORTH, RICHARD J. DURBIN, KIRSTEN E. GILLIBRAND, LUIS V. GUTIERREZ, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MARTIN HEINRICH, MAZIE K. HIRONO, STENY H. HOYER, SHEILA JACKSON LEE, HAKEEM JEFFRIES, HENRY C. HANK JOHNSON, JR, TIM KAINE, AMY KLOBUCHAR, PATRICK LEAHY, TED W. LIEU, ZOE LOFGREN, EDWARD J. MARKEY, JEFF MERKLEY, CHRIS MURPHY, PATTY MURRAY, JERROLD NADLER, NANCY PELOSI, JAMIE RASKIN, JACK REED, CEDRIC L. RICHMOND, LINDA T. SANCHEZ, BERNARD SANDERS, BRIAN SCHATZ, ERIC SWALWELL, TOM UDALL, CHRIS VAN HOLLEN, ELIZABETH WARREN, SHELDON WHITEHOUSE, RON WYDEN (Frazelle, Brian)
August 15, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lin, Jean)
July 27, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by KAREN BASS, MICHAEL F. BENNET, RICHARD BLUMENTHAL, CORY A. BOOKER, MARIA CANTWELL, BENJAMIN L. CARDIN, TOM CARPER, DAVID N. CICILLINE, JAMES E. CLYBURN, STEVE COHEN, CHRISTOPHER A. COONS, CATHERINE CORTEZ MASTO, JOSEPH CROWLEY, TED DEUTCH, TAMMY DUCKWORTH, RICHARD J. DURBIN, KIRSTEN E. GILLIBRAND, LUIS V. GUTIERREZ, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MARTIN HEINRICH, MAZIE K. HIRONO, STENY H. HOYER, SHEILA JACKSON LEE, HAKEEM JEFFRIES, HENRY C. HANK JOHNSON, JR, TIM KAINE, AMY KLOBUCHAR, PATRICK LEAHY, TED W. LIEU, ZOE LOFGREN, EDWARD J. MARKEY, JEFF MERKLEY, CHRIS MURPHY, PATTY MURRAY, JERROLD NADLER, NANCY PELOSI, JAMIE RASKIN, JACK REED, CEDRIC L. RICHMOND, LINDA T. SANCHEZ, BERNARD SANDERS, BRIAN SCHATZ, ERIC SWALWELL, TOM UDALL, CHRIS VAN HOLLEN, ELIZABETH WARREN, SHELDON WHITEHOUSE, RON WYDEN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gorod, Brianne)
July 27, 2018 Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on 6-7-18; Page Numbers: 1-119. Date of Issuance:6-14-18. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 8/17/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2018.(Wallace, Scott) (Main Document 54 replaced on 7/31/2018) (zjf).
June 7, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Motion Hearing held on 6/7/2018 re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Court Reporter SCOTT WALLACE.) (mac)
June 4, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett A. Shumate on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Shumate, Brett)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #52 motion for leave to be heard at oral argument by amicus. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/22/2018. (lcegs1)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court has determined that at the June 7, 2018 motion hearing in this case, it will hear argument only on the threshold question of plaintiffs' standing to bring their claims. The Court is appreciative of the amicus briefs submitted, but declines to invite any amicus to be heard orally. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/22/2018. (lcegs1)
May 21, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION For Leave to be Heard at Oral Argument by JUDICIAL EDUCATION PROJECT, SETH BARRETT TILLMAN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ray, Robert)
April 30, 2018 Filing 51 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisidction (Pursuant to the Court's March 30 Order) filed by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Lin, Jean)
April 30, 2018 Filing 50 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re Order, filed by KAREN BASS, MICHAEL F. BENNET, RICHARD BLUMENTHAL, CORY A. BOOKER, MARIA CANTWELL, BENJAMIN L. CARDIN, TOM CARPER, DAVID N. CICILLINE, JAMES E. CLYBURN, STEVE COHEN, CHRISTOPHER A. COONS, CATHERINE CORTEZ MASTO, JOSEPH CROWLEY, TED DEUTCH, TAMMY DUCKWORTH, RICHARD J. DURBIN, KIRSTEN E. GILLIBRAND, LUIS V. GUTIERREZ, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MARTIN HEINRICH, MAZIE K. HIRONO, STENY H. HOYER, SHEILA JACKSON LEE, HAKEEM JEFFRIES, HENRY C. HANK JOHNSON, JR, TIM KAINE, AMY KLOBUCHAR, PATRICK LEAHY, TED W. LIEU, ZOE LOFGREN, EDWARD J. MARKEY, JEFF MERKLEY, CHRIS MURPHY, PATTY MURRAY, JERROLD NADLER, NANCY PELOSI, JAMIE RASKIN, JACK REED, CEDRIC L. RICHMOND, LINDA T. SANCHEZ, BERNARD SANDERS, BRIAN SCHATZ, ERIC SWALWELL, TOM UDALL, CHRIS VAN HOLLEN, ELIZABETH WARREN, SHELDON WHITEHOUSE, RON WYDEN. (Gorod, Brianne)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #48 motion to clarify, the Court clarifies that amici are not invited to respond to arguments raised by other amici. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/17/2018. (lcegs1) Modified event title on 4/19/2018 (znmw).
April 13, 2018 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JUDICIAL EDUCATION PROJECT, SETH BARRETT TILLMAN re #48 MOTION to Clarify . (Ray, Robert)
April 13, 2018 Filing 48 MOTION to Clarify by JUDICIAL EDUCATION PROJECT, SETH BARRETT TILLMAN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Ray, Robert)
April 5, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by KAREN BASS, MICHAEL F. BENNET, RICHARD BLUMENTHAL, CORY A. BOOKER, MARIA CANTWELL, BENJAMIN L. CARDIN, TOM CARPER, DAVID N. CICILLINE, JAMES E. CLYBURN, STEVE COHEN, CHRISTOPHER A. COONS, CATHERINE CORTEZ MASTO, JOSEPH CROWLEY, TED DEUTCH, TAMMY DUCKWORTH, RICHARD J. DURBIN, KIRSTEN E. GILLIBRAND, LUIS V. GUTIERREZ, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MARTIN HEINRICH, MAZIE K. HIRONO, STENY H. HOYER, SHEILA JACKSON LEE, HAKEEM JEFFRIES, HENRY C. HANK JOHNSON, JR, TIM KAINE, AMY KLOBUCHAR, PATRICK LEAHY, TED W. LIEU, ZOE LOFGREN, EDWARD J. MARKEY, JEFF MERKLEY, CHRIS MURPHY, PATTY MURRAY, JERROLD NADLER, NANCY PELOSI, JAMIE RASKIN, JACK REED, CEDRIC L. RICHMOND, LINDA T. SANCHEZ, BERNARD SANDERS, BRIAN SCHATZ, ERIC SWALWELL, TOM UDALL, CHRIS VAN HOLLEN, ELIZABETH WARREN, SHELDON WHITEHOUSE, RON WYDEN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gorod, Brianne)
March 30, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response To All Amicus Curiae Briefs due by 4/30/2018 (mac)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to respond, by no later than April 30, 2018, to any arguments raised by amici that have not been addressed by the parties in their briefs. The response shall be a consolidated response to all amicus curiae briefs of no more than 45 pages. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/30/2018. (lcegs1)
March 6, 2018 Filing 46 AMICUS BRIEF by JOHN MIKHAIL, JACK RAKOVE, GAUTHAM RAO, JED H. SHUGERMAN, SIMON STERN. (jf)
March 6, 2018 Filing 45 AMICUS BRIEF by (Separation of Powers Scholars) REBECCA L. BROWN, HAROLD H. BRUFF, NEIL KINKOPF, CHRISTOPHER H. SCHROEDER, PETER M. SHANE, KEVIN M. STACK, PETER L. STRAUSS. (jf)
March 6, 2018 Filing 44 AMICUS BRIEF by FEDERAL JURISDICTION AND CONSTITUTIONAL LAW SCHOLARS. (jf)
March 6, 2018 Filing 43 AMICUS BRIEF by FORMER NATIONAL SECURITY OFFICIALS. (jf)
March 6, 2018 Filing 42 AMICUS BRIEF by DON FOX, MARILYN GLYNN, KAREN KUCIK, LAWRENCE R. REYNOLDS, AMY COMSTOCK RICK, TRIP ROTHSCHILD, WALTER SHAUB, RICHARD M. THOMAS, KATHLEEN WHALEN, HARVEY WILCOX, LESLIE WILCOX . (jf)
March 6, 2018 Filing 41 AMICUS BRIEF by MICHAEL BARNES, LEONARD BOSWELL, BARBARA BOXER, BOB CARR, TOM COLEMAN, MICKEY EDWARDS, LEE HAMILTON, TOM HARKIN, GARY HART, BOB INGLIS, CARL LEVIN, BRAD MILLER, GEORGE MILLER, PHILIP SHARP, CHRIS SHAYS, PETER SMITH, MARK UDALL, HENRY WAXMAN, DICK ZIMMER. (jf)
March 6, 2018 Filing 40 AMICUS BRIEF by JUDICIAL EDUCATION PROJECT, SETH BARRETT TILLMAN. (jf)
March 6, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in Ceremonial Courtroom before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (mac)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court sua sponte schedules a motion hearing to hear oral argument on #15 motion to dismiss in this proceeding. The motion hearing shall take place on June 7, 2018 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 20. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/6/2018. (lcegs1)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #31 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Hyperlinked E-Brief by DON FOX, MARILYN GLYNN, KAREN KUCIK, LAWRENCE R. REYNOLDS, AMY COMSTOCK RICK, TRIP ROTHSCHILD, WALTER SHAUB, RICHARD M. THOMAS, KATHLEEN WHALEN, HARVEY WILCOX, LESLIE WILCOX. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/6/2018. (lcegs1)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #29 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae E-Brief with Hyperlinks by FORMER NATIONAL SECURITY OFFICIALS. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/6/2018. (lcegs1)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Joshua M. Blackman, Esq. is admitted pro hac vice in this proceeding. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/6/2018. (lcegs1)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER granting #26 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae by JED H. SHUGERMAN, JOHN MIKHAIL, JACK RAKOVE, GAUTHUM RAO, SIMON STERN.Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/6/2018. (lcegs1)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #25 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Separation of Powers Scholars as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs by REBECCA L. BROWN, HAROLD H BRUFF, NEIL KINKOPF, CHRISTOPHER H. SCHROEDER, PETER M. SHANE, KEVIN M. STACK, PETER L. STRAUSS. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/6/2018. (lcegs1)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #24 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Brief In Support of Plaintiffs by FEDERAL JURISDICTION AND CONSTITUTIONAL LAW SCHOLARS. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/6/2018. (lcegs1)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #22 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by FORMER NATIONAL SECURITY OFFICIALS. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/6/2018. (lcegs1)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #21 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by DON FOX, et al. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/6/2018. (lcegs1)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #18 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae by MICHAEL BARNES, LEONARD BOSWELL, BARBARA BOXER, Bob Carr, TOM COLEMAN, Mickey Edwards, Lee Hamilton, Tom Harkin, GARY HART, Bob Inglis, CARL LEVIN, Brad Miller, GEORGE MILLER, PHILIP SHARP, CHRIS SHAYS, PETER SMITH, MARK UDALL, HENRY WAXMAN, DICK ZIMMER. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3//2018. (lcegs1)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #16 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman and Judical Education Project as Amici Curiae in Support of the Defendant. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/6/2018. (lcegs1)
December 22, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lin, Jean)
November 28, 2017 Filing 37 NOTICE by MICHAEL BARNES (Donahue, Sean)
November 28, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE of Filing Hyperlinked E-Brief by JUDICIAL EDUCATION PROJECT, SETH BARRETT TILLMAN (Ray, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2017: #1 Hyperlinked Brief, #2 Request Notice) (znmw).
November 28, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE of Filing by DONALD J. TRUMP (Lin, Jean)
November 28, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE of Filing Hyperlinked E-Brief by FEDERAL JURISDICTION AND CONSTITUTIONAL LAW SCHOLARS re #24 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Brief In Support of Plaintiffs (Roush, Corey)
November 28, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE by REBECCA L. BROWN, HAROLD H. BRUFF, NEIL KINKOPF, CHRISTOPHER H. SCHROEDER, PETER M. SHANE, KEVIN M. STACK, PETER L. STRAUSS (Mapes, Katharine)
November 28, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE OF FILING HYPERLINKED BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE by JOHN MIKHAIL, JACK RAKOVE, GAUTHAM RAO, JED H. SHUGERMAN, SIMON STERN re #26 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae (Maxman, Melissa) (Main Document 32 replaced on 11/29/2017) (znmw).
November 28, 2017 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Hyperlinked E-Brief by DON FOX, MARILYN GLYNN, KAREN KUCIK, LAWRENCE R. REYNOLDS, AMY COMSTOCK RICK, TRIP ROTHSCHILD, WALTER SHAUB, RICHARD M. THOMAS, KATHLEEN WHALEN, HARVEY WILCOX, LESLIE WILCOX (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Curiae Hyperlinked E-Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Thomas)
November 28, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE OF FILING HYPERLINKED E-BRIEF by KAREN BASS, MICHAEL F. BENNET, RICHARD BLUMENTHAL, CORY A. BOOKER, MARIA CANTWELL, BENJAMIN L. CARDIN, TOM CARPER, DAVID N. CICILLINE, JAMES E. CLYBURN, STEVE COHEN, JOHN CONYERS, JR, CHRISTOPHER A. COONS, CATHERINE CORTEZ MASTO, JOSEPH CROWLEY, TED DEUTCH, TAMMY DUCKWORTH, RICHARD J. DURBIN, AL FRANKEN, KIRSTEN E. GILLIBRAND, LUIS V. GUTIERREZ, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MARTIN HEINRICH, MAZIE K. HIRONO, STENY H. HOYER, SHEILA JACKSON LEE, HAKEEM JEFFRIES, HENRY C. HANK JOHNSON, JR, TIM KAINE, AMY KLOBUCHAR, PATRICK LEAHY, TED W. LIEU, ZOE LOFGREN, EDWARD J. MARKEY, JEFF MERKLEY, CHRIS MURPHY, PATTY MURRAY, JERROLD NADLER, NANCY PELOSI, JAMIE RASKIN, JACK REED, CEDRIC L. RICHMOND, LINDA T. SANCHEZ, BERNARD SANDERS, BRIAN SCHATZ, ERIC SWALWELL, TOM UDALL, CHRIS VAN HOLLEN, ELIZABETH WARREN, SHELDON WHITEHOUSE, RON WYDEN (Gorod, Brianne)
November 26, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae E-Brief with Hyperlinks by FORMER NATIONAL SECURITY OFFICIALS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Curiae E-Brief With Hyperlinks, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spector, Phillip)
November 21, 2017 Filing 28 REPLY to opposition to motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Lin, Jean)
November 3, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joshua M. Blackman, :Firm- Joshua M. Blackman, :Address- 1303 San Jacinto Street, Houston, Texas 77002. Phone No. - 202-294-9003. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5190329. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SETH BARRETT TILLMAN (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ray, Robert)
November 2, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae by JED H. SHUGERMAN, JOHN MIKHAIL, JACK RAKOVE, GAUTHUM RAO, SIMON STERN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amici Curiae Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Maxman, Melissa)
November 2, 2017 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Separation of Powers Scholars as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs by REBECCA L. BROWN, HAROLD H BRUFF, NEIL KINKOPF, CHRISTOPHER H. SCHROEDER, PETER M. SHANE, KEVIN M. STACK, PETER L. STRAUSS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Mapes, Katharine)
November 2, 2017 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Brief In Support of Plaintiffs by FEDERAL JURISDICTION AND CONSTITUTIONAL LAW SCHOLARS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Roush, Corey)
November 2, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Corey William Roush on behalf of FEDERAL JURISDICTION AND CONSTITUTIONAL LAW SCHOLARS (Roush, Corey)
November 2, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by FORMER NATIONAL SECURITY OFFICIALS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Curiae Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spector, Phillip)
November 2, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by DON FOX, et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amici Curiae Brief of Former Government Ethics Officers, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Thomas)
November 2, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Goldstein on behalf of DON FOX, et al. (Goldstein, Thomas)
November 2, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Hoe Donahue on behalf of MICHAEL BARNES, et al. (Donahue, Sean)
November 2, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae by MICHAEL BARNES, LEONARD BOSWELL, BARBARA BOXER, Bob Carr, TOM COLEMAN, Mickey Edwards, Lee Hamilton, Tom Harkin, GARY HART, Bob Inglis, CARL LEVIN, Brad Miller, GEORGE MILLER, PHILIP SHARP, CHRIS SHAYS, PETER SMITH, MARK UDALL, HENRY WAXMAN, DICK ZIMMER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Donahue, Sean)
October 26, 2017 Filing 17 RESPONSE re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by KAREN BASS, MICHAEL F. BENNET, RICHARD BLUMENTHAL, CORY A. BOOKER, MARIA CANTWELL, BENJAMIN L. CARDIN, TOM CARPER, DAVID N. CICILLINE, JAMES E. CLYBURN, STEVE COHEN, JOHN CONYERS, JR, CHRISTOPHER A. COONS, CATHERINE CORTEZ MASTO, JOSEPH CROWLEY, TED DEUTCH, TAMMY DUCKWORTH, RICHARD J. DURBIN, AL FRANKEN, KIRSTEN E. GILLIBRAND, LUIS V. GUTIERREZ, KAMALA D. HARRIS, MARTIN HEINRICH, MAZIE K. HIRONO, STENY H. HOYER, SHEILA JACKSON LEE, HAKEEM JEFFRIES, HENRY C. HANK JOHNSON, JR, TIM KAINE, AMY KLOBUCHAR, PATRICK LEAHY, TED W. LIEU, ZOE LOFGREN, EDWARD J. MARKEY, JEFF MERKLEY, CHRIS MURPHY, PATTY MURRAY, JERROLD NADLER, NANCY PELOSI, JAMIE RASKIN, JACK REED, CEDRIC L. RICHMOND, LINDA T. SANCHEZ, BERNARD SANDERS, BRIAN SCHATZ, ERIC SWALWELL, TOM UDALL, CHRIS VAN HOLLEN, ELIZABETH WARREN, SHELDON WHITEHOUSE, RON WYDEN. (Gorod, Brianne)
September 19, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman and Judical Education Project as Amici Curiae in Support of the Defendant by SETH BARETT TILLAN, JUDICIAL EDUCATION PROJECT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brief for Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman and the Judicial Education Project as Amici Curiae in Support of the Defendant, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ray, Robert) Modified to correct filers on 9/20/2017 (znmw).
September 15, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean) Modified event title on 9/18/2017 (znmw).
August 15, 2017 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DONALD J. TRUMP filed by NANCY PELOSI, STENY H. HOYER, KAMALA D. HARRIS, BERNARD SANDERS, CHRIS MURPHY, JOHN CONYERS, JR, TOM CARPER, RICHARD BLUMENTHAL, CATHERINE CORTEZ MASTO, CHRIS VAN HOLLEN, BENJAMIN L. CARDIN, KAREN BASS, JACK REED, JEFF MERKLEY, BRIAN SCHATZ, STEVE COHEN, KIRSTEN E. GILLIBRAND, CORY A. BOOKER, TED W. LIEU, EDWARD J. MARKEY, AL FRANKEN, RON WYDEN, JOSEPH CROWLEY, CHRISTOPHER A. COONS, ERIC SWALWELL, TED DEUTCH, MARTIN HEINRICH, HAKEEM JEFFRIES, MICHAEL F. BENNET, TIM KAINE, TOM UDALL, AMY KLOBUCHAR, JAMIE RASKIN, SHEILA JACKSON LEE, LINDA T. SANCHEZ, RICHARD J. DURBIN, SHELDON WHITEHOUSE, MAZIE K. HIRONO, HENRY C. HANK JOHNSON, JR, DAVID N. CICILLINE, MARIA CANTWELL, PATRICK LEAHY, ZOE LOFGREN, PATTY MURRAY, JAMES E. CLYBURN, CEDRIC L. RICHMOND, JERROLD NADLER, TAMMY DUCKWORTH, LUIS V. GUTIERREZ, ELIZABETH WARREN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline -- Amended Complaint)(Gorod, Brianne)
July 16, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint due by 8/15/2017. Defendant's Response To The Complaint due by 09/15/2017. Motion Seeking Leave To File An Amicus Curiae Brief In Support Of Defendant, With The Brief Attached As An Exhibit due by 9/22/2017. Plaintiffs' Opposition To The Motion To Dismiss due by 10/26/2017. Motion Seeking Leave To File An Amicus Curiae Brief In Support Of Plaintiffs, With The Brief Attached As An Exhibit due by 11/02/2017. Defendant's Reply In Support Of The Motion To Dismiss due by 11/21/2017. Parties, Including Those Seeking Leave To File An Amicus Curiae Brief, Shall File E-Briefs, Containing Hyperlinks To Any cited Exhibits and Points And Authorities due by 11/28/2017. (mac)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GOVERNING THE FILING OF AMICUS CURIAE BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/14/2017. (lcegs1)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion for Extensions of Time and for Entry of Scheduling Order. The following schedule shall govern proceedings in this case: plaintiffs' first amended complaint shall be filed by no later than August 15, 2017; defendant's response to the complaint shall be filed by no later than September 15, 2017; any motion seeking leave to file an amicus curiae brief in support of defendant, with the brief attached as an exhibit, shall be filed by no later than September 22, 2017; plaintiffs' opposition to the motion to dismiss shall be filed by no later than October 26, 2017; any motion seeking leave to file an amicus curiae brief in support of plaintiffs, with the brief attached as an exhibit, shall be filed by no later than November 2, 2017; defendant's reply in support of the motion to dismiss shall be filed by no later than November 21, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties may file non-hyperlinked briefs in accordance with this schedule. By no later than November 28, 2017, the parties, including those seeking leave to file an amicus curiae brief, shall file E-Briefs containing hyperlinks to any cited exhibits and points and authorities. By no later than November 28, 2017, the parties, including those seeking leave to file an amicus curiae brief, shall submit to the Court two hard copies and one USB drive containing all submissions to the Court governed by this scheduling order, including points and authorities. All paper copy submissions to the Court shall include the headers added by the Case Management/Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) System and shall be single-sided, double-spaced, use 12-point Times New Roman font, and use one inch page margins. Each set of hard copies shall be in three-ring binders, with appropriate tables of contents and tabs, and the binders shall be clearly labeled to identify the pleading therein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that by no later than November 28, 2017, the parties shall jointly submit one copy of each principal case or authority cited by any party. The points and authorities shall be in three-ring binders, with appropriate tables of contents and tabs, and the binders shall be clearly labeled to identify the contents therein. Plaintiffs' counsel is HEREBY REMINDED of Local Civil Rule 5.1(c)(1) requiring documents signed by an attorney to include the D.C. Bar identification number of the attorney, as appropriate. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/14/2017. (lcegs1)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/14/2017.(Attachments: #1 Appendix) (lcegs1)
July 12, 2017 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint and for Entry of Scheduling Order by DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean). Added MOTION for Scheduling Order on 7/13/2017 (znmw).
July 12, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Lin on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Lin, Jean)
July 10, 2017 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DONALD J. TRUMP served on 6/19/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/19/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/19/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/18/2017.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Frazelle, Brian)
June 14, 2017 Filing 8 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Consent Forms)(jd)
June 14, 2017 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE as to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia filed by NANCY PELOSI, STENY H. HOYER, KAMALA D. HARRIS, BERNARD SANDERS, CHRIS MURPHY, JOHN CONYERS, JR, TOM CARPER, RICHARD BLUMENTHAL, CATHERINE CORTEZ MASTO, CHRIS VAN HOLLEN, BENJAMIN L. CARDIN, KAREN BASS, JACK REED, JEFF MERKLEY, BRIAN SCHATZ, STEVE COHEN, KIRSTEN E. GILLIBRAND, CORY A. BOOKER, TED W. LIEU, EDWARD J. MARKEY, AL FRANKEN, RON WYDEN, JOSEPH CROWLEY, CHRISTOPHER A. COONS, ERIC SWALWELL, TED DEUTCH, MARTIN HEINRICH, HAKEEM JEFFRIES, MICHAEL F. BENNET, TIM KAINE, TOM UDALL, AMY KLOBUCHAR, JAMIE RASKIN, SHEILA JACKSON LEE, LINDA T. SANCHEZ, RICHARD J. DURBIN, SHELDON WHITEHOUSE, MAZIE K. HIRONO, HENRY C. HANK JOHNSON, JR, DAVID N. CICILLINE, MARIA CANTWELL, PATRICK LEAHY, ZOE LOFGREN, PATTY MURRAY, JAMES E. CLYBURN, CEDRIC L. RICHMOND, JERROLD NADLER, TAMMY DUCKWORTH, LUIS V. GUTIERREZ, ELIZABETH WARREN.(Frazelle, Brian)
June 14, 2017 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE as to U.S. Attorney General filed by NANCY PELOSI, STENY H. HOYER, KAMALA D. HARRIS, BERNARD SANDERS, CHRIS MURPHY, JOHN CONYERS, JR, TOM CARPER, RICHARD BLUMENTHAL, CATHERINE CORTEZ MASTO, CHRIS VAN HOLLEN, BENJAMIN L. CARDIN, KAREN BASS, JACK REED, JEFF MERKLEY, BRIAN SCHATZ, STEVE COHEN, KIRSTEN E. GILLIBRAND, CORY A. BOOKER, TED W. LIEU, EDWARD J. MARKEY, AL FRANKEN, RON WYDEN, JOSEPH CROWLEY, CHRISTOPHER A. COONS, ERIC SWALWELL, TED DEUTCH, MARTIN HEINRICH, HAKEEM JEFFRIES, MICHAEL F. BENNET, TIM KAINE, TOM UDALL, AMY KLOBUCHAR, JAMIE RASKIN, SHEILA JACKSON LEE, LINDA T. SANCHEZ, RICHARD J. DURBIN, SHELDON WHITEHOUSE, MAZIE K. HIRONO, HENRY C. HANK JOHNSON, JR, DAVID N. CICILLINE, MARIA CANTWELL, PATRICK LEAHY, ZOE LOFGREN, PATTY MURRAY, JAMES E. CLYBURN, CEDRIC L. RICHMOND, JERROLD NADLER, TAMMY DUCKWORTH, LUIS V. GUTIERREZ, ELIZABETH WARREN.(Frazelle, Brian)
June 14, 2017 SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. Attorney General, and U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia (jd)
June 14, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachment: #1 Consent Forms)(jd)
June 14, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (jd)
June 14, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brianne Jenna Gorod on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gorod, Brianne)
June 14, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Rene Frazelle on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Frazelle, Brian)
June 14, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wydra, Elizabeth)
June 14, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DONALD J. TRUMP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4989810) filed by NANCY PELOSI, STENY H. HOYER, KAMALA D. HARRIS, BERNARD SANDERS, CHRIS MURPHY, JOHN CONYERS, JR, TOM CARPER, RICHARD BLUMENTHAL, CATHERINE CORTEZ MASTO, CHRIS VAN HOLLEN, BENJAMIN L. CARDIN, KAREN BASS, JACK REED, JEFF MERKLEY, BRIAN SCHATZ, STEVE COHEN, KIRSTEN E. GILLIBRAND, CORY A. BOOKER, TED W. LIEU, EDWARD J. MARKEY, AL FRANKEN, RON WYDEN, JOSEPH CROWLEY, CHRISTOPHER A. COONS, ERIC SWALWELL, TED DEUTCH, MARTIN HEINRICH, HAKEEM JEFFRIES, MICHAEL F. BENNET, TIM KAINE, TOM UDALL, AMY KLOBUCHAR, JAMIE RASKIN, SHEILA JACKSON LEE, LINDA T. SANCHEZ, RICHARD J. DURBIN, SHELDON WHITEHOUSE, MAZIE K. HIRONO, HENRY C. HANK JOHNSON, JR, DAVID N. CICILLINE, MARIA CANTWELL, PATRICK LEAHY, ZOE LOFGREN, PATTY MURRAY, JAMES E. CLYBURN, CEDRIC L. RICHMOND, JERROLD NADLER, TAMMY DUCKWORTH, LUIS V. GUTIERREZ, ELIZABETH WARREN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gorod, Brianne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLUMENTHAL et al v. TRUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD BLUMENTHAL
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHERINE CORTEZ MASTO
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN SCHATZ
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERROLD NADLER
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS V. GUTIERREZ
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES E. CLYBURN
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTIN HEINRICH
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER A. COONS
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN CONYERS, JR.
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL F. BENNET
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFF MERKLEY
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TED W. LIEU
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN BASS
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY C. HANK JOHNSON, JR.
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOM CARPER
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD J. MARKEY
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORY A. BOOKER
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RON WYDEN
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD J. DURBIN
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERNARD SANDERS
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK LEAHY
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TED DEUTCH
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVE COHEN
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAMALA D. HARRIS
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAKEEM JEFFRIES
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIRSTEN E. GILLIBRAND
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHELDON WHITEHOUSE
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIM KAINE
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA T. SANCHEZ
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA CANTWELL
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEILA JACKSON LEE
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRIS VAN HOLLEN
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STENY H. HOYER
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOM UDALL
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMIE RASKIN
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY PELOSI
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACK REED
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CEDRIC L. RICHMOND
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID N. CICILLINE
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMY DUCKWORTH
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH WARREN
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC SWALWELL
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRIS MURPHY
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN L. CARDIN
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH CROWLEY
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY KLOBUCHAR
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZOE LOFGREN
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATTY MURRAY
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AL FRANKEN
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAZIE K. HIRONO
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Brett A. Shumate
Represented By: Bradley P. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HAROLD H. BRUFF
Represented By: Katharine M. Mapes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PETER SMITH
Represented By: Sean Hoe Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BOB CARR
Represented By: Sean Hoe Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RICHARD M. THOMAS
Represented By: Thomas C. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DICK ZIMMER
Represented By: Sean Hoe Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LESLIE WILCOX
Represented By: Thomas C. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TOM HARKIN
Represented By: Sean Hoe Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARILYN GLYNN
Represented By: Thomas C. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FORMER NATIONAL SECURITY OFFICIALS
Represented By: Phillip Michael Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GEORGE MILLER
Represented By: Sean Hoe Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PETER L. STRAUSS
Represented By: Katharine M. Mapes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JACK RAKOVE
Represented By: Melissa H. Maxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRAD MILLER
Represented By: Sean Hoe Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHAEL BARNES
Represented By: Sean Hoe Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HARVEY WILCOX
Represented By: Thomas C. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SIMON STERN
Represented By: Melissa H. Maxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PHILIP SHARP
Represented By: Sean Hoe Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BARBARA BOXER
Represented By: Sean Hoe Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GAUTHAM RAO
Represented By: Melissa H. Maxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LEONARD BOSWELL
Represented By: Sean Hoe Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BOB INGLIS
Represented By: Sean Hoe Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HENRY WAXMAN
Represented By: Sean Hoe Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JED H. SHUGERMAN
Represented By: Melissa H. Maxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LAWRENCE R. REYNOLDS
Represented By: Thomas C. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FEDERAL JURISDICTION AND CONSTITUTIONAL LAW SCHOLARS
Represented By: Corey William Roush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TRIP ROTHSCHILD
Represented By: Thomas C. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEIL KINKOPF
Represented By: Katharine M. Mapes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TOM COLEMAN
Represented By: Sean Hoe Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CARL LEVIN
Represented By: Sean Hoe Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LEE HAMILTON
Represented By: Sean Hoe Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JUDICIAL EDUCATION PROJECT
Represented By: Robert William Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMY COMSTOCK RICK
Represented By: Thomas C. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KEVIN M. STACK
Represented By: Katharine M. Mapes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHRIS SHAYS
Represented By: Sean Hoe Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SETH BARRETT TILLMAN
Represented By: Robert William Ray
Represented By: Joshua Michael Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOHN MIKHAIL
Represented By: Melissa H. Maxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICKEY EDWARDS
Represented By: Sean Hoe Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GARY HART
Represented By: Sean Hoe Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REBECCA L. BROWN
Represented By: Katharine M. Mapes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KAREN KUCIK
Represented By: Thomas C. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WALTER SHAUB
Represented By: Thomas C. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PETER M. SHANE
Represented By: Katharine M. Mapes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARK UDALL
Represented By: Sean Hoe Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DON FOX
Represented By: Thomas C. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KATHLEEN WHALEN
Represented By: Thomas C. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHRISTOPHER H. SCHROEDER
Represented By: Katharine M. Mapes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?